Osprey Partners RSF LLC et al v. UBS Financial Services Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:16-cv-04894

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 18, 2017 at 11:41 PM EDT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Osprey Partners RSF LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McGuinn Hillsman & Palefsky

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cliff Michael Palefsky +1 415 421 9292 +1 415 403 0202 cp@mhpsf.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott M Stillman +1 415 421 9292 sstillman@mhpsf.com
No Logo Svoboda Consulting, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McGuinn Hillsman & Palefsky

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cliff Michael Palefsky +1 415 421 9292 +1 415 403 0202 cp@mhpsf.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott M Stillman +1 415 421 9292 sstillman@mhpsf.com
v.
UBS Financial Services, Inc. UBS Financial Services, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Keesal, Young & Logan, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander James Bukac +1 415 398 6000 alexander.bukac@kyl.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julie L. Taylor +1 415 398 6000 julie.taylor@kyl.com
  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Private ADR
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: None Case Management Conference - Initial
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Answer
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/16/2016, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William Alsup: Motion Hearing held on 11/10/2016 re 10 MOTION to Compel Notice of Petition and Petition to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Proceedings filed by UBS Financial Services Inc. Total Time in Court 11 minutes. Court Reporter Name Leo Mankiewicz. Plaintiff Attorney Cliff Palefsky; Scott Stillman. Defendant Attorney Julie Taylor; Alexander Bukac. Attachment minute order.(dl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/10/2016) (Entered: 11/16/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None Order on Stipulation selecting Private ADR
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Compel
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/10/2016, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/10/2016, Entered: None ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/10/2016, Entered: None ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/10/2016, Entered: None ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Order
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    CLERK'S NOTICE Rescheduling Motion Hearing. Court Unavailable in the Morning Due to Trial. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 10 MOTION to Compel Notice of Petition and Petition to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Proceedings. Motion Hearing set for 11/10/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2016) Modified on 11/7/2016 (ecgS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/04/2016)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      REPLY (re 10 MOTION to Compel Notice of Petition and Petition to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Proceedings; Memorandum of Points and Authorities ) filed byUBS Financial Services Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Patricia Cashin in Support of Defendant's Reply Brief)(Bukac, Alexander) (Filed on 10/21/2016) Modified on 10/24/2016 (ecgS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/21/2016)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            MOTION to Compel Notice of Petition and Petition to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Proceedings; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by UBS Financial Services Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/10/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 10/14/2016. Replies due by 10/21/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Patricia Cashin, # 2 Declaration Declaration of Julie L. Taylor, # 3 Proposed Order)(Bukac, Alexander) (Filed on 9/30/2016) (Entered: 09/30/2016)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Stipulation without Proposed Order
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/25/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/25/2016, Entered: None Case Management Scheduling Order
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Case assigned to Hon. William Alsup. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2016) (Entered: 08/25/2016)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/25/2016, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/25/2016, Entered: None Notice of Removal
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 11 times.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?