Arucan v. Cambridge East Healthcare Center/Sava Seniorcare, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Michigan Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:16-cv-12726

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 9, 2019 at 3:24 PM DT (1.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation No cause code entered
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (58) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 10/9/2019, Entered: None Appeal/Supreme Court Letter
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 7/18/2019, Entered: None Appeal/Supreme Court Letter
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 3/7/2019, Entered: None Appeal Mandate
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 2/12/2019, Entered: None Appeal Order/Opinion/Judgment
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: None Change of Address/Contact Information
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: None Certificate of Service of Notice of Appeal - 6th Circuit*
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appeal - 6th Circuit
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/30/2018, Entered: None Judgment*
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  OPINION AND ORDER ACCEPTING the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation 73 and GRANTING Heinrich and Zamojski's and Cambridge East Healthcare Center's Motions for Summary Judgment ( 50 , 52 ). Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (KJac)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: None Objection to Report and Recommendation
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: None Notice - Other
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Extend
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: None Extend - free
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: None Report and Recommendation
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: None Notice - Other
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: None Notice - Other
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Response - Free
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 1/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    OPINION AND ORDER AFFIRMING Magistrate Judge's Order Denying Motion to Compel Discovery 57 . Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (KJac)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 12/19/2017, Entered: None Objection - Free
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Compel
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/26/2017, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Requiring Responsive Pleading*
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/2/2017, Entered: None Compel
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/2/2017, Entered: None Appoint Counsel
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: None Requiring Responsive Pleading*
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/14/2017, Entered: None Notice - Other
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: None Leave to File
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: None Withdraw Motion
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/4/2017, Entered: None Requiring Responsive Pleading*
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion - Free
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: None Motion - Free
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None Leave to File
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None Appearance
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None Objection - Free
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/16/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: None Change of Address/Contact Information
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Change of Address/Contact Information
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Request - other
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/3/2016, Entered: None Change of Address/Contact Information
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: None Appearance
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/23/2016, Entered: None Appear*
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/23/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: None Application for Appointment of Counsel
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Appearance
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: None Appearance
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 22 times.

                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?