Unknown
Federal Court Proceeding Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, Case No. Unknown

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 2, 2016 at 4:45 AM DT (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Liaison Counsel for Plaintiff, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony D. Shapiro - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 206 623 7292 +1 206 623 0594 tony@hbsslaw.com
v.
No Logo Liaison Counsel for Defendant, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew S Morovitz +1 312 782 0600
  Entries (95) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 6/24/2003, Entered: None
CRO FINAL TODAY -- (CTO #8)(re: pldg # 94 ) Gray & Co., ILC 1:97-1203 (OR 3:97-69) - notified involved clerks & judge (sr) (Entered: 06/24/2003)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 6/6/2003, Entered: None
    CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER FILED TODAY -- (CTO #8)(re: pldg # 93 ) Gray & Co., ILC 1:97-1203 (OR 3:97-69) - Notified involved counsel & judge (sr) (Entered: 06/06/2003)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 6/6/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
      SUGGESTION OF REMAND -- (CTO #8)(re: pldg # 92 ) Signed by Judge Michael M. Mihm in C.D. Illinois (filed 05/13/03) - Gray & Co., ILC 1:97-1203 (OR 3:97-69) (sr) (Entered: 06/06/2003)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 5/22/1997, Entered: None
        TRANSFER ORDER -- (CTO-8) (re: pldg. 85 ) Gray & Co., Inc., v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., et al., D. Oregon, C.A. No. 3:97-69 - Notified involved counsel, judges, Panel judges & clerks (bb) (Entered: 05/22/1997)
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 5/15/1997, Entered: None
          WAIVERS OF ORAL ARGUMENT -- (re: pldg. # 86 ) (For hearing on May 16, 1997 in Washington, D.C.) Archer Daniels Midland Co. and American Maize-Products Co. (rh) (Entered: 05/15/1997)
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 5/15/1997, Entered: None
            HEARING APPEARANCES -- (re: pldg. # 86 ) (For hearing on May 16, 1997 in Washington, D.C.) JAMES C. RUH, ESQ. for Golden Technologies Co., Inc. and Minnesota Corn Processors; KATHLEEN M. MULLIGAN, ESQ. for CPC International, Inc.; JOHN R. HORAN, ESQ. for Roquette America, Inc.; WILLIAM F. MARTSON, JR., ESQ. for Gray & Co. and ROBERT E. BLOCH, ESQ. for Cargill, Inc. (rh) (Entered: 05/15/1997)
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 4/17/1997, Entered: None
              NOTIFICATION OF DESIGNATED ATY. -- (CTO-8)(re: pldg. # 87 ) WILLIAM F. MARTSON, JR., ESQ. for Pltf. in Gray & Company v. Archer Daniels Midland Company, et al., D. Oregon, C.A. No. 3:97-69 - w/cert. of svc (kb) (Entered: 04/17/1997)
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 4/15/1997, Entered: None
                REPLY -- (CTO-8) (re: pldg. # 87 ) Filed by Defts. Minnesota Corn Processors, CPC International Inc., Roquette America, Inc. and Golden Technologies Co., Inc. in Gray & Co., Inc. v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., et al., D. Oregon, C.A. No. 3:97-69 - w/Exhibits A-G & cert. of svc (kb) (Entered: 04/15/1997)
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 4/7/1997, Entered: None
                  RESPONSE, MEMORANDUM -- (CTO-8)(re: pldg. # 85 ) Filed by Pltf. in Gray & Company, Inc. v. Archer Daniels Midland Company, et al., D. Oregon, C.A. No. 3:97-69 - w/Exhibits 1-2 & cert of svc (kb) (Entered: 04/07/1997)
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 4/2/1997, Entered: None
                    HEARING ORDER -- (re: pldgs. # 80 , 81 , 82 & 83 ) Setting Panel Hearing on May 16, 1997 in Washington, D.C. in the following oppositions of defts. Golden Technologies Co., Inc.; Roquette America, Inc.; Minnesota Corn Processors and CPC International, Inc. in Gray & Co., Inc. v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., et al., D. Oregon, C.A. No. 3:97-69 - Notified involved counsel, judges and clerks (rh) (Entered: 04/02/1997)
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 3/18/1997, Entered: None
                      MOTION/BRIEF TO VACATE CTO -- (CTO-8)(re: pldg. # 82 ) Filed by Defts. Minnesota Corn Processors, CPC International Inc., Roquette America, Inc. and Golden Technologies Co., Inc. in Gray & Co., Inc. v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., et al., D. Oregon, C.A. No. 3:97-69 - w/cert. of svc (kb) (Entered: 03/18/1997)
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 3/5/1997, Entered: None
                        NOTIFICATION OF DESIGNATED ATY. -- (CTO-8)(re: pldg. # 79 ) DONALD W. NILES, ESQ. for Deft. Minnesota Corn Processors in Gray & Co., Inc. v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., et al., D. Oregon, C.A. No. 3:97-69 - w/cert. of svc (kb) (Entered: 03/05/1997)
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 3/4/1997, Entered: None
                          NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO CTO -- (CTO-8)(re: pldg. # 79 ) Filed by Deft. CPC International Inc. in Gray & Co. v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., et al., D. Oregon, C.A. No. 3:97-69 - Notified involved counsel & judges (kb) (Entered: 03/04/1997)
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/4/1997, Entered: None
                            NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO CTO -- (CTO-8)(re: pldg. # 79 ) Filed by Deft. Minnesota Corn Processors in Gray & Co., Inc. v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., et al., D. Oregon, C.A. No. 3:97-69 - Notified involved counsel & judges (kb) (Entered: 03/04/1997)
