Springer et al v. Code Rebel Corporation et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-03492
District Judge Alison J. Nathan, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 14, 2017 at 11:12 PM DT (4.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Robert Springer, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Rosen Law Firm PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip C. Kim +1 212 686 1060 +1 212 202 3827 pkim@rosenlegal.com
v.
No Logo Arben Kryeziu, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by dfmklaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Justin Blake Singer +1 646 793 3097 justin@dfmklaw.com
No Logo Code Rebel Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Reid Dabney, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by AXINN VELTROP HARKRIDER LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Felix John Gilman +1 212 728 2234 +1 212 728 2201 fgilman@axinn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Axinn, Veltrop & Harkrider LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donald W. Hawthorne +1 212 909 6000 +1 212 909 6836 dwh@avhlaw.com
No Logo Adrian Ybarra, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pomerantz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J Alexander Hood +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 ahood@pomlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy Alan Lieberman +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 jalieberman@pomlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Justin Solomon Nematzadeh +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 jnematzadeh@pomlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rosen Law Firm PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip C. Kim +1 212 686 1060 +1 212 202 3827 pkim@rosenlegal.com
No Logo Afaq Shaik, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lesley Frank Portnoy +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 LPortnoy@glancylaw.com
No Logo George Torres, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Moylan Guiney +1 212 545 4761 +1 212 545 4758 guiney@whafh.com
No Logo Larry Strowbridge, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Levi & Korsinsky, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam M Apton +1 202 524 4290 +1 202 333 2121 AApton@zlk.com
No Logo William Tran, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pomerantz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J Alexander Hood +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 ahood@pomlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy Alan Lieberman +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 jalieberman@pomlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Justin Solomon Nematzadeh +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 jnematzadeh@pomlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rosen Law Firm PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip C. Kim +1 212 686 1060 +1 212 202 3827 pkim@rosenlegal.com
No Logo Jeoffrey L. Burtch, Miscellaneous
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a)
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (71) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 71 Filed: 6/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING PROPOSED SETTLEMENT granting 61 Motion for Settlement Lead Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. The Court preliminarily finds that the proposed Settlement evidenced by the Settlement Agreement is sufficiently fair, reasonable, and adequate to warrant sending notice of the proposed Settlement to the Class and scheduling a Fairness Hearing for further review of the proposed Settlement, as set forth in this Order. The Court hereby preliminarily certifies the Class solely for purposes of the proposed Settlement pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(b)(3). Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(e), the Court will hold a hearing (the "Fairness Hearing") on Dec 8, 2017 at 10:00am before the Honorable Alison J. Nathan, United States District Judge for the Southern District of New York, at the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007. All proceedings in this Action are stayed until further order of the Court, except as may be necessary to implement the Settlement or comply with the terms of the Stipulation and this Order, as set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 6/28/2017) (mml) (Entered: 06/28/2017)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER: In a concurrently filed order, the Court has preliminary approved the proposed settlement. The parties are ordered, however, to make three changes to the notice of pendency at Dkt. No. 60-2. First, on page 1, the second bulleted paragraph should state "per share of Code Rebel" - the word Rebel is presently omitted. See Dkt. No. 60-2, at 1. Second, on page 5, under paragraph 5, the first sentence should state: "The Settlement Class consists of those who purchased.... " Id. at 5. Finally, on page 14, the docket number for this case is erroneously listed as 16-cv-3491. It should be changed to 16-cv-3492. Id. at 14. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 6/27/2017) (mml) (Entered: 06/28/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to James Canton. (pc) (Entered: 06/27/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to David Dwelle. (pc) (Entered: 06/27/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Volodymyr Bykov. (pc) (Entered: 06/27/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Volodymyr Bykov, re: 63 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by William Tran, Adrian Ybarra. (Kim, Phillip) Modified on 6/27/2017 (pc). (Entered: 06/27/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to James Canton, re: 63 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by William Tran, Adrian Ybarra. (Kim, Phillip) Modified on 6/27/2017 (pc). (Entered: 06/27/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to David Dwelle, re: 63 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by William Tran, Adrian Ybarra. (Kim, Phillip) Modified on 6/27/2017 (pc). (Entered: 06/27/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 63 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 56 Amended Complaint, against Volodymyr Bykov, James Canton, Code Rebel Corporation, Reid Dabney, David Dwelle, Arben Kryeziu with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Adrian Ybarra, William Tran. Related document: 56 Amended Complaint, filed by Adrian Ybarra, William Tran.(Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 06/27/2017)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 61 MOTION for Settlement Lead Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. . Document filed by William Tran, Adrian Ybarra. (Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      MOTION for Settlement Lead Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. Document filed by William Tran, Adrian Ybarra.(Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT . Document filed by William Tran, Adrian Ybarra. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order Preliminary Approving Proposed Settlement, # 2 Exhibit A-1 - Notice of Pendency and Proposed Settlement of Class Action, # 3 Exhibit A-2 - Proof of Claim and Release Form, # 4 Exhibit A-3 - Summary Notice of Pendency and Proposed Class Action Settlement, # 5 Exhibit B - Proposed Final Order and Judgment Approving Class Action Settlement)(Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Volodymyr Bykov, re: 56 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by William Tran, Adrian Ybarra. (Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to James Canton, re: 56 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by William Tran, Adrian Ybarra. (Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to David Dwelle, re: 56 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by William Tran, Adrian Ybarra. (Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint, against Code Rebel Corporation, Reid Dabney, Arben Kryeziu, David Dwelle, James Canton, Volodymyr Bykov with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Adrian Ybarra, William Tran. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by Robert Springer.(Kim, Phillip) Modified on 6/27/2017 (pc). (Entered: 06/26/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 54 LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Phillip Kim dated June 13, 2017 re: Lifting of the Stay for Filing of the Amended Complaint and Motion for Preliminary Approval of the Proposed Settlement. ENDORSEMENT: The stay is hereby lifted. The parties are instructed to separately submit their proposed amended complaint as well as their motion for preliminary approval of the settlement, on the docket. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 6/23/2017) (cf) (Entered: 06/23/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Phillip Kim dated June 13, 2017 re: Lifting of the Stay for Filing of the Amended Complaint and Motion for Preliminary Approval of the Proposed Settlement. Document filed by William Tran, Adrian Ybarra. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement, # 2 Exhibit Amended Complaint, # 3 Exhibit Notice of Motion and Memorandum of Law in Support of Preliminary Approval of Settlement, # 4 Exhibit Order Granting Trustee's Motion for Approval of Settlement)(Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 06/13/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      MEMORANDUM & ORDER: terminating 31 Motion to Appoint ; granting 35 Letter Motion to Stay ; granting 18 Letter Motion to Stay ; granting 23 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting 23 Motion to Appoint ; terminating 24 Motion to Appoint ; terminating 24 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; terminating 28 Motion to Appoint ; terminating 28 Motion to Appoint Counsel. In conclusion, the Court hereby appoints Plaintiffs William Tran and Adrian Ybarra as lead Plaintiffs, approves the Rosen Law Firm, P.A., and Pomerantz LLP, as co-lead counsel for the purported class, and temporarily stays this matter to allow the Individual Defendants to seek their requested stay from the Bankruptcy Court. This resolves Dkt. Nos. 18, 23, 24, 28, 31, 35. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 3/02/2017) (ama) (Entered: 03/02/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank 52 Filed: 9/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Justin Solomon Nematzadeh on behalf of William Tran, Adrian Ybarra. (Nematzadeh, Justin) (Entered: 09/20/2016)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 51 Filed: 9/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          NOTICE of NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION OF ADRIAN YBARRA AND WILLIAM TRAN FOR APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF, AND APPROVAL OF COUNSEL AND IN OPPOSITION TO COMPETING MOTIONS re: 23 MOTION to Appoint Counsel The Rosen Law Firm P.A. and Pomerantz LLP. MOTION to Appoint William Tran, Adrian Ybarra to serve as lead plaintiff(s) .. Document filed by William Tran, Adrian Ybarra. (Lieberman, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/16/2016)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            ORDER granting 49 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Phillip Kim dated September 7, 2016. Document filed by William Tran, Adrian Ybarra. So ordered. The following hearing(s) was terminated: Initial Conference. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 9/8/2016) (rjm) (Entered: 09/08/2016)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Phillip Kim dated September 7, 2016. Document filed by William Tran, Adrian Ybarra.(Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 09/07/2016)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Alexander Hood, II on behalf of William Tran, Adrian Ybarra. (Hood, Joseph) (Entered: 08/09/2016)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeremy Alan Lieberman on behalf of William Tran, Adrian Ybarra. (Lieberman, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/09/2016)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    NOTICE of of Withdrawal of Motion re: 24 MOTION to Appoint George Torres to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel - Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLP as Lead Counsel.. Document filed by George Torres. (Guiney, Matthew) (Entered: 08/04/2016)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Phillip Kim dated 07/29/2016 re: Bankrputcy Trustee's Submission, RE: Stay. Document filed by Robert Springer(on behalf of others similarly situated). