SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION v. COOPERMAN et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Pennsylvania Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:16-cv-05043-JS
District Judge Juan R. Sanchez, presiding

Tags
Last Updated September 20, 2019 at 3:46 PM DT (1.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States Securities and Exchange Commission United States Securities and Exchange Commission, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Securities and Exchange Commission

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DAVID L. AXELROD +1 215 861 9625 axelrodd@sec.gov
Space JENNIFER CHUN BARRY +1 215 597 3100 Barryj@sec.gov
Space Bridget M. Fitzpatrick +1 202 551 4578 +1 202 772 9282 fitzpatrickbr@sec.gov
Space POLLY A. HAYES +1 215 861 9612 hayesp@sec.gov
Space ORESTE P. MCCLUNG +1 215 597 2873 mcclungo@sec.gov
Space Brendan P. McGlynn +1 215 597 3100 +1 215 597 2740 mcglynnb@sec.gov
Space MARK R. SYLVESTER +1 215 597 3100 sylvesterm@sec.gov
v.
No Logo LEON G. COOPERMAN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ballard Spahr LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space HENRY E. HOCKEIMER, JR. +1 215 864 8204 hockeimerh@ballardspahr.com
Space TIMOTHY MULLIGAN STENGEL +1 215 523 8304 stengelt@ballardspahr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Jonathan Kramer +1 212 373 3020 +1 212 492 0020 dkramer@paulweiss.com
Space Gregory Frederick Laufer +1 212 373 3000 +1 212 492 0441 glaufer@paulweiss.com
Space RICHARD TARLOWE +1 212 373 3000 +1 212 637 2387 rtarlowe@paulweiss.com
Space THEODORE V. WELLS +1 212 373 3089 +1 212 492 0089 twells@paulweiss.com
No Logo Omega Advisors, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ballard Spahr LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space HENRY E. HOCKEIMER, JR. +1 215 864 8204 hockeimerh@ballardspahr.com
Space TIMOTHY MULLIGAN STENGEL +1 215 523 8304 stengelt@ballardspahr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Jonathan Kramer +1 212 373 3020 +1 212 492 0020 dkramer@paulweiss.com
Space Gregory Frederick Laufer +1 212 373 3000 +1 212 492 0441 glaufer@paulweiss.com
Space THEODORE V. WELLS +1 212 373 3089 +1 212 492 0089 twells@paulweiss.com
  Entries (61) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: 6/26/2017 Order on Motion to Approve Consent Judgment
ORDER THAT THE PARTIES' JOINT [49] MOTION TO APPROVE CONSENT JUDGMENT IS GRANTED. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO MARK THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED ACTION AS CLOSED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 6/26/2017.6/26/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document 52 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: 5/22/2017 Order
    FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT LEON G. COOPERMAN THAT IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED THAT DEFENDANT IS PERMANENTLY RESTRAINED AND ENJOINED FROM VIOLATION, DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY, SECTION 10(b) OF THE SECURITIES EXCHANGE ACT OF 1934 AS OUTLINED HEREIN. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THIS COURT SHALL RETAIN JURISDICTION OF THIS MATTER FOR THE PURPOSES OF ENFORCING THE TERMS OF THIS FINAL JUDGMENT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 5/22/17. 5/22/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gs)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: 5/22/2017 Order
      FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT OMEGA ADVISORS, INC. THAT IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED THAT DEFENDANT IS PERMANENTLY RESTRAINED AND ENJOINED FROM VIOLATION, DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY, SECTION 10(b) OF THE SECURITIES EXCHANGE ACT OF 1934 AS OUTLINED HEREIN. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THIS COURT SHALL RETAIN JURISDICTION OF THIS MATTER FOR THE PURPOSES OF ENFORCING THE TERMS OF THIS FINAL JUDGMENT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 5/22/17. 5/22/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gs)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: 5/22/2017 order on motion to vacate
        ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF THE PARTIES JOINT MOTION TO VACATE [48], IT IS ORDERED THE PARTIES' JOINT MOTION IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THE PORTION OF THE 3/20/17 ORDER DISMISSING THE SECOND AND THIRD CLAIMS FOR RELIEF IS HEREBY VACATED AND THE SECOND AND THIRD CLAIMS FOR RELIEF IN THE COMPLAINT ARE REINSTATED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 5/22/17.5/22/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gs)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: 5/18/2017, Terminated: 6/26/2017 Motion to Approve Consent Judgment
          Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment filed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit Exhibit D, # (5) Certificate of Service)(FITZPATRICK, BRIDGET)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: 5/18/2017, Terminated: 5/22/2017 Motion to vacate
            Joint MOTION to Vacate the Portion of the March 20, 2017 Order Dismissing the Second and Third Claims for Relief of the Complaint for Lack of Venue filed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order, # (2) Certificate of Service)(BARRY, JENNIFER)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: 4/28/2017 Order on Motion to continue
              ORDER THAT THE PARTIES' JOINT [46] MOTION TO CONTINUE BRIEFING SCHEDULE IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE COMMISSION SHALL FILE AN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION ON OR BEFORE 5/30/2017. DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE A REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THE MOTION ON OR BEFORE 6/13/2017. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 4/28/2017.4/28/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: 4/28/2017, Terminated: 4/28/2017 Motion to Continue
                Joint MOTION to Continue filed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(SYLVESTER, MARK)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank  set motion and R&R deadlines/hearings
                  Set/Reset Deadlines as to [43] MOTION for Certificate of Appealability / Interlocutory Appeal. RESPONSES DUE BY 5/30/2017. REPLIES DUE BY 6/13/2017. (kp, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: 4/13/2017 Order on motion to amend/correct
                    ORDER THAT THE PARTIES' JOINT MOTION FOR AMENDED BRIEFING SCHEDULE (DOC. NO. [44]), IS GRANTED. THE COMMISSION SHALL FILE AN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION ON OR BEFORE 5/2/2017. DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE A REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THE MOTION ON OR BEFORE 5/16/2017. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 4/13/2017.4/13/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank  set motion and R&R deadlines/hearings
                      Set/Reset Deadlines as to [43] MOTION for Certificate of Appealability / Interlocutory Appeal. RESPONSES DUE BY 5/2/2017. REPLIES DUE BY 5/16/2017. (amas,)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: 4/12/2017, Terminated: 4/13/2017 motion to amend/correct
                        Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct [43] MOTION for Certificate of Appealability / Interlocutory Appeal (Briefing Schedule) filed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(SYLVESTER, MARK)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/4/2017, Entered: 4/4/2017, Terminated: 6/26/2017 Motion for Certificate of Appealability
                          MOTION for Certificate of Appealability / Interlocutory Appeal filed by LEON G. COOPERMAN, OMEGA ADVISORS, INC..Memorandum. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(KRAMER, DANIEL)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: 4/3/2017 Answer
                            ANSWER to [1] Complaint by LEON G. COOPERMAN, OMEGA ADVISORS, INC. Affirmative Defenses, Certificate of Service.(KRAMER, DANIEL) Modified on 4/5/2017 (tjd).
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: 3/20/2017 Notice of appearance
                              NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER REYNOLDS KELLY on behalf of SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION with Certificate of Service(KELLY, CHRISTOPHER)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: 3/20/2017 Scheduling Order
                                ORDER THAT A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 10/30/2017 AT 11:00 AM IN COURTROOM 11A BEFORE HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ. A TELEPHONE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 10/11/2017 AT 03:00 PM BEFORE HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ. DISCOVERY DUE BY 8/15/2017. DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS ARE DUE BY 9/20/2017. MOTIONS IN LIMINE ARE DUE BY 10/18/2017. PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 10/26/2017. DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 10/26/2017. THE TRIAL POOL IS SET FOR 11/6/2017.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 3/20/2017. 3/20/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document 39 Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: 3/20/2017 Order (Memorandum and/or Opinion)
                                  ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO DISMISS IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE AN ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE 4/3/2017. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 3/20/2017. 3/20/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, ) (AS PER ORDER [50], THE SECOND AND THIRD CLAIMS ARE REINSTATED. Modified on 5/22/2017 (gs, ).
