Pamela Armisted, et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit, Case No. 09-2055

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 13, 2017 at 10:25 AM EST (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
Nature of Suit 3400 - STATUTES-State Reapportionment
  Entries (57) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006010149286 Filed: 4/8/2010, Entered: None
[DISREGARD THIS FILING; IT IS DEFECTIVE] [Counsel is directed to correctly refile with counsel's signiture correctly applied and with a corporate disclosure statement] --[Edited 04/12/2010 by BLC] APPELLANT BRIEF filed by. Certificate of Service:04/08/2010. Argument Request: requested. [09-2055, 09-2113] (LAS)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: None
    MANDATE ISSUED with no costs taxed. [09-2055, 09-2113] (BLC)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
      OPINION and JUDGMENT filed: The portion of the appeals concerning State Farm's discovery sanctions is DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction and the district court's judgment is AFFIRMED in all other respects. Decision for publication pursuant to Local Rule 206. Boyce F. Martin , Jr., Richard Allen Griffin (AUTHORING), Circuit Judges; S. Thomas Anderson, U.S. District Judge for the Western District of Tennessee, sitting by designation. [09-2055, 09-2113] (LKM)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: None
        FILED: Affidavit of Gary Parks re jurisdiction by Mr. Larry A. Smith for Pamela Armisted, J.B., Kathleen Chauvin, Joseph Chauvin, Jerry Wagner, Leslie Stewart, Harold Adams, Eileen Adams, Joshua Adams, Gary Parks and Towanda Parks in 09-2055, 09-2113. Certificate of Service: 11/02/2011. [09-2055, 09-2113] (LAS)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: None
          SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF filed by Attorney Mr. James G. Gross for Appellee Cross-Appellant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company in 09-2055, 09-2113. Certificate of Service:10/14/2011. [09-2055, 09-2113] (JGG)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 10/12/2011, Entered: None
            Memo from the bench: The appellant was asked by the panel during the 10/7/11 argument to supply the court with an affidavit of domicile [09-2055, 09-2113] (BLC)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None
              LETTER SENT to Mr. Larry A. Smith for Appellants Cross-Appellees and Mr. James F. Hewson for Appellee Cross-Appellant regarding time change of oral argument. Oral argument will begin at 8:30 a.m. instead of 9:00 a.m. [09-2055, 09-2113] (DTS)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None
                Oral argument acknowledgement filed by Attorney Mr. James F. Hewson for Appellee Cross-Appellant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company in 09-2055, 09-2113. Certificate of Service: 08/22/2011. [09-2055, 09-2113] (JFH)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: None
                  Oral argument acknowledgement filed by Attorney Mr. Larry A. Smith for Appellants Cross-Appellees Pamela Armisted, J.B., Kathleen Chauvin, Joseph Chauvin, Jerry Wagner, Leslie Stewart, Harold Adams, Eileen Adams, Joshua Adams, Gary Parks and Towanda Parks in 09-2055, 09-2113. Certificate of Service: 08/17/2011. [09-2055, 09-2113] (LAS)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 8/3/2011, Entered: None
                    Oral argument acknowledgement filed by Attorney Mr. James G. Gross for Appellee Cross-Appellant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company in 09-2055, 09-2113. Certificate of Service: 08/03/2011. [09-2055, 09-2113] (JGG)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 8/3/2011, Entered: None
                      Oral argument date set for 9:00 A.M. Friday, October 7, 2011. Notice of argument sent to counsel on 08/03/2011. [09-2055, 09-2113] (MCP)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: None
                        ORDER filed granting motion to file oversize brief [65] filed by Mr. James G. Gross for appellee/cross-appellant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company [09-2055, 09-2113] (BLC)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: None
                          FOURTH BRIEF filed by Mr. James G. Gross for State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company in 09-2055, 09-2113. Certificate of Service:11/19/2010. [09-2055, 09-2113] (JGG)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/28/2010, Entered: None
                            LETTER SENT granting (in part) motion to extend time to file fourth brief [73] filed by Mr. James G. Gross for State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company in 09-2113, resetting briefing schedule:. [09-2113, 09-2055] The fouth brief is now due 11/19/10. (BLC)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/27/2010, Entered: None
