Ferrari v. U.S. Equities Corp.
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Case No. 15-3573

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 10, 2017 at 11:48 PM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (37) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 9/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
JUDGMENT MANDATE, ISSUED.[1873305] [15-3573] [Entered: 09/28/2016 03:56 PM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    ITEMIZED BILL OF COSTS, on behalf of Appellant Liz Ferrari, FILED. Service date 09/21/2016 by CM/ECF.[1868271] [15-3573] [Entered: 09/21/2016 05:17 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 66 Filed: 9/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      ITEMIZED BILL OF COSTS, on behalf of Appellee Olga Moises, U.S. Equities Corp. and Linda A. Strumpf, FILED. Service date 09/20/2016 by CM/ECF.[1866209] [15-3573] [Entered: 09/20/2016 08:49 AM]
        LREF
        Blank 64 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        CERTIFIED SUMMARY ORDER, dated 09/07/2016, to CONNECTICUT (NEW HAVEN), ISSUED.[1857346] [15-3573] [Entered: 09/07/2016 09:38 AM]
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          SUMMARY ORDER AND JUDGMENT, affirming in part and vacating in part judgment of the district court and remanding in part the matter for recalculation of attorney's fees in accordance with this order, by JON, RKW, RR, FILED.[1857340] [15-3573] [Entered: 09/07/2016 09:35 AM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            NEW CASE MANAGER, Yana Segal, ASSIGNED.[1857306] [15-3573] [Entered: 09/07/2016 09:17 AM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/18/2016, Entered: None
              NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellant Liz Ferrari, FILED. Service date 07/18/2016 by CM/ECF. [1817595] [15-3573] [Entered: 07/18/2016 09:43 AM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/15/2016, Entered: None
                NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee Olga Moises, Linda A. Strumpf and U.S. Equities Corp., FILED. Service date 07/15/2016 by CM/ECF. [1816274] [15-3573] [Entered: 07/15/2016 08:31 AM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/13/2016, Entered: None
                  ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[1814490] [15-3573] [Entered: 07/13/2016 01:38 PM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: None
                    ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Anthony J. Majestro, Esq. for Appellant Liz Ferrari, FILED. Service date 05/10/2016 by CM/ECF. [1769041] [15-3573] [Entered: 05/10/2016 04:39 PM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 52 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: None
                      REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Liz Ferrari, FILED. Service date 05/10/2016 by CM/ECF. [1769037] [15-3573] [Entered: 05/10/2016 04:36 PM]
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/9/2016, Entered: None
                        ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney James F. Sullivan, Esq. for Appellee Olga Moises, Linda A. Strumpf and U.S. Equities Corp., FILED. Service date 05/09/2016 by CM/ECF. [1767709] [15-3573] [Entered: 05/09/2016 02:31 PM]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank 46 Filed: 4/27/2016, Entered: None
                          BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Olga Moises, Linda A. Strumpf and U.S. Equities Corp., FILED. Service date 04/26/2016 by CM/ECF. [1759083] [15-3573] [Entered: 04/27/2016 08:12 AM]
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: None
                            DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Brief, [44], on behalf of Appellee Olga Moises, Linda A. Strumpf and U.S. Equities Corp., FILED.[1758964] [15-3573] [Entered: 04/26/2016 04:28 PM]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/10/2016, Entered: None
                              SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Olga Moises, Linda A. Strumpf and U.S. Equities Corp. Brief due date as 04/26/2016, FILED.[1723678] [15-3573] [Entered: 03/10/2016 10:09 AM]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: None
                                LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Olga Moises, Linda A. Strumpf and U.S. Equities Corp., informing Court of proposed due date 04/26/2016, RECEIVED. Service date 03/04/2016 by CM/ECF.[1719665] [15-3573] [Entered: 03/04/2016 03:24 PM]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: None
                                  SPECIAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant Liz Ferrari, FILED. Service date 02/24/2016 by CM/ECF.[1712454] [15-3573] [Entered: 02/24/2016 04:40 PM]
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: None
