Katrina Yvonne Palmer- Adversary Proceeding
Bankruptcy Case Indiana Southern Bankruptcy, Case No. 70-JJG-7
District Judge Jeffrey J. Graham, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 10, 2016 at 12:31 AM DT (5 years ago) SpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo C&F Finance Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Krisor and Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brooks J. Grainger +1 574 272 1000 +1 574 272 4303 bankruptcy@krisorlaw.com
v.
No Logo Katrina Yvonne Palmer, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Katrina Yvonne Palmer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Katrina Yvonne Palmer
Office of the United States Trustee Office of the United States Trustee, U.S. Trustee
Officially listed as "U.S. Trustee"
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None
Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time to File Corporate Owenership Statement AND Amend The Caption For The Adversary Complaint (re: Doc # 5). Attorney for Plaintiff C&F Finance Company must distribute this order. Time to file extended to 1/15/2015. (lat) (Entered: 01/05/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/30/2014, Entered: None
    Motion to Extend Time to File Corporate Owenership Statement AND AMEND THE CAPTION FOR THE ADVERSARY COMPLAINT filed by Brooks J. Grainger on behalf of Plaintiff C&F Finance Company (Grainger, Brooks) CORRECTION: Clarifying text added in all capitals. Modified on 1/5/2015 (esd). (Entered: 12/30/2014) [Granted by #6 CMECF.widget.DocLink('documentKcaseidV645358Kde_seq_numV24Kdm_idV30999324Kdoc_numV6Kpdf_headerV1');]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None
      Deficiency Notice Issued re: Complaint (re: Doc # 1). Corporate Ownership Statement due by 01/02/2015. (esd) (Entered: 12/19/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None
        Deficiency Notice Issued re: Complaint (re: Doc # 1). Deficiency to be cured by 1/2/2015. (esd) (Entered: 12/19/2014) [Notice canceled on 12/19/2014 by esd]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None
          Appearance filed by Brooks J. Grainger on behalf of Plaintiff C&F Finance Company. (Grainger, Brooks) (Entered: 12/18/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None
            Adversary case 14-50238. Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) C&F Finance Company against Defendant(s) Katrina Yvonne Palmer [11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)]. (Grainger, Brooks) (Entered: 12/18/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 7 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?