J & J Sports Productions Inc. v. Hill
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Southern District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-00890

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 16, 2019 at 2:12 AM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 47 U.S.C. § 553
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT DARRIS STORMS. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 3/31/18. (ba)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/3/2017, Entered: None Default Judgment (Motion for)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Order to Show Cause
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: None Clerks Entry of Default
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Application to enter Default
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: None Certificate of Clerk
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/16/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/15/2017, Entered: None Summons Issued
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: None Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/26/2017, Entered: None Stipulation
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Summons Returned Unexecuted
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Stipulation
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/10/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/3/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/14/2016, Entered: None Certificate of Clerk
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/1/2016, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/1/2016, Entered: None Complaint
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 3 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?