                              MOTION filed by Mr. James G. Gross for State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company in 09-2113, 09-2055 to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 10/27/2010. [09-2113, 09-2055] (JGG)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                THIRD BRIEF filed by Attorney Mr. Larry A. Smith for Appellants Cross-Appellees Pamela Armisted, J.B., Kathleen Chauvin, Joseph Chauvin, Jerry Wagner, Leslie Stewart, Harold Adams, Eileen Adams, Joshua Adams, Gary Parks and Towanda Parks in 09-2055, 09-2113. Certificate of Service:10/12/2010. [09-2055, 09-2113] (LAS)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: None
                                  LETTER SENT granting motion to extend time to file brief [69] filed by Mr. Larry A. Smith for Pamela Armisted, J.B., Kathleen Chauvin, Joseph Chauvin, Jerry Wagner, Leslie Stewart, Harold Adams, Eileen Adams, Joshua Adams, Gary Parks and Towanda Parks in 09-2055, resetting briefing schedule: third brief now due 10/12/2010. [09-2055, 09-2113] (BLC)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 9/28/2010, Entered: None
                                    MOTION filed by Mr. Larry A. Smith for Pamela Armisted, J.B., Kathleen Chauvin, Joseph Chauvin, Jerry Wagner, Leslie Stewart, Harold Adams, Eileen Adams, Joshua Adams, Gary Parks and Towanda Parks in 09-2055, 09-2113 to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 09/28/2010. [09-2055, 09-2113] (LAS)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/27/2010, Entered: None
                                      LETTER SENT granting motion to extend time to file brief [67] filed by Mr. Larry A. Smith for Pamela Armisted, J.B., Kathleen Chauvin, Joseph Chauvin, Jerry Wagner, Leslie Stewart, Harold Adams, Eileen Adams, Joshua Adams, Gary Parks and Towanda Parks in 09-2055, resetting briefing schedule: third brief now due 09/30/2010. [09-2055, 09-2113] (BLC)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: None
                                        MOTION filed by Mr. Larry A. Smith for Pamela Armisted, J.B., Kathleen Chauvin, Joseph Chauvin, Jerry Wagner, Leslie Stewart, Harold Adams, Eileen Adams, Joshua Adams, Gary Parks and Towanda Parks in 09-2055, 09-2113 to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 08/25/2010. [09-2055, 09-2113] (LAS)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: None
                                          SECOND BRIEF. REDACTED (public version) filed by Mr. James G. Gross for Appellee/Cross-Appellant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company in 09-2055, 09-2113. Certificate of Service:07/26/2010. Argument Request: requested.. [09-2055, 09-2113] (JGG)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: None
                                            MOTION filed by Mr. James G. Gross for State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company in 09-2055, 09-2113 to file oversize brief. Certificate of Service: 07/26/2010. [09-2055, 09-2113] (JGG)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: None
                                              LETTER SENT granting motion to extend time to file brief [62] filed by Mr. James G. Gross for State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company in 09-2055, resetting briefing schedule: second brief now due 07/26/2010. third brief now due 08/30/2010. [09-2055, 09-2113] (BLC)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                MOTION filed by Mr. James G. Gross for State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company in 09-2113, 09-2055 to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 07/15/2010. [09-2113, 09-2055] (JGG)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                  LETTER SENT granting (in part) motion to extend time to file brief [60] filed by Mr. James G. Gross for State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, resetting briefing schedule: second brief now due 07/16/2010. third brief now due 08/16/2010. [09-2055, 09-2113] (BLC)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                    MOTION filed by Mr. James G. Gross for State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company in 09-2113, 09-2055 to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 06/25/2010. [09-2113, 09-2055] (JGG)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Blank 57 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                      CORRECTED FIRST BRIEF. REDACTED (public version) filed by Mr. Larry A. Smith for Appellant/Cross-AppelleesPamela Armisted, J.B., Kathleen Chauvin, Joseph Chauvin, Jerry Wagner, Leslie Stewart, Harold Adams, Eileen Adams, Joshua Adams, Gary Parks and Towanda Parks in 09-2055, 09-2113. Certificate of Service:06/01/2010. Argument Request: requested. [09-2055, 09-2113]--[Edited 07/26/2010 by BLC] (LAS)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                        LETTER SENT granting motion to extend time to file brief [46] filed by Mr. James G. Gross for State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company in 09-2055, resetting briefing schedule: public version of first brief due 6/2/10; second brief now due 06/30/2010. third brief now due 07/28/2010. [09-2055, 09-2113] (BLC)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                          