Cybernet Entertainment Llc v. Michael R.radcliff

Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 91229667-OPP
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 21, 2017 at 8:11 AM EDT (7.6 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Cybernet Entertainment LLC, Plaintiff

Represented by Austin Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder swanson@austinlawgroup.com
v.
No Logo Michael R.radcliff, Defendant

Represented by Richrd Mark Blnk Esquire

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Mark Blank rmb@blanklegal.com
Attributes
Type Opposition
Interlocutory Attorney ELIZABETH WINTER
Date in Location 8/23/2016
Status Code 2
Location Code 845
Timeline
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (4) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/20/2017, Entered: None T
Bd Decision: Sustained
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/14/2017, Entered: None T
P Mot For Default Judgment
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: None T
Answer Due; Trial Dates Reset
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/19/2017, Entered: None T
D Mot For Ext W/o Consent
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: None T
P Mot For Default Judgment
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: None T
D's Mtn To Set Aside Notice Of Default Denied; Mtn To Reopen Granted; Answer Due; Trial Dates Reset
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: None T
P Opp/resp To Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: None X
Response Due
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: None M
Mot For Relief From Entry Of Default Judgment
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/12/2016, Entered: None T
Notice Of Default
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/23/2016, Entered: None
Pending, Instituted
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/23/2016, Entered: None
Notice And Trial Dates Sent; Answer Due:
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/23/2016, Entered: None
Filed And Fee
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 2 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?