Ohr v. EFN OBT1 LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-09018

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 2, 2019 at 4:36 PM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Peter Sung Ohr, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by National Labor Relations Board

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Augustine Schorsch +1 312 353 9778 michael.schorsch@nlrb.gov
v.
No Logo EFN OBT1 LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy Carl Moritz +1 312 558 1242 +1 312 807 3619 jeremy.moritz@ogletreedeakins.com
No Logo Nai Hiffman Asset Management, LLC, Defendant
No Logo North American Automotive Services, Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 160(1)
Nature of Suit 790 - Labor: Other
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Civil case terminated. This action is hereby dismissed without prejudice. The 10/20/2016 status date is vacated.Mailed notice (srn, ) (Entered: 10/14/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Peter Sung Ohr (Schorsch, Michael) (Entered: 10/14/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:At the request of counsel, the 10/13/2016 status date is vacated and reset for 10/20/2016 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (srn, ) (Entered: 10/12/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: 10/11/2016 Unknown Document Type
        MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Defendants' motion for extension of time to 10/18/2016 to answer or otherwise plead 10 is granted. No appearance is required on 10/13/2016. Mailed notice (srn, )
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          NOTICE of Motion by Jeremy Carl Moritz for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer 10 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 10/13/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Moritz, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/10/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/10/2016, Entered: 10/10/2016 Unknown Document Type
            MOTION by Defendant EFN OBT1 LLC for extension of time to file answer - DEFENDANT EFN OBT1, LLC'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ANSWER TO COMPLAINT - (Moritz, Jeremy)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant EFN OBT1 LLC by Jeremy Carl Moritz (Moritz, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/10/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                NOTICE of Motion by Michael Augustine Schorsch for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, 7 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 10/13/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Schorsch, Michael) (Entered: 10/07/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: 10/7/2016 Unknown Document Type
                  MOTION by Plaintiff Peter Sung OhrMotion to Try Petition for Section 10(j) Preliminary Injunction on Basis of ALJ Hearing Transcript (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Brief in Support of Motion to Try Petition on Basis of ALJ Hearing Transcript, # 2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service of Petitioner's Motion, Brief in Support, and Notice, # 3 Notice of Filing Notice of Motion)(Schorsch, Michael)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    SUMMONS Returned executed as to North American Automotive Services Inc on 9/20/2016, answer due 10/11/2016. (Schorsch, Michael) (Docket Text Modified by the Clerk's Office on 9/30/2016) (sxn, ). (Entered: 09/29/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      SUMMONS Returned executed as to NAI Hiffman on 9/20/2016, answer due 10/11/2016 (Schorsch, Michael) (Docket Text Modified by the Clerk's Office on 9/30/2016) (sxn, ). (Entered: 09/29/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        SUMMONS Returned executed as to EFN OBT1 LLC on 9/20/2016, answer due 10/11/2016.(Schorsch, Michael) (Docket Text Modified by the Clerk's Office on 9/30/2016) (sxn, ). (Entered: 09/29/2016)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Peter Sung Ohr by Michael Augustine Schorsch. (sxn, ) (Entered: 09/19/2016)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            CIVIL Cover Sheet. (sxn, ) Modified on 9/19/2016 (sxn, ). (Entered: 09/19/2016)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: None Complaint
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                PETITION for preliminary injunction under section 10(j) of the National Labor Relations Act filed by Peter Sung Ohr (Exhibits). (sxn, ) Modified on 9/19/2016 (sxn, ). (Entered: 09/19/2016)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants EFN OBT1 LLC, Nai Hiffman Asset Management, LLC, North American Automotive Services, Inc. (pg, )
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 19 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?