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/4/1997, Entered: None
                              NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO CTO -- (CTO-8)(re: pldg. # 79 ) Filed by Defts. Roquette America, Inc. and The Hubinger Co. in Gray & Co., Inc. v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., et al., D. Oregon, C.A. No. 3:97-69 - Notified involved counsel & judges (kb) (Entered: 03/04/1997)
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/4/1997, Entered: None
                                NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO CTO -- (CTO-8)(re: pldg. # 79 ) Filed by Deft. Golden Technologies Co., Inc. in Gray & Co., Inc. v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., et al., D. Oregon, C.A. No. 3:97-69 - Notified involved counsel & judges (kb) (Entered: 03/04/1997)
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 2/14/1997, Entered: None
                                  CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FILED TODAY -- (CTO-8) Gray & Co., Inc. v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., et al., D. Oregon, C.A. No. 3:97-69 - Notified involved counsel & judges (kb) (Entered: 02/14/1997)
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 6/4/1996, Entered: None
                                    TRANSFER ORDER -- Transferring Rainbow Acres v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., Inc., et al., N.D. California, C.A. No. 3:96-668 and Anthony Patane v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., Inc., et al., N.D. California, C.A. No. 3:96-691 to the C.D. Illinois for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings - Notified involved counsel, clerks, judges & panel judges (kb) (Entered: 06/04/1996)
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/31/1996, Entered: None
                                      ORDER LIFTING STAY OF CTO -- (CTO-7) (re: pldg. 76 ) Alvin Earl Ricci, Jr. v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., et al., E.D. California, C.A. No. 1:96-5341 - Transferring to N.D. Illinois for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings - separating and remanding the corn syrup claims to the E.D. California - transferring the corn syrup claims to C.D. Illinois - separating and remanding the citric acid claims to the E.D. California - transferring the citric acid claims to the N.D. California - Notified involved counsel, judges & clerks (*ALSO DOCKETED AS MDL-1083, PLDG. 48; MDL-1092, PLDG. 35)(bb) (Entered: 05/31/1996)
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/31/1996, Entered: None
                                        WITHDRAWAL OF OPPOSITION TO CTO -- (CTO-7) (re: pldg. 71 ) Alvin Earl Ricci, Jr. v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., et al., E.D. California, C.A. No. 1:96-6341 - w/cert of svc (*ALSO DOCKETED AS MDL-1083, PLDG. 47; MDL-1092, PLDG. 34) (bb) (Entered: 05/31/1996)
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/30/1996, Entered: None
                                          WAIVERS OF ORAL ARGUMENT -- (re: pldg. # 68 ) (For Panel hearing on 5/31/96 in Washington, D.C.) Rainbow Acres; American Maize-Products; Rite Foods, Inc.; A&W Bottling, Inc.; Carteret Packagaing, Inc.; Dellwood Farms, Inc.; E.B. Evans Food Co., Inc.; Golden Eagle,Inc.; Grist Mill Co.; Mohawk Distilled Publix Super Mkts., Inc.; Seven Up Bottling Co. of Jasper; Southeastern Specialty Foods Co.; Sun Dew Sales Corp.; Tom's Foods, Inc.; Trio-Beverage Co., Inc.; Tuscan Dairy Farms; Vineland Syrup, Inc.; Vita Food Prods., Inc.; Wells Dairy, Inc.; Zarda Enter. and E.B. Evans Food Co., Inc. (rh) (Entered: 05/30/1996)
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 5/30/1996, Entered: None
                                            HEARING APPEARANCES -- (re: pldg. # 68 ) (For Panel hearing on 5/31/96 in Washington, D.C.) MICHAEL E. LACKEY, JR., ESQ. for Cargill, Inc. and JOHN E. SCHMIDTLEIN, ESQ. for Archer Daniels Midland Co. (rh) (Entered: 05/30/1996)
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/17/1996, Entered: None
                                              SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION -- (re: pldgs. # 56 and # 65 ) Signed by Michael E. Lackey Jr., counsel for Deft. Cargill, Inc. (dated 5/15/96) - w/exhibit 1 and cert. of svc (pas) (Entered: 05/17/1996)
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/14/1996, Entered: None
                                                CTO FINAL TODAY -- (CTO-7) (re:pldg. # 69 ) Gordon Batson v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., et al., E.D. California, C.A. No. 1:96-5037; NuLaid Foods, Inc. v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., et al., E.D. California, C.A. No. 1:96-5046; June Noldin v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., et al., E.D. California, C.A. No. 1:96-5082; Barbara Guzman v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., et al., E.D. California, C.A. No. 1:96-5085; Virginia Abbott v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., et al., E.D. California, C.A. No. 1:96-5086 - Notified involved clerks and judges (ALSO DOCKET AS MDL 1083, PLDG. NO. 45 and MDL 1092, PLDG. NO. 33) (cgf) (Entered: 05/14/1996)
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 5/14/1996, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO CTO -- (CTO-7) (re:pldg. # 69 ) Filed by Pltfs. in Alvin Earl Ricci, Jr. v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., et al., E.D. California, C.A. No. 1:96-5341 - Notified involved counsel and judges (*ALSO DOCKETED AS MDL-1083, PLDG. #44 and MDL-1092, PLDG. #32) (cgf) (Entered: 05/14/1996)
