Atkins v. Florida Department of Corrections et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Middle District Court, Case No. 2:16-cv-00360

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 25, 2018 at 3:42 PM ST (3.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Mae Helen Atkins, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Amber Hall, Attorney at Law, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amber Noelle Belinda Hall +1 850 201 7253 amber@amberhalllaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shea and Larocque

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JAMES VERNON COOK +1 850 222 8080 +1 850 561 0836 cookjv@gmail.com
v.
No Logo Ahsaki Jones, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Van Wilson +1 813 233 2880 kenneth.wilson@myfloridalegal.com
No Logo Andrew Love, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Van Wilson +1 813 233 2880 kenneth.wilson@myfloridalegal.com
No Logo Christopher Wheeler, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gaebe Mullen Antonelli & Dimatteo

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Devang B. Desai +1 305 667 0223 +1 305 284 9844 ddesai@gaebemullen.com
No Logo DANIEL LYNCH, Defendant
No Logo Daniel Stahl, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gaebe Mullen Antonelli & Dimatteo

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Devang B. Desai +1 305 667 0223 +1 305 284 9844 ddesai@gaebemullen.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel R Lazaro +1 305 667 0223 +1 305 284 9844 dlazaro@gaebemullen.com
No Logo Dave Thomas, Defendant
No Logo Denise Jenks, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gaebe Mullen Antonelli & Dimatteo

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Devang B. Desai +1 305 667 0223 +1 305 284 9844 ddesai@gaebemullen.com
No Logo Dr. Robert Hemphill, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gaebe Mullen Antonelli & Dimatteo

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Devang B. Desai +1 305 667 0223 +1 305 284 9844 ddesai@gaebemullen.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel R Lazaro +1 305 667 0223 +1 305 284 9844 dlazaro@gaebemullen.com
No Logo Edward Sinor, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Van Wilson +1 813 233 2880 kenneth.wilson@myfloridalegal.com
No Logo Errol Grant, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Van Wilson +1 813 233 2880 kenneth.wilson@myfloridalegal.com
No Logo Florida Department of Corrections, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Van Wilson +1 813 233 2880 kenneth.wilson@myfloridalegal.com
No Logo Joseph Troyan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Van Wilson +1 813 233 2880 kenneth.wilson@myfloridalegal.com
No Logo Kent Stott, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Van Wilson +1 813 233 2880 kenneth.wilson@myfloridalegal.com
No Logo Mestely Saintervil, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Van Wilson +1 813 233 2880 kenneth.wilson@myfloridalegal.com
No Logo Priscilla Wheeler, Defendant
No Logo Rosemary Harrington, Defendant
No Logo Thomas, Reid, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Van Wilson +1 813 233 2880 kenneth.wilson@myfloridalegal.com
No Logo Thomas Weidner, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Van Wilson +1 813 233 2880 kenneth.wilson@myfloridalegal.com
No Logo Tyler Triplett, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Van Wilson +1 813 233 2880 kenneth.wilson@myfloridalegal.com
No Logo Wexford Health Sources, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gaebe Mullen Antonelli & Dimatteo

