United States v. Farmer
Criminal Case Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 4:16-cr-00408-2

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 4, 2021 at 10:36 AM DT (1.8 months ago) SpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Thomas Galen Massey, Defendant (2)

Toggle Switch Represented by Federal Public Defender - Houston

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/06/2016, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Public Defender or Community Defender Appointment Federal Public Defender - YAK +1 956 630 2995 +1 713 718 4610 deborah_hill@fd.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Foreman Degeurin Nugent Gerger

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George Michael DeGeurin, Jr. +1 713 655 9000 m2degeurin@fdnlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mike DeGeurin, Sr. +1 713 655 9000 +1 713 655 1812 mdegeurin@foremandegeurin.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Fed Pub Def

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/06/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Public Defender or Community Defender Appointment Philip G Gallagher +1 713 718 4600 philip_gallagher@fd.org

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (121) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 525 Filed: 6/4/2021, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 524 Filed: 6/2/2021, Entered: None Continue - Cr
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 511 Filed: 12/24/2020, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 510 Filed: 12/24/2020, Entered: None Continue - Cr
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 498 Filed: 8/31/2020, Entered: None Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 493 Filed: 8/28/2020, Entered: None Continue - Cr
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document 486 Filed: 4/22/2020, Entered: None Resetting Sentencing
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 485 Filed: 4/22/2020, Entered: None Motion to Continue (Sealed)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document 438 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: None Order
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 437 Filed: 1/14/2020, Entered: None Motion to Continue (Sealed)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document 416 Filed: 8/21/2019, Entered: None Order
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 415 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019 Continue - Cr
                        Unopposed MOTION to Continue Sentencing by Thomas Galen Massey, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(DeGeurin, Mike)
                        LREF
                        Blank 402 Filed: 6/26/2019, Entered: 6/26/2019 Court Filing
                        ORDER RESETTING DISCLOSURE DEADLINES as to Andrew Ian Farmer, Thomas Galen Massey, Eddie Douglas Austin, Jr., Carolyn Price Austin, John David Brotherton, Scott Russell Sieck, Charles Earl Grob. (PSI Completion due by 8/2/2019. Counsel will file objections or a statement or no objection by 14 days after disclosure. The Probation Office will submit the final PSR with an addendum by 7 days before Sentencing. The Sentencings will remain as previously scheduled.) (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified. (bthomas, 4)
                          LREF
                          Blank 397 Filed: 4/24/2019, Entered: 4/24/2019 Court Filing
                          ORDER RESETTING SENTENCING Dates as to Andrew Ian Farmer, Thomas Galen Massey. PSI Completion due by 6/28/2019. Counsel will file objections or a statement or no objection within 14 days after disclosure. The Probation Office will submit the final PSR with an addendum 7 days before Sentencing. Sentencing set for 10/15/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified. (bthomas, 4)
                            LREF
                            Blank 368 Filed: 2/5/2019, Entered: 2/5/2019 Court Filing
                            ORDER granting 314 Motion to Have Chimera Energy Corp's Attorney Client Privilege Deemed Inapplicable. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore.) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
                              LREF
                              Sealed Legal Document 356 Filed: 1/25/2019, Entered: 1/25/2019
                              Sealed Order granting 355 Sealed Event, filed.