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/30/1996, Entered: None
                                                    RESPONSE, MEMORANDUM -- (CTO-6) (re: pldg. 65 ) Filed by deft. Cargill, Inc., in Rainbow Acres v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., et al., N.D. California, C.A. No. 3:96-668 - w/Exhibit 1 & cert of svc (bb) (Entered: 04/30/1996)
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 4/26/1996, Entered: None
                                                      CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FILED TODAY -- (CTO-7) Gordon Batson v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., et al., E.D. California, C.A. No. 1:96-5037, NuLaid Foods, Inc. v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., et al., E.D. California, C.A. No. 1:96-5046, June Noldin v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., et al., E.D. California, C.A. No. 1:96-5082, Barbara Guzman v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., et al., E.D. California, C.A. No. 1:96-5085, Virginia Abbott v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., et al., E.D. California, C.A. No. 1:96-5086 and Alvin Earl Ricci, Jr. v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., et al., E.D. California, C.A. No. 1:96-5341 - LYSINE, CORN SYRUP and CITRIC ACID CLAIMS transferred to N.D. Illinois, CORN SYRUP and CITRIC ACID CLAIMS separated, remanded to E.D. California, then, transferred to C.D. Illinois/CITRIC ACID CLAIMS separated, remanded to E.D. California, then, transferred to N.D. California - (also see MDL-1083, CTO-3, pldg. # 31 and MDL- 1092 , CTO- 3 . pldg. # 42 ) - Notified involved counsel and judges (dpl) (Entered: 04/26/1996)
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 4/19/1996, Entered: None
                                                        HEARING ORDER -- (re: pldgs. # 61 and 62 ) Setting Panel Hearing in Washington, D.C. on 5/31/96 in the following oppositions of pltfs. in Rainbow Acres v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., Inc., et al., N.D. California, C.A. No. 3:96-668 and Anthony Patane v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., Inc., et al., N.D. California, C.A. No. 3:96-691 - Notified involved counsel, judges and clerks (rh) (Entered: 04/19/1996)
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/12/1996, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          TRANSFER ORDER -- (CTO-2) (re: pldg. 46 ) Freda's v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., et al., S.D. West Virginia, C.A. No. 2:95-1047 -- Transferring to C.D. Illinois for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings - separating and remanding the citric acid claims to the S.D. West Virginia - transferring the citric acid claims to the N.D. California for inclusion in MDL-1092 - Notified involved counsel, judges, Panel Judges & clerks (ALSO DOCKTED IN MDL-1092; PLDG. 30) (bb) (Entered: 04/12/1996)
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 4/12/1996, Entered: None
                                                            TRANSFER ORDER -- (re: pldg. 33 ) Transferring Kagome Foods, Inc. v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., et al., E.D. California, C.A. No. 1:95-5976; St. Stans Brewing Co. v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., et al., E.D. California, C.A. No. 1:95-5977 - Notified involved counsel, judges, Panel judges & clerks (lrd) (Entered: 04/12/1996)
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/11/1996, Entered: None
                                                              MOTION/BRIEF TO VACATE CTO -- (CTO-6) (re: pldg. # 61 , 62 ) Filed by Pltfs. in Rainbow Acres v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., N.D. California, C.A. No. 3:96-668 and Anthony Patane v. Archer Daniels Midland, N.D. California, C.A. No. 3:96-691 - w/Exhibits A-B & cert. of svc (kb) (Entered: 04/11/1996)
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/27/1996, Entered: None
                                                                WAIVERS OF ORAL ARGUMENT -- (re: pldg. # 49 ) (For Panel hearing on 3/28/96 in Palm Spring, California) Freda's West Virginia Association; Grist Mill; A&W Bottling, Inc., et al. and Golden Eagle, Inc. (rh) (Entered: 03/27/1996)
                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/27/1996, Entered: None
                                                                  HEARING APPEARANCES -- (re: pldg. # 49 ) (For Panel hearing on 3/28/96 in Palm Springs, California) ROGER M. SCHRIMP, ESQ. OR BRUCE L. SIMON, ESQ. for Kagome Foods, Inc. and St. Stan's Brewing Co.; THOMAS DILENGE, ESQ. for Cargill, Inc. and JOHN E. SCHMIDTLEIN, ESQ. for Archer Daniels Midland Co. (rh) (Entered: 03/27/1996)
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/26/1996, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO CTO -- (CTO-6) (re: pldg. # 56 ) Filed by Pltf. in Anthony Patane v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., Inc., et al., N.D. California, C.A. No. 3:96-691 - Notified involved counsel and clerks (dpl) (Entered: 03/26/1996)
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/26/1996, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO CTO -- (CTO-6) (re: pldg. # 56 ) Filed by Pltf. in Rainbow Acres v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., Inc., et al., N.D. California, C.A. No. 3:96-668 - Notified involved counsel and judges (dpl) (Entered: 03/26/1996)
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/26/1996, Entered: None
