LNV Corporation v. Catherine Gebhardt
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit, Case No. 14-5605

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 2, 2018 at 11:30 AM EST (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 4140 - Contract: Negotiable Instruments
  Entries (55) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006012582850 Filed: 12/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
**LOCKED**NOTIFICATION OF REVISED NOTICE OF CONSTITUTIONAL QUESTION filed by Catherine Gebhardt. Certificate of Service: 12/07/2015. (APPELLANT SENT IN REVISED NOTICE DUE TO TYPOGRAPHICAL ERRORS)--[Edited 12/09/2015 by JRH]--[Edited 12/09/2015 by JRH] (JRH)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6012582850 Filed: 12/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    **LOCKED**NOTIFICATION OF REVISED NOTICE OF CONSTITUTIONAL QUESTION filed by Catherine Gebhardt. Certificate of Service: 12/07/2015. (APPELLANT SENT IN REVISED NOTICE DUE TO TYPOGRAPHICAL ERRORS)--[Edited 12/09/2015 by JRH]--[Edited 12/09/2015 by JRH] (JRH)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6012582850 Filed: 12/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      **LOCKED**NOTIFICATION OF REVISED NOTICE OF CONSTITUTIONAL QUESTION filed by Catherine Gebhardt. Certificate of Service: 12/07/2015. (APPELLANT SENT IN REVISED NOTICE DUE TO TYPOGRAPHICAL ERRORS)--[Edited 12/09/2015 by JRH]--[Edited 12/09/2015 by JRH] (JRH)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006012396911 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        **LOCKED**APPELLEE BRIEF filed by Mr. Ronald G. Steen, Jr. for LNV Corporation. Certificate of Service:05/21/2015. Argument Request: waived. (CORRECTIONS NEEDED)--[Edited 05/21/2015 by JRH] (RGS)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6012396911 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          **LOCKED**APPELLEE BRIEF filed by Mr. Ronald G. Steen, Jr. for LNV Corporation. Certificate of Service:05/21/2015. Argument Request: waived. (CORRECTIONS NEEDED)--[Edited 05/21/2015 by JRH] (RGS)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6012396911 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            **LOCKED**APPELLEE BRIEF filed by Mr. Ronald G. Steen, Jr. for LNV Corporation. Certificate of Service:05/21/2015. Argument Request: waived. (CORRECTIONS NEEDED)--[Edited 05/21/2015 by JRH] (RGS)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              MANDATE ISSUED with no costs taxed. (JRH)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ORDER filed denying petition for en banc rehearing [57] filed by Catherine Gebhardt. Richard F. Suhrheinrich, Jeffrey S. Sutton, and Deborah L. Cook, Circuit Judges. (BLH)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/11/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  PETITION for en banc rehearing filed by Catherine Gebhardt. Certificate of Service: 12/08/2015. (BLH)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    CORRECTED NOTIFICATION OF REVISED NOTICE OF CONSTITUTIONAL QUESTION filed by Catherine Gebhardt. Certificate of Service: 12/09/2015. (JRH)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      TENDERED petition for rehearing en banc which is 4 days late. Received from Appellant Catherine Gebhardt. (BLH)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        ORDER filed: The motion to exceed the page limit is DENIED, and the district court's judgment is AFFIRMED, pursuant to FRAP 34(a)(2)(C), decision not for publication. Richard F. Suhrheinrich, Jeffrey S. Sutton and Deborah L. Cook, Circuit Judges. (JRH)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          ORDER filed: The motion for injunctive relief is DENIED. Alice M. Batchelder, Ronald Lee Gilman and David W. McKeague, Circuit Judges. (JRH)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            RESPONSE filed regarding a motion to stay injunction pending appeal, [49]; previously filed by Catherine Gebhardt in 14-5605. Response from Attorney Mr. Ronald G. Steen, Jr. for Appellee LNV Corporation Certificate of Service:10/22/2015. (RGS)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Emergency Appellant MOTION filed by Catherine Gebhardt for injunctive relief from enforcement of an unconstitutional Tennessee Eviction Law. Certificate of service:.(no date on document), deputy clerk.--[Edited 10/19/2015 by CB] (CB)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                REPLY filed by Catherine Gebhardt to appellees' response in opposition to appellants amendment to the brief . Certificate of Service: 08/31/2015. (JRH)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  RESPONSE in opposition filed to appellant's amendment to the brief [46]. Response from Attorney Mr. Ronald G. Steen, Jr. for Appellee LNV Corporation Certificate of Service:08/14/2015.--[Edited 09/01/2015 by JRH] (RGS)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Supplemental pleading filed. (AMENDMENT TO APPELLANT BRIEF). --[Edited 08/13/2015 by CB] (CB)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      RULING LETTER SENT granting motion to add amendment to brief [44] filed by Catherine Gebhardt.. (CB)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Appellant MOTION filed by Catherine Gebhardt to add an amendment to appellant brief. certificate of service: 08/10/2015. (CB)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          ORDER filed: The motions for reconsideration and to remand are DENIED. Deborah L. Cook, David W. McKeague and Raymond M. Kethledge, Circuit Judges. (JRH)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            NOTIFICATION OF CONSTITUTIONAL QUESTIONS filed by Catherine Gebhardt. Certificate of Service: 06/09/2015. (JRH)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              APPELLANT MOTION to Exceed 30 Page Limit on Appellant's Notice of Constitutional Questions filed by Catherine Gebhardt. Certificate of service: 06/09/2015. (JRH)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                EMERGENCY MOTION TO REMAND TO DISTRICT COURT for ajudication of appellant's unajudicated exparte application to vacate summary judgment for obstruction of justice and to quash and recall the writ filed on 4/22/15 filed by Catherine Gebhardt. Certificate of service: 06/09/2015. (JRH)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  EMERGENCY MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION of previous order issued 6/8/15 filed by Catherine Gebhardt. Certificate of service: 06/09/2015. (JRH)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    REPLY in opposition to Appellee's response to appellant's Emergency Motion to Stay the Execution of the Writ filed by Catherine Gebhardt. Certificate of Service: 06/08/2015.