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Devang B. Desai +1 305 667 0223 +1 305 284 9844 ddesai@gaebemullen.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel R Lazaro +1 305 667 0223 +1 305 284 9844 dlazaro@gaebemullen.com
  Entries (91) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: None Mediation report
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: None Judgment
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 8/2/2017, Entered: None Amended Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: None Case Management Report
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Status Conference
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Continue
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 2/21/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 2/21/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 2/21/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 2/21/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 2/21/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Hearing
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: None Status Report
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 2/9/2017, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Remand to State Court
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for More Definite Statement
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None Extend Time
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None Status Report Order
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/26/2017, Entered: None Compel
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/10/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim amended complaint for damages by Ahsaki Jones. (Wilson, Kenneth). Added and in the alternative MOTION for More Definite Statement on 9/27/2016 (SLU). (Entered: 09/27/2016)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                  MOTION for protective order by Errol Grant, Andrew Love, Thomas Reid, Mestely Saintervil, Kent Stott, Tyler Triplett, Joseph Troyan, Thomas Weidner. (Wilson, Kenneth) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. Modified on 9/27/2016 to edit docket text (SLU). (Entered: 09/26/2016)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                    MOTION to stay discovery by Errol Grant, Andrew Love, Thomas Reid, Mestely Saintervil, Kent Stott, Tyler Triplett, Joseph Troyan, Thomas Weidner. (Wilson, Kenneth) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. Modified on 9/26/2016 to edit docket text (SLU). (Entered: 09/23/2016)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Remand to State Court
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                              ENDORSED ORDER granting 42 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time for Service of Process. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 8/1/2016. (MMH) (Entered: 08/01/2016)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Blank 44 Filed: 7/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 38 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Mae Helen Atkins. (Hall, Amber) (Entered: 07/29/2016)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 43 Filed: 7/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 37 MOTION to Dismiss, 33 MOTION to Dismiss Count XII - Wrongful Death - from Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Mae Helen Atkins. (Hall, Amber) (Entered: 07/29/2016)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    UNOPPOSED MOTION to extend time to Serve Defendants (Service of Process Extension) and memorandum of law in support by Mae Helen Atkins. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit FDOC Affidavit of Service, # 2 Exhibit Wexford Health Sources, Inc. Affidavit of Service, # 3 Exhibit T. Triplett Affidavit of Service, # 4 Exhibit T. Reid Affidavit of Service, # 5 Exhibit T. Weidner Affidavit of Service, # 6 Exhibit J. Troyan Affidavit of Service, # 7 Exhibit E. Grant Affidavit of Service, # 8 Exhibit Kent Stott Affidavit of Service, # 9 Exhibit M. Saintervil Affidavit of Service, # 10 Exhibit A. Jones Affidavit of Service, # 11 Exhibit A. Love Affidavit of Service, # 12 Exhibit R. Hemphill Affidavit of Service, # 13 Exhibit D. Stahl Affidavit of Service)(Hall, Amber) Modified on 7/22/2016 to edit docket text (SLU). (Entered: 07/21/2016)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      NOTICE of compliance with Service of Initial Rule 26 Disclosures by Mae Helen Atkins (Hall, Amber) (Entered: 07/20/2016)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        NOTICE of compliance with Service of Initial Rule 26 Disclosures by Robert Hemphill, Daniel Stahl, Wexford Health Sources, Inc. (Desai, Devang) (Entered: 07/20/2016)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 39 Filed: 7/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          JOINT STIPULATION to Designate Mediator pursuant to case management scheduling order 32 by Mae Helen Atkins, Wexford Health Sources, Inc., Daniel Stahl, Robert Hemphill, Florida Department of Corrections, Tyler Triplett, Thomas Weidner, Thomas Reid, Mestely Saintervil, Kent Stott, Joseph Troyan, Errol Grant, Ahsaki Jones, and Andrew Love. (Hall, Amber) Modified on 7/20/2016 to add filers and edit docket text (SLU). (Entered: 07/19/2016)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim and qualified immunity (isolated counts) by Errol Grant, Andrew Love, Thomas Reid, Mestely Saintervil, Edward Sinor, Kent Stott, Tyler Triplett, Joseph Troyan, Thomas Weidner. (Wilson, Kenneth). Added in the alternative MOTION for More Definite Statement on 7/18/2016 (SLU). Modified on 7/18/2016 to add event, edit filers, and edit docket text (SLU). (Entered: 07/15/2016)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              AMENDED MOTION to Dismiss Count XII - Wrongful Death - from Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Wexford Health Sources, Inc. (Lazaro, Daniel) Modified on 7/15/2016 (kma). (Entered: 07/15/2016)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to 29 Amended Complaint by Daniel Stahl.(Desai, Devang) (Entered: 07/15/2016)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to 29 Amended Complaint by Robert Hemphill.(Desai, Devang) (Entered: 07/15/2016)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to 29 Amended Complaint by Wexford Health Sources, Inc..(Desai, Devang) (Entered: 07/15/2016)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss Count XII - Wrongful Death - from Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Wexford Health Sources, Inc.. (Desai, Devang) Terminated on 7/15/2016. Attorney filed amended motion 37 (kma). (Entered: 07/15/2016)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 32 Filed: 7/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/25/2017 at 09:30 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 D before Judge Sheri Polster Chappell, Jury Trial set for 9/5/2017 at 09:00 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 D before Judge Sheri Polster Chappell. See Order for all deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 7/5/2016. (BJH) (Entered: 07/05/2016)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot 22 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot 28 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Defendants have fourteen (14) days after service of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint 29 to file an answer or other responsive pleading. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 7/5/2016. (MMH) (Entered: 07/05/2016)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy: PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 7/5/2016. (BJH) (Entered: 07/05/2016)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT (First) against Errol Grant, Rosemary Harrington, Robert Hemphill, Denise Jenks, Ahsaki Jones, Andrew Love, Daniel Lynch, Thomas Reid, Mestely Saintervil, Edward Sinor, Daniel Stahl, Kent Stott, Dave Thomas, Tyler Triplett, Joseph Troyan, Thomas Weidner, Wexford Health Sources, Inc., Christopher Wheeler, Priscilla Wheeler with Jury Demand. filed by Mae Helen Atkins.(Hall, Amber) (Entered: 07/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                First MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by Errol Grant, Andrew Love, Kent Stott. (Wilson, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Hall, Amber) (Entered: 06/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Hall, Amber) Modified on 6/28/2016 pleading not signed by counsel; counsel notified via e-mail (SLU). (Entered: 06/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION to 11th Amendment Immunity by Mae Helen Atkins. (Hall, Amber) (Entered: 06/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        ENDORSED ORDER granting 23 Joint Motion for Leave to Conduct Case Management Conference Telephonically. The parties may conduct the case management conference by telephone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 6/15/2016. (JTM) (Entered: 06/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          JOINT MOTION to Appear Telephonically at Case Management Conference by Florida Department of Corrections, Thomas Reid, Tyler Triplett, Thomas Weidner, Joseph Troyan, and Mae Helen Atkins. (Wilson, Kenneth) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. Modified on 6/15/2016 to add filer and edit docket text (SLU). (Entered: 06/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Damages by Florida Department of Corrections, Thomas Reid, Tyler Triplett, Joseph Troyan, Thomas Weidner. (Wilson, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              TEXT ORDER: Notwithstanding any prior Order of the Court, the parties are to file a joint Case Management Report by no later than 6/28/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 6/7/2016. (JTM) (Entered: 06/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 5 Interested persons order by Florida Department of Corrections. (Wilson, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of pendency of related cases re 6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Florida Department of Corrections. Related case(s): yes (Wilson, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Wexford Health Sources, Inc..(Lazaro, Daniel) (Entered: 06/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED ORDER granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or respond and granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or respond. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 6/1/2016. (MMH) (Entered: 06/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of pendency of related cases re 6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Wexford Health Sources, Inc.. Related case(s): no (Desai, Devang) (Entered: 05/31/2016)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 5 Interested persons order by Wexford Health Sources, Inc.. (Desai, Devang) (Entered: 05/31/2016)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of pendency of related cases re 6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Mae Helen Atkins. Related case(s): no (Hall, Amber) (Entered: 05/31/2016)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 5 Interested persons order for civil cases by Mae Helen Atkins. (Hall, Amber) (Entered: 05/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of compliance with Local Rule 2.01(d) by Mae Helen Atkins. (Hall, Amber) (Entered: 05/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of compliance with Local Rule 2.01(d) by Mae Helen Atkins (Hall, Amber) (Entered: 05/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by James V. Cook on behalf of Mae Helen Atkins (Cook, James) (Entered: 05/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 2 Complaint by Wexford Health Sources, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Desai, Devang) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. Modified on 5/26/2016 to edit docket text (SLU). (Entered: 05/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 2 Complaint by Florida Department of Corrections. (Wilson, Kenneth) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. Modified on 5/20/2016 to edit docket text (SLU). (Entered: 05/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 7/5/2016 at 10:00 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 C before Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. (BJH) (Entered: 05/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 5/31/2016. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 5/17/2016. (BJH) (Entered: 05/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 5/31/2016. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 5/17/2016. (BJH) (Entered: 05/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER for Amber Hall to comply with the administrative procedures regarding electronic filing. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 5/17/2016. (BJH) (Entered: 05/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 5/13/2016. (SLU) (Entered: 05/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT For Damages against Florida Department of Corrections, Errol Grant, Rosemary Harrington, Robert Hemphill, Denise Jenks, Ahsaki Jones, Andrew Love, Daniel Lynch, Thomas Reid, Mestely Saintervil, Edward Sinor, Daniel Stahl, Kent Stott, Dave Thomas, Tyler Triplett, Joseph Troyan, Thomas Weidner, Wexford Health Sources, Inc., Christopher Wheeler with Jury Demand originally filed in State Court on April 11, 2016 filed by Mae Helen Atkins.(RMT) (Entered: 05/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the Twentieth Judicial Circuit, in and for Charlotte County, Florida, case number 16-00065-CA originally filed in State Court on April 11, 2016. Filing fee $400, receipt number FTM009369 filed by Wexford Health Sources, Inc., Robert Hemphill, Denise Jenks, Daniel Stahl, Christopher Wheeler . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(RMT) (Entered: 05/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 9 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?