                                                                        ORDER LIFTING STAY OF CTO -- AND VACATING THE MARCH 28, 1996 HEARING (re: pldgs. # 50 and 59 ) MCFH, Inc. v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., et al., N.D. California, C.A. No. 4:95-4621 - CORN SWEETENER CLAIMS transferred to C.D. Illinois and CITRIC ACID CLAIMS separated & remanded to N.D. California - Notified involved counsel, judges and clerk (rh) (Entered: 03/26/1996)
                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/26/1996, Entered: None
                                                                          WITHDRAWAL OF OPPOSITION TO CTO -- (re: pldgs. # 45 and 53 ) Filed by pltf. in MCFH, Inv. v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., et al., N.D. California, C.A. No. 4:95-4621 - w/cer. of cert. (rh) (Entered: 03/26/1996)
                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/21/1996, Entered: None
                                                                            RESPONSE -- (CTO-1) (re:pldg. # 54 ) Filed by Deft. Cargill, Inc. in Kagome Foods, Inc. v. Arhcher Daniels Midland Co., et al., E.D. California, C.A. No. 1:95-5976 - w/cert. of svc. (cgf) (Entered: 03/21/1996)
                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/14/1996, Entered: None
                                                                              RESPONSE -- (CTO-5) (re:pldg. # 53 ) Filed by Defts. Cargill, Inc., et al. in MCFH, Inc. v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., et al., N.D. California, C.A. No. 4:95-4621 - w/cert. of svc. (cgf) (Entered: 03/14/1996)
                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/11/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FILED TODAY -- (CTO-6) Rainbow Acres v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., Inc., et al., N.D. California, C.A. No. 3:96-668; Anthony Patane v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., Inc., et al., N.D. California, C.A. No. 3:96-691 - Notified involved counsel & judges (kb) (Entered: 03/11/1996)
                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/7/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                  RESPONSE -- (CTO-2) (re:pldg. # 46 ) Filed by Deft. Cargill, Inc. in Freda's v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., et al., S.D. West Virginia, C.A. No. 2:95-1047 - w/cert. of svc. (*ALSO DOCKETED AS MDL-1092, PLDG. #27) (cgf) (Entered: 03/07/1996)
                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/26/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                    SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION -- (CTO-1) (re: pldg. 44 ) Filed by pltfs. in Kagome Foods, Inc. v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., et al., E.D. California, C.A. No. 1:95-5976 - w/cert of svc (bb) (Entered: 02/26/1996)
                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/22/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                      MOTION/BRIEF TO VACATE CTO -- (CTO-4) (re: pldg. 45 ) Filed by pltf. in MCHF, Inc. v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., et al., N.D. California, C.A. No. 4:95-4621 - w/Exhibits A-H & cert of svc (bb) (Entered: 02/22/1996)
                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/21/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                        RESPONSE, MEMORANDUM -- (CTO-1) (re: pldg. 44 ) Filed by deft. Cargill, Inc., in Kagome Foods, Inc. v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., et al., E.D. California, C.A. No. 1:95-5976 and St. Stans Brewing Co. v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., et al., E.D. California, C.A. No. 1:95-5977 - w/cert of svc (bb) (Entered: 02/21/1996)
                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/14/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                          CTO FINAL TODAY -- (CTO-5)(re: pldg. # 42 ) Seven-Up Bottling Co. of San Francisco, Inc. v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., Inc., et al., N.D. California, C.A. No. 4:95-4082 - Notified involved judges & clerks (kb) (Entered: 02/14/1996)
                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/14/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                            FIRST AMENDMENT TO THE HEARING ORDER -- AND ATTACHED SCHEDULE FILED FEBRUARY 14, 1996 (re: pldgs. # 45 and 49 ) Setting Panel Hearing in Palm Springs, California on 3/28/96 to include the following opposition of pltf. in MCFH, Inc. v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., et al., N.D. California, C.A. No. 4:95-4621 - Notified involved counsel, judges and clerks (rh) (Entered: 02/14/1996)
                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/14/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                              HEARING ORDER -- (re: pldgs. # 36 and 41 ) Setting Panel Hearing in Palm Springs, California on 3/28/96 in the following oppositions of pltfs. in Kagome Foods, Inc. v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., et al., E.D. California, C.A. No. 1:95-5976; St. Stans Brewing Co. v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., et al., E.D. California, C.A. No. 1:95-5977 and Freda's v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., et al., S.D. West Virginia, C.A. No. 2:95-1047 - Notified involved counsel, judges and clerks (rh) (Entered: 02/14/1996)
