USA v. Levin et al
Criminal Case Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 4:16-cr-40031
Magistrate Judge Timothy S. Hillman, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 25, 2017 at 3:42 AM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo James E Levin, Defendant (1)

Toggle Switch Represented by Brad Bailey Law, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Adamo L. Lanza +1 781 820 0381 adamo@bradbaileylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Bradley J. Bailey +1 508 771 4644 +1 508 790 1334 bbailey@capecod.net

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (53) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 8/26/2016 as to Jacklyn M Sutcivni. (Burgos, Sandra) (Entered: 12/01/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered adopting Report and Recommendations re 41 Report and Recommendations granting in part and denying in part 29 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to James E Levin (1) as stated in the Report and Recommendation. Since this matter has been referred to Magistrate Judge Robertson for all pretrial proceedings, she is authorized to modify conditions of release without approval of the district court judge. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 11/28/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting in part 44 Motion to Designate Case as Complex, Grant a Continuance of the Date in which Trial Must Begin and Exclude Time Under the Speedy Trial Act as to James E Levin (1), Jacklyn M Sutcivni (2). The case shall be designated as complex and this designation shall be considered in connection with proposed exclusions of time under the Speedy Trial Act as the case progresses. (Robertson, Katherine) (Entered: 11/22/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 46 the parties' Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order as to James E Levin (1), Jacklyn M Sutcivni (2). Based on the volume of discovery to be produced by the government and reviewed by the defendants, the existing scheduling order is vacated. The parties will appear at a status conference on January 30, 2017 at 2:30 p.m. at which time a further scheduling order will be addressed. (Robertson, Katherine) (Entered: 11/22/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: Initial Status Conference as to James E Levin and Jacklyn M Sutcivni held on 11/21/2016. Attorneys Present (by telephone): Michelle L. Dineen Jerrett, R. Bradford Bailey and Joseph M. Griffin. Colloquy re: status of the case. The parties informed the Court that discovery is voluminous and production/requests are ongoing. An Interim Status Conference is set for 1/30/2017 at 2:30 PM in Hampshire Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. Joint report due by 1/26/2017. Parties assert that time from 11/10/2016 through the Interim Status Conference should be excluded from speedy trial calculation. The court agrees. The ends of justice outweigh the usual interest in a speedy trial. A separate order shall issue. (Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Digital Recording. To order a copy of this Digital Recording, please go to http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/Magistrate-Audio.htm . For a transcript of this proceeding, contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov.) (Calderon, Melissa) (Entered: 11/22/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Remark: Telephone conference information sent to counsel by email. (Calderon, Melissa) (Entered: 11/18/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 47 Motion to appear at the 11/21/2016 status conference telephonically as to James E Levin (1); granting 49 Motion to appear at the 11/21/2016 status conference telephonically as to James E Levin (1), Jacklyn M Sutcivni (2); granting 48 Motion to appear at the 11/21/2016 status conference telephonically as to Jacklyn M Sutcivni (2). The Court will e-mail counsel the call in information. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 11/18/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                STATUS REPORT filed jointly by the parties in advance of initial status conference by USA as to James E Levin, Jacklyn M Sutcivni (Dineen Jerrett, Michelle) (Entered: 11/17/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  MOTION appear telephonically for initial status conference on November 21, 2016 as to James E Levin, Jacklyn M Sutcivni by USA. (Dineen Jerrett, Michelle) (Entered: 11/17/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE FOR SCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE as to Jacklyn M Sutcivni. (Griffin, Joseph) (Entered: 11/17/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      MOTION to Appear at the November 21, 2016 Status Conference Telephonically as to James E Levin. (Bailey, R.) (Entered: 11/17/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Joint MOTION to Amend 31 Scheduling Order, as to James E Levin, Jacklyn M Sutcivni by USA. (Dineen Jerrett, Michelle) (Entered: 11/15/2016)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Joint MOTION to Designate Case as Complex as to James E Levin, Jacklyn M Sutcivni by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dineen Jerrett, Michelle) (Entered: 11/04/2016)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 42 Motion to Continue the Initial Status Conference to 11/21/2016 as to James E Levin (1), Jacklyn M Sutcivni (2). Initial Status Conference set for 11/21/2016 03:00 PM in Hampshire Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 11/04/2016)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Assented to MOTION to Continue to November 21, 2016 to initial status conference as to James E Levin, Jacklyn M Sutcivni by USA. (Dineen Jerrett, Michelle) (Entered: 11/03/2016)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ORDER entered. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS as to James E Levin re 29 MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release . For the foregoing reasons, the court recommends that Defendants Motion to Modify Conditions of Release be GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The court further recommends that: (a) the challenged condition of pre-trial release be modified to provide as follows: The Defendant shall... (k) avoid all contact, directly or indirectly, with any persons who are or who may become a victim or potential witness in the subject investigation or prosecution, including but not limited to Co-defendants, except through counsel for purposes of preparing a defense. The co-defendants may communicate directly with each other in the presence of counsel solely for purposes of preparing their defense; and (b) notwithstanding her role as a potential witness, the challenged condition not apply to communications with Christine Carey, Esq., who, as a condition of engaging in direct, unmonitored communications with Levin under the terms set forth in this Report and Recommendation, should file under seal and on an ex parte basis, a list of the individuals for whom she and Levin are joint counsel and on whose behalf she needs to engage in direct, confidential communications with Levin. Objections to R&R due by 11/9/2016. