Fox v. 1 World Trade Center, L.L.C. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-12748
District Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 26, 2017 at 10:06 AM ST (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Patricia Fox, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Worby Groner Edelman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
(Inactive), LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Joseph Dubanevich +1 212 267 3700 wdubanevich@napolibern.com
v.
No Logo 1 World Trade Center, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo 1 WTC Holdings, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo 2 Broadway LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Harris Beach PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Andrew Bender +21268701 00x 313 5405 +1 212 687 0659 jsavitsky@harrisbeach.com
Space Brian Andrew Bender +21268701 00x 313 5405 +1 212 687 0659 jsavitsky@harrisbeach.com
No Logo 2 World Trade Center, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo 2 WTC Holdings, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo 4 World Trade Center, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo 4 WTC Holdings, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo 5 World Trade Center, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo 5 WTC Holdings, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo 7 World Trade Company, L.P., Defendant
No Logo A Russo Wrecking, Inc., Defendant
ABM Industries, Inc. ABM Industries, Inc., Defendant
No Logo ABM Janitorial Northeast, Inc., Defendant
No Logo AMEC Construction Management, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Amec Earth & Environmental, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Anthony Cortese Specialized Hauling, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Atlantic Heydt Corp., Defendant
No Logo Bechtel Associates Professional Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Bechtel Construction, Inc., Defendant
Bechtel Corporation Bechtel Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Bechtel Environmental, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Berkel & Company Contractors, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Big Apple Wrecking & Construction Corp., Defendant
No Logo Bovis Lend Lease LMB, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Bovis Lend Lease, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Breeze Carting Corp., Defendant
No Logo Breeze National Inc., Defendant
No Logo Brer-Four Transportation Corp., Defendant
No Logo Buro Happold Consulting Engineers, P.c., Defendant
No Logo C.B. Contracting Corp., Defendant
No Logo Canron Construction Corp., Defendant
No Logo Colliers ABR, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Cord Contracting Co., Inc., Defendant
No Logo Craig Test Boring Company, Inc., Defendant
No Logo D'Onofrio General Contractors Corp., Defendant
No Logo Dakota Demo-Tech, Defendant
No Logo Diamond Point Excavating Corp., Defendant
No Logo Diego Construction, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Diversified Carting, Inc., Defendant
No Logo DMT Enterprise, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Eagle Leasing & Industrial Supply, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Eagle One Roofing Contractors Inc., Defendant
No Logo Eagle Scaffolding Co., Inc., Defendant
No Logo EJ Davies, Inc., Defendant
No Logo En-Tech Corp., Defendant
No Logo ET Environmental, Defendant
No Logo Evergreen Recycling of Corona (EROC), Defendant
No Logo Ewell W. Finley, P.C., Defendant
No Logo Executive Medical Services, P.C., Defendant
No Logo F & G Mechanical, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Fleet Trucking, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Francis A. Lee Exterior Restoration, Inc., Defendant
No Logo FTI Trucking, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Gilsanz, Murray & Steficek, L.L.P., Defendant
No Logo Goldstein Associates Consulting Engineers, P.L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo H.P. Environmental, Defendant
No Logo Hallen Welding Service, Inc., Defendant
Koch Skanska Inc. Koch Skanska Inc., Defendant
No Logo Laquila Construction, Inc., Defendant
No Logo LaStrada General Contracting Corp., Defendant
No Logo Leslie E. Robertson Associates Consulting Engineers, P.C., Defendant
Liberty Mutual Insurance Group, Inc. Liberty Mutual Insurance Group, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Liberty Mutual Group"
No Logo Lockwood Kessler & Bartlett, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Lucius Pitkin, Inc., Defendant
No Logo LZA Tech-Div of Thorton Tomasetti, Defendant
No Logo Manafort Brothers, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Manafort Brothers Incorporated"
No Logo Mazzocchi Wrecking, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Meridian Construction Corp., Defendant
No Logo Moretrench American Corp., Defendant
No Logo MRA Engineering, P.C., Defendant
No Logo Mueser Rutledge Consulting Engineers, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Nacirema Industries Incorporated, Defendant
No Logo New York Crane & Equipment Corp., Defendant
No Logo Nicholson Construction Company, Defendant
No Logo Peter Scalamandre & Sons, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Pinnacle Environmental Corp., Defendant
No Logo Plaza Construction Corp., Defendant
No Logo Pro Safety Services, Llc, Defendant
No Logo PT & L Contracting Corp., Defendant
No Logo Regional Scaffolding & Hoisting Co., Inc., Defendant
No Logo Rober Silman Associates, Defendant
No Logo Robert L. Gerosa, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Rodar Enterprises, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Royal GM, Inc., Defendant