                                LREF
                                Blank 331 Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: 1/10/2019 Court Filing
                                ORDER TO CONTINUE - Interest of Justice as to Andrew Ian Farmer, Eddie Douglas Austin, Jr, Carolyn Price Austin, John David Brotherton, Scott Russell Sieck. Jury Trial set for 2/18/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified. (bthomas, 4)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 320 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: 1/4/2019
                                  Proposed Voir Dire by USA as to Andrew Ian Farmer, Thomas Galen Massey, Eddie Douglas Austin, Jr, Carolyn Price Austin, John David Brotherton, Scott Russell Sieck, Charles Earl Grob, filed. (Chu, Michael)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 319 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: 1/4/2019
                                    Proposed Jury Instructions by USA as to Andrew Ian Farmer, Thomas Galen Massey, Eddie Douglas Austin, Jr, Carolyn Price Austin, John David Brotherton, Scott Russell Sieck, Charles Earl Grob, filed. (Chu, Michael)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 314 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: 1/4/2019
                                      MOTION to Have Chimera Energy Corp.'s Attorney Client Privilege Deemed Inapplicable by USA as to Andrew Ian Farmer, Thomas Galen Massey, Eddie Douglas Austin, Jr, Carolyn Price Austin, John David Brotherton, Scott Russell Sieck, Charles Earl Grob, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit 3608-c)(Chu, Michael)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 308 Filed: 12/28/2018, Entered: 12/28/2018
                                        Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to 307 Transcript,. Party notified, filed. (dhansen, 4)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 307 Filed: 12/27/2018, Entered: 12/27/2018 Court Filing
                                          TRANSCRIPT as to Andrew Ian Farmer, Thomas Galen Massey, Eddie Douglas Austin, Jr, Carolyn Price Austin, John David Brotherton, Scott Russell Sieck, Charles Earl Grob re: Pretrial Conference held on December 10, 2018, before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore.Court Reporter/Transcriber Dye. Ordering Party Robert Eric Reed Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/27/2019., filed. (gdye, )
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: 12/10/2018 order on motion in limineCourt Filing
                                            ORDER as to Eddie Douglas Austin Jr. (3) granting 296 Motion in Limine Regarding Resignation of Law License. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore.) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: 12/10/2018 Order on Motion for Jencks/Act MaterialCourt Filing
                                              ORDER as to Eddie Douglas Austin Jr (3) denying 230 Motion for Jencks Act Material. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore.) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: 12/10/2018 Order on Motion to Adopt Motion of Other DefendantsCourt Filing
                                                ORDER as to Andrew Ian Farmer (1) granting 226 Motion for Leave to File Additional Motions. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore.) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: 12/10/2018 Order on Motion for Jencks/Act MaterialCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER as to Scott Russell Sieck (6) denying 223 Motion for Jencks Act Material. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore.) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: 12/10/2018 Order on Motion for Reciprocal DiscoveryCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER granting 217 Motion for Reciprocal Discovery.(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore.) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: 11/5/2018 Mail Returned Undeliverable
                                                      MAIL RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE (FORWARDING TIME EXPIRED - RETURN TO SENDER) re: 259 sent to Thomas Galen Massey, filed. (rnieto, 1)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 11/3/2018, Entered: 11/3/2018 Other Notice
                                                        NOTICE of of Expert Testimony by USA as to Andrew Ian Farmer, Thomas Galen Massey, Eddie Douglas Austin, Jr, Carolyn Price Austin, John David Brotherton, Scott Russell Sieck, Charles Earl Grob, filed.(Chu, Michael)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 11/3/2018, Entered: 11/3/2018 Other Notice
                                                          NOTICE of Expert Witness Testimony by USA as to Andrew Ian Farmer, Thomas Galen Massey, Eddie Douglas Austin, Jr, Carolyn Price Austin, John David Brotherton, Scott Russell Sieck, Charles Earl Grob, filed.(Martin, Justin)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document 260 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: 11/1/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER denying 228 Motion for a Bill of Particulars as to Andrew Ian Farmer, Eddie Douglas Austin, Jr, Carolyn Price Austin, John David Brotherton, Scott Russell Sieck, Charles Earl Grob. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified. (bthomas, 4)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 259 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: 10/30/2018 PSI and Disclosure & Sentencing Dates (FORM)Court Filing
