Santana v. US
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit, Case No. 16-2435

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 24, 2016 at 12:28 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0130894948 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
TENDERED from Appellant Celeste Santana. Title: OPENING BRIEF. Service: 11/21/2016 by email. [384786]. This brief has been rejected. See Doc No.[14]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    NOTICE OF REJECTION: The brief of Appellant Celeste Santana, Original Brief of Appellant [13], is not in compliance with the rules of this court and is therefore rejected for filing. Corrected Brief due 12/05/2016. Appellee United States brief is due 01/03/2017. Service as of this date by Clerk of Court. [385011]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      MOTION of Appellant Celeste Santana to extend the time to 11/21/2016 at 11:00 pm to file the appellant/petitioner's principal brief. Response/Opposition is due 10/03/2016 [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 09/19/2016 by email. [367339]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        MOTION of Appellant Celeste Santana to extend the time to 11/21/2016 at 11:00 pm to file the appellant/petitioner's principal brief. Response/Opposition is due 10/03/2016 [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 09/18/2016 by email. [367197]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Docketing Statement for the Appellant Celeste Santana. Service: 09/15/2016 by email. [366497]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Docketing Statement for the Appellee US. Service: 08/29/2016 by email. [362601]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Certificate of Interest for the Appellant Celeste Santana. Service: 08/26/2016 by email. [362489]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Entry of appearance for John B. Wells as principal counsel for Appellant Celeste Santana. Service: 08/26/2016 by email. [362488]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: None
                  Entry of appearance for Douglas G. Edelschick as principal counsel for Appellee US. Service: 08/08/2016 by email. [356737]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: None
                    Appeal docketed. Received: 08/05/2016. [356726]Entry of Appearance due 08/22/2016. Certificate of Interest is due on 08/22/2016. Docketing Statement due 09/07/2016. Appellant's brief is due 10/07/2016.
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 105 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?