Vincent, et al v. Camino Camper, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Southern District Court, Case No. 3:93-cv-01838
District Judge Rudi M. Brewster, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 25, 2017 at 4:58 AM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Ronald D Vincent, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Robert P Ottilie

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert P Ottilie +1 619 231 4841 +1 619 231 3293 ro@ottilielaw.com
No Logo Terri L Vincent, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Robert P Ottilie

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert P Ottilie +1 619 231 4841 +1 619 231 3293 ro@ottilielaw.com
v.
No Logo Camino Camper of Las Vegas, Defendant
Deere & Company Deere & Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Neil Dymott Perkins Brown & Frank

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tim Scott McClain +1 619 238 1712 +1 619 238 1562
No Logo Deere Marketing Services, Inc, Defendant
No Logo Eldorado Motor Corporation, Defendant
Ford Motor Company Ford Motor Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "Ford Motor Corporation"
Officer/Director, Gopivotal, Inc.
Officer/Director, Vastera, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnelle, Hastie, Mcgee, Willis & Greene

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George M. Duff, III +1 415 495 4747 gduff@lkclaw.com
Space George M. Duff, III +1 415 495 4747 gduff@lkclaw.com
No Logo John Deere Waterloo Works, Defendant
Oshkosh Oshkosh, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Neil Dymott Perkins Brown & Frank

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tim Scott McClain +1 619 238 1712 +1 619 238 1562
No Logo Sears Consumer Financial Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Camino Camper of Las Vegas, Cross Defendant
Deere & Company Deere & Company, Cross Defendant
No Logo Eldorado Motor Corporation, Cross Defendant
No Logo Oshkosh Truck Corporation, Cross Defendant
No Logo Sears Consumer Financial Corporation, Cross Defendant
Ford Motor Company Ford Motor Company, Cross Claimant
Officer/Director, Gopivotal, Inc.
Officer/Director, Vastera, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnelle, Hastie, Mcgee, Willis & Greene