                                                              ORDER RESETTING SENTENCING as to Thomas Galen Massey. PSI Completion due by 4/30/2019. Counsel will file objections or a statement or no objection within 14 days after disclosure. Sentencing set for 6/3/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified. (bthomas, 4)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: 9/24/2018 Other Notice
                                                                NOTICE of Intent to Use Evidence, Rule 404(b) [First Supplemental Notice] by USA as to Andrew Ian Farmer, Thomas Galen Massey, Eddie Douglas Austin, Jr, Carolyn Price Austin, John David Brotherton, Scott Russell Sieck, Charles Earl Grob, filed.(Martin, Justin)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 254 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: 9/4/2018 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER denying 251 Motion for Entry of Docket Control Order.(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore.) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 253 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: 9/4/2018 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER granting 250 Motion for Order Regarding Expert Witnesses. All parties must provide notice of any expert witness testimony they intend to introduce at trial no later than 60 days before trial in order to give the opposing party an opportunity to hire an expert of its own in response. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore.) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: 8/29/2018 Response In Opposition
                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Andrew Ian Farmer, Thomas Galen Massey, Eddie Douglas Austin, Jr, Carolyn Price Austin, John David Brotherton, Scott Russell Sieck, Charles Earl Grob re 251 Opposed MOTION Entry of Docket Control Order , filed.(Martin, Justin)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: 8/27/2018 Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                        MOTION for scheduling order regarding disclosure of expert witnesses by USA as to Andrew Ian Farmer, Thomas Galen Massey, Eddie Douglas Austin, Jr, Carolyn Price Austin, John David Brotherton, Scott Russell Sieck, Charles Earl Grob, filed. (Martin, Justin)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: 8/17/2018 Response In Opposition
                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Andrew Ian Farmer, Thomas Galen Massey, Eddie Douglas Austin, Jr, Carolyn Price Austin, John David Brotherton, Scott Russell Sieck, Charles Earl Grob re 228 Opposed MOTION for Bill of Particulars , filed.(Martin, Justin)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: 8/17/2018 Response In Opposition
                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Andrew Ian Farmer, Thomas Galen Massey, Eddie Douglas Austin, Jr, Carolyn Price Austin, John David Brotherton, Scott Russell Sieck, Charles Earl Grob re 229 MOTION for Discovery and Inspection under Rule 16, 243 MOTION in Limine , 234 MOTION for Notice of Govt Intent to Use Evidence , 244 MOTION to Adopt Motions of Other Defendants , 233 MOTION for Leave to File , 225 MOTION for Preservation of Evidence Rough Notes, 242 MOTION to Adopt Motions of Other Defendants , 232 MOTION for Brady Materials , 239 MOTION for List of Witnesses To Be Called By Government, 226 MOTION for Leave to File Additional Motions, 238 MOTION for Notice of Govt Intent to Use Evidence , 235 MOTION for Preservation of Evidence Rough Notes, 236 MOTION for Pretrial Notice of 404(b) Evidence , 223 MOTION for Jencks Act Material , 227 Opposed MOTION for Notice of Govt Intent to Use Evidence , 220 MOTION to Adopt Motions of Other Defendants , 221 MOTION for Brady Materials , 240 LETTER MOTION , 231 MOTION to Adopt Motions of Other Defendants , 222 MOTION for Discovery of Information Regarding Government Witnesses, 230 MOTION for Jencks Act Material , 224 MOTION for Leave to File to Amend or File New Motions, 241 MOTION for Exculpatory Evidence , filed.(Martin, Justin)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: 8/16/2018 Continue - Cr
                                                                              MOTION to Continue Jury Selection and Trial by Andrew Farmer, Eddie Austin, Jr., Carolyn Austin, John Brotherton, Scott Sieck, Charles Grob, filed. (bthomas, 4)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: 8/8/2018 Order on Motion to continueCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER denying 218 Motion to Continue as to Andrew Ian Farmer (1), Eddie Douglas Austin Jr (3), Carolyn Price Austin (4), John David Brotherton (5), Scott Russell Sieck (6), Charles Earl Grob (7).(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore.) Parties notified.(kpicota, 4)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: 8/6/2018 Bill of particulars
                                                                                  Opposed MOTION for Bill of Particulars by Carolyn Price Austin as to Andrew Ian Farmer, Thomas Galen Massey, Eddie Douglas Austin, Jr, Carolyn Price Austin, John David Brotherton, Scott Russell Sieck, Charles Earl Grob, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hester, John)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: 7/31/2018 Response In Opposition
                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Andrew Ian Farmer, Thomas Galen Massey, Eddie Douglas Austin, Jr, Carolyn Price Austin, John David Brotherton, Scott Russell Sieck, Charles Earl Grob re 218 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Jury Selection and Trial , filed.(Martin, Justin)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: 7/30/2018 Other Notice