No Logo SAB Trucking, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Safeway Environmental Corp., Defendant
No Logo Seasons Industrial Contracting, Defendant
No Logo Semcor Equipment & Manufacturing Corp., Defendant
No Logo Silverite Contracting Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Silverstein Development Corp., Defendant
No Logo Silverstein Properties, Defendant
No Logo Silverstein Properties, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Silverstein WTC Facility Manager, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Silverstein WTC MGMT Co., L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Silverstein WTC Properties, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Silverstein WTC, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Simpson Gumpertz & Heger, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Skidmore, Owing & Merrill, L.L.P., Defendant
No Logo Survivair, Defendant
No Logo Thorton-Tomasetti Group, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Tishman Construction Corporation of Manhattan, Defendant
No Logo Tishman Construction Corporation of New York, Defendant
No Logo Tishman Interiors Corporation, Defendant
Tishman Speyer Properties Tishman Speyer Properties, Defendant
No Logo Torretta Trucking, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Total Safety Consulting, LLC., Defendant
No Logo Tucci Equipment Rental Corp., Defendant
No Logo Tully Construction Co Inc, Defendant
No Logo Tully Construction Company, Defendant
No Logo Tully Environmental Inc., Defendant
No Logo Tully Industries, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Turner Construction Co., Defendant
Turner Construction Company Turner Construction Company, Defendant
No Logo Ultimate Demolition/CS Hauling (Joint Venture), Defendant
No Logo Vollmer Associates L.L.P., Defendant
No Logo W HARRIS & SONS INC, Defendant
No Logo Weeks Marine Inc., Defendant
No Logo Weidlinger Associates, Consulting Engineers, P.C., Defendant
No Logo Whitney Contracting, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Wolkow-Braker Roofing Corp., Defendant
No Logo World Trade Center Properties LLC, Defendant
No Logo WSP Cantor Seinuk, Defendant
No Logo Yannuzzi & Sons, Inc., Defendant
No Logo YONKERS CONTRACTING Company INC., Defendant
No Logo York Hunter Construction, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Ziegenfuss Drilling, Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 49 U.S.C. § 40101
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
  Entries (48) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/13/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENTS IN 640 CASES: the motion to approve the settlements is GRANTED. The Clerk shall mark the motion (Doc. No. 6070) terminated. Accordingly, the Clerk shall dismiss with prejudice the Complaints of the plaintiffs listed in Exhibit 2, attached hereto, and close their cases, subject to restoration by any party if settlements are not finalized. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/10/2016) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2 - 1, # 2 Exhibit 2 - 2, # 3 Exhibit 2 - 3, # 4 Exhibit 2 - 4, # 5 Exhibit 2 - 5)(tn) (Entered: 08/24/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
    STIPULATION: that the Plaintiffs' time to file and serve their Responses to Defendants Zar Realty Corporation and 2 Broadway, LLC's December 17, 2014 Motion originally set for January 23, 2015 shall be extended for an additional 14 days, and thus should be filed and served on or before February 6, 2015. The Defendants' Reply papers originally set for February 11, 2015 shall also be extended for an additional 14 days and thus shall be filed and served on or before February 25, 2015. (Responses due by 2/6/2015, Replies due by 2/25/2015.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/26/2015) (tn) Modified on 1/28/2015 (tn). (Entered: 01/26/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
      STIPULATION: that the Plaintiffs' time to file and serve their Responses to Defendants Zar Realty Corporation and 2 Broadway, LLC's December 17, 2014 Motion in the above referenced matters only shall be set for January 23, 2015. The Defendants' Reply papers shall be filed and served on or before February 11, 2015. (Responses due by 1/23/2015, Replies due by 2/11/2015.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/30/2014) (tn) (Entered: 12/30/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT WITH TAYLOR RECYCLING AND DISMISSING CERTAIN PLAINTIFFS FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE: The Court has been advised that Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel, Worby Groner Edelman & Napoli Bern, LLP, and counsel for Taylor Recycling, LLP, have reached a settlement of all claims against Taylor Recycling in the above-captioned cases. The Court has received a pair of stipulations to dismiss settled cases. I rule as follows. The Settlement with Taylor Recycling is Fair and Reasonable, and the Claims of the 1,802 Plaintiffs who Filed Proper Settlement Paperwork is Endorsed. The Complaints of 26 Derivative Plaintiffs who Alleged Claims Against Taylor Recycling, but who did not File Proper Settlement Paperwork, Are Dismissed Involuntarily for Failure to Prosecute. A group of Plaintiffs who had to cure their paperwork held claims against Taylor Recycling. I have been informed that 26 of these Plaintiffs have not cured the defects in their paperwork. Accordingly, I dismiss the complaints of these 26 Plaintiffs for failure to prosecute under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). The dismissals are with prejudice. The list of 26 Plaintiffs is attached to this Order. One final point deserves notice. Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel submitted a proposed stipulation dismissing these 26 Plaintiffs, which suggests the dismissals are voluntary, that is, specifically requested by each such Plaintiff. It seems that this is not the case. Liaison Counsel's stipulation and proposed order of dismissal is rejected, and is being returned. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/21/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00103-AKH et al.(jpo) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
