Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
67 |
Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: 12/1/2017 |
Unknown Document Type |
|
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner: granting 66 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Dismiss Case. The Court dismisses this entire case with prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Each party is to bear its own fees and costs. IT IS SO ORDERED. ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) (mz)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
66 |
Filed: 11/30/2017, Entered: 11/30/2017 |
Unknown Document Type |
|
Joint EX PARTE APPLICATION to Dismiss Case filed by plaintiff Ken Redman. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 proof of service) (Verdun, Andre)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
65 |
Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: 11/17/2017 |
Unknown Document Type |
|
CONSENT TO PROCEED before United States Magistrate Judge by all parties pursuant to GO 12-01 is approved by District Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. This case is hereby reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner for all further proceedings. Case number will now read 2:16-cv-06789 MRW. (rn)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
64 |
Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
NOTICE filed by Plaintiff Ken Redman. of Pending Settlement (Wilcox, Ronald) (Entered: 11/14/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
63 |
Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form 4, Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,,, Set/Reset Hearing,,,, 55 (Attachments: # 1 Statement To Consent to Proceed Before A United States Magistrate Judge)(Wilcox, Ronald) (Entered: 11/14/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
62 |
Filed: 11/9/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
ORDER RE TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The Court conferred with parties regarding that status of settlement. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mz) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 11/09/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
61 |
Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
ORDER RE TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The Court conferred with the parties regarding the status of the case. A follow up telephone Conference is set for 11/9/2017 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mz) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 11/06/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
60 |
Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
ORDER RE: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The Court conferred with the parties regarding the status of the case. A Follow-Up Telephone Conference is set for 11/03/2017 at 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (afe) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 10/31/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
59 |
Filed: 10/26/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Telephone Conference set for October 31, 2017 at 09:00 AM. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vm) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 10/26/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
58 |
Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Order,,, Set/Reset Hearing,, 56 . The incorrect.pdf image was attached. The correct image will be attached herewith and will also replace the incorrect image attached to document 56 with the correct image. (Attachments: # 1 order setting FPTC) (shb) (Entered: 10/23/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
57 |
Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: None |
Order |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
57 |
Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
ORDER RE JURY INSTRUCTIONS by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr. It is Ordered that counsel shall prepare and file proposed jury instructions in accordance with the procedures set forth in this Order. Failure to comply with thisOrder shall subject counsel to sanctions, in addition to the instructions beingreturned to be properly prepared. The Court prefers instructions from Kevin F. OMalley, et al., Federal Jury Practice and Instructions (6th ed. Current edition), modified only if necessary to fit the circumstances of each case. Attached is a list of the Court's general civil jury instructions which will be given when applicable. See order for further details. (shb) (Entered: 10/23/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
56 |
Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: None |
Order |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
56 |
Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
ORDER SETTING FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE AND REFERRING DISCOVERY by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr. It is Ordered that all discovery matters which become at issue are referred to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner for his/her consideration. Please contact the courtroom deputy clerk to the Magistrate Judge regarding these matters. It is Ordered, pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures and Local Rule 16, that the Final Pre-Trial Conference is placed on the Courts calendar for March 5, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom No. 9B in the U. S. Courthouse on First Street. See order for further details. (shb) (Main Document 56 replaced on 10/23/2017) (shb). (Entered: 10/23/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
55 |
Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: None |
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
55 |
Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MINUTE IN CHAMBERS NEW CASE BEFORE JUDGE HATTER: This action has been assigned to the calendar of the HONORABLE TERRY J. HATTER, JR., United States District Judge. Please include the initials TJH in all documents pertaining to this case, as documents are routed using the judges initials, it is imperative that the correct initials TJH be used on all subsequent filings to prevent any delays in the processing of documents. Judge Hatter's Courtroom Deputy Clerk is Yolanda Skipper. She can be reached at (213) 894-5276. Counsel shall not attempt to contact the Court or its chambers staff by telephone or by any other ex parte means, although counsel may contact the Courtroom Deputy, Yolanda Skipper, at: yolanda_skipper@cacd.uscourts.gov, with appropriate inquiries.Judge Hatters courtroom is located on the 9th Floor, at 350 W. 1st Street, United States Courthouse, Courtroom No. 9B. Additional information about Judge Hatters procedures and schedules can be found on the courts website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov. Counsel are further notified that the Court will set the Final Pretrial Conference for March 5, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. Jury trial date will be set for April 3, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. See order for further details. (shb) (Entered: 10/23/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
54 |
Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Joseph James Poppen counsel for Defendants Elan Financial Services, US Bank National Association. CHASE HASLAM is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant U.S. Bank, N.A. (d/b/a Elan Financial Services). (Attorney Joseph James Poppen added to party Elan Financial Services(pty:dft))(Poppen, Joseph) (Entered: 10/20/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
53 |
