Eugene Kline, et al v. MERS, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit, Case No. 16-3932

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 14, 2017 at 11:46 PM DT (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (44) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006013058331 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
LOCKED -- COUNSEL HAS KINDLY REFILED AN AMENDED STATEMENT ON THIS DATE --- Oral argument acknowledgment filed by Attorney Mr. Douglas Brooks Riley for Appellees Wells Fargo, MERS and Barclays Capital Real Estate, Incorporated. Certificate of Service: 04/26/2017.--[Edited 04/26/2017 by RGF] (DBR)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006013028473 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    LOCKED -- COUNSEL KINDLY ADVISED TO REFILE AS A REPLY BRIEF --- REPLY filed by Mr. Paul Stuart Grobman for George Ross, Eugene Kline, Jon Shayne Jones, Diana L. Hughes and Carol Ross regarding 16-3932. Certificate of Service: 03/24/2017.--[Edited 03/27/2017 by RGF] (PSG)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006013007852 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      LOCKED -- CORRECTED MOTION FILED THIS DATE --- MOTION filed by Mr. Richard C.O. Rezie for Reimer, Arnovitz, Chernek & Jeffrey Co. to exceed page limit. Certificate of Service: 03/02/2017.--[Edited 03/02/2017 by RGF] (RCR)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006012973034 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        LOCKED -- SEE CORRECTED BRIEF FILED 02/10/2017 --- APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Paul Stuart Grobman for George Ross, Eugene Kline, Jon Shayne Jones, Diana L. Hughes and Carol Ross. Certificate of Service:01/24/2017. Argument Request: requested.--[Edited 02/13/2017 by RGF] (PSG)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Oral argument acknowledgment filed by Attorney Mr. Paul Stuart Grobman for Appellants George Ross, Eugene Kline, Jon Shayne Jones, Diana L. Hughes and Carol Ross. Certificate of Service: 05/16/2017. (PSG)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Oral argument acknowledgment filed by Attorney Mr. Douglas Brooks Riley for Appellee, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. Certificate of Service: 04/26/2017.--[Edited 04/26/2017 by RGF] (DBR)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Oral argument acknowledgment filed by Attorney Mr. Russell J. Pope for Appellees Wells Fargo and Barclays Capital Real Estate, Incorporated. Certificate of Service: 04/26/2017. (RJP)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Oral argument acknowledgment filed by Attorney Mr. Rick D. DeBlasis for Appellee Lerner Sampson & Rothfuss. Certificate of Service: 04/26/2017. (RDD)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Oral argument acknowledgment filed by Attorney Ms. Lori E. Brown for Appellee Reimer, Arnovitz, Chernek & Jeffrey Co.. Certificate of Service: 04/25/2017. (LEB)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    ORAL ARGUMENT SCHEDULED for 9:00 a.m. Tuesday, June 13, 2017. (DTS)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      ORDER filed GRANTING Appellant's motion to file oversized reply brief [38] filed by Mr. Paul Stuart Grobman. (PJE)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank 40 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        REPLY BRIEF filed by Attorney Mr. Paul Stuart Grobman for Appellants George Ross, Eugene Kline, Jon Shayne Jones, Diana L. Hughes and Carol Ross. Certificate of Service:03/24/2017. (PSG)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          MOTION filed by Mr. Paul Stuart Grobman for George Ross, Eugene Kline, Jon Shayne Jones, Diana L. Hughes and Carol Ross to file oversize brief. Certificate of Service: 03/24/2017. (PSG)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            APPELLEE BRIEF filed by Mr. Rick D. DeBlasis for Lerner Sampson & Rothfuss. Certificate of Service:03/10/2017. Argument Request: not requested. (RDD)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              APPELLEE BRIEF filed by Mr. Russell J. Pope for Wells Fargo, MERS and Barclays Capital Real Estate, Incorporated. Certificate of Service:03/10/2017. Argument Request: not requested. (RJP)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank 34 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                APPELLEE BRIEF filed by Ms. Lori E. Brown for Reimer, Arnovitz, Chernek & Jeffrey Co.. Certificate of Service:03/10/2017. Argument Request: not requested. (LEB)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  MOTION filed by Mr. Russell J. Pope for Wells Fargo, MERS and Barclays Capital Real Estate, Incorporated to exceed page limit. Certificate of Service: 03/02/2017. (RJP)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    MOTION filed by Mr. Richard C.O. Rezie for Reimer, Arnovitz, Chernek & Jeffrey Co. to exceed page limit. Certificate of Service: 03/02/2017. (RCR)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      CORRECTED Opening Appellants' BRIEF filed by Mr. Paul Stuart Grobman for George Ross, Eugene Kline, Jon Shayne Jones, Diana L. Hughes and Carol Ross. Certificate of Service:02/10/2017. Argument Request: requested.