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 07/29/2016)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion re: 31 MOTION to Appoint Larry Strowbridge to serve as lead plaintiff(s) .. Document filed by Larry Strowbridge. (Apton, Adam) (Entered: 07/28/2016)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 31 MOTION to Appoint Larry Strowbridge to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . . Document filed by George Torres. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Guiney, Matthew) (Entered: 07/28/2016)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 24 MOTION to Appoint George Torres to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel - Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLP as Lead Counsel., 31 MOTION to Appoint Larry Strowbridge to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . . Document filed by William Tran, Adrian Ybarra. (Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 07/28/2016)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              NOTICE of Non-Opposition to Competing Motions for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Counsel. Document filed by Afaq Shaik. (Portnoy, Lesley) (Entered: 07/27/2016)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                AFFIRMATION of Jeoffrey L. Burtch, Chapter 7 Trustee for the estate of Code Rebel Corporation in Support re: 35 MOTION to Stay Action as Against Individual Defendants.. Document filed by Jeoffrey L. Burtch. (Felger, Mark) (Entered: 07/20/2016)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  DECLARATION of Phillip Kim in Opposition re: 35 MOTION to Stay Action as Against Individual Defendants.. Document filed by Robert Springer(on behalf of others similarly situated). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 07/15/2016)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 35 MOTION to Stay Action as Against Individual Defendants. . Document filed by Robert Springer(on behalf of others similarly situated). (Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 07/15/2016)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 35 MOTION to Stay Action as Against Individual Defendants. . Document filed by Arben Kryeziu. (Singer, Justin) (Entered: 07/14/2016)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        DECLARATION of Justin B. Singer in Support re: 35 MOTION to Stay Action as Against Individual Defendants.. Document filed by Arben Kryeziu. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Singer, Justin) (Entered: 07/14/2016)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          MOTION to Stay Action as Against Individual Defendants. Document filed by Arben Kryeziu.(Singer, Justin) (Entered: 07/14/2016)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Justin Blake Singer on behalf of Arben Kryeziu. New Address: Feuerstein Kulick LLP, 205 E. 42nd Street, 20th Floor, New York, New York, USA 10017, 646-793-3097. (Singer, Justin) (Entered: 07/13/2016)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              DECLARATION of Adam M. Apton in Support re: 31 MOTION to Appoint Larry Strowbridge to serve as lead plaintiff(s) .. Document filed by Larry Strowbridge. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(Apton, Adam) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 31 MOTION to Appoint Larry Strowbridge to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . . Document filed by Larry Strowbridge. (Apton, Adam) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  MOTION to Appoint Larry Strowbridge to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . Document filed by Larry Strowbridge. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Apton, Adam) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    DECLARATION of Lesley F. Portnoy in Support re: 28 MOTION to Appoint Afaq Shaik to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP.. Document filed by Afaq Shaik. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Press Release, # 2 Exhibit B - Movant Certification, # 3 Exhibit C- Loss Chart, # 4 Exhibit D - GPM Firm Resume)(Portnoy, Lesley) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 28 MOTION to Appoint Afaq Shaik to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP. . Document filed by Afaq Shaik. (Portnoy, Lesley) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        MOTION to Appoint Afaq Shaik to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., MOTION to Appoint Counsel Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP. Document filed by Afaq Shaik. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Portnoy, Lesley) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          DECLARATION of Matthew M. Guiney in Support re: 24 MOTION to Appoint George Torres to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel - Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLP as Lead Counsel.. Document filed by George Torres. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Part 1, # 5 Exhibit 4 - Part 2, # 6 Exhibit 5)(Guiney, Matthew) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 24 MOTION to Appoint George Torres to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel - Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLP as Lead Counsel. . Document filed by George Torres. (Guiney, Matthew) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 23 MOTION to Appoint Counsel The Rosen Law Firm P.A. and Pomerantz LLP. MOTION to Appoint William Tran, Adrian Ybarra to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . . Document filed by William Tran, Adrian Ybarra. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit)(Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                MOTION to Appoint George Torres to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., MOTION to Appoint Counsel - Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLP as Lead Counsel. Document filed by George Torres.(Guiney, Matthew) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  MOTION to Appoint Counsel The Rosen Law Firm P.A. and Pomerantz LLP., MOTION to Appoint William Tran, Adrian Ybarra to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . Document filed by William Tran, Adrian Ybarra. