Lynn Peak Productions, Inc. v. Doe 1 et al.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Colorado District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-02984

Tags
Last Updated September 4, 2016 at 1:02 AM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

  Entries (36) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: 3/17/2014
REPORT on the determination of an action mailed to Register of Copyrights (evana, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: 3/11/2014
    CERTIFICATE of Service by MAIL by Clerk of Court re [34] Order on Motion for Extension of Time, Order on Motion for Leave to Restrict, Order on Motion for Order, to John Doe 11. Text Only Entry (evana, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: 3/11/2014 Court Filing
      MINUTE ORDER denying as Moot [29] Defendant John Doe 11's Motion for Extension of Time ; denying as Moot [28] Defendant John Doe 11's Motion to Proceed Anonymously; granting [30] Defendant John Doe 11's Motion for Leave to Restrict, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/10/2014.(evana, )
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: 3/10/2014
        STATEMENT re [31] Restricted Document - Level 2 by Defendant Doe 11 (Public entry for RESTRICTED Document [31], filed 3/7/2014) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (evana, )
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: 3/7/2014 Court Filing
          MEMORANDUM regarding [28] MOTION for Order to filed by Doe 11, [30] MOTION for Leave to Restrict filed by Doe 11, [29] MOTION for Extension of Time to filed by Doe 11. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 3/7/14. Text Only Entry (rkeec)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: 3/7/2014
            RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 2: by Defendant Doe 11.. (evana, )
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 30 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: 3/7/2014
              MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Defendant Doe 11. (evana, )
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: 3/7/2014
                MOTION for Extension of Time by Defendant Doe 11. (evana, )
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: 3/7/2014
                  MOTION for Order to Proceed Anonymously by Defendant Doe 11. (evana, )
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: 2/28/2014
                    Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed in this case on 2/26/2014. Text Only Entry (evana, )
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: 2/26/2014
                      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case Without Prejudice by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc. (Kannady, Scott)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: 2/10/2014
                        Monthly STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc.. (Kannady, Scott)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: 2/5/2014
                          Party Doe 19 terminated pursuant to the notice of dismissal or stipulation to dismiss filed in this case on 02/04/14. Text Only Entry (jhawk, )
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: 2/4/2014
                            NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe #19 by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc. (Kannady, Scott)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: 1/21/2014
                              Party Doe 29 terminated pursuant to the notice of dismissal or stipulation to dismiss filed in this case on 01/17/14. Text Only Entry (jjhsl, )
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: 1/17/2014
                                NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe 29 by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc. (Kannady, Scott)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/31/2013, Entered: 1/2/2014 Court Filing
                                  MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice [13] Motion to Quash the Subpoena. Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer [sic] or otherwise Respond to Defendant John Doe 11's Motion to Quash Subpoena [17] is denied as moot by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/31/13.(jjhsl, )
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/31/2013, Entered: 12/31/2013 Court Filing
                                    MEMORANDUM regarding [13] MOTION to Quash filed by Doe 11. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 12/31/13. Text Only Entry (wydcd, rrk)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: 12/31/2013 Court Filing
                                      MEMORANDUM regarding [17] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [13] MOTION to Quash Subpoena filed by Lynn Peak Productions, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 12/30/13. Text Only Entry (jjhsl, )
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: 12/30/2013
                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [13] MOTION to Quash Subpoena by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc.. (Kannady, Scott)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: 12/13/2013
                                          Party Doe 16 terminated pursuant to the notice of dismissal or stipulation to dismiss filed in this case on 12/12/13. Text Only Entry (jjhsl, )
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: 12/12/2013
                                            NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe #16 by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc. (Kannady, Scott)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: 12/10/2013
                                              Monthly STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc.. (Kannady, Scott)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: 12/10/2013
                                                Memorandum of Points and Authority in Support of Defedant John Doe No. 11's Motion to Quash the Subpoena by Defendant Doe 11. (jjhsl, ) Modified on 12/10/2013 to Change into a Motion pursuant to MEH Chambers (jjhsl, ).
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: 11/14/2013 Court Filing
                                                  MINUTE ORDER: This case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty pursuant to an Order Referring Case entered by Senior Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. It is hereby ORDERED that the Plaintiff shall file a status report on the tenth day of each month informing the Court of the status of service in this case. For its monthly reports, the Plaintiff need not file a separate report in each case, but may include this case in one monthly report of associated cases; however, the Plaintiff shall separately notify the Court in which case the monthly status report is filed. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/14/2013. Text Only Entry (mehcd)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/11/2013, Entered: 11/11/2013
                                                    Monthly STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc.. (Kannady, Scott)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: 11/6/2013 Court Filing
                                                      ORDER granting in part and denying in part [3] Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/5/2013.(ervsl, )
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: 11/5/2013 Court Filing
                                                        MINUTE ORDER: This case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty pursuant to an Order Referring Case entered by Senior Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. It is hereby ORDERED that the Plaintiff shall file a status report on the tenth day of each month informing the Court of the status of service in this case. For its monthly reports, the Plaintiff need not file a separate report in each case, but may include this case in one monthly report of associated cases; however, the Plaintiff shall separately notify the Court in which case the monthly status report is filed. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/5/2013. Text Only Entry. (mehcd)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: 11/4/2013 Court Filing
                                                          MEMORANDUM regarding [3] MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by Lynn Peak Productions, Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/4/13. Text Only Entry (wydcd, rrk)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: 11/4/2013 Court Filing
                                                            ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for dispositive matters. That pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge is designated to conduct proceedings in this civil action as follows: (1) Convene a scheduling conference under Fed.R.Civ.P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2. (2) Conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause. (3) Hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions. (4) Conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. (5) Alternative Dispute Resolution Authority: Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge, or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. (6) Conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. It is further ORDERED that parties and counsel shall be familiar and comply with the above judge's requirements found at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Entered by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/4/13. Text Only Entry (wydcd, rrk)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: 11/1/2013 Court Filing
                                                              Magistrate Judge Consent Form issued. (dbera, )
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: 11/1/2013
                                                                REPORT on the filing of an action mailed to Register of Copyrights (dbera, )
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: 11/1/2013 Court Filing
                                                                  Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and drawn to Magistrate Judge Micheal E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry (dbera, )
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: 10/31/2013
                                                                    MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Kannady, Scott)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: 10/31/2013
                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent 0939599 BC LTD., Corporate Parent Studio West Productions (VCC) Inc. for Lynn Peak Productions, Inc.. (Kannady, Scott)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: 10/31/2013
                                                                        COMPLAINT against Does 1-30 (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-3601841), filed by Lynn Peak Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Summons, # (2) Civil Cover Sheet, # (3) Exhibit A, # (4) Exhibit B)(Kannady, Scott)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                          Statistics

                                                                          This case has been viewed 91 times.

                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                          Space
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                           
                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                          Need Password Help?