--[Edited 02/13/2017 by RGF] (PSG)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        RULING LETTER SENT GRANTING APPELLANT'S motion file an oversized biref [26] filed by Mr. Paul Stuart Grobman of no more than 18,000 words. (RGF)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          BRIEFING LETTER SENT requesting brief corrections from Mr. Paul Stuart Grobman for George Ross, Eugene Kline, Jon Shayne Jones, Diana L. Hughes and Carol Ross because MIssing oral argument statement within the brief; Text references are not in compliance, counsel kindly reminded to always use RE instead of Doc when citing the record entries; appellant designation of lower court documents is missing.. Corrections due: 02/10/2017. ALL COUNSEL SHOULD OPEN THIS DOCUMENT FOR REVIEW. (RGF)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Blank 27 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Paul Stuart Grobman for George Ross, Eugene Kline, Jon Shayne Jones, Diana L. Hughes and Carol Ross. Certificate of Service:01/24/2017. Argument Request: requested. (PSG)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              MOTION filed by Mr. Paul Stuart Grobman for George Ross, Eugene Kline, Jon Shayne Jones, Diana L. Hughes and Carol Ross to exceed page limit. Certificate of Service: 01/17/2016. (PSG)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                RULING LETTER SENT granting motion to extend time to file brief [24] filed by Mr. Paul Stuart Grobman., resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 01/24/2017. appellee brief now due 03/10/2017. (RLJ)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  MOTION filed by Mr. Paul Stuart Grobman for George Ross, Eugene Kline, Jon Shayne Jones, Diana L. Hughes and Carol Ross to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 12/14/2016. (PSG)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 01/03/2017; appellee brief due 02/01/2017. (AEG)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Russell J. Pope for Appellee Wells Fargo Certificate of Service: 09/06/2016. (RJP)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Russell J. Pope for Appellee MERS Certificate of Service: 09/06/2016. (RJP)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Russell J. Pope for Appellee Barclays Capital Real Estate, Incorporated Certificate of Service: 09/06/2016. (RJP)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Barclays Capital Real Estate, Incorporated, HomEq Servicing Corporation and MERS by Reuel D. Ash. Certificate of Service: 09/02/2016. (RDA)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Barclays Capital Real Estate, Incorporated, MERS and Wells Fargo by Russell J. Pope. Certificate of Service: 09/02/2016. (DBR)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Barclays Capital Real Estate, Incorporated, MERS and Wells Fargo by Douglas B. Riley. Certificate of Service: 09/02/2016. (DBR)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Lerner Sampson & Rothfuss by Cynthia M. Fischer. Certificate of Service: 09/01/2016. (CMF)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Paul Stuart Grobman for Appellants George Ross, Eugene Kline, Jon Shayne Jones, Diana L. Hughes and Carol Ross. Certificate of Service:09/01/2016. (PSG)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Paul Stuart Grobman for Appellants George Ross, Eugene Kline, Jon Shayne Jones, Diana L. Hughes and Carol Ross Certificate of Service: 09/01/2016. (PSG)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Eugene Kline by Paul S. Grobman. Certificate of Service: 09/01/2016. (PSG)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Rick D. DeBlasis for Appellee Lerner Sampson & Rothfuss Certificate of Service: 08/30/2016. (RDD)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Lerner Sampson & Rothfuss by Rick D. DeBlasis. Certificate of Service: 08/30/2016. (RDD)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 8/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Timothy Thomas Brick for Appellee Reimer, Arnovitz, Chernek & Jeffrey Co. Certificate of Service: 08/30/2016. (TTB)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Reimer, Arnovitz, Chernek & Jeffrey Co. by Timothy T. Brick. Certificate of Service: 08/30/2016. (LEB)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Reimer, Arnovitz, Chernek & Jeffrey Co. by Richard C.O. Rezie. Certificate of Service: 08/30/2016. (LEB)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Reimer, Arnovitz, Chernek & Jeffrey Co. by Lori E. Brown. Certificate of Service: 08/30/2016. (LEB)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                      A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 09/09/2016 at 9:30 AM (ET) with Bob Kaiser. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/16/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                        Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellants Diana L. Hughes, Jon Shayne Jones, Eugene Kline, Carol Ross and George Ross. Transcript needed: n. (RGF)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                          This case has been viewed 101 times.

                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                          Space
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                           
                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                          Need Password Help?