          MEMO ENDORSEMENT on NOTICE OF JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS CLAIMS AGAINST TAYLOR RECYCLING, LCC, filed by Plaintiffs Liaison Counsel: The joint motion is granted. The originals of the stip'ns (exs. 3, 4) have been signed and are being docketed. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/14/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00103-AKH et al. (ab) (Entered: 06/15/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT: As described above, I approve the settlement as fair and reasonable, in the context of previous settlements that I approved. I decline to express any opinion on the fairness or appropriateness of the particular terms and conditions of this settlement agreement. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/24/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00103-AKH et al.(jpo) (Entered: 03/25/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
              STIPULATED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FINAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT: (THIS STIPULATED ORDER PERTAINS TO ALL PLAINTIFFS AND DOCKET NUMBERS SET FORTH ON EXHIBIT A) IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED Plaintiffs and Settling Defendants have entered into a settlement agreement resolving all claims by Plaintiffs against Settling Defendants in the above-captioned action. Accordingly, Plaintiffs' claims against the Settling Defendants and each of them shall be dismissed, and hereby are dismissed, with prejudice. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/25/2011) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(tro) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER: On June 23, 2010, I entered Case Management Order Nos. 10, 7, and 2 in the 21 MC 100, 21 MC 102, and 21 MC 103 Consolidated Master Dockets, respectively. On October 27, 2010, I extended the potential expiration date of all three Case Management Orders to December 21, 2010. For the reasons stated on the record at the conference held on December 22, 2010, I hereby extend the December 21, 2010 deadline to February 2, 2011. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/28/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00103-AKH et al.(db) (Entered: 12/29/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/28/2007, Entered: None
                  AMENDED COMPLAINT BY ADOPTION/CHECK-OFF COMPLAINT Related to the Master Complaint 1 Complaint, against A Russo Wrecking, Inc., ABM Industries, Inc., ABM Janitorial Northeast, Inc., AMEC Construction Management, Inc., Amec Earth & Environmental, Inc., Anthony Cortese Specialized Hauling, L.L.C., Atlantic Heydt Corp., Bechtel Associates Professional Corporation, Bechtel Construction, Inc., Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Environmental, Inc., Berkel & Company, Contractors, Inc., Big Apple Wrecking & Construction Corp., Bovis Lend Lease LMB, Inc., Bovis Lend Lease, Inc., Breeze Carting Corp., Breeze National, Inc., Brer-Four Transportation Corp., Buro Happold Consulting Engineers, P.C., C.B. Contracting Corp., Canron Construction Corp., Colliers ABR, Inc., Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc., Cord Contracting Co., Inc., Craig Test Boring Company, Inc., D'Onofrio General Contractors Corp., DMT Enterprise, Inc., Dakota Demo-Tech, Diamond Point Excavating Corp., Diego Construction, Inc., Diversified Carting, Inc., EJ Davies, Inc., ET Environmental, Eagle Leasing & Industrial Supply, Inc., Eagle One Roofing Contractors, Inc., Eagle Scaffolding Co., Inc., En-Tech Corp., Evergreen Recycling of Corona (EROC), Ewell W. Finley, P.C., Executive Medical Services, P.C., F & G Mechanical, Inc., FTI Trucking, Inc., Fleet Trucking, Inc., Francis A. Lee Exterior Restoration, Inc., Gilsanz, Murray & Steficek, L.L.P., Goldstein Associates Consulting Engineers, P.L.L.C., H.P. Environmental, Hallen Welding Service, Inc., Koch Skanska, Inc., LZA Tech-Div of Thorton Tomasetti, LaStrada General Contracting Corp., Laquila Construction, Inc., Leslie E. Robertson Associates Consulting Engineers, P.C., Liberty Mutual Group, Lockwood, Kessler & Bartlett, Inc., Lucius Pitkin, Inc., MRA Engineering, P.C., Manafort Brothers Incorporated, Mazzocchi Wrecking, Inc., Meridian Construction Corp., Moretrench American Corp., Mueser Rutledge Consulting Engineers, Inc., Nacirema Industries Incorporated, New York Crane & Equipment Corp., Nicholson Construction Company, PT & L Contracting Corp., Peter Scalamandre & Sons, Inc., Pinnacle Environmental Corp., Plaza Construction Corp., Pro Safety Services, L.L.C., Regional Scaffolding & Hoisting Co., Inc., Rober Silman Associates, Robert L. Gerosa, Inc., Rodar Enterprises, Inc., Royal GM, Inc., SAB Trucking, Inc., Safeway Environmental Corp., Seasons Industrial Contracting, Semcor Equipment & Manufacturing Corp., Silverite Contracting Corporation, Silverstein Development Corp., Silverstein Properties, Silverstein Properties, Inc., Silverstein WTC Facility Manager, L.L.C., Silverstein WTC MGMT Co., L.L.C., Silverstein WTC Properties, L.L.C., Silverstein WTC, L.L.C., Simpson Gumpertz & Heger, Inc., Skidmore, Owing & Merrill, L.L.P., Survivair, Thorton-Tomasetti Group, Inc., Tishman Construction Corporation of Manhattan, Tishman Construction Corporation