                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/12/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                ORDER LIFTING STAY OF CTO -- (CTO-2) (re:pldg. # 47 ) Gangi Brothers Packing Co. v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., et al., E.D. California, C.A. No. 1:95-5957 - Notified involved clerks, counsel and judges (* ALSO DOCKETED AS MDL-1092, PLDG. #25) (cgf) (Entered: 02/12/1996)
                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/12/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                  WITHDRAWAL OF OPPOSITION TO CTO -- (CTO-2) (re:pldg. # 40 ) Filed by Pltf. in Gangi Brothers Packing Co. v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., et al., E.D. California, C.A. No. 1:95-5957 (* ALSO DOCKETED AS MDL-1092, PLDG. #24) (cgf) (Entered: 02/12/1996)
                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/12/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                    MOTION/BRIEF TO VACATE CTO -- (CTO-2) (re: pldg. 41 ) Filed by pltf. in Freda's v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., et al., S.D. West Virginia, C.A. No. 2:95-1047 - w/cert of svc (*ALSO DOCKETED IN MDL-1092, PLDG. #23) (bb) (Entered: 02/12/1996)
                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/7/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                      NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO CTO -- (CTO-4)(re: pldg. # 38 ) Filed by Pltf. in MCFH, Inc. v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., et al., N.D. California, C.A. No. 4:95-4621 - Notified involved counsel & judges (rec'd 2/6/96 & filed 2/7/96) (kb) (Entered: 02/07/1996)
                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/1/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                        MOTION/BRIEF TO VACATE CTO -- (CTO-1) (re: pldg. 36 ) Filed by pltfs. in Kagome Foods, Inc. v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., et al., E.D. California, C.A. No. 1:95-5976 and St. Stans Brewing Co. v. Archer Dniels Midland Co., et al., E.D. California, C.A. No. 1:95-5977 - w/cert of svc (bb) (Entered: 02/01/1996)
                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/1/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                          RESPONSE -- (CTO-1) (re: pldg. 36 ) (CTO-3)(re: pldg. 40 ) Filed by pltfs. in Kagome Foods, Inc. v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., et al., E.D. California, C.A. No. 1:95-5976; St. Stans Brewing Co. v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., et al., E.D. California, C.A. No. 1:95-5977; and Gangi Brothers Packing Co. v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., et al., E.D. California, C.A. No. 1:95-5957 - w/Schedule A and cert of svc (bb) (Entered: 02/01/1996)
                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/29/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                            CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FILED TODAY -- (CTO-5) Seven-Up Bottling Co. of San Francisco, Inc. v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., Inc., et al., N.D. California, C.A. No. 4:95-4082 - Notified involved counsel & judges (bb) (Entered: 01/29/1996)
                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/26/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                              NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO CTO -- (CTO-2) (re: pldg.# 34 ) Filed by Pltf. in Freda's v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., et al., S.D. West Virginia, C.A. No. 2:95-1047 - Notified involved counsel & judges (*ALSO DOCKETED AS MDL-1092, PLDG.#21) (lg) (Entered: 01/26/1996)
                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/26/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO CTO -- (CTO-3) (re: pldg.# 35 ) Filed by Pltfs. in Gangi Brothers Packing Co. v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., et al., E.D. California, C.A. No. 1:95-5957 - Notified involved counsel & judges (*ALSO DOCKETED AS MDL-1092, PLDG.#22) (lg) (Entered: 01/26/1996)
                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/25/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  NOTIFICATION OF DESIGNATED ATY. -- (CTO-2) (re: pldg. # 34 ) WILLIAM C. BUCKHOLD, ESQ. for Pltf. in Freda's v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., et al., S.D. West Virginia, C.A. No. 2:95-1047 -w/cert of svc (*ALSO FILED AS MDL-1092, PLDG.#20) (dpl) (Entered: 01/25/1996)
                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/22/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FILED TODAY -- (CTO-4) MCFH, Inc. v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., et al., N.D. California, C.A. No. 4:95-4621 - CORN SWEETENER CLAIMS transferred to C.D. Illinois/CITRIC ACID CLAIMS separated & remanded to N.D. California - Notified involved counsel & judges (lg) (Entered: 01/22/1996)
                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/17/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      CTO FINAL TODAY -- (CTO-1) (re: pldg.# 33 ) Zarda Enterprises v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., et al., D. Kansas, C.A. No. 2:95-2457; Trio-Beverage Co., Inc. v. Cargill, Inc., et al., D. Minnesota, C.A. No. 3:95-1045; Carteret Packaging, Inc. v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., et al., D. New Jersey, C.A. No. 2:95-4666; Mohawk Distilled Products v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., et al., S.D. New York, C.A. No. 1:95-9627 - Notified involved judges & clerks (lg) (Entered: 01/17/1996)