                                                                                      NOTICE of Intent to Use Evidence, Rule 404(b) by USA as to Andrew Ian Farmer, Thomas Galen Massey, Eddie Douglas Austin, Jr, Carolyn Price Austin, John David Brotherton, Scott Russell Sieck, Charles Earl Grob, filed.(Martin, Justin)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 203 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: 2/6/2018 PSI and Disclosure & Sentencing Dates (FORM)Court Filing
                                                                                        ORDER RESETTING DISCLOSURE AND SENTENCING DATES as to Thomas Galen Massey. PSI Completion due by 10/29/2018. Sentencing set for 12/17/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified. (bthomas, 4)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: 2/5/2018 Continue - Cr
                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Continue Sentencing of Defendant Thomas Galen Massey by USA as to Thomas Galen Massey, filed. (Martin, Justin)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Blank 198 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: 11/29/2017
                                                                                            RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Andrew Ian Farmer, Thomas Galen Massey, Eddie Douglas Austin, Jr, Carolyn Price Austin, John David Brotherton, Scott Russell Sieck, Charles Earl Grob re 197 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Jury Selection & Trial , filed.(Martin, Justin)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 197 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: 11/28/2017
                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Continue Jury Selection & Trial by Eddie Douglas Austin, Jr as to Andrew Ian Farmer, Thomas Galen Massey, Eddie Douglas Austin, Jr, Carolyn Price Austin, John David Brotherton, Scott Russell Sieck, Charles Earl Grob, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reed, Robert)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 193 Filed: 10/4/2017, Entered: 10/4/2017 Court Filing
                                                                                                ORDER as to John David Brotherton granting 191 Motion to Substitute Counsel Tad Nelson and Kenneth Dies as attorney of record. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 188 Filed: 8/23/2017, Entered: 8/23/2017
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Waiver of Personal Appearance at Arraignment and Entry of Plea of Not Guilty by Scott Russell Sieck as to Andrew Ian Farmer, Thomas Galen Massey, Eddie Douglas Austin, Jr, Carolyn Price Austin, John David Brotherton, Scott Russell Sieck, Charles Earl Grob, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Khalil, Samy)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: 7/26/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    NOTICE of Waiver of Personal Appearance at Arraignment and Entry of Plea of Not Guilty by Scott Russell Sieck as to Andrew Ian Farmer, Thomas Galen Massey, Eddie Douglas Austin, Jr, Carolyn Price Austin, John David Brotherton, Scott Russell Sieck, Charles Earl Grob, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Khalil, Samy)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: 7/20/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      US Attys Criminal Docket Sheet as to Andrew Ian Farmer, Thomas Galen Massey, Eddie Douglas Austin, Jr, Carolyn Price Austin, John David Brotherton, Scott Russell Sieck, Charles Earl Grob, filed. (wbostic, 4)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 162 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: 7/7/2017 Order on Motion to AmendCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER MODIFYING CONDITIONS OF RELEASE as to Thomas Galen Massey (2)granting 161 Motion. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore.) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER MODIFYING CONDITIONS OF RELEASE as to Thomas Galen Massey (2)granting 161 Motion. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore.) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 161 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: 7/5/2017 Amend
                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION to Amend Conditions of Rlease by Thomas Galen Massey, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(DeGeurin, Mike)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 156 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: 6/15/2017 PSI and Disclosure & Sentencing DatesCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER RESETTING DISCLOSURE AND SENTENCING DATES as to Thomas Galen Massey. PSI Completion due by 4/30/2018. Counsel will file objections or a statement within 14 days after disclosure. The final copy of the PSR will be filed with the Court 7 days prior to sentencing. Sentencing set for 6/4/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified. (bthomas, 4)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: 6/6/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              MOTION to Travel by Scott Russell Sieck as to Andrew Ian Farmer, Thomas Galen Massey, Eddie Douglas Austin, Jr, Carolyn Price Austin, John David Brotherton, Scott Russell Sieck, Charles Earl Grob, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Scott Sieck Reservation Letter of Support, # 2 Proposed Order on Motion to Travel)(Khalil, Samy)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: 6/2/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER granting 148 Motion to Extend Protective Order to Cover Additional Defendants as to Eddie Douglas Austin Jr (3), Carolyn Price Austin (4), John David Brotherton (5), Scott Russell Sieck (6), Charles Earl Grob (7).