                                    DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Brief & Appendix , [29], on behalf of Appellant Liz Ferrari, FILED.[1710991] [15-3573] [Entered: 02/23/2016 01:03 PM]
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None
                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, for for Joint Appendix, on behalf of Appellant Liz Ferrari, FILED. Service date 02/22/2016 by CM/ECF.[1710342] [15-3573] [Entered: 02/22/2016 10:10 PM]
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None
                                        JOINT APPENDIX, volume 1 of 1, (pp. 1-590), on behalf of Appellant Liz Ferrari, FILED. Service date 02/22/2016 by CM/ECF.[1710339] [15-3573] [Entered: 02/22/2016 09:46 PM]
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Blank 28 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None
                                          BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Liz Ferrari, FILED. Service date 02/22/2016 by CM/ECF.[1710338] [15-3573] [Entered: 02/22/2016 09:41 PM]
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: None
                                            LETTER, on behalf of Appellant Liz Ferrari, RECEIVED. Service date 01/26/2016 by CM/ECF.[1691532] [15-3573] [Entered: 01/26/2016 11:55 AM]
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/25/2016, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Liz Ferrari, FILED. Service date 01/25/2016 by CM/ECF. [1690987] [15-3573] [Entered: 01/25/2016 03:43 PM]
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1652979] [15-3573] [Entered: 11/30/2015 04:15 PM]
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                  SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Liz Ferrari Brief due date as 02/22/2016;. Joint Appendix due date as 02/22/2016, FILED.[1651260] [15-3573] [Entered: 11/25/2015 10:52 AM]
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                    NEW CASE MANAGER, Brenda Mojica, ASSIGNED.[1650478] [15-3573] [Entered: 11/24/2015 03:21 PM]
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                      INDEX/ROA NOTICE, to Appellant Liz Ferrari, past due material(s) to be submitted by 12/04/2015, SENT.[1649458] [15-3573] [Entered: 11/24/2015 09:32 AM]
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                        LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Liz Ferrari, informing Court of proposed due date 02/22/2016, RECEIVED. Service date 11/23/2015 by CM/ECF.[1648326] [15-3573] [Entered: 11/23/2015 10:01 AM]
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                          FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Liz Ferrari, FILED. Service date 11/23/2015 by CM/ECF.[1648323] [15-3573] [Entered: 11/23/2015 10:00 AM]
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                            FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Liz Ferrari, FILED. Service date 11/23/2015 by CM/ECF.[1648319] [15-3573] [Entered: 11/23/2015 09:58 AM]
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                              ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Olga Moises, Linda A. Strumpf and U.S. Equities Corp., FILED. Service date 11/12/2015 by email, CM/ECF.[1640344] [15-3573] [Entered: 11/12/2015 02:38 PM]
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Liz Ferrari, FILED. Service date 11/09/2015 by CM/ECF.[1637963] [15-3573] [Entered: 11/09/2015 03:17 PM]
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                  DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, [5], on behalf of Appellant Liz Ferrari, FILED.[1637882] [15-3573] [Entered: 11/09/2015 02:30 PM]
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                    DISTRICT COURT TEXT ORDER, dated 11/04/2015, RECEIVED.[1637643] [15-3573] [Entered: 11/09/2015 11:37 AM]
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                      DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 10/22/2015, RECEIVED.[1637636] [15-3573] [Entered: 11/09/2015 11:36 AM]
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                        DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 10/14/2014, RECEIVED.[1637634] [15-3573] [Entered: 11/09/2015 11:35 AM]
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Liz Ferrari, FILED. [1637628] [15-3573] [Entered: 11/09/2015 11:33 AM]
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                            Statistics

                                                                            This case has been viewed 142 times.

                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                            Space
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                             
                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                            Need Password Help?