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/12/1995 George M. Duff, III +1 415 495 4747 gduff@lkclaw.com
TERMINATED: 01/12/1995, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George M. Duff, III +1 415 495 4747 gduff@lkclaw.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 2301
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/2/1995, Entered: None
Notice by defendant Ford Motor Corporati, cross-claimant Ford Motor Company of filing: notice of entry of order dismissing cross-claimant Ford Motor Company's cross-claim t/w exhibits and prf svc (dkt clerk) (Entered: 02/10/1995)
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/12/1995, Entered: None Court Filing
    Stipulation and Order by Judge Rudi M. Brewster: to dismiss case w/prej . JS6 on 1/19/95. (cc: all counsel) (dkt clerk) (Entered: 01/19/1995)
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/12/1995, Entered: None Court Filing
      Order by Judge Rudi M. Brewster to dismiss party cross-defendants Sears Consumer Finan, Camino Camper, El Dorado Motor Corp w/out prej; to dismiss party cross-defendants Oshkosh Truck Corp, Deere and Company w/prej by party cross-claimants Ford Motor Company (cc: all counsel) (dkt clerk) (Entered: 01/19/1995)
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/9/1995, Entered: None
        Minutes: Enter Order by Magistrate Cynthia G. Aaron at pla's request status hearing re dismissal 1/10/95 is canceled; dismissal to be filed be 1/11/95, if not filed Status conf set 9:00 1/12/95 (counsel for pla to notify all parties) (dkt clerk) (Entered: 01/17/1995)
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: None
          Minutes: Enter Order by Magistrate Cynthia G. Aaron ; Status conf set for 1/4/95 is vacated, dismissal to be filed by 1/19/95, if not filed status conf re dismissal set for 9:00 1/10/95 (counsel for pla to notify all parties) (dkt clerk) (Entered: 01/09/1995)
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/27/1994, Entered: None
            Order by Magistrate Cynthia G. Aaron ; E.N.E. Conference held 10:00 10/26/94 Case settledd and a dismissal is to be filed on or before 1/3/95. If not so filed, the attys must appear on 1/4/95 at 9:00 am. (cc: all counsel) (mam) (Entered: 11/02/1994)
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/15/1994, Entered: None
              Answer by cross-defendant Deere and Company, cross-defendant Oshkosh Truck Corp to Crossclaim by Ford Motor Company t/w jury demand and prf svc (dkt clerk) (Entered: 09/28/1994)
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/12/1994, Entered: None
                Notice by defendant Deere and Company, defendant Oshkosh of filing: original declaration of Dwight E. Soper, previous declaration was a facsimile copy (dkt clerk) (Entered: 09/23/1994)
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/8/1994, Entered: None
                  Order by Magistrate Cynthia G. Aaron E.N.E. Conference set for 10:00 10/26/94 (cc: all counsel) (dkt clerk) (Entered: 09/13/1994)
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/30/1994, Entered: None
                    Minutes: Enter Order by Magistrate Anthony J. Battaglia Case referred to Magistrate Cynthia G. Aaron (cc: all counsel) (dkt clerk) (Entered: 09/06/1994)
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/25/1994, Entered: None
                      Memorandum of p/a's by defendant Deere and Company, defendant Oshkosh in support of motion to dismiss [Rule 12(b)] [14-1], of motion for summary judgment [Rule 56] [14-2] t/w exhibits and prf svc (dkt clerk) (Entered: 08/29/1994)
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/25/1994, Entered: None Court Filing
                        Notice of motion and Motion by defendant Deere and Company, defendant Oshkosh to dismiss [Rule 12(b)] , or in thhe alternative, for summary judgment [Rule 56] [motions referred to Judge Rudi M. Brewster] on 12/5/94 at 10:30am (dkt clerk) (Entered: 08/29/1994)
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/25/1994, Entered: None
                          Answer to Complaint and Crossclaim by defendant Ford Motor Corporati t/w fax copy of prf svc (dkt clerk) (Entered: 08/29/1994)
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/1/1994, Entered: None
                            Declaration of James D. Boley by defendant Deere and Company, defendant Oshkosh re Scheduling order Answer due 8/25/94 for Oshkosh, for Deere and Company, for all dfts properly served [11-1], re stipulation [11-2] (dkt clerk) (Entered: 08/01/1994)
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/1/1994, Entered: None Court Filing
                              Stipulation and Order by Judge Rudi M. Brewster: Answer due 8/25/94 for Oshkosh, for Deere and Company, for all dfts properly served (dkt clerk) (Entered: 08/01/1994)
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/30/1994, Entered: None
                                Declaration by dft Deere and Company re Scheduling order Answer due 8/1/94 for Sears Consumer Finan, for Oshkosh, for Deere Marketing, for John Deere Waterloo, for Deere and Company, for Ford Motor Corporati, for El Dorado Motor Corp, for Camino Camper [9-1], re stipulation [9-2] (dkt clerk) (Entered: 07/11/1994)
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/30/1994, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  Stipulation and Order by Judge Rudi M. Brewster : Answer due 8/1/94 for Sears Consumer Finan, for Oshkosh, for Deere Marketing, for John Deere Waterloo, for Deere and Company, for Ford Motor Corporati, for El Dorado Motor Corp, for Camino Camper (cc: all counsel) (dkt clerk) (Entered: 07/11/1994)
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/15/1994, Entered: None
                                    Return of Service executed upon defendant Sears Consumer Finan on 6/10/94 (dkt clerk) (Entered: 06/27/1994)
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/15/1994, Entered: None
                                      Return of Service executed upon defendant Deere and Company, defendant John Deere Waterloo, defendant Deere Marketing on 6/14/94 (dkt clerk) (Entered: 06/27/1994)
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/15/1994, Entered: None
                                        Return of Service executed upon defendant Ford Motor Corporati on 6/10/94 (dkt clerk) (Entered: 06/27/1994)
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/10/1994, Entered: None
                                          Acceptance/Acknowledgement of Service by defendant Oshkosh Truck Corp on 6/1/94 (dkt clerk) (Entered: 06/20/1994)
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/19/1994, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            Order by Judge Rudi M. Brewster granting application [3-1] to extend time of svc of summons and complaint to 6/15/94 (cc: all counsel) (dkt clerk) (Entered: 04/29/1994)
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/19/1994, Entered: None
                                              Ex Parte Application by plaintiff Ronald D Vincent, plaintiff Terri Vincent to extend time to serve (dkt clerk) (Entered: 04/29/1994)
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/6/1994, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                Minutes: Enter Order by Judge Judith N. Keep Case referred to Magistrate Anthony J. Battaglia (cc: all counsel) (dkt clerk) (Entered: 01/06/1994)
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/2/1993, Entered: None
                                                  Complaint Filed; Summons(es) issued to atty (referred to Magistrate Harry R. McCue ) Receipt No/Amt of Fee: #16914/$120 (dkt clerk) (Entered: 12/06/1993)
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 113 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?