of New York, Tishman Interiors Corporation, Tishman Speyer Properties, Torretta Trucking, Inc., Total Safety Consulting, L.L.C., Tucci Equipment Rental Corp., Tully Construction Co., Inc., Tully Construction Company, Tully Environmental, Inc., Tully Industries, Inc., Turner Construction Co., Turner Construction Company, Ultimate Demolition/CS Hauling (Joint Venture), Verizon New York, Inc., Vollmer Associates L.L.P., W Harris & Sons Inc., WSP Cantor Seinuk, Weeks Marine, Inc., Weidlinger Associates, Consulting Engineers, P.C., Whitney Contracting, Inc., Wolkow-Braker Roofing Corp., World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., Yannuzzi & Sons, Inc., Yonkers Contracting Company, Inc., York Hunter Construction, L.L.C., 1 WTC Holdings, L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center, L.L.C., 2 Broadway LLC, 2 WTC Holdings, L.L.C., 2 World Trade Center, L.L.C., 4 WTC Holdings, L.L.C., 4 World Trade Center, L.L.C., 5 WTC Holdings, L.L.C., 5 World Trade Center, L.L.C., 7 World Trade Company, L.P., Ziegenfuss Drilling, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Patricia Fox. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by Patricia Fox.(dnd) (Entered: 10/28/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: None
                    AMENDED COMPLAINT BY ADOPTION/CHECK-OFF COMPLAINT against defendants with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Patricia Fox.(mro) (Entered: 10/25/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/30/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                      STIPULATION: It is hereby sitpulated and agreed by and between the parties, that with respect to the actions listed "Schedule A" attached hereto, that each claim, cross-claim and counter-claim asserted by and against Defendant Pinnacle Environmental Corp., only as to the claims being made as to the premises identified in the First Amended Master Complaint and individual; Check-off Complaint as 140 West Street, New York, NY 1007, shall be and are hereby discontinued without prejudice and without costs as to any party against the other. It is further stipulated and agreed that upon Amended Master Complaint and Amended Form Check-Off Complaint, Plaintiffs will remove all references to Defendant Pinnacle Environmental Corp. with regard to 140 West Street, New York, NY 10007. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/30/2010) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00103-AKH et al.(jpo) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None
                        NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER ANSWER. Document filed by TIshman Construction Corporation of Manhattan, Tishman Construction Corporation of New York; Tishman Interiors Corporation. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00103-AKH, 1:06-cv-12748-AKH(Schwarz, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/10/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER That the Defendant's motion to have Thomas R. Harrington, Esquire admitted to practice law in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York pro hac vice in connection with the above-captioned case is GRANTED. Counsel is directed to immediately apply for an ECF password at www.nysd.uscourts.gov and shall forward the pro hac vice fee to the Clerk of the Court. THIS DOCUMENT APPLIES TO ALL CASES IN THE WORLD TRADE CENTER LOWER MANHATTAN DISASTER SITE LITIGATION IN WHICH AIG REALTY, INC., AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP, INC. AND AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL REALTY CORP. IS A DEFENDANT. Relates to 21mc102, 21mc103; granting (443) Motion for Thomas R. Harrington to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:21-mc-00103-AKH. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/19/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00103-AKH et al.(rjm) (Entered: 05/21/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/21/2009, Entered: None
                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Service was accepted by Paul O'Brien. Document filed by Patricia Fox. (Dubanevich, William) (Entered: 03/21/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/12/2009, Entered: None
                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Service was accepted by Kristen M Hackford. Document filed by Patricia Fox. (Dubanevich, William) (Entered: 03/12/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/4/2009, Entered: None
                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Service was accepted by John Sparling. Document filed by Patricia Fox. (Gitelman, Robert) (Entered: 03/04/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/26/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  STIPULATION. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, the parties' counsel, that the defendant's time to reply to plaintiffs' opposition to the Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Master Complaint by William F. Collins, AIA Architects, LLP, filed and served on October 31, 2008, and originally set for February 24, 2009 shall be and hereby is extended for an additional 7 days, and thus shall be filed and served on or before Tuesday, March 3, 2009. THIS DOCUMENT APPLIES TO ALL WORLD TRADE CENTER LOWER MANHATTAN DISASTER SITE LITIGATION. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/25/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00103-AKH et al.(rjm) Modified on 3/17/2009 (rjm). (Entered: 02/27/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/26/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    STIPULATION. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, the parties' counsel, that the defendant's time to reply to plaintiffs' opposition to the Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Master Complaint by Syska Hennessy Group, Inc., filed and served on October 31, 2008, and originally set for February 24, 2009 shall be and hereby is extended for an additional 7 days, and thus shall be filed and served on or before Tuesday, March 3, 2009. THIS DOCUMENT APPLIES TO ALL WORLD TRADE CENTER LOWER MANHATTAN DISASTER SITE LITIGATION. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/26/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00103-AKH et al.(rjm) (Entered: 02/26/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: None
