J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Aburahma
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Northern District Court, Case No. 4:16-cv-02225

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 21, 2018 at 3:03 AM DT (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 47 U.S.C. § 553
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    Memorandum of Opinion and Order For the reasons set forth herein, the Court grants Plaintiff's Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement, ECF No. 15 , which was reached with the consent of the parties at a Mediation before Magistrate Judge Limbert. Defendant shall honor the terms of the settlement, and the Court hereby enforces the settlement in accordance with the details in the Release. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 5/3/2017. (JLG)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: None Enforce
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None Attend by Telephone
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: None Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: None Order of Referral to Judicial Officer for Mediation or Settlement
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: None Case Management Conference Plan/Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: None Continue
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: None Complaint
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 2 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?