Litwin v. Monster Worldwide Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-11844
District Judge William Young, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 7, 2017 at 11:26 PM DT (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Harold Litwin, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Matorin Law Office LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mitchell J. Matorin +1 781 453 0100 +1 888 628 6746 mmatorin@matorinlawoffice.com
v.
No Logo Edmund P. Giambastiani, Jr., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey Louis Benner +1 212 698 3500 +1 212 698 3599 jeffrey.benner@dechert.com
Space Timothy C. Blank +1 617 728 7100 +1 617 426 6567 timothy.blank@dechert.com
Space Linda Ceilia Goldstein +1 212 841 1000 +1 212 841 1010 linda.goldstein@dechert.com
Space Joshua David Hess +1 415 262 4500 +1 415 262 4555 joshua.hess@dechert.com
Space Kate M. O'Keeffe +1 617 654 8679 kate.o'keeffe@dechert.com
No Logo Gillian Munson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey Louis Benner +1 212 698 3500 +1 212 698 3599 jeffrey.benner@dechert.com
Space Timothy C. Blank +1 617 728 7100 +1 617 426 6567 timothy.blank@dechert.com
Space Linda Ceilia Goldstein +1 212 841 1000 +1 212 841 1010 linda.goldstein@dechert.com
Space Joshua David Hess +1 415 262 4500 +1 415 262 4555 joshua.hess@dechert.com
Space Kate M. O'Keeffe +1 617 654 8679 kate.o'keeffe@dechert.com
No Logo James P. McVeigh, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey Louis Benner +1 212 698 3500 +1 212 698 3599 jeffrey.benner@dechert.com
Space Timothy C. Blank +1 617 728 7100 +1 617 426 6567 timothy.blank@dechert.com
Space Linda Ceilia Goldstein +1 212 841 1000 +1 212 841 1010 linda.goldstein@dechert.com
Space Joshua David Hess +1 415 262 4500 +1 415 262 4555 joshua.hess@dechert.com
Space Kate M. O'Keeffe +1 617 654 8679 kate.o'keeffe@dechert.com
No Logo Jeffrey F. Rayport, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey Louis Benner +1 212 698 3500 +1 212 698 3599 jeffrey.benner@dechert.com
Space Timothy C. Blank +1 617 728 7100 +1 617 426 6567 timothy.blank@dechert.com
Space Linda Ceilia Goldstein +1 212 841 1000 +1 212 841 1010 linda.goldstein@dechert.com
Space Joshua David Hess +1 415 262 4500 +1 415 262 4555 joshua.hess@dechert.com
Space Kate M. O'Keeffe +1 617 654 8679 kate.o'keeffe@dechert.com
No Logo John Gaulding, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey Louis Benner +1 212 698 3500 +1 212 698 3599 jeffrey.benner@dechert.com
Space Timothy C. Blank +1 617 728 7100 +1 617 426 6567 timothy.blank@dechert.com
Space Linda Ceilia Goldstein +1 212 841 1000 +1 212 841 1010 linda.goldstein@dechert.com
Space Joshua David Hess +1 415 262 4500 +1 415 262 4555 joshua.hess@dechert.com
Space Kate M. O'Keeffe +1 617 654 8679 kate.o'keeffe@dechert.com
No Logo Monster Worldwide, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey Louis Benner +1 212 698 3500 +1 212 698 3599 jeffrey.benner@dechert.com
Space Timothy C. Blank +1 617 728 7100 +1 617 426 6567 timothy.blank@dechert.com
Space Linda Ceilia Goldstein +1 212 841 1000 +1 212 841 1010 linda.goldstein@dechert.com
Space Joshua David Hess +1 415 262 4500 +1 415 262 4555 joshua.hess@dechert.com
Space Kate M. O'Keeffe +1 617 654 8679 kate.o'keeffe@dechert.com
No Logo Roberto Tunioli, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey Louis Benner +1 212 698 3500 +1 212 698 3599 jeffrey.benner@dechert.com
Space Timothy C. Blank +1 617 728 7100 +1 617 426 6567 timothy.blank@dechert.com
Space Linda Ceilia Goldstein +1 212 841 1000 +1 212 841 1010 linda.goldstein@dechert.com
Space Joshua David Hess +1 415 262 4500 +1 415 262 4555 joshua.hess@dechert.com
Space Kate M. O'Keeffe +1 617 654 8679 kate.o'keeffe@dechert.com
No Logo Timothy T. Yates, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey Louis Benner +1 212 698 3500 +1 212 698 3599 jeffrey.benner@dechert.com
Space Timothy C. Blank +1 617 728 7100 +1 617 426 6567 timothy.blank@dechert.com
Space Linda Ceilia Goldstein +1 212 841 1000 +1 212 841 1010 linda.goldstein@dechert.com
Space Joshua David Hess +1 415 262 4500 +1 415 262 4555 joshua.hess@dechert.com
Space Kate M. O'Keeffe +1 617 654 8679 kate.o'keeffe@dechert.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a)
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 12 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Harold Litwin (Matorin, Mitchell) (Entered: 11/09/2016)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: allowed re 10 Stipulation filed by John Gaulding, Edmund P. Giambastiani, Jr., Jeffrey F. Rayport, Roberto Tunioli, Gillian Munson, Timothy T. Yates, James P. McVeigh, Monster Worldwide Inc. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 10/03/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      STIPULATION Regarding Date for Responsive Pleading by John Gaulding, Edmund P. Giambastiani, Jr, James P. McVeigh, Monster Worldwide Inc., Gillian Munson, Jeffrey F. Rayport, Roberto Tunioli, Timothy T. Yates. (Blank, Timothy) (Entered: 09/29/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Joshua D.N. Hess, Jeffrey Benner, and Linda C. Goldstein. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 09/15/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Linda C. Goldstein Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6290219 by John Gaulding, Edmund P. Giambastiani, Jr, James P. McVeigh, Monster Worldwide Inc., Gillian Munson, Jeffrey F. Rayport, Roberto Tunioli, Timothy T. Yates. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Blank, Timothy) (Entered: 09/14/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jeffrey Benner Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6290198 by John Gaulding, Edmund P. Giambastiani, Jr, James P. McVeigh, Monster Worldwide Inc., Gillian Munson, Jeffrey F. Rayport, Roberto Tunioli, Timothy T. Yates. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Blank, Timothy) (Entered: 09/14/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Joshua D.N. Hess Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6290151 by John Gaulding, Edmund P. Giambastiani, Jr, James P. McVeigh, Monster Worldwide Inc., Gillian Munson, Jeffrey F. Rayport, Roberto Tunioli, Timothy T. Yates. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Blank, Timothy) (Entered: 09/14/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                NOTICE of Appearance by Kate M. O'Keeffe on behalf of John Gaulding, Edmund P. Giambastiani, Jr, James P. McVeigh, Monster Worldwide Inc., Gillian Munson, Jeffrey F. Rayport, Roberto Tunioli, Timothy T. Yates (O'Keeffe, Kate) (Entered: 09/14/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy C. Blank on behalf of John Gaulding, Edmund P. Giambastiani, Jr, James P. McVeigh, Monster Worldwide Inc., Gillian Munson, Jeffrey F. Rayport, Roberto Tunioli, Timothy T. Yates (Blank, Timothy) (Entered: 09/14/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 09/12/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 09/12/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank 1 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: 9/9/2016 Complaint
                        COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-6283972 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Harold Litwin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit PSLRA Certification, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 JS45)(Matorin, Mitchell) (Entered: 09/09/2016)
                          LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 180 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?