                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Service was accepted by Andrew Gibbs. Document filed by Patricia Fox. (Rubin, Denise) (Entered: 02/17/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned that Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP be substituted as counsel for Defendant WILLIAM F. COLLINS, AIA ARCHITECTS. LLP i/s/h/a WILLIAM F. COLLINS ARCHITECTS in the above-captioned action as of this date, in place and instead of Donovan Hatem LLP. Attorney David M. Pollack for William F. Collins Architects, William F. Collins, added. Also Relates to 21mc102, 21mc103. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/12/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00103-AKH et al.(rjm) (Entered: 01/13/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/7/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          STIPULATION. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, the parties' counsel that the Defendant's Syska Hennessy Group, Inc., Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Master Complaint, filed and served on October 31, 2008. is amended to include the new and/or amended complaints listed in the attached service riders, as well as any future new and/or amended complaints served upon Syska Hennessy Group, Inc. This Document Applies to All World Trade Center Lower Manhattan Disaster Site Litigation. Also 21mc102, 21mc103. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/7/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00103-AKH et al.(rjm) (Entered: 01/08/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/7/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            STIPULATION. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, the parties' counsel that the Defendant's. William F. Collins, AIA Architects LLP, Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Master Complaint, filed and served on October 31, 2008. is amended to include the new and/or amended complaints listed in the attached service riders, as well as any future new and/or amended complaints served upon William F. Collins, AIA Architects, LLP. This Document Applies to All World Trade Center Lower Manhattan Disaster Site Litigation. Also 21mc102, 21mc103. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/7/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00103-AKH et al.(rjm) (Entered: 01/08/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/6/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned that Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP be substituted as counsel for Defendant SYSKA HENNESSY GROUP, Inc. s/h/a SYSKA AND HENNESSY in the above-captioned action as of this date, in place and instead of Donovan Hatem LLP.THIS DOCUMENT APPLIES TO ALL WORLD TRADE CENTER DISASTER SITE LITIGATION. Also Relates to 21mc102, 21mc103. Attorney David M. Pollack for Syska and Hennessy added. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/5/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00103-AKH et al.(rjm) (Entered: 01/07/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/6/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER Consent to Change Attorney. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned that Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP be substituted as counsel for Defendants, ACTA Realty Corp. and 25 Broadway Office Properties, LLC, in the above-captioned action as of this date, in place and instead of Donovan Hatem LLP. Attorney David M. Pollack for 25 Broadway Office Properties LLC, ACTA Realty Corp., 25 Broadway Office Properties LLC and ACTA Realty Corp. added. THIS DOCUMENT APPLIES TO ALL WORLD TRADE CENTER DISASTER SITE LITIGATION. Also Relates to 21mc102, 21mc103. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/5/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00103-AKH et al.(rjm) (Entered: 01/06/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/30/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER DIRECTING PRODUCTION OF VICTIMS COMPENSATION FUND RECORDS... ORDERED that, pursuant to 5 U.S.C. § 552a(b)(11), the USDOJ shall cooperate and make all reasonable efforts to make available and produce the VCF Claimant List. For every individual who has submitted an application and other material to the VCF seeking compensation for death or personal injury, the VCF Claimant List will set forth the claimant's and/or decedent's full name; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that, upon receipt of the VCF Claimant List from USDOJ, the Parties shall, upon request, provide copies of same to any other Co-Liaison Counsel in both 21 MC 100, 21 MC 102 and 21 MC103 matters; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that, the VCF Claimant List produced by the USDOJ to the Parties under this Order shall be held in the strictest confidence, used only for purposes of the above-captioned litigations, not divulged to any third party, either in whole or in part, without the express written permission of this Court, and not filed with the Court unless under seal or with the Court's express written permission; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that, upon final resolution of all matters contained within the 21 MC 100, 21 MC 102, and 21 MC 103 litigations, the VCF Claimant List produced by the USDOJ to any party's counsel under this Order, shall be returned to the USDOJ within ninety (90) days or destroyed. This Document applies to All World Trade Center Disaster Site Litigation. Also applies to 21mc 100, 21mc102, 21mc103. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/30/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00103-AKH et al.(rjm) (Entered: 12/30/2008)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                    FIRST NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER ANSWER. Document filed by Colliers ABR, Inc.. (Leff, Richard) (Entered: 11/20/2008)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      STIPULATION. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, the parties' counsel, that the plaintiffs' time to respond to the Motions to Dismiss the First Amended Master Complaint by Syska Hennessy Group, Inc. and William F. Collins, AlA Architects, LLP, filed and served on October 31, 2008, originally set for November 14, 2008, shall be and hereby is extended for 60 days, and thus shall be filed and served on or before Tuesday, January 13,2009 with defendants' Reply papers to be filed and served on or before Thursday February 12, 2009. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/7/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00103-AKH et al.(rjm) (Entered: 11/07/2008)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Turner Construction Company served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006. Service was accepted by John Sparling. Document filed by Patricia Fox. (Dubanevich, William) (Entered: 10/19/2008)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Tishman Construction Corporation of Manhattan served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Tishman Construction Corporation of New York served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006. Service was accepted by Andrew Gibbs. Document filed by Patricia Fox. (Dubanevich, William) (Entered: 10/16/2008)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Pinnacle Environmental Corp. served on 1/26/2007, answer due 2/15/2007. Document filed by Patricia Fox. (LoPalo, Christopher) (Entered: 10/08/2008)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Skidmore, Owing & Merrill, L.L.P. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Thorton-Tomasetti Group, Inc. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Total Safety Consulting, L.L.C. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Vollmer Associates L.L.P. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Weeks Marine, Inc. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Weidlinger Associates, Consulting Engineers, P.C. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; WSP Cantor Seinuk served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Yonkers Contracting Company, Inc. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; A Russo Wrecking, Inc. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; AMEC Construction Management, Inc. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Amec Earth & Environmental, Inc. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Bechtel Construction, Inc. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Bechtel Environmental, Inc. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Berkel & Company, Contractors, Inc. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Big Apple Wrecking & Construction Corp. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Breeze Carting Corp. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Breeze National, Inc. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Brer-Four Transportation Corp. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Buro Happold Consulting Engineers, P.C. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; C.B. Contracting Corp. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Canron Construction Corp. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Cord Contracting Co., Inc. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Diamond Point Excavating Corp. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Diego Construction, Inc. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Diversified Carting, Inc. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; D'Onofrio General Contractors Corp. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Eagle One Roofing Contractors, Inc. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; EJ Davies, Inc. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; En-Tech Corp. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Evergreen Recycling of Corona (EROC) served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Ewell W. Finley, P.C. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Executive Medical Services, P.C. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Fleet Trucking, Inc. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; FTI Trucking, Inc. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Gilsanz, Murray & Steficek, L.L.P. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; H.P. Environmental served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Koch Skanska, Inc. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Laquila Construction, Inc. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; LaStrada General Contracting Corp. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Leslie E. Robertson Associates Consulting Engineers, P.C. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Lockwood, Kessler & Bartlett, Inc. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; LZA Tech-Div of Thorton Tomasetti served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Manafort Brothers Incorporated served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Mazzocchi Wrecking, Inc. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Nicholson Construction Company served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Peter Scalamandre & Sons, Inc. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Plaza Construction Corp. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Pro Safety Services, L.L.C. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Rober Silman Associates served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Robert L. Gerosa, Inc. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Royal GM, Inc. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Safeway Environmental Corp. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Silverite Contracting Corporation served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006. Service was accepted by Tara Saybe. Document filed by Patricia Fox. (Gitelman, Robert) (Entered: 09/20/2008)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Bovis Lend Lease LMB, Inc. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006. Service was accepted by Kristen M. Hackford. Document filed by Patricia Fox. (Rubin, Denise) (Entered: 09/15/2008)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/4/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... that any and all claims asserted and/or assertable against Defendant(s) -Highrise Hoistings & Scaffolding, Inc.; Diego Construction, Inc., and Donofrio General Contractors Corp.- in the captioned lawsuit(s) shall be dismissed by the Court without prejudice. This Document relates to 21mc100, 21mc103, All World Trade Center Disaster Site Litigation. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/3/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00103-AKH et al.(rjm) (Entered: 09/05/2008)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Turner Construction Company served on 11/10/2006, answer due 11/30/2006. Service was accepted by Eugen Massamillo, Esq.. Document filed by Patricia Fox. (Gitelman, Robert) (Entered: 09/03/2008)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Goldstein Associates Consulting Engineers, P.L.L.C. served on 12/20/2006, answer due 1/9/2007. Service was accepted by Goldstein Associates Consulting Engineers, PLLC. Document filed by Patricia Fox. (Gitelman, Robert) (Entered: 08/30/2008)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Atlantic Heydt Corp. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006. Service was accepted by Tom E Byrne. Document filed by Patricia Fox. (Gitelman, Robert) (Entered: 08/25/2008)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. DMT Enterprise, Inc. served on 1/26/2007, answer due 2/15/2007. Document filed by Patricia Fox. (Gitelman, Robert) (Entered: 08/13/2008)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Tucci Equipment Rental Corp. served on 1/26/2007, answer due 2/15/2007. Service was accepted by Daneen Gazzola. Document filed by Patricia Fox. (LoPalo, Christopher) (Entered: 05/30/2008)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                              AMENDED NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER ANSWER. Document filed by 2 Broadway LLC. (Goos, Stanley) (Entered: 02/28/2008)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                FILING ERROR - WRONG DOCUMENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - NOTICE of Amended Notice of Adoption (master answer). Document filed by 2 Broadway LLC. (Goos, Stanley) Modified on 2/26/2008 (db). (Entered: 02/26/2008)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL... that whereas no party hereto is an infant or incompetent person for whom a committee has been appointed and no person not a party has an interest in the subject matter of the actions, the above actions listed on Schedule A are discontinued without prejudice against defendant Verizon Communications Inc., only, without costs to either party as against the other... and as further set forth in said stipulation and order. This Document relates to claims against Verizon Communications Inc. only in: All Cases listed on first page of this Order. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/14/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00103-AKH et al.(rjm) (Entered: 02/15/2008)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISCONTINUANCE... that whereas no party hereto is an infant or incompetent person for whom a committee has been appointed and no person not a party has an interest in the subject matter of the actions, the above actions listed on Schedule A are discontinued without prejudice against Verizon New York Inc., only, without costs to either party as against the other... and as further set forth in said stipulation and order. This Document relates to claims against Verizon New York Inc. only in: All Cases listed in Schedule A. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/6/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00103-AKH et al.(rjm) (Entered: 02/07/2008)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISCONTINUANCE... that whereas no party hereto is an infant or incompetent person for whom a committee has been appointed and no person not a party has an interest in the subject matter of the actions, the above actions listed on Schedule A are discontinued without prejudice against Verizon New York Inc., only, without costs to either party as against the other... and as further set forth in said stipulation and order. This Document relates to claims against Verizon New York Inc. only in: All Cases listed in Schedule A. