Vortex Pathway LLC v. Fortinet, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:16-cv-00952

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 11, 2017 at 1:45 AM DT (4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Vortex Pathway LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Buether Joe & Carpenter Llc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth Paul Kula +1 214 730 5660 +1 972 707 1248 ken.kula@bjciplaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schneider Rothman Intellectual Property Law Group PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joel Benjamin Rothman +1 561 404 4350 +1 561 404 4353 joel.rothman@sriplaw.com
v.
No Logo Fortinet, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/07/2017 Allen Franklin Gardner +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 allen@gillamsmithlaw.com
TERMINATED: 07/07/2017 Melissa Richards Smith +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 melissa@gillamsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John M. Neukom +1 650 470 4500 +1 650 470 4570 John.Neukom@skadden.com
No Logo David Folsom, Mediator
No Logo William Joseph Cornelius, Mediator
No Logo Gemalto Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James A Fussell, III +1 202 263 3222 +1 202 830 0357 jfussell@mayerbrown.com
No Logo Yubico Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J. David Hadden +1 650 988 8500 +1 650 938 5200 dhadden@fenwick.com
Consolidated Civil Action 2:16cv955 Eman Sojoodi +1 415 875 2300 +1 415 281 1350 esojoodi@fenwick.com
  Entries (61) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: None Dismiss
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: None Dismiss
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: None Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Stay
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None Response to Motion
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: None Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: None Change Venue
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/4/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: None Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/27/2017, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/27/2017, Entered: None Protective Order
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/21/2017, Entered: None Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling, Protective or Discovery Order
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/16/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Mediator
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Mediator
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: None Order of Reference (Title 28 U.S.C. 636(c))
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: None Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None Notice of Designation of Mediator
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None Notice of Designation of Mediator
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/31/2017, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/19/2017, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None Continue
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/4/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      Defendant Fortinet Inc.'s Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Vortex Pathway LLC.( Rothman, Joel) (Entered: 10/24/2016)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/30/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 111 times.

                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?