Rajapakse v. Credit Acceptance Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit Michigan Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:16-cv-13144-MFL-SDD
District Judge Matthew F. Leitman, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.

Reality Check: Credit Acceptance Corporation, Part I

This docket is featured in the December 13, 2017 article Reality Check: Credit Acceptance Corporation, Part I.

Last Updated January 15, 2019 at 1:17 AM ST (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Rajapakse, Samantha D., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Samantha Rajapakse"
v.
Credit Acceptance Corporation Credit Acceptance Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by King & Murray, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen W. King +1 248 792 2398 +1 248 646 8277 sking@kingandmurray.com
Office Detroit
Filed 8/29/2016
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 371 - Personal Property: Truth in Lending
Cause No cause code entered
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Motion/Petition Before Trial
County Oakland
Terminated 8/23/2017
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags CLOSED,IFP,LR11.2_NOTICE
  Entries (40) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: 10/6/2017 Order on Motion for reconsiderationCourt Filing
ORDER (1) Denying [28] Motion for Reconsideration and (2) Terminating [29] Motion for Immediate Resolution as Moot. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank  Certificate of service
    TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re [31] Order on Motion for Reconsideration on Samantha Rajapakse at P.O. Box 21053, Chattanooga, TN 37424. (HMon)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: 9/19/2017 Pro Se Application for E-filing
      Pro Se Application for E-filing submitted by Samantha Rajapakse [DENIED: CASE CLOSED] (DTyl)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: 9/19/2017 Docket Annotation
        PLAINTIFF SEEK IMMEDIATE RESOLUTION AGAISNT CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION by Samantha Rajapakse (SOso)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document 28 Filed: 8/29/2017, Entered: 8/30/2017 Motion for reconsideration
          MOTION for reconsideration, to amend complaint, for injunctive relief, and to have Court arbitrate or hear plaintiff's motion for summary judgment by Samantha Rajapakse. (DPer)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/23/2017, Entered: 8/23/2017 judgmentCourt Filing
            JUDGMENT. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/23/2017, Entered: 8/23/2017 Order Adopting Report and RecommendationCourt Filing
              ORDER (1) Adopting Magistrate Judge's [24] Recommended Disposition, (2) Granting Defendant's [12] Motion to Compel Arbitration, (3) Terminating Plaintiff's [15] and [22] Motions for Injunctive Relief and for Summary Judgment as Moot, and (4) Dismissing [1] Complaint Without Prejudice. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank  Certificate of service
                TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re [26] Order Adopting Report and Recommendation, [27] Judgment on Samantha Rajapakse at 45 7th Calvary Road, Fort Leavenworth, KS 66027. (HMon)
                  LREF
                  Blank  Certificate of Service
                  TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re [26] Order Adopting Report and Recommendation, [27] Judgment on Samantha Rajapakse at 45 7th Calvary Road, Fort Leavenworth, KS 66027. (HMon)
                    LREF
                    Blank  Certificate of Service
                    TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re [26] Order Adopting Report and Recommendation, [27] Judgment on Samantha Rajapakse at P.O. Box 21053, Chattanooga, TN 37424. (HMon)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/7/2017, Entered: 8/8/2017 Supplemental Brief
                      Plaintiff Submission of Evidence to Support her Motion for Summary Judgment with Newly Attach Evidence filed by Samantha Rajapakse. (SSch)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: 7/28/2017, Terminated: 8/23/2017 Report and RecommendationCourt Filing
                        REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re [22] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Samantha Rajapakse, [12] MOTION to Compel Arbitration, and to Dismiss, or, in the alternative, to stay all proceedings filed by Credit Acceptance Corporation, [15] MOTION filed by Samantha Rajapakse. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis. (THal)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank  Certificate of Service
                          TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re [24] REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION on Samantha Rajapakse, 45 7th Calvary Road, Fort, Leavenworth, KS 66027 (THal)
                            LREF
                            Blank  Certificate of Service
                            TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re [24] REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION on Samantha Rajapakse at P.O. Box 21053, Chattanooga, TN 37424. (THal)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: 7/19/2017 Docket Annotation
                              Amend Summary Judgment with Attached Evidence filed by Samantha Rajapakse. (Ahmed, N)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: 7/10/2017, Terminated: 8/23/2017 Motion for summary judgment
                                MOTION for summary judgment by Samantha Rajapakse. (DPer)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: 5/15/2017 Response to Petition/Request/Application
                                  RESPONSE to Petitioner for Marcus Mays petitioning seeking to file a claim and become a plaintiff wiht this court agaisnt Credit Acceptance Corporation filed by Credit Acceptance Corporation. (King, Stephen)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: 5/3/2017 Docket Annotation
                                    Petitioner for Marcus Mays Petitioning to Seeking to File a Claim and Become a Plaintiff with this Court Against Credit Acceptance Corporation for Breach of Contract filed by Marcus May. (Ahmed, N)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank  Certificate of Service