                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/17/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO CTO -- (CTO-1) (re: pldg.# 33 ) Filed by Pltfs. in Kagome Foods, Inc. v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., et al., E.D. California, C.A. No. 1:95-5976 and St. Stans Brewing Co. v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., et al., E.D. California, C.A. No. 1:95-5977 - Notified involved counsel & judges (lg) (Entered: 01/17/1996)
                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/11/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FILED TODAY -- (CTO-3) Gangi Brothers Packing Co. v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., et al., E.D. California, C.A. No. 1:95-5957 - CORN SWEETENER CLAIMS transferred to C.D. Illinois/ CITRIC ACID CLAIMS separated, remanded, then, transferred to N.D. California - (also see MDL-1092, CTO-2, pldg. 19 ) -Notified involved counsel & judges (bb) (Entered: 01/11/1996)
                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/11/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FILED TODAY -- (CTO-2) Freda's v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., et al., S.D. West Virginia, C.A. No. 2:95-1047 - CORN SWEETENER CLAIMS transferred to C.D. Illinois/CITRIC ACID CLAIMS separated, remanded, then transferred to N.D. California - (also see MDL-1092, CTO-1, pldg. # 18 ) - Notified involved counsel & judges (bb) (Entered: 01/11/1996)
                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/29/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FILED TODAY -- (CTO-1) Kagome Foods, Inc. v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., et al., E.D. California, C.A. No. 1:95-5976; St. Stans Brewing Co. v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., et al., E.D. California, C.A. No. 1:95-5977; Zarda Enterprises v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., et al., D. Kansas, C.A. No. 2:95-2457; Trio-Beverage Co., Inc. v. Cargill, Inc., et al, D. Minnesota, C.A. No. 3:95-1045; Carteret Packaging, Inc. v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., et al., D. New Jersey, C.A. No. 2:95-4666 and Mohawk Distilled Products v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., et al., S.D. New York, C.A. No. 1:95-9627 - Notified involved counsel and judges (dpl) (Entered: 12/29/1995)
                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/15/1995, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                TRANSFER ORDER -- PER CURIAM opinion, with John F. Nangle, Chairman of the Panel, joined by Robert R. Merhige, Jr., and Barefoot Sanders, Judges of the Panel, DISSENTING - Transferring ALN-4, LAE-1, MN-1, NYE-1 to Judge Michael Mihm for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings - Notified involved counsel, judges, clerks, Panel Judges, misc. recipients & interested publishers (lg) (Entered: 12/15/1995)
                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/15/1995, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  CONSENT ORDER -- Signed by Chief Judge Michael Mihm in C.D. Illinois (dated 11/30/95), consenting to transfer of litigation to himself for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings (lg) (Entered: 12/15/1995)
                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/15/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION -- (LETTER)(re: pldg. # 1 ) (2 actions) Signed by Robert E. Bloch, Esq. (dated 12/14/95) - Seven-Up Bottling Co. of San Francisco v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., N.D. California, C.A. No. 3:95-4082 and Mohawk Distilled Products, L.P., dba Marie Brizard Wine & Spirits, U.S.A. v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., S.D. New York, C.A. No. 1:95-9627 w/cert. of svc (rec'd 12/14/95 and filed 12/15/95)(kb) (Entered: 12/15/1995)
                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/1/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE, MEMORANDUM -- (re: pldg. # 19 ) Filed by "Illinois Corn Syrup Plaintiffs" (see pldg.# 10 for list of parties) - w/Exhibits A-B & cert. of svc. (kb) (Entered: 12/01/1995)
                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/30/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE, MEMORANDUM -- (re: pldg. 19 ) Filed by defts. Archer Daniels Midland Co., A.E. Staley Manufacturing Co., American Maize Products Co., CPC International, Inc., and Cargill, Inc. - w/cert of svc (bb) (Entered: 11/30/1995)
                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/29/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION -- (re: pldg. 1 ) (LETTER) (FILED JOINTLY W/MDL-1088 & 1092) Signed by Mark W. Ryan, Esq. (dated 11/29/95) - Freda's v. Archer Daniels Midland Company, S.D. West Virginia, C.A. No. 2:95-1047 - w/cert of svc (bb) (Entered: 11/29/1995)
                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/29/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            LETTER (SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION) -- FILED JOINTLY W/MDL-1088 - pldg. 21 & MDL-1092 - pldg. 13) (re: pldg. 25) Signed by Roger M. Schrimp, counsel for pltf. in Kagome Foods, Inc. v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., E.D. California, C.A. No. 1:95-5976; St. Stan's Brewing Co. v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., E.D. California, C.A. No. 1:95-5977 (bb) (Entered: 11/29/1995)
