Lewis et al v. Secret Service et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Southern District Court, Case No. 3:16-cv-00970
District Judge Staci M. Yandle, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 13, 2017 at 4:10 PM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Obama, Barack Hussein Obama, Barack Hussein, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Barack Obama"
United States of America President, United States of America, January 20, 2009 - January 20, 2017

Toggle Switch Represented by Obama, Barack Hussein

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA
Federal Bureau of Investigation Federal Bureau of Investigation, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "F.B.I."

Toggle Switch Represented by Federal Bureau of Investigation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space F.B.I.
Clinton, Hillary Rodham Clinton, Hillary Rodham, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Hillary Clinton"

Toggle Switch Represented by Clinton, Hillary Rodham

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space HILLARY CLINTON
No Logo James D Lewis, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by B-52327

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James D. Lewis
No Logo Ted Cruz, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Ted Cruz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ted Cruz
v.
No Logo Bruce Rauner, Defendant
Snowden, Edward Snowden, Edward, Defendant
Officially listed as "Edward Snowden"
No Logo U.s. Secret Service, Defendant
Officially listed as "Secret Service"
United States Department of Homeland Security United States Department of Homeland Security, Defendant
Officially listed as "U.S. Homeland Security"
No Logo Unknown Party, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1346
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 5 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by James D Lewis. (cds) (Entered: 09/20/2016)
    LREF
    Blank 4 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER: Plaintiff has filed a Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis ("IFP") in this case (see Doc. 2 ), but has failed to provide the necessary prisoner trust fund account information as required by the PLRA to determine whether the inmate is entitled to proceed without prepaying fees and costs. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1), the Court must review the prisoner trust fund account statement for the 6 month period immediately preceding the filing of this action. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiff shall provide the Clerk of Court with the attached certification completed by the Trust Fund Officer at the facility and a copy of his/her trust fund account statement (or institutional equivalent) for the period 2/1/2016 to 8/29/2016 no later than 45 days from the date of this order. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of this action for failure to comply with an Order of this Court. Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). See generally Ladien v. Astrachan, 128 F.3d 1051 (7th Cir. 1997); Johnson v. Kamminga, 34 F.3d 466 (7th Cir. 1994). The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this Order and the certification form to the Trust Fund Officer at Dixon Correctional Center. (Action due by 10/24/2016). Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 9/7/2016. (tjk) (Entered: 09/07/2016)
      LREF
      Blank 3 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      Letter from USDC/SDIL to Plaintiff Lewis informing him of case number. (Attachments: # 1 Consent to Magistrate Judge) (jaj) (Entered: 08/29/2016)
        LREF
        Blank 2 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by James D Lewis. (jaj) (Entered: 08/29/2016)
          LREF
          Blank 1 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Barack Obama, F.B.I., Hillary Clinton, James D Lewis, Ted Cruz.(jaj) (Entered: 08/29/2016)
            LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 111 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?