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 10/26/2016)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: Motion Hearing as to James E. Levin (1) and Jacklyn M. Sutcivni (2) held on 10/12/2016 re Defendants' 29 MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release. Present: AUSA Michelle L. Dineen Jerrett, Atty R. Bradford Bailey, Atty Joseph M. Griffin, Jr. and Defendants (OB). Arguments were heard on the pending motion. This matter is taken under advisement. R&R to issue. Deadlines, in accordance with the scheduling order issued on 9/13/2016 (See Dkt. No. 31 ), shall remain as set. Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Digital Recording - For transcripts or CDs contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov. (Calderon, Melissa) (Entered: 10/17/2016)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ORDER entered. PROTECTIVE ORDER as to James E Levin, Jacklyn M Sutcivni entered. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 10/07/2016)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 36 the government's assented-to Motion for Protective Order as to James E Levin (1) and Jacklyn M Sutcivni (2) to protect the confidentiality of personal identifying information of third parties in material to be produced by the government in discovery. The proposed order shall be entered separately. (Robertson, Katherine) (Entered: 10/07/2016)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 8/25/2016 as to James E Levin. (Burgos, Sandra) (Entered: 10/06/2016)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Assented to MOTION for Protective Order as to James E Levin, Jacklyn M Sutcivni by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Protective Order)(Dineen Jerrett, Michelle) (Entered: 10/06/2016)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING ON 29 MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release as to James E Levin (1) and Jacklyn M Sutcivni (2) ISSUED: At the request of the parties, a Motion Hearing is set for 10/12/2016 at 11:30 AM in Hampshire Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Calderon, Melissa) (Entered: 10/03/2016)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Opposition by USA as to James E Levin, Jacklyn M Sutcivni re 29 MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release (Dineen Jerrett, Michelle) (Entered: 09/22/2016)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ORDER dated 9/9/2016 entered. ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to James E Levin, Jacklyn M Sutcivni. Time excluded from August 25, 2016 until November 10, 2016. Reason for entry of order on excludable delay: 18 USC 3161(h)(7)(A) Interests of justice. (Finn, Mary) Modified on 9/13/2016 to add to the text - dated 9/9/2016. (Finn, Mary). (Entered: 09/13/2016)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  Set Hearings as to James E Levin, Jacklyn M Sutcivni. Initial Status Conference set for 11/10/2016 at 02:30 PM in Hampshire Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 09/13/2016)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER as to James E Levin, Jacklyn M Sutcivni. Initial Status Conference set for 11/10/2016 at 02:30 PM in Hampshire Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Finn, Mary) Modified on 9/13/2016 to correct the date of the hearing from 10/11/2016 to 11/10/2016. (Finn, Mary). (Entered: 09/13/2016)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting in the interests of justice 28 the government's assented-to Motion to Exclude Time Under the Speedy Trial Act as to defendants James E Levin and Jacklyn M Sutcivni. The time from August 25 to November 10, 2016 is excluded. A separate order shall issue. (Robertson, Katherine) (Entered: 09/09/2016)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release as to James E Levin. (Bailey, R.) (Entered: 09/08/2016)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Assented to MOTION for Excludable Delay from August 25, 2016 to November 10, 2016 as to James E Levin, Jacklyn M Sutcivni by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Dineen Jerrett, Michelle) (Entered: 09/07/2016)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson Reason for referral: Pretrial as to James E Levin, Jacklyn M Sutcivni (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 08/29/2016)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              Case as to James E Levin, Jacklyn M Sutcivni no longer referred to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Belpedio, Lisa) (Entered: 08/29/2016)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: R. Bradford Bailey appearing for James E Levin. Type of Appearance: Retained. (Bailey, R.) (Entered: 08/29/2016)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Blank 24 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: 8/26/2016 Court Filing
                                                                  District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ORDER entered. ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Jacklyn M Sutcivni. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 08/26/2016)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 23 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: 8/26/2016
                                                                    Unsecured personal recognizance Bond Entered as to Jacklyn M Sutcivni in amount of $15,000.00. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 08/26/2016)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: 8/26/2016 Court Filing
                                                                      Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Timothy S Hillman: Arraignment as to Jacklyn M Sutcivni (2) Count 1,2,3,4 held on 8/26/2016, Case called, Counsel and dft appear for arraignment after dft's arrest, Court informs dft of her rights, Court appoints atty Griffin to represent dft, Dft enters a plea of not-guilty to all counts, Plea entered by Jacklyn M Sutcivni Not Guilty on counts 1-4, Court releases dft on conditions of release, Appearance bond executed and filed, Order re conditions of release to enter, Court informs counsel that Mag. Judge Robertson will schedule the next Court appearance, Court order time excluded to allow govt 28 days for initial disclosures,(Attorneys present: Grady/Griffin)(P.O. Miller)Court Reporter Name and Contact information: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 08/26/2016)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: 8/26/2016 Court Filing
                                                                        Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Timothy S Hillman: Initial Appearance as to Jacklyn M Sutcivni held on 8/26/2016 (Attorneys present: Grady/Griffin)(P.O. Miller)Court Reporter Name and Contact information: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 08/26/2016)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: 8/26/2016