Filed: 10/18/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#17-081) approved by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the TRANSFER OF CASES of Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell, this case is transferred from Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell to the calendar of Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:16-cv-06789-TJH-MRWx. (rrp) (Entered: 10/19/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
52 |
Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MINUTES OF Settlement Conference held before Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The Court conducted a settlement conference with the parties today. The case did not settle. Court Recorder: CS 8/24/2017. (vm) (Entered: 08/25/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
51 |
Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Joseph James Poppen on behalf of Defendant US Bank National Association (Attorney Joseph James Poppen added to party US Bank National Association(pty:dft))(Poppen, Joseph) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
50 |
Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
ORDER by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell granting Stipulation to CONTINUE THE DISCOVERY CUT OFF AND MOTION CUT OFF DEADLINES. The Court orders that the discovery cut off date shall be extended from September 11, 2017 to January 2, 2018, and the last date for hearing on on motions is extended from September 4, 2017, to January 8, 2018. All other dates set forth in the Order issued on March 15, 2017 at Docket no. 31 remain the same. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 06/29/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
49 |
Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date to 1/2/2018 48 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected.Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (jloz) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
48 |
Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: 6/23/2017 |
Unknown Document Type |
|
EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date to 1/2/2018 filed by plaintiff Ken Redman. (Attachments: # 1 proof of service) (Verdun, Andre)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
47 |
Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: 6/23/2017 |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The Court will conduct a settlement conference in this action on Friday, August 18, 2017, from 9:00 a.m. to noon. (See Minute Order for further details) (vm)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
46 |
Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
ORDER RE: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The Court conferred with the parties regarding the status of the case. The parties are ordered to contact the clerk regarding a proposed date for a settlement conference. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vm) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 06/06/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
45 |
Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
ORDER RE: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The Court conferred with the parties regarding the status of discovery. The Court will conduct a further telephonic status conference on June 6, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vm) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 05/22/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
44 |
Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: 5/16/2017 |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MINUTE ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE REGARDING DISCOVERY DISPUTES by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The Court will conduct a telephone conference with the parties on Monday, May 22, 2017, at 11:30 a.m. If the parties resolve their disputes before then, they may contact the Court and cancel the meeting. IT IS SO ORDERED. (mz)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
43 |
Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition 35 First Amended Answer of Defendant U.S. Bank, N.A. to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendant US Bank National Association.(Mahdavi, Golareh) (Entered: 05/05/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
42 |
Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: 5/1/2017 |
Unknown Document Type |
|
ORDER by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: The Stipulation Enlarging Time to Amend, Answer and File Motion to Strike 41 is GRANTED. Defendant's deadline to amend is continued to 5/5/2017; plaintiff's deadline for a motion to strike is continued to 5/12/2017. (cw)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
41 |
Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Amend Answer to Complaint (Discovery) 8, STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff Ken Redman's Motion to Strike Defendant's Affirmative Defenses filed by Defendant US Bank National Association. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Enlarging Time to Amend Answer and File Motion to Strike Defendant's Affirmative Defenses)(Mahdavi, Golareh) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
40 |
Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: 4/13/2017 |
Unknown Document Type |
|
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (See Order for details) re Stipulation for Protective Order 39 (vm)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
39 |
Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendant US Bank National Association. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Stipulated Protective Order)(Mahdavi, Golareh) (Entered: 04/12/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
38 |
Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition 35 Answer of Defendant U.S. Bank, N.A. to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Elan Financial Services, US Bank National Association.(Mahdavi, Golareh) (Entered: 04/07/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
37 |
Filed: 3/29/2017, Entered: 3/29/2017 |
Unknown Document Type |
|
ORDER by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell, re Stipulation to Continue Trial from March 14, 2018 to March 28, 2018 33 Jury Trial set for 3/28/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. (rfi)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
36 |
Filed: 3/29/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation Regarding Trial Date 33 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Continue - under Category - Stipulation. Other error(s) with document(s): Motion event utilized in docketing this filing; Clerk has terminated the Motion event created by documents 33 only and modified your docket entry to reflect the caption of document, which was just a Stipulation. In the future, please use the SEARCH feature on the CM/ECF Menu Bar if you are unsure of the events to use. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (jp) (Entered: 03/29/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
35 |
Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by plaintiff Ken Redman (Attachments: # 1 proof of service)(Verdun, Andre) (Entered: 03/24/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
34 |
Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
Notice of Withdrawal of Amended Complaint/Petition 32 filed by plaintiff Ken Redman. (Attachments: # 1 proof of service)(Verdun, Andre) (Entered: 03/24/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
33 |
Filed: 3/23/2017, Entered: 3/23/2017 |
Unknown Document Type |
|
Stipulation Regarding Trial Date from March 14, 2018 to March 28, 2018 filed by plaintiff Ken Redman. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 proof of service) (Verdun, Andre). Modified on 3/29/2017 (jp).