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: 3/20/2017 Memorandum and/or Opinion
                                    MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 3/20/2017. 3/20/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/24/2017, Entered: 2/24/2017 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                      Notice of Filing of Official Transcript with Certificate of Service re [36] Transcript - PDF,, 2/24/2017 Entered and Copies Emailed.(kp, )
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/24/2017, Entered: 2/24/2017 Transcript - PDFCourt Filing
                                        TRANSCRIPT of MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT held on 2/7/2017, before Judge SANCHEZ. Court Reporter/Transcriber ESR/WRITERS CRAMP TRANSCRIPTION SERVICE. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 3/17/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/27/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/25/2017. (kp, )
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: 2/13/2017 protective order
                                          STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 2/10/2017. 2/13/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: 2/8/2017 Motion Hearing
                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ Rule 16 and Oral Argument held on 2/7/17 (ti, )
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: 1/25/2017 Notice of appearance
                                              NOTICE of Appearance by BRIDGET M FITZPATRICK on behalf of SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION with Certificate of Service(FITZPATRICK, BRIDGET)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: 1/25/2017 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by DAVID L. AXELROD on behalf of SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service)(AXELROD, DAVID)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: 1/20/2017 Reply to Response to motion
                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re [17] MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by LEON G. COOPERMAN, OMEGA ADVISORS, INC.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Gregory F. Laufer, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Declaration of Susan Leong)(KRAMER, DANIEL)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/19/2017, Entered: 1/19/2017 Order Setting Hearing on Motion
                                                    ORDER THAT A RULE 16 CONFERENCE AND ORAL ARGUMENT ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS IS SET FOR 2/7/2017 10:00 AM IN COURTROOM BEFORE HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 1/19/2017. 1/19/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: 1/18/2017 order on motion for leave to file
                                                      ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' [28] MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE EXCESS PAGES IS GRANTED. DEFENDANTS MAY FILE A REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO DISMISS NOT TO EXCEED 15 PAGES.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 1/18/2017.1/18/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: 1/13/2017, Terminated: 1/18/2017 motion for leave to file
                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Excess of the Page Limitation Set Forth in The Court's Procedural Guidelines filed by LEON G. COOPERMAN, OMEGA ADVISORS, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(STENGEL, TIMOTHY)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: 1/6/2017 Declaration
                                                          Declaration re [26] Response in Opposition to Motion by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit, # (4) Exhibit, # (5) Exhibit)(SYLVESTER, MARK)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document 26 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: 1/6/2017 response in opposition to motion
                                                            Memorandum of Law in Opposition re [17] MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(SYLVESTER, MARK) Modified on 1/9/2017 (tjd).
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: 12/16/2016 Order
                                                            ORDER THAT THE JOINT REQUEST TO EXTEND THE DEADLINES IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS IS DUE BY 1/6/2017. DEFENDANTS' REPLY IN SUPPORT IS DUE BY 1/20/2017.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 12/16/2016. 12/16/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/15/2016, Entered: 12/15/2016 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                              ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S [23] MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE EXCESS PAGES IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFF MAY FILE A MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS NOT TO EXCEED TWENTY-TWO PAGES.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 12/15/2016.12/15/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: 12/13/2016, Terminated: 12/15/2016 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(SYLVESTER, MARK)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: 12/13/2016 Notice of appearance
                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by ORESTE P. MCCLUNG on behalf of SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION with Certificate of Service(MCCLUNG, ORESTE)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: 12/13/2016 Notice of appearance
                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by MARK R. SYLVESTER on behalf of SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION with Certificate of Service(SYLVESTER, MARK)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: 12/13/2016 Notice of appearance
                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by BRENDAN P. MCGLYNN on behalf of SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION with Certificate of Service(MCGLYNN, BRENDAN)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: 12/13/2016 Notice of appearance
                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by POLLY A. HAYES on behalf of SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION with Certificate of Service(HAYES, POLLY)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: 12/13/2016 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                          Notice of Appearance by JENNIEFER CHUN BARRY on behalf of SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. Certificate of Service. (BARRY, JENNIFER) Modified on 12/13/2016 (tjd).