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/5/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00103-AKH et al.(rjm) (Entered: 02/05/2008)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                        NOTICE of of Adoption (answer). Document filed by 2 Broadway LLC. (Goos, Stanley) (Entered: 01/16/2008)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stanley Goos on behalf of 2 Broadway LLC (Goos, Stanley) (Entered: 01/16/2008)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Attorney W. Steven Berman for Worby Groner Edelman & Napoli Bern, LLP admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/5/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00103-AKH et al.(rjm) (Entered: 09/06/2007)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/9/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              STIPULATION OF DISCONTINUANCE AS TO DEFENDANT, NEW YORK CITY ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION ONLY... that any and all claims asserted and/or assertable by and against Defendant(s) -New York City Economic Development Corporation- in the captioned lawsuit shall be dismissed by the Court without prejudice... and without costs to any party as against the other... and as further set forth in said stipulation of discontinuance. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/9/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00103-AKH et al.(rjm) (Entered: 08/10/2007)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                COMPLAINT against Silverstein WTC, L.L.C., Silverstein WTC MGMT Co., L.L.C., Silverstein WTC Properties, L.L.C., Silverstein WTC, L.L.C., Simpson Gumpertz & Heger, Inc., Skidmore, Owing & Merrill, L.L.P., Survivair, Tishman Construction Corporation of Manhattan, Tishman Construction Corporation of New York, Tishman Interiors Corporation, 5 World Trade Center, L.L.C., Tishman Speyer Properties, Thorton-Tomasetti Group, Inc., Torretta Trucking, Inc., Total Safety Consulting, L.L.C., Tucci Equipment Rental Corp., Tully Construction Co., Inc., Tully Construction Company, Tully Environmental, Inc., Tully Industries, Inc., Turner Construction Co., 5 WTC Holdings, L.L.C., Turner Construction Company, Ultimate Demolition/CS Hauling (Joint Venture), Verizon New York, Inc., Vollmer Associates L.L.P., W Harris & Sons Inc., Weeks Marine, Inc., Weidlinger Associates, Consulting Engineers, P.C., Whitney Contracting, Inc., Wolkow-Braker Roofing Corp., World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 7 World Trade Company, L.P., WSP Cantor Seinuk, Yannuzzi & Sons, Inc., Yonkers Contracting Company, Inc., York Hunter Construction, L.L.C., Ziegenfuss Drilling, Inc., A Russo Wrecking, Inc., ABM Industries, Inc., ABM Janitorial Northeast, Inc., AMEC Construction Management, Inc., Amec Earth & Environmental, Inc., Anthony Cortese Specialized Hauling, L.L.C., Atlantic Heydt Corp., Bechtel Associates Professional Corporation, Bechtel Construction, Inc., Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Environmental, Inc., Berkel & Company, Contractors, Inc., Big Apple Wrecking & Construction Corp., Bovis Lend Lease LMB, Inc., Bovis Lend Lease, Inc., Breeze Carting Corp., Breeze National, Inc., Breeze Carting Corp., Brer-Four Transportation Corp., Buro Happold Consulting Engineers, P.C., C.B. Contracting Corp., Canron Construction Corp., Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc., Cord Contracting Co., Inc., Craig Test Boring Company, Inc., Dakota Demo-Tech, Diamond Point Excavating Corp., Diego Construction, Inc., Diversified Carting, Inc., DMT Enterprise, Inc., D'Onofrio General Contractors Corp., Eagle Leasing & Industrial Supply, Inc., Eagle One Roofing Contractors, Inc., Eagle Scaffolding Co., Inc., 1 World Trade Center, L.L.C., EJ Davies, Inc., En-Tech Corp., ET Environmental, Evergreen Recycling of Corona (EROC), Ewell W. Finley, P.C., Executive Medical Services, P.C., F & G Mechanical, Inc., Fleet Trucking, Inc., Francis A. Lee Exterior Restoration, Inc., FTI Trucking, Inc., 1 WTC Holdings, L.L.C., Gilsanz, Murray & Steficek, L.L.P., Goldstein Associates Consulting Engineers, P.L.L.C., Hallen Welding Service, Inc., H.P. Environmental, Koch Skanska, Inc., Laquila Construction, Inc., LaStrada General Contracting Corp., Leslie E. Robertson Associates Consulting Engineers, P.C., Liberty Mutual Group, Lockwood, Kessler & Bartlett, Inc., 2 World Trade Center, L.L.C., Lucius Pitkin, Inc., LZA Tech-Div of Thorton Tomasetti, Manafort Brothers Incorporated, Mazzocchi Wrecking, Inc., Meridian Construction Corp., Moretrench American Corp., MRA Engineering, P.C., Mueser Rutledge Consulting Engineers, Inc., Nacirema Industries Incorporated, New York Crane & Equipment Corp., 2 WTC Holdings, L.L.C., Nicholson Construction Company, Peter Scalamandre & Sons, Inc., Pinnacle Environmental Corp., Plaza Construction Corp., Pro Safety Services, L.L.C., PT & L Contracting Corp., Regional Scaffolding & Hoisting Co., Inc., Rober Silman Associates, Robert L. Gerosa, Inc., Rodar Enterprises, Inc., 4 World Trade Center, L.L.C., Royal GM, Inc., SAB Trucking, Inc., Safeway Environmental Corp., Seasons Industrial Contracting, Semcor Equipment & Manufacturing Corp., Silverite Contracting Corporation, Silverstein Development Corp., Silverstein Properties, Inc., Silverstein Properties, Silverstein WTC Facility Manager, L.L.C., 4 WTC Holdings, L.L.C.. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 589528) Document filed by Patricia Fox (Automated User) (Entered: 09/14/2006)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 103 times.

                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                   
                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                  Need Password Help?