                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/27/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION -- (LETTER) (FILED JOINTLY w/MDL-1088) (3 actions) Signed by Robert E. Bloch, Esq. (dated 11/22/95) - Kagome Foods, Inc. v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., E.D. California, C.A. No. 1:95-5976; St. Stan's Brewing Co. v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., E.D. California, C.A. No. 1:95-5977; Tom's Foods, Inc. v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., C.D. Illinois, C.A. No. 1:95-2266 - w/cert of svc (Recvd 11/22/95; filed 11/27/95) (bb) (Entered: 11/27/1995)
                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/22/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE, MEMORANDUM -- (re: pldg. 19 ) Filed by pltfs. Carteret Packaging Co., Seven Up Bottling Co. of Jaspser, Inc., Golden Eagle, Inc., E.B. Evans Food Co., Grist Mill Co., Ppsi-Cola Bottling Co. of Olean, A&J Food Wholesalers, Inc. and Mohawk Distilled Products - w/Exhibits A-C & cert of svc (bb) (Entered: 11/22/1995)
                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/21/1995, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION -- (re: pldg. 19 ) Filed by pltfs. in Dellwood Farms, Inc. v. Cargill Inc., et al., C.D. Illinois, C.A. No. 1:95-1387; Vineland Syrup, Inc. v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., C.D. Illinois, C.A. No. 1:95-1385; Vita Food Products Inc. v. Cargill Inc., et al., C.D. Illinois, C.A. No. 1:95-1372; Rite Food, Inc. v. Cargill Inc., et al., C.D. Illinois, C.A. No. 1:95-1386; A&W Bottling v. Cargill Inc., et al., C.D. Illinois, C.A. No. 1:95-1388; Tuscan Dairy Farms, Inc. v. Cargill, Inc., et al., C.D. Illinois, C.A. No. 1:95-1389 - w/Signed copy of Judge Michael M. Mihm's Order & cert of svc (bb) (Entered: 11/21/1995)
                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/17/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    HEARING APPEARANCES -- (re: pldgs. # 7 and 11 ) (For hearing on 11/17/95 in Fort Myers, Florida) CHARLES S. ZIMMERMAN, ESQ. for Grist Mill Co.; JOHN E. SCHMIDTLEIN, ESQ. for Archer Daniels Midland Co.; DANIEL E. BECNEL, JR., ESQ. for Mr. Jim's Cafe, Inc.; ROBERT N. KAPLAN, ESQ. for Tuscan Dairy Farms, Inc., et al.; MICHAEL J. FREED, ESQ. for Dellwood Farms, Inc.; ROBERT E. BLOCH, ESQ. for Cargill Inc.; NATHAN P. EIMER, ESQ. for CPC International Inc.; TERRY M. GRIMM, ESQ. for A.E. Staley Manufacturing Co. and American Maize Products Co.; WILLIAM F. DUKER, ESQ. for Seven Up Bottling Co. of Jasper, et al.; MERRILL G. DAVIDOFF, ESQ. for E.B. Evans Food Co., Inc.; MARY BOIES, ESQ. for Golden Eagle, Inc. and SAMUEL D. HEINS, ESQ. for Pepsi-Cola Bottling Co. of Olean (rh) (Entered: 11/17/1995)
                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/15/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE -- (re: pldgs. 3 , 8 & 19 ) Filed by pltf. Wells Dairy, Inc. - w/cert of svc (bb) (Entered: 11/15/1995)
                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/15/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        APPEARANCE -- (re: pldg. 19 ) JERRY S. COHEN, ESQ. for Trio-Beverage Co., Inc., d/b/a/ Pepsi-Cola Bottling Company of Wilkes-Barre - w/cert of svc (bb) (Entered: 11/15/1995)
                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/15/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION -- BRIEF, SCHEDULE OF ACTIONS (16 actions) Filed by pltf. Trio-Beverage Co., Inc. - SUGGESTED TRANSFEREE DISTRICT: D. MINNESOTA; SUGGESTED TRANSFEREE JUDGE: ? - w/cert of svc - Notified involved counsel (recvd 11/14/95; filed 11/15/95) (bb) (Entered: 11/15/1995)
                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/15/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION -- (re: pldg. 1 ) (1 action) (FILED JOINTLY W/MDL-1088, PLDG.#17 & MDL-1092, PLDG.#10) Filed by deft. Cargill, Inc., in Gangi Bros. Packing Company v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., E.D. California, C.A. No. 95-5957 - w/cert of svc (recvd 11/14/95; filed 11/15/95) (bb) (Entered: 11/15/1995)
                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/2/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION -- (LETTER) (FILED JOINTLY w/ MDL-1083, pldg.# 17 ) (re: pldg.# 1 ) (2 N.D. Illinois actions) Signed by Gregory K. Arenson, Esq. (dated 10/25/95) - A.J. DeCoster Co. v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., et al., C.A. No. 1:95-5938 and Consumers Supply Corp. v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., et al., C.A. No. 1:95-5940 - w/cert of svc (Rec'd 10/30/95 and Filed 11/2/95) (lg) (Entered: 11/02/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/31/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION -- (re: pldg.# 1 ) (3 new actions) Filed by Pltf. in Zarda Enterprises v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., et al., D. Kansas, C.A. No. 95-2457; A&W Bottling, Inc. v. ADM, et al., N.D. Illinois; Dellwood Farms & Sun Dew Sales Corp. v. ADM, et al., N.D. Illinois (NO C.A. NO. AVAILABLE YET FOR THESE 2 N.D. ILLINOIS ACTIONS) - w/cert of svc (dpl) (Entered: 10/31/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/30/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION -- (NOTICE OF REMAND OF 2 ACTIONS) Filed by Pltfs. in Patricia Borgeson v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., et al., C.D. California, C.A. No. 2:95-5745 and Nedra Goings v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., et al., C.D. California, C.A. No. 2:95-5746 - w/Order of Remand to State Court, Signed by J. Aubrey B. Collins in C.D. California (dated 10/12/95); & cert of svc (lg) (Entered: 10/30/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/27/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE, MEMORANDUM -- (re: pldg. # 8 ) Filed by Defts. Archer Daniels Midland Co., A.E. Staley Manufacturing Co., American Maize Products Co., CPC International, Inc., and Cargill, Inc. -w/cert of svc (dpl) (Entered: 10/27/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/24/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE -- (re: pldg.