Randy Coley v. DIRECTV, Inc.
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 16-1920

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 22, 2017 at 4:17 AM ST (4.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3490 - Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (32) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 51 Filed: 1/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice issued re: status report. [16-1920, 16-1943, 16-1944, 16-1946] (KH)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    DOCUMENT - Attached are the documents that were sent from the Delaware Supreme Court in regards the certify question to state court by Doris Adkins, Delaware Supreme Court. [999997659] [16-1920, 16-1943, 16-1944, 16-1946] (KH)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      DOCUMENT - Attached are the documents that were sent from the Delaware Supreme Court in regards the certify question to state court-by Doris Adkins, Delaware Supreme Court. [999997655] [16-1920, 16-1943, 16-1944, 16-1946] (KH)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        COURT ORDER filed [999991717] granting Motion to certify question to state court in Case Nos. 16-1920, 16-1943, 16-1944, 16-1946 [37]; granting Motion to dismiss appeal pursuant to FRAP 42(b) in Case No. 16-2013 [44]. Copies to all parties. [16-1920, 16-1943, 16-1944, 16-1946, 16-2013] (KH)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          RESPONSE/ANSWER by DIRECTV, Incorporated to notice requesting response [999980289-2], Motion to dismiss appeal pursuant to FRAP 42(b) [44]. Nature of response: in opposition. [16-2013] John Jamnback
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            REPLY by Randy Coley in 16-1920 to Motion to certify question to state court [37].. [16-1920, 16-1943, 16-1944, 16-1946, 16-2013] Patrick Jordan
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              MOTION by Appellant South Raleigh Air, LLC to dismiss appeal pursuant to FRAP 42(b) [44]. Date and method of service: 12/02/2016 ecf. [999980098] [16-2013] John Bryant
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                NOTICE by Appellant Randy Coley in 16-1920 that a reply will be filed.[999977290].. [16-1920, 16-1943, 16-1944, 16-1946, 16-2013] Patrick Jordan
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  AFFIDAVIT by Appellee DIRECTV, Incorporated in 16-1920, 16-1943, 16-1944, 16-1946, 16-2013 re: Appellee DIRECTV's Opposition to Appellant Randy Coley's Motion for Certification of Four Issues to the Delaware Supreme Court. [999976436] [16-1920, 16-1943, 16-1944, 16-1946, 16-2013] John Jamnback
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    RESPONSE/ANSWER by DIRECTV, Incorporated in 16-1920, 16-1943, 16-1944, 16-1946, 16-2013 to Motion to certify question to state court [37], notice requesting response [38]. Nature of response: in opposition. [16-1920, 16-1943, 16-1944, 16-1946, 16-2013] John Jamnback
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      ORDER filed [999923619] consolidating case 16-2013 with 16-1920(L), 16-1943, 16-1944, and 16-1946. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Jeremy E. Roller, Brian Adam Scotti, Scott T. Wilsdon. [16-1920, 16-1943, 16-1944, 16-1946, 16-2013] (KH)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed for Sonia Ferris in 16-1920, 16-1943, 16-1944, 16-1946. Identify by proceeding and date all transcript ordered from this court reporter: 3/7/12 and 10/18/12 Motions Hearings. Names of all parties ordering transcript from this reporter: Kimberly Coley.. Originating case number: 5:11-cv-00048-MFU. Transcript due from Sonia Ferris, Official Court Reporter on 11/08/2016. [16-1920, 16-1943, 16-1944, 16-1946] (DL)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Kimberly Coley for Sonia Ferris. [16-1944] James O'Keeffe
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant Randy Coley in 16-1920, 16-1943. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999922174] [16-1920, 16-1943] Patrick Jordan
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed for Bridget Dickert in 16-1920, 16-1943, 16-1944, 16-1946. Identify by proceeding and date all transcript ordered from this court reporter: receiver hearing, 8/3/2016. Names of all parties ordering transcript from this reporter: Randy Coley.. Originating case number: 5:11-cv-00048-MFU. Transcript due from Bridget Dickert, Official Court Reporter on 11/07/2016. [16-1920, 16-1943, 16-1944, 16-1946] (CP)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Corrected TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Randy Coley in 16-1920, 16-1943 for. [16-1920, 16-1943, 16-1944, 16-1946] Patrick Jordan
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant Kimberly Coley. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999921727] [16-1944] James O'Keeffe
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by James J. O'Keeffe for Kimberly Coley.[999921725] [16-1944] James O'Keeffe
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Docket correction requested from Mr. Robert Ward Shaw for Randy Coley in 16-1920. Mailed to: Jeremy E. Roller, Brian Adam Scotti, Scott T. Wilsdon. [16-1920, 16-1943, 16-1944, 16-1946] (KH)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant Its Thundertime, LLC in 16-1946. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999921114] [16-1920, 16-1943, 16-1944, 16-1946] John Bryant
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by John Walter Bryant for Its Thundertime, LLC in 16-1946.[999921109] [16-1920, 16-1943, 16-1944, 16-1946] John Bryant
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Patrick T. Jordan for Randy Coley in 16-1920, 16-1943.[999919517] [16-1920, 16-1943] Robert Shaw
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellant Randy Coley. [16-1920] Robert Shaw
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee DIRECTV, Incorporated in 16-1920, 16-1943, 16-1944, 16-1946. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999919501] [16-1920, 16-1943, 16-1944, 16-1946] John Jamnback
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Robert Shaw for Randy Coley in 16-1920, 16-1943.[999918490] [16-1920, 16-1943] Robert Shaw
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by John H. Jamnback for DIRECTV, Incorporated in 16-1920, 16-1943, 16-1944, 16-1946.[999913893] [16-1920, 16-1943, 16-1944, 16-1946] John Jamnback
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      ORDER filed [999913372] consolidating case 16-1943, 16-1944, 16-1946 with 16-1920. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Jeremy E. Roller, Scott T. Wilsdon, Brian A. Scottie, Jason G. Moyers. [16-1920, 16-1943, 16-1944, 16-1946] (KH)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [999913352-2] case docketed Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 5:11-cv-00048-MFU. Mailed to: Jason Guy Moyers, Jeremy E. Roller, Brian Adam Scotti, Scott T. Wilsdon. [16-1946] (KH)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [999913309-2] case docketed Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 5:11-cv-00048-MFU. Mailed to: Jeremy E. Roller, Brian Adam Scotti, Scott T. Wilsdon. [16-1944]--[Edited 08/18/2016 by KH] (KH)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [999913266-2] case docketed Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 5:11-cv-00048-MFU. Mailed to: Jeremy E. Roller, Brian Adam Scotti, Scott T. Wilsdon. [16-1943]--[Edited 08/18/2016 by KH] (KH)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case docketed Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 5:11-cv-00048-MFU. Mailed to: John Hugo Jamnback, Jeremy E. Roller, Brian Adam Scotti, Scott T. Wilsdon. [16-1920] (KH)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                Case docketed. Originating case number: 5:11-cv-00048-MFU. Case manager: KHancock. [16-1920] (KH)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                  Statistics

                                                                  This case has been viewed 179 times.

                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                  Space
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                   
                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                  Need Password Help?