ORDER filed granting motion to file oversize brief [36] filed by Mr. Larry A. Smith for Pamela Armisted, J.B., Kathleen Chauvin, Joseph Chauvin, Jerry Wagner, Leslie Stewart, Harold Adams, Eileen Adams, Joshua Adams, Gary Parks and Towanda Parks in 09-2055. [09-2055, 09-2113] (BLC)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                            ORDER filed: GRANTING in part and DENYING in part motion to seal brief [34] filed by Mr. Larry A. Smith for Pamela Armisted, et al. To the extent the plaintiffs refer to confidential matters that were filed under seal in the district court, the appellate briefs may be filed under seal in this court. A public version of the briefs, redacting any confidential matters sealed in the district court, must also be filed. Entered by order of the court. [09-2055, 09-2113] (BLC)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                              MOTION filed by Mr. James G. Gross for State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company in 09-2113, 09-2055 to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 05/07/2010. [09-2113, 09-2055] (JGG)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Cross-Appellant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company in 09-2113 by James F. Hewson. Certificate of Service: 04/26/2010. [09-2113, 09-2055] [Applies to 09-2113 only] (JFH)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                  APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Cross-Appellant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company in 09-2055 by James F. Hewson. Certificate of Service: 04/26/2010. [09-2055, 09-2113] [Applies to 09-2055 only] (JFH)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                    MOTION filed by Mr. Larry A. Smith for Pamela Armisted, J.B., Kathleen Chauvin, Joseph Chauvin, Jerry Wagner, Leslie Stewart, Harold Adams, Eileen Adams, Joshua Adams, Gary Parks and Towanda Parks in 09-2055, 09-2113 to file oversize brief. Certificate of Service: 04/08/2010. [09-2055, 09-2113] (LAS)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                      MOTION filed by Mr. Larry A. Smith for Pamela Armisted, J.B., Kathleen Chauvin, Joseph Chauvin, Jerry Wagner, Leslie Stewart, Harold Adams, Eileen Adams, Joshua Adams, Gary Parks and Towanda Parks in 09-2055, 09-2113 to seal brief. Certificate of Service: 04/06/2010. [09-2055, 09-2113] (LAS)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                        LETTER SENT granting motion to extend time to file brief [30] filed by Mr. Larry A. Smith for Pamela Armisted, J.B., Kathleen Chauvin, Joseph Chauvin, Jerry Wagner, Leslie Stewart, Harold Adams, Eileen Adams, Joshua Adams, Gary Parks and Towanda Parks in 09-2055, resetting briefing schedule: first brief now due 04/09/2010. second brief now due 05/12/2010. third brief now due 06/14/2010. [09-2055, 09-2113] (BLC)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                          MOTION filed by Mr. Larry A. Smith for Pamela Armisted, J.B., Kathleen Chauvin, Joseph Chauvin, Jerry Wagner, Leslie Stewart, Harold Adams, Eileen Adams, Joshua Adams, Gary Parks and Towanda Parks in 09-2055, 09-2113 to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 02/08/2010. [09-2055, 09-2113] (LAS)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                            LETTER SENT granting motion to extend time to file brief [27] filed by Mr. Larry A. Smith for Pamela Armisted, J.B., Kathleen Chauvin, Joseph Chauvin, Jerry Wagner, Leslie Stewart, Harold Adams, Eileen Adams, Joshua Adams, Gary Parks and Towanda Parks in 09-2055, resetting briefing schedule: first brief now due 02/16/2010. second brief now due 03/17/2010. third brief now due 04/19/2010. [09-2055, 09-2113] (BLC)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                              RESPONSE in support filed regarding a motion to extend time to file brief, [27]; previously filed by Mr. Larry A. Smith for Pamela Armisted, J.B., Kathleen Chauvin, Joseph Chauvin, Jerry Wagner, Leslie Stewart, Harold Adams, Eileen Adams, Joshua Adams, Gary Parks and Towanda Parks in 09-2055,09-2113. Response from Attorney Mr. James G. Gross for Appellee Cross-Appellant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company in 09-2055, 09-2113 Certificate of Service:12/10/2009. [09-2055, 09-2113] (JGG)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                MOTION filed by Mr. Larry A. Smith for Pamela Armisted, J.B., Kathleen Chauvin, Joseph Chauvin, Jerry Wagner, Leslie Stewart, Harold Adams, Eileen Adams, Joshua Adams, Gary Parks and Towanda Parks in 09-2055, 09-2113 to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 12/10/2009. [09-2055, 09-2113] (LAS)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                  LETTER SENT granting motion to extend time to file brief [25] filed by Mr. Larry A. Smith for Pamela Armisted, J.B., Kathleen Chauvin, Joseph Chauvin, Jerry Wagner, Leslie Stewart, Harold Adams, Eileen Adams, Joshua Adams, Gary Parks and Towanda Parks in 09-2055, resetting