Gibson v. Bank of America, NA

Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:16-cv-02689
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 22, 2018 at 12:22 AM EST (7.3 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Madge Gibson, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin Christopher Mallon +1 212 897 5840 +1 212 897 5841 consumer.esq@outlook.com

Represented by Humphreys Wallace Humphreys, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert David Humphreys +1 918 747 5300 +1 918 747 5311 david@hwh-law.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lucius Wallace +1 918 747 5300 +1 918 747 5311 luke@hwh-law.com
v.
Bank of America, NA Bank of America, NA, Defendant
Officer/Director, Oneida Ltd.
Officer/Director, NATIONSBANK CORP
Officer/Director, Blue Ridge Investments, LLC
Officer/Director, Pioneer High Income Trust
Officer/Director, Nb Holdings Corp

Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christine L. Andreoli +1 212 541 1136 +1 212 904 0536 christine.andreoli@bryancave.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Suzanne Michelle Berger +1 212 541 2034 +1 212 541 1334 smberger@bryancave.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Eric Ginsberg +1 212 541 1130 +1 212 541 1430 jon.ginsberg@bclplaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Catherine E. Welker +1 212 541 1088 +1 212 541 1488 cathy.welker@bryancave.com
Attributes
Timeline
  Entries (55) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Madge Gibson. (Wallace, Lucius) (Entered: 08/10/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: None Scheduling Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE in Opposition re 47 MOTION to Compel /Defendant's Letter in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel filed by Bank of America, NA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Erin S. Avera's Declaration) (Andreoli, Christine) (Entered: 03/22/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: None Compel
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: None Status Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/28/2017, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: None Continue
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Protective Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Protective Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Adjourn Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: None Adjourn Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: None Memorandum in Support
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re 32 MOTION to Dismiss Of Catherine Welker In Further Support filed by Bank of America, NA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10) (Andreoli, Christine) (Entered: 12/01/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re 32 MOTION to Dismiss Of Luke Wallace filed by Bank of America, NA. (Andreoli, Christine) (Entered: 12/01/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: None Memorandum in Support
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re 32 MOTION to Dismiss Of Brianna May filed by Bank of America, NA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6) (Andreoli, Christine) (Entered: 12/01/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re 32 MOTION to Dismiss Of Christine L. Andreoli filed by Bank of America, NA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F) (Andreoli, Christine) (Entered: 12/01/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: None Dismiss
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None File Excess Pages
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: None File Excess Pages
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/2/2016, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE to Motion re 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 21 Scheduling Order /Defendant's Letter Response to Plaintiff's Motion and Defendant's Proposed Scheduling Order filed by Bank of America, NA. (Andreoli, Christine) (Entered: 10/28/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/27/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bank of America, NA, filed by Madge Gibson. (Mallon, Kevin) (Entered: 09/29/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/14/2016, Entered: None Scheduling Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/14/2016, Entered: None Initial Conference Hearing
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: None Proposed Scheduling Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/30/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Pre Motion Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, until 8.31.16 by Bank of America, NA. (Andreoli, Christine) (Entered: 07/28/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, until 8.1.16 by Bank of America, NA. (Andreoli, Christine) (Entered: 07/19/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by Bank of America, NA. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Andreoli, Christine) (Entered: 06/20/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Appearance by Christine L. Andreoli on behalf of Bank of America, NA (aty to be noticed) (Andreoli, Christine) (Entered: 06/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Appearance by Lucius J. Wallace on behalf of Madge Gibson (notification declined or already on case) (Wallace, Lucius) (Entered: 06/10/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert D. Humphreys on behalf of Madge Gibson (notification declined or already on case) (Humphreys, Robert) (Entered: 06/10/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-8670818. by Madge Gibson. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit in Support, # 2 Proposed Order) (Wallace, Lucius) (Entered: 06/09/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-8670698. by Madge Gibson. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit in Support, # 2 Proposed Order) (Humphreys, Robert) (Entered: 06/09/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank of America, NA identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corporation for Bank of America, NA. (Berger, Suzanne) (Entered: 06/07/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine E. Welker on behalf of Bank of America, NA (aty to be noticed) (Welker, Catherine) (Entered: 06/07/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne Michelle Berger on behalf of Bank of America, NA (aty to be noticed) (Berger, Suzanne) (Entered: 06/07/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Summons Issued as to Bank of America, NA, on 05/27/2016. (Fagan, Linda) (Entered: 05/27/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 05/27/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 05/27/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
COMPLAINT against Bank of America, NA filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-8640829 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No, filed by Madge Gibson. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Summons) (Mallon, Kevin) Modified on 5/27/2016 (Rodin, Deanna). (Entered: 05/26/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 13 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?