                                                                          INDICTMENT as to Jacklyn M Sutcivni (2) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4. (Indictment re-entered to fix statistical information.) (Attachments: # 1 JS45)(Jones, Sherry) (Entered: 08/26/2016)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: 8/26/2016 Court Filing
                                                                          District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 18 Motion to Unseal Case as to James E Levin (1), Jacklyn M Sutcivni (2). (Burgos, Sandra) (Entered: 08/26/2016)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: 8/26/2016
                                                                            MOTION to Unseal Case as to James E Levin, Jacklyn M Sutcivni by USA. (Burgos, Sandra) (Entered: 08/26/2016)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/25/2016, Entered: 8/25/2016 Court Filing
                                                                              District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ORDER entered. ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to James E Levin. (Castles, Martin) (Main Document 17 replaced on 8/25/2016) (Castles, Martin). (Entered: 08/25/2016)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/25/2016, Entered: 8/25/2016
                                                                                Unsecured Appearance Bond Entered as to James E Levin in amount of $15,000.00. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 08/25/2016)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/25/2016, Entered: 8/25/2016 Court Filing
                                                                                  Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Timothy S Hillman: Arraignment as to James E Levin (1) Count 1,2,3,4 held on 8/25/2016, Case called, Counsel and dft appear for arraignment after dft's arrest, Court informs dft of his rights, Dft enters a plea of not-guilty to all counts, Plea entered by James E Levin Not Guilty on counts 1-4, Court release dft on conditions of release, Appearance bond executed and filed, Order re conditions of release to enter, Court informs counsel that Mag. Judge Robertson will schedule the next Court appearance, (Attorneys present: Dineen Jerrett/Lanza)Court Reporter Name and Contact information: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 08/25/2016)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/25/2016, Entered: 8/25/2016 Court Filing
                                                                                    Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Timothy S Hillman: Initial Appearance as to James E Levin held on 8/25/2016 (Attorneys present: Dineen Jerrett/Lanza)Court Reporter Name and Contact information: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 08/25/2016)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/25/2016, Entered: 8/25/2016 Court Filing
                                                                                      District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 9 Motion to Unseal Indictment for Limited Purpose as to James E Levin (1). (Burgos, Sandra) (Entered: 08/25/2016)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/25/2016, Entered: 8/25/2016
                                                                                        NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Adamo L. Lanza appearing for James E Levin. Type of Appearance: Retained. (Burgos, Sandra) (Entered: 08/25/2016)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/25/2016, Entered: 8/25/2016 Court Filing
                                                                                          If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson as to James E Levin, Jacklyn M Sutcivni (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/25/2016)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: 8/25/2016 Court Filing
                                                                                            Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: ELECTRONIC ORDER OF RECUSAL as to James E Levin, Jacklyn M Sutcivni. Under 28 U.S.C. § 455(a), a United States Magistrate Judge must disqualify himself from any proceeding "in which his impartiality might reasonably be questioned." During my tenure with the United States Attorney's Office, I was involved in the prosecution of this criminal matter. Accordingly, I recuse myself the instant criminal case. (Belpedio, Lisa) (Entered: 08/25/2016)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/25/2016, Entered: 8/25/2016
                                                                                              MOTION to Unseal Indictment for a Limited Purpose as to James E Levin by USA. (Burgos, Sandra) (Entered: 08/25/2016)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: 8/24/2016 Court Filing
                                                                                                District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy Reason for referral: full pretrial as to James E Levin, Jacklyn M Sutcivni, Jacklyn Sutcivni. (Burgos, Sandra) (Entered: 08/24/2016)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 4 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: 8/24/2016
                                                                                                  SEALED INDICTMENT WITH FORFEITURE ALLEGATION as to James E Levin (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, Jacklyn M Sutcivni (2) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4. (Attachments: # 1 JS45 - James Levin, # 2 JS45 - Jacklyn M Sutcivni)(Burgos, Sandra) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/25/2016) (Burgos, Sandra). (Entered: 08/24/2016)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: 8/24/2016 Court Filing
                                                                                                    Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 2 Motion to Seal Case as to James E Levin (1), Jacklyn Sutcivni (2). (Burgos, Sandra) (Entered: 08/24/2016)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: 8/24/2016
                                                                                                      MOTION to Seal Case as to James E Levin, Jacklyn Sutcivni by USA. (Burgos, Sandra) (Entered: 08/24/2016)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: 8/24/2016 Court Filing
                                                                                                        ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment as to James E Levin, Jacklyn Sutcivni; District Judge Timothy S Hillman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (adminn, ) (Entered: 08/24/2016)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 422 times.

                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                           
                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                          Need Password Help?