briefing schedule: first brief now due 12/15/2009. second brief now due 01/14/2010. third brief now due 02/16/2010. [09-2055, 09-2113] (BLC)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                    MOTION filed by Mr. Larry A. Smith for Pamela Armisted, J.B., Kathleen Chauvin, Joseph Chauvin, Jerry Wagner, Leslie Stewart, Harold Adams, Eileen Adams, Joshua Adams, Gary Parks and Towanda Parks in 09-2055, 09-2113 to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 11/13/2009. [09-2055, 09-2113] (LAS)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                      BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: first brief due 11/24/2009. second brief due 12/28/2009. third brief due 01/25/2010. [09-2055, 09-2113] (BLC)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM filed by Mr. James G. Gross for State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company in 09-2113; Transcript on file in district court. Certificate of Service: 10/02/2009. [09-2113, 09-2055] (JGG)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                          Mediation telephone conference has been rescheduled for 10/29/2009 at 2:00 P.M. (Eastern Time) and reassigned to Robert Rack. [Please open notice for important details.] [09-2055, 09-2113] (WJR)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. James G. Gross for Appellee Cross-Appellant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company in 09-2113 Certificate of Service: 09/18/2009. [09-2113, 09-2055] (JGG)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                              CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. James G. Gross for Appellee Cross-Appellant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company in 09-2113. Certificate of Service:09/18/2009. [09-2113, 09-2055] (JGG)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Cross-Appellant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company in 09-2113 by James G. Gross. Certificate of Service: 09/18/2009. [09-2113, 09-2055] (JGG)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM filed by Mr. Nicholas Steven Andrews for Pamela Armisted, J.B., Kathleen Chauvin, Joseph Chauvin, Jerry Wagner, Leslie Stewart, Harold Adams, Eileen Adams, Joshua Adams, Gary Parks and Towanda Parks in 09-2055, Mr. Nicholas Steven Andrews for Pamela Armisted, J.B., Kathleen Chauvin, Jerry Wagner, Leslie Stewart, Harold Adams, Eileen Adams, Joshua Adams, Gary Parks and Towanda Parks in 09-2113; Transcript on file in district court. Certificate of Service: 09/03/2009. [09-2055, 09-2113] (NSA)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                    APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Cross-Appellees Eileen Adams, Harold Adams, Joshua Adams, Pamela Armisted, Joseph Chauvin, Kathleen Chauvin, J.B., Gary Parks, Towanda Parks, Leslie Stewart and Jerry Wagner in 09-2055 by Nicholas S. Andrews. Certificate of Service: 09/03/2009. [09-2055, 09-2113] (NSA)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Larry A. Smith for Appellants Cross-Appellees Pamela Armisted, J.B., Kathleen Chauvin, Joseph Chauvin, Jerry Wagner, Leslie Stewart, Harold Adams, Eileen Adams, Joshua Adams, Gary Parks and Towanda Parks in 09-2055, 09-2113 Certificate of Service: 09/02/2009. [09-2055, 09-2113] (LAS)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                        CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Larry A. Smith for Appellants Cross-Appellees Pamela Armisted, J.B., Kathleen Chauvin, Joseph Chauvin, Jerry Wagner, Leslie Stewart, Harold Adams, Eileen Adams, Joshua Adams, Gary Parks and Towanda Parks in 09-2055, 09-2113. Certificate of Service:09/02/2009. [09-2055, 09-2113] (LAS)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                          APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Cross-Appellees Eileen Adams, Harold Adams, Joshua Adams, Pamela Armisted, Joseph Chauvin, Kathleen Chauvin, J.B., Gary Parks, Towanda Parks, Leslie Stewart and Jerry Wagner in 09-2055, 09-2113 by Larry A. Smith. Certificate of Service: 09/02/2009. [09-2055, 09-2113] (LAS)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Mediation telephone conference has been scheduled for 09/30/2009 at 2:00 pm ET with Mr. Rack. [Please open notice for important details.] (CAW)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. James G. Gross for Appellee State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company Certificate of Service: 08/20/2009. (JGG)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                APPEARANCE filed for Appellee State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company by James G. Gross. Certificate of Service: 08/20/2009. (JGG)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellants Eileen Adams, Harold Adams, Joshua Adams, Pamela Armisted, Joseph Chauvin, Kathleen Chauvin, J.B., Gary Parks, Towanda Parks, Leslie Stewart and Jerry Wagner. Transcript needed: y. (BLC)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 171 times.

                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?