FDNS et al v. USCIS et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Missouri Eastern District Court, Case No. 4:16-cv-01423

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 10, 2017 at 3:22 PM DT (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo FDNS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of General Counsel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space FDNS
No Logo HAKAN ALTIN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Evita Tolu +1 314 872 3988 +1 314 872 9556 evitatolu@yahoo.com
No Logo USCIS DISTRICT 15 DIRECTOR, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the General Counsel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space USCIS DISTRICT 15 DIRECTOR
v.
No Logo DHS, Defendant
Federal Bureau of Investigation Federal Bureau of Investigation, Defendant
Officially listed as "FBI"
No Logo FBI -E.D. - MO, Defendant
No Logo Uscis, Defendant
No Logo USCIS ST LOUIS FIELD OFFICE, Defendant
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Order of Dismissal (case ) or (Stipulation of Dismissal of case)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/8/2017, Entered: None Dismiss Case
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/15/2017, Entered: None Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/9/2017, Entered: None Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/15/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/7/2016, Entered: None Entry of Appearance
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Entry of Appearance
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: None Memorandum (NON-MOTION EVENT)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/16/2016, Entered: None Complaint
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/16/2016, Entered: None Complaint
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/4/2016, Entered: None Complaint
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 105 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?