(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(gclair, 4)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: 5/22/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Continue Trial and New Deadlines by Scott Russell Sieck as to Andrew Ian Farmer, Thomas Galen Massey, Eddie Douglas Austin, Jr, Carolyn Price Austin, John David Brotherton, Scott Russell Sieck, Charles Earl Grob, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Order on Motion for Continuance)(Khalil, Samy)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: 4/27/2017 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript - (FORM, noticing)
                                                                                                                    Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to 84 Transcript,. Party notified, filed. (hcarr, 4)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: 4/26/2017 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT as to Thomas Galen Massey re: Rearraignment held on 4-18-17 before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore.Court Reporter/Transcriber B. Slavin. Ordering Party SEC (Deborah Minnick) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/25/2017., filed. (bslavin, )
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: 4/26/2017 AO435 Transcript RequestCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by SEC (Deborah Minnick) as to Thomas Galen Massey for Transcript of Rearraignment on 4-18-17 before Judge Gilmore. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Bruce Slavin, filed. (bslavin, )
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: 4/24/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Justin R. Martin as to Andrew Ian Farmer, Thomas Galen Massey for Transcript of Motion Hearing, Judge V. Gilmore, 2/27/2017. 14-Day turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Johnny Sanchez, filed. (mmapps, 4)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 4/18/2017, Entered: 4/18/2017 PSI and Disclosure & Sentencing DatesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER for Presentence Investigation and Disclosure & Sentencing Dates as to Thomas Galen Massey. PSI Completion due by 5/23/2017. Objection to PSI due by 6/6/2017. Final PSI due by 6/20/2017. Sentencing set for 6/26/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified. (bthomas, 4)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 4/18/2017, Entered: 4/18/2017 Plea Agreement
                                                                                                                              PLEA AGREEMENT as to Thomas Galen Massey, filed. (bthomas, 4)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 4/17/2017, Entered: 4/18/2017 Waiver of Indictment
                                                                                                                                WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Thomas Galen Massey, filed.(lrivera, 2)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 4/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Thomas Galen Massey, filed.(lrivera, 2) (Entered: 04/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 4/17/2017, Entered: 4/18/2017 ArraignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore: ARRAIGNMENT as to Thomas Galen Massey (2) Count 1,1s,10-14,16-17 held on 4/17/2017. Appearances: Justin R. Martin, Mike DeGeurin, Sr.(Tape #2:06-2:11)(ERO:Sl. Gueverra) (Interpreter:none) Deft continued on bond, filed.(lrivera, 2)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 4/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore: ARRAIGNMENT as to Thomas Galen Massey (2) Count 1,1s,10-14,16-17 held on 4/17/2017. Appearances: Justin R. Martin, Mike DeGeurin, Sr.(Tape #2:06-2:11)(ERO:Sl. Gueverra) (Interpreter:none) Deft continued on bond, filed.(lrivera, 2) (Entered: 04/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 4/17/2017, Entered: 4/17/2017 Notice of Setting (FORM, noticing) - ArraignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF SETTING as to Thomas Galen Massey. Arraignment set for 4/17/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy, filed. (bwhite, 4)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 4/14/2017, Entered: 4/14/2017 US Attys Criminal Docket Sheet
                                                                                                                                          US Attys Criminal Docket Sheet as to Thomas Galen Massey, filed.(gkelner, 4)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: 4/13/2017 Information - Felony
                                                                                                                                            INFORMATION as to Thomas Galen Massey (2) count(s) 1s, filed. (ckrus, 4) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/14/2017: # 2 Waiver of Indictment) (gkelner, 4).
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: 4/13/2017 Document
                                                                                                                                              RE-DOCKETED at 74 FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PURPOSES. Information as to Thomas Galen Massey, filed.(Martin, Justin) Modified on 4/13/2017 (bthomas, 4).
