Webb et al v. Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc.

Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-04664
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 1, 2018 at 2:39 PM EDT (6.9 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Nicholas Webb, Plaintiff

Represented by mkplawyers.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nathan Pear Karlsgodt +1 312 463 9400 nkarlsgodt@mkplawyers.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cornelius Edward McKnight +1 312 463 9400 nmcknight@mkplawyers.com
No Logo Thad Beversdorf, Plaintiff

Represented by mkplawyers.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nathan Pear Karlsgodt +1 312 463 9400 nkarlsgodt@mkplawyers.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cornelius Edward McKnight +1 312 463 9400 nmcknight@mkplawyers.com
v.
Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc. Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Figliulo & Silverman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James H. Bowhay +1 312 251 4600 jbowhay@fslegal.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James R. Figliulo +1 312 251 4600 jfigliulo@fslegal.com

Represented by Figliulo & Silverman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lisa Michelle Mazzone +1 312 251 4600 lmazzone@fslegal.com
Attributes
Timeline
  Entries (44) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Supplement
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/14/2018, Entered: None Supplement
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Judgment - AO450
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: None memorandum opinion and order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Status hearing set for 6/27/2017 is stricken. Order to follow. Mailed notice (ef, ) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Status hearing held. Pursuant to the discussion held in open court, the status hearing is continued to 6/27/2017 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (ef, ) (Entered: 06/08/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Status hearing held. Pursuant to the discussion held in open court, the status hearing is continued to 6/7/2017 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (ef, ) (Entered: 05/04/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Status hearing set for 4/13/2017 is stricken and reset for 5/3/2017 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (ef, ) (Entered: 04/12/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Status hearing set for 3/8/2017 is stricken and reset for 4/13/2017 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (ef, ) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Status hearing set for 1/31/2017 is stricken and reset for 3/8/2017 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (ef, ) (Entered: 01/30/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Status hearing set for 12/19/2016 is stricken and reset for 1/31/2017 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (ef, ) (Entered: 12/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Status hearing set for 11/10/2016 is stricken and reset for 12/19/2016 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (ef, ) (Entered: 11/07/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Status hearing set for 10/5/2016 is stricken and reset for 11/10/2016 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (ef, ) (Entered: 10/04/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 29 Filed: 9/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STATUS Report Joint Initial Status Report by Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc. (Bowhay, James) (Entered: 09/28/2016)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/30/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY by Defendant Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc. in Support of Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C)(Bowhay, James) (Entered: 07/27/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Defendant's Motion for extension of time to file response/reply 24 is granted. Defendant shall reply to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 9 by 7/27/2016. The motion presentment date of 7/21/2016 is stricken. Parties need not appear. Mailed notice (ef, ) (Entered: 07/19/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Motion by James H. Bowhay for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply 24 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 7/21/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Bowhay, James) (Entered: 07/18/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION by Defendant Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc. for extension of time to file response/reply (Bowhay, James) (Entered: 07/18/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE by Thad Beversdorf to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motion to Dismiss Complaint 9 (McKnight, Cornelius) (Entered: 06/29/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Plaintiffs' Motion for extension of time to file response/reply 19 is granted. The briefing schedule for Defendant's motion to dismiss 9 is extended as follows: Plaintiff shall have until 6/29/2016 to respond and defendant shall have until 7/19/2016 to reply. Plaintiffs' motion 20 is terminated as moot. The motion presentment date of 6/22/2016 is stricken. Parties need not appear. The initial status hearing set for 7/26/2016 is stricken and reset for 8/31/2016 at 9:00 AM. At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. Mailed Notice. Mailed notice (ef, ) (Entered: 06/17/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Re-Filed NOTICE of Motion by Cornelius Edward McKnight for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply, motion for relief 19 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 6/22/2016 at 09:00 AM. (McKnight, Cornelius) (Entered: 06/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION by Plaintiffs Thad Beversdorf, Nicholas Webb for extension of time to file response/reply as to motion for extension of time to file response/reply, motion for relief 19 Notice of Motion to Extend Time to Respond (McKnight, Cornelius) (Entered: 06/15/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION by Plaintiffs Thad Beversdorf, Nicholas Webb for extension of time to file response/reply as to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 9 (McKnight, Cornelius) (Entered: 06/15/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER: Motion hearing held. For the reasons stated on the record, Defendant's motion for leave to file under seal 16 is taken under advisement. The Court sets the following briefing schedule for Defendant's motion to dismiss 9 : Plaintiff shall have until 6/15/2016 to respond and defendant shall have until 6/28/2016 to reply. Discover in this matter is stayed until further order of court. The initial status hearing set for 6/29/2016 is stricken and reset for 7/26/2016 at 9:00 AM. At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. Mailed Notice. Signed by the Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 5/11/2016.(gcy, ) (Entered: 05/13/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RE- NOTICE of Motion by James H. Bowhay for presentment of motion for leave to file 16 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 5/11/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Bowhay, James) (Entered: 04/28/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION by Defendant Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc. for leave to file Under Seal (Bowhay, James) (Entered: 04/28/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Thad Beversdorf, Nicholas Webb by Nathan Pear Karlsgodt (Karlsgodt, Nathan) (Entered: 04/28/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Thad Beversdorf, Nicholas Webb by Cornelius Edward McKnight (McKnight, Cornelius) (Entered: 04/28/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Correction regarding 7 (jc, ) (Entered: 04/28/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Initial status hearing set for 6/29/2016 at 9:00 AM. The parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. The initial status report shall provide the information described on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under District Judges, Judge Andrea R. Wood, Initial Status Conference. Mailed notice (ef, ) (Entered: 04/28/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 11 Filed: 4/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MEMORANDUM by Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc. in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 9 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A & B)(Bowhay, James) (Entered: 04/27/2016)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Motion by James H. Bowhay for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 9 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 5/11/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Bowhay, James) (Entered: 04/27/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motion to Dismiss Complaint (Bowhay, James) (Entered: 04/27/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Motion by James H. Bowhay for presentment of motion for leave to file 7 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 5/11/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Bowhay, James) (Entered: 04/27/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION by Defendant Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc. for leave to file under seal (Bowhay, James) (Incorrect pdf document linked - Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office) Modified on 4/28/2016 (jc, ). (Entered: 04/27/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record (jc, ) (Entered: 04/27/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc. by Lisa Michelle Mazzone (Mazzone, Lisa) (Entered: 04/26/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc. by James R. Figliulo (Figliulo, James) (Entered: 04/26/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc. by James H. Bowhay (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Bowhay, James) (Entered: 04/26/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CIVIL Cover Sheet (Bowhay, James) (Entered: 04/26/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2016 CH 04136) filed by Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-11866888. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A & B)(Bowhay, James) (Entered: 04/26/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 7 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?