USA v. Aruffo
Criminal Case California Southern District Court, Case No. 3:14-cr-01924

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 17, 2017 at 12:04 AM DT (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Edmond A Aruffo, Defendant (1)

Toggle Switch Represented by Dentons (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/17/2017, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Christian D Humphreys +1 619 236 1414 +1 619 232 8311 chris.humphreys@dentons.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary K Brucker, Jr. +1 619 233 1009 +1 619 233 8627 gary.brucker@lewisbrisbois.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (37) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Order to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Gary Brucker, Jr. is substituted in place of Christian Humphreys as counsel of record for Edmond A Aruffo. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 5/17/2017. (rlu) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz:Status Hearing re Counsel as to Edmond A Aruffo held on 5/17/2017 re 33 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Consent Order Granting Substitution of Attorney filed by Edmond A Aruffo ; granting 33 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Gary Brucker retained as to Edmond Aruffo; Attorney Christian D Humphreys terminated as to Edmond A Aruffo (1); Government's oral motion to continue sentencing hearing granted. Sentence With PSR continued to 1/31/2018 10:30 AM in Courtroom 15B before Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz. (Court Reporter/ECR James Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Mark Pletcher, AUSA; Patrick Hovakimian, AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Gary Brucker, RET). (no document attached) (rfm) (Entered: 05/17/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      NOTICE OF HEARING as to Defendant Edmond A Aruffo. Status Hearing set for 5/17/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15B before Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz. (no document attached) (rfm) (Entered: 05/09/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Patrick Hovakimian appearing for USA. (Hovakimian, Patrick)Attorney Patrick Hovakimian added to party USA(pty:pla) (rlu). (Entered: 04/10/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL in case as to Edmond A Aruffo. Judge Janis L. Sammartino is no longer assigned. Case randomly reassigned to Chief Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz for all further proceedings. Pending hearings previously set before the original Judge have been transferred to the newly assigned Judge. The new case number is 14cr1924 BTM. (no document attached) (jcj) (Entered: 03/28/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            MOTION to Substitute Attorney Consent Order Granting Substitution of Attorney by Edmond A Aruffo. (Brucker, Gary) (dxj). (Entered: 03/24/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              ORDER Continuing Sentencing Hearing as to Edmond A. Aruffo (1). Pursuant to joint motion, it is hereby ordered that the Sentencing Hearing in this matter be continued from January 27, 2017 to July 21, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. before Judge Janis L. Sammartino. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 12/8/2016.(kcm) (Entered: 12/08/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Joint MOTION to Continue Sentencing Hearing by Edmond A Aruffo. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Acknowledgement to Continue Sentencing Hearing)(Humphreys, Christian) (kcm). (Entered: 12/06/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  NOTICE of Change of Address by Christian D Humphreys (Humphreys, Christian) (kcm). (Entered: 08/30/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    ORDER granting 28 Motion to Continue as to Edmond A Aruffo (1). Pursuant to joint motion, it is hereby ordered that the Sentencing Hearing in this matter is continued from September 16, 2016 to January 27, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. before Judge Janis L. Sammartino. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/9/2016.(kcm) (Entered: 08/09/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Joint MOTION to Continue Sentencing Hearing by Edmond A Aruffo. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Acknowledgement to Continue Sentencing Hearing)(Humphreys, Christian) (kcm). (Entered: 08/08/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        ORDER Granting 26 Motion to Continue as to Edmond A Aruffo (1). Sentence With PSR reset for 9/16/2016 09:00 AM before Judge Janis L. Sammartino. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 12/4/2015.(jao) (Entered: 12/04/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Joint MOTION to Continue Sentencing Hearing by Edmond A Aruffo. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Acknowledgment to Continue Sentencing Hearing)(Humphreys, Christian) (jao). (Entered: 12/03/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            ***English. No Interpreter needed as to Edmond A Aruffo (no document attached) (nsp) (Entered: 11/25/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              ORDER Granting 23 Joint Motion to Continue as to Edmond A Aruffo (1). Sentence With PSR reset for 1/22/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Janis L. Sammartino. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 9/1/2015.(jao) (Entered: 09/01/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Joint MOTION to Continue Sentencing Hearing by Edmond A Aruffo. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Acknowledgment to Continue Sentencing Hearing)(Humphreys, Christian) (jao). (Entered: 08/31/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  NOTICE of Change of Firm Name and Counsel's Email Addresses by Edmond A Aruffo (Brucker, Gary) (aef). (Entered: 07/07/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    ORDER Granting 20 Joint Motion to Continue as to Edmond A Aruffo (1). Sentence With PSR reset for 9/25/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Janis L. Sammartino. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/14/2015.(jao) (Entered: 04/14/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Joint MOTION to Continue Sentencing Hearing by Edmond A Aruffo. (Attachments: # 1 Notice Acknowledgement, # 2 Proof of Service)(Humphreys, Christian) (jao). (Entered: 04/13/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        ORDER Granting 18 Motion to Continue as to Edmond A Aruffo (1). Sentence With PSR reset for 5/8/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Janis L. Sammartino. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 12/17/2014.(jao) (Entered: 12/17/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Joint MOTION to Continue Sentencing Hearing by Edmond A Aruffo. (Attachments: # 1 Notice Notice of Acknowledgement, # 2 Proposed Order)(Humphreys, Christian) Mailer sent re proposed orders on 12/17/2014 (jao). (Entered: 12/16/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            ORDER Granting 16 Motion to Continue as to Edmond A Aruffo (1). Sentence With PSR reset for 1/16/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Janis L. Sammartino. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 9/24/2014.(jao) (Entered: 09/24/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Joint MOTION to Continue Sentencing Hearing by Edmond A Aruffo. (Brucker, Gary)Attorney Gary K Brucker, Jr added to party Edmond A Aruffo(pty:dft) (jao). (Entered: 09/23/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                ABSTRACT OF ORDER Releasing Edmond A Aruffo re 14 Bond. (jao) (Entered: 09/23/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  P/S/ Bond Filed as to Edmond A Aruffo in amount of $ 40,000. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. (Document applicable to USA, Edmond A Aruffo.) (jao) (Entered: 09/23/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER ACCEPTING GUILTY PLEA as to count(s) one of the Information, as to Edmond A Aruffo, adopting 9 Findings and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 7/29/2014. (jao) (Entered: 07/29/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Mark W. Pletcher appearing for USA. (Pletcher, Mark)Attorney Mark W. Pletcher added to party USA(pty:pla) (jao). (Entered: 07/11/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Robert S Huie appearing for USA. (Huie, Robert)Attorney Robert S Huie added to party USA(pty:pla) (jao). (Entered: 07/11/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by USA of case(s) 13cr3781-JLS, 13cr3782-JLS, 13cr4287-JLS, 13cr4043-JLS, 14cr1354-JLS. (no low number order prepared) (jao) (Entered: 07/08/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge upon a Tendered Plea of Guilty as to Edmond A Aruffo: Recommending that the district judge accept the defendant's plea of guilty. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 7/3/2014. (jao) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              PLEA AGREEMENT as to Edmond A Aruffo. (jao) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                CONSENT TO RULE 11 PLEA before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford by Edmond A Aruffo. (jao) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Bond set for Edmond A Aruffo (1) $40,000 P/S secured by a trust deed on real property. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 7/3/2014. (jao) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    ABSTRACT OF ORDER self surrender after pleading guilty as to Edmond A Aruffo. (jao) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford: Deft Edmond A. Aruffo present. Initial Appearance as to Edmond A Aruffo held on 7/3/2014. Attorney Christian Humphreys makes a general appearance on behalf of Edmond A. Aruffo. Bond set as to Edmond A Aruffo (1) $40,000P/S. Arraignment on Information as to Edmond A Aruffo (1) Count 1 held on 7/3/2014. Not guilty plea entered. Change of Plea Hearing as to Edmond A Aruffo held on 7/3/2014. Plea Tendered by Edmond A Aruffo Guilty on count one(1) of the Information. Excludable(s) started as to Edmond A Aruffo: XT Interest of Justice 7/3/2014-10/3/2014. PSR Ordered. ( Sentence With PSR set for 10/3/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Janis L. Sammartino.) (CD# 7/3/2014 KSC1: 340-400). (Plaintiff Attorney Mark Pletcher and Robert Huie, AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Christian Humphreys, ret). (no document attached) (mnb) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Edmond A Aruffo (mnb) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          INFORMATION as to Edmond A Aruffo (1) count(s) 1. (mnb)(av1). (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                            Statistics

                                                                            This case has been viewed 417 times.

                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                            Space
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                             
                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                            Need Password Help?