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: 4/13/2017 Sentencing Data Sheet
                                                                                                                                                SENTENCING DATA SHEET by USA as to Thomas Galen Massey, filed.(Martin, Justin)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: 4/10/2017 Notice of Setting (FORM, noticing) - Re-ArraignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF SETTING as to Thomas Galen Massey. Re-Arraignment set for 4/18/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore, filed. (bthomas, 4)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: 3/15/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER as to Thomas Galen Massey denying 68 Sealed Motion to Travel. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified. (bthomas, 4)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: 3/13/2017 Response
                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by USA as to Thomas Galen Massey Opposition to Motion to Travel to Mexico, filed.(Martin, Justin)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 68 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: 3/10/2017 Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 2/27/2017, Entered: 2/27/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER TO CONTINUE - Interest of Justice as to Andrew Ian Farmer, Thomas Galen Massey granting 53 MOTION to Continue Trial and Pretrial. (Proposed Voir Dire due by 6/2/2017., Pretrial Conference set for 6/5/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore., Jury Trial set for 6/19/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified. (bthomas, 4)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/24/2017, Entered: 2/24/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying 55 Motion to Compel the Production of SEC counsel handwritten notes. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore.) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/24/2017, Entered: 2/24/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 48 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply. The Sur-Reply is due 2/24/2017. The Court will consider it on 2/27/2017. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore.) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/24/2017, Entered: 2/24/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 31 Motion for Discovery Pursuant to Rule 16(a)(1)(A)(B)(C)(D)(E) and (F). (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore.) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/24/2017, Entered: 2/24/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 30 Motion to Disclose Electronically or Video Recorded Material. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore.) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/24/2017, Entered: 2/24/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting in part 29 Motion to Disclose Promises of Favorable Treatment or Threats of Prosecution Made to Government Witnesses. The Court finds that the disclosure of specific promises must be disclosed, but not internal memoranda or reports. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore.) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/24/2017, Entered: 2/24/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 28 Motion to Disclose All Evidence the Government intends to Offer Pursuant to Rule 404(b). (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore.) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/24/2017, Entered: 2/24/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 27 Motion for Production of Favorable Evidence. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore.) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/24/2017, Entered: 2/24/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying 26 Motion for Early Production of Witness Statements and Supporting Brief. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore.) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/24/2017, Entered: 2/24/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF SETTING as to Andrew Ian Farmer, Thomas Galen Massey - regarding 26 MOTION for Jencks Act Material, 27 MOTION for Production of Favorable Evidence, 28 MOTION for Disclosure, 29 MOTION for Disclosure, 30 MOTION for Disclosure, 31 MOTION for Discovery, 45 MOTION to Compel Brady Material and Motion to Compel Discovery, 48 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-reply to Motion to Compel, 53 MOTION to Continue Trial and Pretrial, 55 MOTION to Compel Production of SEC Notes. Motion Hearing set for 2/27/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore, filed. (bthomas, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/16/2017, Entered: 2/16/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Continue Trial and Pretrial by Thomas Galen Massey as to Andrew Ian Farmer, Thomas Galen Massey, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(DeGeurin, George)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/15/2017, Entered: 2/15/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Continue Trial and Pretrial by Thomas Galen Massey as to Andrew Ian Farmer, Thomas Galen Massey, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(DeGeurin, George)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: 2/10/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 50 Motion for Reciprocal Discovery as to Andrew Ian Farmer (1), Thomas Galen Massey (2). (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/9/2017, Entered: 2/9/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Reciprocal Discovery by USA as to Andrew Ian Farmer, Thomas Galen Massey, filed. (Martin, Justin)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: 1/11/2017 Order on Motion to ModifyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER MODIFYING CONDITIONS OF RELEASE as to Thomas Galen Massey (2) granting 43 Motion to Modify. Ordered that the travel restrictions on his conditions of release be modified to travel in all districts of Texas. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore.) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: 1/9/2017 Modify
                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Modify Travel Restrictions on Conditional Release by Thomas Galen Massey, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(DeGeurin, Mike)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: 12/7/2016 Order on Motion to Substitute AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER as to Thomas Galen Massey (2) granting 40 Motion to Substitute Mike DeGeurin as Attorney. Philip Gallagher is terminated. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore.) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER as to Thomas Galen Massey (2) granting 40 Motion to Substitute Mike DeGeurin as Attorney. Philip Gallagher is terminated. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore.) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4) (Entered: 12/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: 12/5/2016 Substitute Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Substitute Attorney Mike DeGeurin, Sr by Thomas Galen Massey, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(DeGeurin, Mike)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/10/2016, Entered: 11/10/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER TO CONTINUE - Interest of Justice as to Andrew Ian Farmer, Thomas Galen Massey granting 34 MOTION to Continue Trial and Related Dates. (Motion Filing due by 3/17/2017., Responses due by 3/27/2017., Pretrial Conference set for 4/10/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore., Jury Trial set for 4/17/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified. (bthomas, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: 11/9/2016 Continue - Cr
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Continue Trial and Related Dates by Thomas Galen Massey, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Gallagher, Philip)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/6/2016, Entered: 10/6/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 24 Motion for Protective Order as to Andrew Ian Farmer (1)Andrew Ian Farmer (1), Thomas Galen Massey (2).(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore.) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/4/2016, Entered: 10/4/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Protective Order for discovery by USA as to Andrew Ian Farmer, Andrew Ian Farmer, Thomas Galen Massey, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Martin, Justin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: 9/22/2016 Bond
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Appearance Bond Entered as to Thomas Galen Massey in amount of $50,000 Unsecured, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted attachment) (rnieto, 1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Appearance Bond Entered as to Thomas Galen Massey in amount of $50,000 Unsecured, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted attachment) (rnieto, 1) (Entered: 09/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 20 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: 9/22/2016 Pretrial Services Report (Sealed)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to Thomas Galen Massey, filed.