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
32 |
Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
[THIS DOCUMENT IS HEREBY WITHDRAW PURSUANT TO NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL 34 DATED 3/24/2017] - SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by plaintiff Ken Redman (Attachments: # 1 proof of service)(Verdun, Andre). Modified on 3/29/2017 (jp). (Entered: 03/16/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
31 |
Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: 3/15/2017 |
Unknown Document Type |
|
ORDER by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell, re Stipulation to Amend/Correct, IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff may file the proposed Second Amended Complaint [Dkt. Not. 25-1] within three (3) days of the execution of this Order. The MOTION SEEKING LEAVE TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT (filed 2/28/2017) 25 is DENIED as moot and the hearing set for April 3, 2017 is VACATED 30, The deadlines and hearings originally scheduled have been rescheduled( Motions in Limine to be filed by 1/30/2018., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/30/2018., Last date to conduct settlement conference is 1/16/2018., Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/13/2018 at 03:00 PM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell., Jury Trial set for 3/14/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell., Motions in Limine set for hearing on 2/27/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. (rfi)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
30 |
Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
STIPULATION to Amend - Stipulation to Modify Schedule of Trial and Pretrial Dates and Allow for Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant US Bank National Association. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order to Modify Schedule of Trial and Pretrial Dates and Allow for Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint)(Mahdavi, Golareh) (Entered: 03/14/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
29 |
Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: 3/13/2017 |
Unknown Document Type |
|
Opposition Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint 25 filed by Defendant US Bank National Association. (Mahdavi, Golareh)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
28 |
Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
ORDER RE: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The Court conferred with counsel regarding the status of the case. The Court sets a further telephonic status conference on June 6, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. re: Text Only Scheduling Notice 22 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vm) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 03/07/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
27 |
Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: 3/1/2017 |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: EX PARTE DEPOSITION APPLICATION by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (See Minute Order for details) denying 24 Ex Parte Application for Order (vm)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
26 |
Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: 3/1/2017 |
Unknown Document Type |
|
Opposition Opposition re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Leave for Court approval for remote deposition pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(4) 24 filed by Defendants Elan Financial Services, US Bank National Association. (Mahdavi, Golareh)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
25 |
Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: None |
Leave to File Document |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
25 |
Filed: 2/28/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint filed by plaintiff Ken Redman. Motion set for hearing on 4/3/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Second Amended Complaint, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 proof of service) (Verdun, Andre) (Entered: 02/28/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
24 |
Filed: 2/28/2017, Entered: 2/28/2017 |
Unknown Document Type |
|
EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Leave for Court approval for remote deposition pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(4) filed by plaintiff Ken Redman. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 proof of service)(Verdun, Andre)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
23 |
Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Ronald Wilcox on behalf of Plaintiff Ken Redman (Attorney Ronald Wilcox added to party Ken Redman(pty:pla))(Wilcox, Ronald) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
22 |
Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
ORDER RE: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The Court conferred with counsel regarding the status of the case. The Court sets a further telephonic status conference on March 7, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vm) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 01/12/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
21 |
Filed: 12/28/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Telephone Conference set for January 12, 2017 at 10:00 AM. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vm) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 12/28/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
20 |
Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: 12/19/2016 |
Unknown Document Type |
|
ORDER FOR CIVIL JURY TRIAL SEE LAST PAGE FOR PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. Trial Estimate: 2-7 days. Amended Pleadings due by 3/20/2017. Discovery cut-off is 9/4/2017. Motions in Limine to be filed by 10/2/2017. Last date for hearing on motions is 9/11/2017 at 1:30 pm. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/2/2017. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 9/18/2017. Motions in Limine set for hearing on 10/30/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/16/2017 at 03:00 PM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. Jury Trial set for 11/14/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. (rfi)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
19 |
Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: 12/19/2016 |
Unknown Document Type |
|
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 1 by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. Case ordered to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner for Settlement Conference. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 9/18/2017. (rfi)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
18 |
Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: 12/19/2016 |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MINUTES OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. Court conducts Scheduling Conference. Counsel inform the Court of their selection for a settlement procedure pursuant to Local Rule 16-14. The Court orders that any settlement discussions shall be completed no later than 9/18/2017. Court Reporter: Myra Ponce. (rfi)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
17 |
Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), SECOND AMENDED ANSWER OF DEFENDANT U.S. BANK, N.A. TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Defendant US Bank National Association.(Mahdavi, Golareh) (Entered: 12/14/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
16 |
Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: 12/13/2016 |
Unknown Document Type |
|
EXHIBIT Filed filed by Defendants Elan Financial Services, US Bank National Association. Exhibit A to Joint Rule 26(f) Report as to Report 15 . (Mahdavi, Golareh)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
15 |
Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: None |
Report |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
15 |
Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) filed by Defendants Elan Financial Services, US Bank National Association. (Mahdavi, Golareh) (Entered: 12/12/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
14 |
Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), AMENDED ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS U.S. BANK, N.A. AND ELAN FINANCIAL SERVICES TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Defendants Elan Financial Services, US Bank National Association.(Mahdavi, Golareh) (Entered: 11/23/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
13 |
Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: 11/4/2016 |
Unknown Document Type |
|
ORDER RE MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. The Court finds good cause exists for the parties stipulation and on that basis the foregoing stipulation 12 is approved and is so ordered that Plaintiff deadline to file a motion to strike under FRCP 12(f) and Defendants deadline to amend their answer under FRCP 15(a)(1)(B) shall be continued to 11/25/2016. (jp)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
12 |
Filed: 11/3/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses and Amend Defendants' Answer, STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Amend filed by Defendants Elan Financial Services, US Bank National Association. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Mahdavi, Golareh) (Entered: 11/03/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
11 |
Filed: 10/24/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
NOTICE TO PARTIES by District Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. Effective October 31, 2016, Judge O'Connell will be located at the 1st Street Courthouse, COURTROOM 7C on the 7th floor, located at 350 W. 1st Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 7C of the 1st Street Courthouse, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box outside the Clerk's Office on the 4th floor of the 1st Street Courthouse. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at Edward R. Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 10/24/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
10 |
Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
NOTICE of Change of address by Chase M Haslam attorney for Defendants Elan Financial Services, US Bank National Association. Changing attorneys address to Three Embarcadero Center, 7th Floor, San Francisco, CA 94111-4070. Filed by Defendants Elan Financial Services, US Bank National Association. (Haslam, Chase) (Entered: 10/19/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
9 |
Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: 10/18/2016 |
Unknown Document Type |
|
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. Scheduling Conference set for 12/19/2016 at 1:30 PM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. (cw)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
8 |
Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Elan Financial Services, US Bank National Association.(Mahdavi, Golareh) (Entered: 10/14/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
7 |
Filed: 9/27/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES upon filing of the complaint by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. (rfi) (Entered: 09/27/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6 |
Filed: 9/15/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Elan Financial Services answer now due 10/14/2016; US Bank National Association answer now due 10/14/2016, re Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendants Elan Financial Services; US Bank National Association.(Fetterly, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/15/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
5 |
Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: 9/12/2016 |
Unknown Document Type |
|
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
4 |
Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Beverly Reid OConnell and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (et) (Entered: 09/12/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
3 |
Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: 9/9/2016 |
Unknown Document Type |
|
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Elan Financial Services, US Bank National Association identifying U.S. Bankcorp as Corporate Parent. (Fetterly, Jonathan)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2 |
Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ventura County Superior Court, case number 56-2016-00484477-CU-BT-VTA with filing fee previously paid ($400.00 paid on 09/09/2016, receipt number 0973-18522803), filed by Defendants Elan Financial Services, US Bank National Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Jonathan G Fetterly added to party Elan Financial Services(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan G Fetterly added to party US Bank National Association(pty:dft))(Fetterly, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/09/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1 |
Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: 9/9/2016 |
Unknown Document Type |
|
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Elan Financial Services, US Bank National Association. (Fetterly, Jonathan)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Elan Financial Services, US Bank National Association., Does 1 through 50, inclusive. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Ken Redman. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 8/10/2016 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS ATTACHMENT #1] (et)
|
|
Request |
 |