                                      TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re TEXT-ONLY Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer on Samantha Rajapakse at P.O. Box 21053, Chattanooga, TN 37424 (THal)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank  Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                        TEXT-ONLY ORDER terminating as moot [16] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis. (THal)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/29/2016, Entered: 11/30/2016 Motion
                                          [THIS DOCUMENT IS PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO [12] MOTION] MOTION to Allow Others Pro Se to File Claim Against Credit Acceptance in this Suit and Response re [12] MOTION to Compel Arbitration, and to Dismiss, or, in the alternative, to stay all proceedings by Samantha Rajapakse. (Ahmed, N) Modified on 11/30/2016 (THal).
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: 11/15/2016 Response to motion
                                            RESPONSE to [15] MOTION for injunctive relief filed by Credit Acceptance Corporation. (King, Stephen)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/3/2016, Entered: 11/3/2016 Certificate of service
                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Credit Acceptance Corporation of Defendant's motion to compel arbitration, or in the alternative, to stay all proceedings (King, Stephen)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: 11/3/2016 motion for extension of time to file answer
                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to Review and File Answer and Motion Demanding Defendant Credit Acceptance to Provide Plaintiff a Copy of Answer to this Court by Samantha Rajapakse. (Ahmed, N)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: 10/26/2016 Motion
                                                  MOTION for Injunctive Relief by Samantha Rajapakse. (BGar)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: 10/25/2016, Terminated: 8/23/2017 Order Requiring Responsive PleadingCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER Requiring Response to [12] Motion to Compel. Response due by 11/18/2016. Reply due by 12/2/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis. (THal)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Blank  Certificate of Service
                                                      TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re [14] Order Requiring Responsive Pleading on Samantha Rajapakse at P.O. Box 21053, Chattanooga, TN 37424 (THal)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: 10/19/2016 Notice of Change of Address/Contact Information
                                                        NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Samantha Rajapakse. (Ahmed, N)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/6/2016, Entered: 10/6/2016, Terminated: 8/23/2017 Motion to compel
                                                          MOTION to Compel Arbitration, and to Dismiss, or, in the alternative, to stay all proceedings by Credit Acceptance Corporation. (King, Stephen)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/4/2016, Entered: 10/4/2016 Notice of Mailing by US Marshals
                                                            NOTICE OF MAILING by the US Marshal as to Credit Acceptance Corporation. (BGar)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/14/2016, Entered: 9/14/2016 Acknowledgment
                                                              ACKNOWLEDGMENT from U.S. Marshal Service of Receipt of Service of Process Documents. (Ahmed, N)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: 9/13/2016 Summons issued
                                                                SUMMONS Issued for *Credit Acceptance Corporation* (DAll)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: 9/13/2016 Summons issued
                                                                  SUMMONS Issued for *Samantha Rajapakse* (DAll)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: 9/13/2016, Terminated: 8/23/2017 Order Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: 9/13/2016, Terminated: 8/23/2017 Order on Petition/Request/ApplicationCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER granting [3] Request for service of the initiating document by U.S. Marshal filed by Samantha Rajapakse. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (DPer)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: 9/13/2016, Terminated: 8/23/2017 Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or CostsCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER granting [2] Application to proceed without prepaying fees or costs. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (DPer)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: 9/7/2016 Regarding Parties Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes*
                                                                          Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KKra)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: 8/31/2016 Request for Service of the Initiating Document by U.S. Marshal
                                                                            Request for Service by the United States Marshal of the Initiating Document by Samantha Rajapakse. (ATee)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: 8/31/2016 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs
                                                                              APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Samantha Rajapakse. (ATee)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: 8/31/2016 Complaint
                                                                                COMPLAINT filed by Samantha Rajapakse against Credit Acceptance Corporation (ATee)
                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                  Space Space

                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                  This case has been viewed 245 times.

                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                  Space
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                   
                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                  Need Password Help?