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 17 Filed: 12/9/2016, Entered: 12/9/2016, Terminated: 3/20/2017 Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                                                            MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by LEON G. COOPERMAN, OMEGA ADVISORS, INC..Memorandum, Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum, # (2) Declaration of Gregory F. Laufer, # (3) Exhibit 1, # (4) Exhibit 2, # (5) Exhibit 3, # (6) Exhibit 4, # (7) Exhibit 5, # (8) Exhibit 6, # (9) Exhibit 7, # (10) Exhibit 8, # (11) Declaration of Susan Leong, # (12) Text of Proposed Order)(KRAMER, DANIEL)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: 12/5/2016 Order
                                                                            ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF DANIEL J. KRAMER, ESQ. TO PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE IN THIS COURT IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 12/2/16. 12/5/16 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(gs)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: 12/5/2016 Order
                                                                              ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF RICHARD TARLOWE, ESQ. TO PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE IN THIS COURT IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 12/2/16. 12/5/16 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(gs)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: 12/2/2016 Disclosure Statement Form
                                                                                Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by LEON G. COOPERMAN, OMEGA ADVISORS, INC..(STENGEL, TIMOTHY)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF DANIEL J. KRAMER, ESQ. TO PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE IN THIS COURT IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 12/2/16. 12/5/16 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(gs) (Entered: 12/05/2016)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: 12/2/2016 Order
                                                                                    ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION TO THE COURT PRO HAC VICE OF GREGORY LAUFER IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 12/2/2016. 12/2/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF RICHARD TARLOWE, ESQ. TO PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE IN THIS COURT IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 12/2/16. 12/5/16 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(gs) (Entered: 12/05/2016)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: 12/2/2016 Order
                                                                                        ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION TO THE COURT PRO HAC VICE OF ATTORNEY THEODORE V. WELLS IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 12/2/2016. 12/2/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: 12/2/2016 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                          APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of DANIEL J. KRAMER by LEON G. COOPERMAN, OMEGA ADVISORS, INC... (FILING FEE PAID)(kp, )
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: 12/2/2016 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                            APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of GREGORY LAUFER by LEON G. COOPERMAN, OMEGA ADVISORS, INC... (FILING FEE PAID 12/1/2016)(kp, )
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: 12/2/2016 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                              APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of THEODORE V. WELLS, JR. by LEON G. COOPERMAN, OMEGA ADVISORS, INC... (FILING FEE PAID 12/1/2016) (kp, )
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: 12/2/2016 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of RICHARD TARLOWE by LEON G. COOPERMAN, OMEGA ADVISORS, INC... (FILING FEE PAID 12/1/2016)(kp, )
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of THEODORE V. WELLS, JR. by LEON G. COOPERMAN, OMEGA ADVISORS, INC... (FILING FEE PAID 12/1/2016) (kp, ) (Entered: 12/02/2016)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/29/2016, Entered: 11/29/2016 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                    ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' [6] MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE EXCESS PAGES IS GRANTED. DEFENDANTS MAY FILE A MOTION TO DISMISS AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF LAW NOT TO EXCEED 25 PAGES. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 11/29/2016.11/29/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of RICHARD TARLOWE by LEON G. COOPERMAN, OMEGA ADVISORS, INC... (FILING FEE PAID 12/1/2016)(kp, ) (Entered: 12/02/2016)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: 11/28/2016, Terminated: 11/29/2016 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by LEON G. COOPERMAN, OMEGA ADVISORS, INC..Certificate of Service.(HOCKEIMER, HENRY)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: 11/28/2016 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by HENRY E. HOCKEIMER, JR on behalf of LEON G. COOPERMAN, OMEGA ADVISORS, INC. with Certificate of Service(HOCKEIMER, HENRY)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: 11/28/2016 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY MULLIGAN STENGEL on behalf of LEON G. COOPERMAN, OMEGA ADVISORS, INC. with Certificate of Service(STENGEL, TIMOTHY)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: 10/19/2016 waiver of service executed
                                                                                                              WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. OMEGA ADVISORS, INC. waiver sent on 10/10/2016, answer due 12/9/2016. (AXELROD, DAVID)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: 10/19/2016 waiver of service executed
                                                                                                                WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. LEON G. COOPERMAN waiver sent on 10/10/2016, answer due 12/9/2016. (AXELROD, DAVID)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: 9/22/2016 Complaint
                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against LEON G. COOPERMAN, OMEGA ADVISORS, INC., filed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Case Management Track Form, # (3) Designation Form)(jmv, )
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank  Jury Demand
                                                                                                                  DEMAND for Trial by Jury by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (jmv, )
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank  Summons issued
                                                                                                                    Summons Issued as to LEON G. COOPERMAN, OMEGA ADVISORS, INC.. Forwarded To: 2 Origs mailed to counsel on 9/21/16 (jmv, )
                                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 280 times.

                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?