Grace Solis v. CitiMortgage, Inc., et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit, Case No. 16-14862

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 26, 2016 at 3:53 PM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109190430 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Appellee's Brief filed by Appellee CitiMortgage, Inc.. (ECF: Donald Mihokovich)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109176500 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Supplemental Appendix [1 VOLUMES] filed by Appellee CitiMortgage, Inc.. (ECF: Donald Mihokovich)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109156881 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Appendix filed [1 VOLUMES - 2 sets] by Party Grace Solis. Service date: 09/06/2016 US mail - Attorney for Appellees: Mihokovich, Roach; email - Attorney for Appellees: Mihokovich, Roach.
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109149551 Filed: 9/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Appellant's brief filed by Grace Solis. Service date: 08/30/2016 [16-14862] Attorney for Appellee: Mihokovich - email; Attorney for Appellee: Roach - email.
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109126457 Filed: 8/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Donald Mihokovich for CitiMortgage, Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). (ECF: Donald Mihokovich)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109120501 Filed: 8/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Donald A. Mihokovich for CitiMortgage, Inc. (ECF: Donald Mihokovich)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109101077 Filed: 8/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Grace Solis.
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109065377 Filed: 7/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Grace Solis on 07/06/2016. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 08/16/2016. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's CIP Due on or before 07/27/2016 as to Appellant Grace Solis
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 73 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?