--[Edited 06/09/2015 by JRH] (JRH)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      CORRESPONDENCE: Cover Letter and Envelope by Catherine Gebhardt. (JRH)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER filed: The motion to stay is DENIED. Deborah L. Cook, David W. McKeague and Raymond M. Kethledge, Circuit Judges. (JRH)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT filed regarding motion stay district court order previously filed by Catherine Gebhardt in 14-5605. Certificate of service:06/04/2015. (JRH)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            RESPONSE in opposition filed regarding a motion stay district court order, [32]; previously filed by Catherine Gebhardt in 14-5605. Response from Attorney Mr. Ronald G. Steen, Jr. for Appellee LNV Corporation Certificate of Service:06/04/2015. (RGS)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              EMERGENCY MOTION TO STAY district court order filed April 22, 2015 by Catherine Gebhardt. Certificate of service: 06/02/2015. (JRH)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                Copy of Writ of Execution from district court filed 4/22/15/ (RE 131) (JRH)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  CORRECTED APPELLEE BRIEF filed by Mr. Ronald G. Steen, Jr. for LNV Corporation. Certificate of Service:05/21/2015. Argument Request: waived.--[Edited 05/21/2015 by JRH] (RGS)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    BRIEFING LETTER SENT requesting brief corrections from Mr. Ronald G. Steen, Jr. for LNV Corporation due to the omission of the PAGE ID#'s in both the citations in the text of the brief and the range on the Designation of Relevant District Court Documents Page. The certificate of service was not dated as well. Corrections due: 06/02/2015. (JRH)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Catherine Gebhardt Copies:1. Certificate of Service:04/22/2015. Argument Request: Pro Se. (JRH)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting pro se briefing schedule: appellant brief due 04/22/2015; appellee brief due 05/26/2015. (JRH)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          ORDER filed: The motion to resume briefing is GRANTED, and a briefing schedule will issue separately. (JRH)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            RESPONSE in opposition filed regarding a motion to reconsider previous order dated 1/30/15 [23]; previously filed by Mr. Ronald G. Steen, Jr. Response from appellant, Catherine Gebhardt. Certificate of Service:02/12/2015. (JRH)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              MOTION filed by Mr. Ronald G. Steen, Jr. for LNV Corporation to reconsider order dated 01/30/2015. Certificate of Service: 02/02/2015. (RGS)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                ORDER filed: GRANTING appellant's motion to hold briefing in abeyance for sixty (60) days pending district court ruling on two motions filed on January 30, 2015 [21] filed by Catherine Gebhardt. (JRH)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  Appellant MOTION filed by Catherine Gebhardt to hold briefing in abeyance pending ruling on two motions filed in district court on January 30, 2015. Certificate of service: 01/29/2015. (JRH)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    RULING LETTER SENT GRANTING motion to extend time to file brief [19] filed by Catherine Gebhardt., resetting pro se briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 01/30/2015. appellee brief now due 03/04/2015. (JRH)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      Appellant MOTION filed by Catherine Gebhardt to extend time to file brief. Certificate of service: 01/15/2015. (JRH)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        BRIEFING LETTER SENT resetting pro se briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 01/13/2015. appellee brief now due 02/17/2015. (JRH)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          ORDER filed DENYING motion to hold briefing in abeyance [16] filed by Catherine Gebhardt. A revised briefing schedule shall separately issue.[Edited 12/02/2014 by JRH] (JRH)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            Appellant MOTION filed by Catherine Gebhardt to hold briefing in abeyance until outstanding motions are ruled on in district court. Certificate of service: 11/10/2014. (JRH)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting pro se briefing schedule: appellant brief due 11/20/2014; appellee brief due 12/23/2014. (JRH)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                Copy of District Court Order filed 10/8/14 granting in forma pauperis. (RE 118) (JRH)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Ronald G. Steen, Jr. for Appellee LNV Corporation Certificate of Service: 06/25/2014. (RGS)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    4A4 ORDER from district court filed. Order Filed: 06/16/2014 . (RE 91) (JRH)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/24/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      Copy of District Court Order filed 6/24/14 (RE 96) Overruling defendant's objection to the DENIAL of her motion to proceed IFP. ORDER giving ten days from today to resubmit an application to appeal IFP. New application due July 7, 2014. (JRH)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        RULING LETTER SENT to extend time to pay fee in the district court or file for IFP here in the court of appeals by June 30, 2014. (JRH)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          Copy of District Court Order filed 5/28/14 denying in forma pauperis.(RE 71) (JRH)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            APPEARANCE filed for Appellee LNV Corporation by Ronald G. Steen, Jr.. Certificate of Service: 05/20/2014. (RGS)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              4a4 Notice filed. Case held in abeyance. RE 65, Motion for Reconsideration filed 5/15/14. (JRH)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 128 times.

                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                Need Password Help?