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Moylan Guiney on behalf of George Torres. (Guiney, Matthew) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Felix John Gilman on behalf of Reid Dabney. (Gilman, Felix) (Entered: 07/08/2016)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Donald W. Hawthorne on behalf of Reid Dabney. (Hawthorne, Donald) (Entered: 07/08/2016)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of (i) Notice of Appearance, (ii) Notice of Motion, (iii) Declaration in Support of Motion, (iv) Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion served on Robert Springer on 7/8/2016. Document filed by Arben Kryeziu. (Singer, Justin) (Entered: 07/08/2016)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION to Stay Memorandum of Law in Support of Extending the Automatic Stay to the Claims Asserted Against the Individual Defendants in this Action. Document filed by Arben Kryeziu.(Singer, Justin) Modified on 7/14/2016 (db). (Entered: 07/08/2016)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION to Stay Action as Against the Individual Defendants. Document filed by Arben Kryeziu. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Justin B. Singer, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Justin B. Singer)(Singer, Justin) Modified on 7/14/2016 (db). (Entered: 07/08/2016)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Justin Blake Singer on behalf of Arben Kryeziu. (Singer, Justin) (Entered: 07/08/2016)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Mailing of Court's Order of June 30, 2016 (ECF No. 14) re: 14 Order, Set Deadlines,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Robert Springer(individually). (Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 07/05/2016)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER. The Court hereby orders the parties to brief the question of whether the Court should stay this litigation with respect to Arben Kryeziu and Reid Dabney (the "Individual Defendants"). Because the Individual Defendants seek to extend the stay beyond the debtor entity, they shall file the opening brief. That brief shall be due by July 8, 2016, and shall be no more than eight pages. Plaintiff shall file an opposition brief no later than July 15, 2016, also of no more than eight pages. If the Individual Defendants choose to file a reply, they shall do so no later than July 20, 2016, and the brief shall not exceed four pages. In addition to the general question of whether to the stay this litigation with respect to the Individual Defendants, counsel are requested to address the issues as further specified in items 1 through 3 in this Order. Because counsel for the Individual Defendants have not yet filed an order of appearance, Plaintiff is ORDERED to serve a copy of this order on the Individual Defendants by July 5, 2016. Counsel for the Individual Defendants are ORDERED to file a notice of appearance by July 8, 2016. So ordered. (Motions due by 7/8/2016. Responses due by 7/15/2016. Replies due by 7/20/2016.) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 6/30/2016) (rjm) (Entered: 07/01/2016)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Phillip Kim, Donald Hawthorne, and Mitchell Kulick dated June 29, 2016 re: Order dated June 20, 2016. Document filed by Robert Springer(individually).(Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 06/29/2016)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Mailing of Court's Order of June 20, 2016 (ECF No. 11) re: 11 Order,,. Document filed by Robert Springer(individually). (Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 06/23/2016)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER: Because Code Rebel has entered bankruptcy proceedings, an automatic stay of litigation against that entity is required by 11 U.S.C. 362. The remaining parties--Plaintiff and individual Defendants Arben Kryeziu and Reid Dabney--shall submit a joint letter, no later than June 29, 2016, indicating whether this case should proceed against the individual Defendants, or if the entire case should be stayed. Because the individual Defendants have not yet appeared in this action, Plaintiff is ORDERED to serve a copy of this order on the individual Defendants by June 24, 2016. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 6/20/2016) (tro) (Entered: 06/21/2016)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Notice of Suggestion of Bankruptcy re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Code Rebel Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Felger, Mark) (Entered: 06/16/2016)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 9/9/2016 at 02:15 PM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. (As further set forth in this Order.) Parties ordered to submit via ECF proposed case management plan and joint letter seven days before conference. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 6/6/2016) (cf) (Entered: 06/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Arben Kryeziu. (rch) (Entered: 05/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Reid Dabney. (rch) (Entered: 05/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Code Rebel Corporation. (rch) (Entered: 05/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Arben Kryeziu, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Robert Springer(individually), Robert Springer(on behalf of others similarly situated). (Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 05/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Reid Dabney, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Robert Springer(individually), Robert Springer(on behalf of others similarly situated). (Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 05/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Code Rebel Corporation, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Robert Springer(individually), Robert Springer(on behalf of others similarly situated). (Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 05/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 05/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT against Code Rebel Corporation, Reid Dabney, Arben Kryeziu. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-12285011)Document filed by Robert Springer(individually), Robert Springer(on behalf of others similarly situated). (Attachments: # 1 Certification)(Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 05/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                Space Space

                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 246 times.

                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?