Garrison v. Fastenal Company
Federal Civil Lawsuit Kansas District Court, Case No. 6:16-cv-01331

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 18, 2018 at 3:39 AM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: None Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: None Scheduling Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Certificate of Service
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/17/2017, Entered: None Setting Scheduling Conference
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/29/2017, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/23/2017, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  MEMORANDUM AND ORDER-IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED BY THE COURT that Defendants Fastenal Company and Chabrun Bernd's 9 Motion for More Definite Statement as to Count 1 is granted. Within ten (10) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall file an Amended Complaint that alleges sufficient facts to constitute a claim for defamation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt on 3/14/2017. (ydm) Modified on 3/15/2017 to correct the date the order was signed. (mam)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 6 MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS II AND III OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. Signed by Chief Judge J. Thomas Marten on 3/9/2017. (mam)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Entry of Appearance
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Response to Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Return of Service of Summons Executed
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None More Definite Statement
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/3/2016, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/3/2016, Entered: None Dismiss
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/25/2016, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: None civil cover sheet
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: None Complaint (Attorney)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 1 time.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?