STRAUGHTER v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:14-cv-00565
District Judge Charles F. Lettow, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 12, 2016 at 2:21 AM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo WILLIAM E. STRAUGHTER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by WILLIAM E. STRAUGHTER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM E. STRAUGHTER
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
  Entries (3) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Charles F. Lettow (vro) (Entered: 07/02/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: None
    MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by WILLIAM E. STRAUGHTER. Service: 7/2/2014.Response due by 7/21/2014.(vro) (Entered: 07/02/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Sealed Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: None
      **SEALED**COMPLAINT against USA (AF) (Copy Served Electronically on Department of Justice), filed by WILLIAM E. STRAUGHTER.Answer due by 9/2/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(vro) (Entered: 07/02/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 108 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?