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 20 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to Thomas Galen Massey, filed. (Entered: 09/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: 9/22/2016 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER as to Thomas Galen Massey. ETT: 8 Days. Motion Filing due by 10/11/2016. Responses due by 10/21/2016. Pretrial Conference set for 11/21/2016 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore. Proposed Voir Dire due by 11/18/2016. Jury Trial set for 11/28/2016 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy) Parties notified. (wbostic, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER as to Thomas Galen Massey. ETT: 8 Days. Motion Filing due by 10/11/2016. Responses due by 10/21/2016. Pretrial Conference set for 11/21/2016 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore. Proposed Voir Dire due by 11/18/2016. Jury Trial set for 11/28/2016 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy) Parties notified. (wbostic, 4) (Entered: 09/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: 9/22/2016 ArraignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy: ARRAIGNMENT as to Thomas Galen Massey (2) Count 1,10-14,16-17 held on 9/21/2016. Not Guilty on All. Appearances:Bert Isaacs, Joshua Lake, and Justin R. Martin. (ERO:Yes), filed. (wbostic, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy: ARRAIGNMENT as to Thomas Galen Massey (2) Count 1,10-14,16-17 held on 9/21/2016. Not Guilty on All. Appearances:Bert Isaacs, Joshua Lake, and Justin R. Martin. (ERO:Yes), filed. (wbostic, 4) (Entered: 09/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: 9/22/2016 Appointing Public DefenderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy) Parties notified. (wbostic, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy) Parties notified. (wbostic, 4) (Entered: 09/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 16 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: 9/22/2016 Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (Sealed)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Thomas Galen Massey, filed.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 16 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Thomas Galen Massey, filed. (Entered: 09/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: 9/22/2016 Initial AppearanceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy: INITIAL APPEARANCE as to Thomas Galen Massey, (Deft informed of rights) held on 9/21/2016. Bond Set and defendant will be released on bond. Defendant requests appointed counsel. Financial Affidavit executed. Order appointing Federal Public Defender. Appearances:Joshua Lake, Bert Isaacs, Justin R. Martin. (ERO:Yes) Deft continued on will be on bond, filed. (wbostic, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy: INITIAL APPEARANCE as to Thomas Galen Massey, (Deft informed of rights) held on 9/21/2016. Bond Set and defendant will be released on bond. Defendant requests appointed counsel. Financial Affidavit executed. Order appointing Federal Public Defender. Appearances:Joshua Lake, Bert Isaacs, Justin R. Martin. (ERO:Yes) Deft continued on will be on bond, filed. (wbostic, 4) (Entered: 09/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/15/2016, Entered: 9/15/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER for Issuance of Bench Warrant as to Thomas Galen Massey ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified. (thanniable, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/15/2016, Entered: 9/15/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 3 Motion to Seal as to Andrew Ian Farmer (1), Thomas Galen Massey (2).(Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo.) Parties notified.(thanniable, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/15/2016, Entered: 9/15/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Seal by USA as to Andrew Ian Farmer, Thomas Galen Massey, filed. (thanniable, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/15/2016, Entered: 9/15/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          US Attys Criminal Docket Sheet as to Andrew Ian Farmer, Thomas Galen Massey, filed.(thanniable, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/15/2016, Entered: 9/15/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            INDICTMENT (The original indictment with the signature of the grand jury foreperson is on file under seal with the clerk) as to Andrew Ian Farmer (1) count(s) 1, 2-17, Thomas Galen Massey (2) count(s) 1, 10-14, 16-17, filed. (thanniable, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 9/15/2016, Entered: 9/15/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Vanessa D Gilmore assigned to this case. (thanniable, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 1,403 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?