# 8 ) Filed by Pltfs. Carteret Packaging Co., Seven Up Bottling Co. of Jasper, Inc., Golden Eagle, Inc., E.B. Evans Food Co., Grist Mill Co., Pepsi-Cola Bottling Co. of Olean, and A&J Food Wholesalers, Inc. - w/cert. of svc. (sas) (Entered: 10/24/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/23/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        APPEARANCE -- DANIEL E. BECNEL, JR., ESQ. for Pltf. in Mr. Jim's Cafe, Inc., d/b/a Coffee Cafe v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., et al., E.D Louisianna, C.A. No. 2:95-3182 -w/cert of svc (dpl) (Entered: 10/23/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/12/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          FIRST AMENDMENT TO THE HEARING ORDER -- AND ATTACHED SCHEDULE FILED OCTOBER 6, 1995 - (re: pldgs. # 7 and # 8 ) Setting motion to transfer for Panel Hearing in Fort Myers, Florida on 11/17/95 - Notified involved counsel, judges and clerks (rh) (Entered: 10/12/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/11/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE, MEMORANDUM -- (SUBMITTED JOINTLY w/pldg.# 12 in MDL- 1088 ) (re: pldgs.# 1 , 3 ) Filed by "Illinois Corn Syrup Pltfs." (Vita Food Products, Inc.; Dellwood Farms, Inc.; Sun Dew Sales Corp.; A&W bottling, Inc.; Vineland Syrup, Inc.; Rite Foods, Inc.; & Tuscan Dairy Farms, Inc.) - w/Schedule, 7 Exhibits, & cert of svc (Rec'd 10/5/95 & Filed 10/11/95) (lg) (Entered: 10/11/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/11/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE, MEMORANDUM -- (re: pldg.# 3 ) Filed by Pltfs. Carteret Packaging Co.; 7-Up Bottling Co. of Jasper, Inc.; Golden Eagle, Inc.; E.B. Evans Food Co.; Grist Mill Co.; Pepsi-Cola Bottling Co. of Olean; A&J Food Wholesalers, Inc. - w/Affidavit of Jeol H. Bernstein, Exhibits A-B, & cert of svc (Rec'd 10/10/95 & Filed 10/11/95) (lg) (Entered: 10/11/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/10/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION -- BRIEF, SCHEDULE (2 actions) - Filed by Pltf. Mr. Jim's Cafe, Inc., d/b/a Coffee Cafe - SUGGESTED TRANSFEREE DISTRICT: E.D. Louisiana - SUGGESTED TRANSFEREE JUDGE: ? - w/exhibit A and cert of svc (dpl) (Entered: 10/10/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/6/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  HEARING ORDER -- (re: pldgs. # 1 and # 3 ) Setting motion to transfer for Panel Hearing in Fort Myers, Florida on 11/17/95 (rh) (Entered: 10/06/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/3/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    APPEARANCE -- KENNETH G. GILMAN, ESQ. for Rite Foods, Inc.; WARREN RUBIN, ESQ. for Vineland Syrup, Inc. and ROBERT N. KAPLAN, ESQ. for Tuscan Dairy Farms, Inc. - Notified involved counsel (dpl) (Entered: 10/03/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/2/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE -- (re: pldg. # 1 ) Filed by Pltfs. Patricia Borgeson and Nedra Goings -w/cert of svc. (dpl) (Entered: 10/02/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/25/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        APPEARANCES -- (re: pldg.# 1 ) BARBARA J. HART, ESQ. for A&J Food Wholesalers, Inc.; JOHN E. SCHMIDTLEIN, ESQ. for Archer Daniels Midland Co.; MICHAEL STRAUS, ESQ. for Seven Up Bottling Co. of Jasper, Inc.; CHARLES S. ZIMMERMAN, ESQ. for Grist Mill Co.; NATHAN P. EIMER, ESQ. for CPC International, Inc.; MERRILL G. DAVIDOFF, ESQ. for E.B. Evans Food Co., Inc.; ROBERT E. BLOCH, ESQ. for Cargill, Inc.; TERRY M. GRIMM, ESQ. for A.E. Stanley Manufacturing Co.; WILLIAM F. DUKER, ESQ. for Golden Eagle, Inc.; SAMUEL D. HEINS, ESQ. for Pepsi-Cola Bottling Co. of Olean; DONALD R. HARRIS, ESQ. for American Maize Products, Co.; MARK C. RIFKIN, ESQ. for Nedra Goings; EUGENE MIKOLAJCZYK, ESQ. for Patricia Borgeson - Notified involved counsel (sas) (Entered: 09/25/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/25/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION -- (AMENDED) BRIEF, SCHEDULE OF ACTIONS (re: pldg.# 1 ) Filed by Defts. Archer Daniels Midland Co., Cargill, Inc., CPC International, Inc. & American Maize Products Co. - AMENDED TO INCLUDE 4 NEW ACTIONS AND SUGGESTED TRANSFEREE DISTRICT: C.D. Illinois - SUGGESTED TRANSFEREE JUDGE: ? - w/exhibits A-C, 1-4 & cert. of svc. (sas) (Entered: 09/25/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/15/1995, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER -- (re: pldg.# 1 ) Signed by Judge Harold D. Vietor (dated 9/14/95) in the District of Iowa (regarding suggestion of transfer of actions to the D. Iowa) (sas) (Entered: 09/15/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/12/1995, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION -- BRIEF, SCHEDULE OF ACTIONS (8 actions) Filed by Defts. Archer Daniels Midland Co., Cargill Inc., A.E. Staley Manufacturing Co., CPC International, Inc. & American Maize Products Co. - SUGGESTED TRANSFEREE DISTRICT: S.D. Iowa - SUGGESTED TRANSFEREE JUDGE: Judge Harold D. Vietor - w/exhibits A-B, 1-8 & cert. of svc. (sas) (Entered: 09/12/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 11 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?