Fuentes v. Parks, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-02660
District Judge Richard M. Berman, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 3, 2017 at 5:11 AM ST (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ihovany Jose Fuentes, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Apt.#2C

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ihovany Jose Fuentes
v.
No Logo I (Officer) John Doe, Defendant
No Logo I (Registered Nurse) Jane Doe, Defendant
No Logo II (Officer) John Doe, Defendant
No Logo Immigration & Naturalization Service, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Lawrence Heath Fogelman +1 212 637 2719 +1 212 637 2730 Lawrence.Fogelman@usdoj.gov
No Logo Lt. (Officer) Anderson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Lawrence Heath Fogelman +1 212 637 2719 +1 212 637 2730 Lawrence.Fogelman@usdoj.gov
No Logo Medical Doctor C. Parks, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Lawrence Heath Fogelman +1 212 637 2719 +1 212 637 2730 Lawrence.Fogelman@usdoj.gov
No Logo Registered Nurse Bayer, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Lawrence Heath Fogelman +1 212 637 2719 +1 212 637 2730 Lawrence.Fogelman@usdoj.gov
No Logo Registered Nurse Hollandsworth, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Lawrence Heath Fogelman +1 212 637 2719 +1 212 637 2730 Lawrence.Fogelman@usdoj.gov
No Logo Registered Nurse Lee, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence Heath Fogelman +1 212 637 2719 +1 212 637 2730 Lawrence.Fogelman@usdoj.gov
No Logo Registered Nurse Vivian Chang, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence Heath Fogelman +1 212 637 2719 +1 212 637 2730 Lawrence.Fogelman@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (56) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/27/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to 53 Notice of Appeal filed by Ihovany Jose Fuentes USCA Case Number 06-2317. Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed that the judgment of the District Court is AFFIRMED. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA. Issued As Mandate: 6/14/2007. (nd) (Entered: 06/27/2007)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/22/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    MEMORANDUM; an amended summons was issued 4/22/05. (pl, ) (Entered: 06/07/2006)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/10/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Index). Notice that the Original index to the record on Appeal for 53 Notice of Appeal filed by Ihovany Jose Fuentes, 3 Copies of the index, Certified Clerk Certificate and Certified Docket Sheet were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (nd, ) (Entered: 05/10/2006)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/24/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        NOTICE OF APPEAL from 52 Order on Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Ihovany Jose Fuentes. Copies of Notice of Appeal mailed to Attorney(s) of Record: A.U.S.A. (tp, ) (Entered: 05/08/2006)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/10/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER granting 41 Motion to Dismiss . The Clerk of the COurt is respectfully requested to close this case.(Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 2/10/2006) (jmi, ) (Entered: 02/14/2006)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Further Support re: 41 MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) to Dismiss. (djc, ) (Entered: 01/09/2006)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/29/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              ENDORSED LETTER: addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Lawrence H. Fogelman dated 12/29/2005 re: the Government is respectfully requesting a 1 week extension of the time to file a reply brief in support of the Government defendants' motion to dismiss the amended complaint, from 12/30/2005 until 1/6/2006. ENDORSEMENT: Extension Granted. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 12/29/2005) (lb, ) (Entered: 12/30/2005)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/9/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Ihovany Jose Fuentes. (djc, ) (Entered: 12/15/2005)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/9/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  AFFIRMATION of Ihovany Jose Fuentes in Opposition for Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Ihovany Jose Fuentes. (djc, ) (Entered: 12/15/2005)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    ENDORSED LETTER: addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from Lawrence H. Fogelman dated 11/30/2005. ENDORSEMENTS: In light of this letter, plaintiff's motion to compel discovery (docket #38) is granted - but the government is deemed to have met its obligation to provide the discovery requested. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 12/1/2005) (lb, ) (Entered: 12/02/2005)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/29/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge from Michael J. Garcia dated 11/18/2005 re: to the government requests premission to update the Court after Thanksgiving holiday, by Wednesday, November 30, in regard to whether this seach has resulted in any responsive information.ENDORSEMENT: Granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 11/21/2005) (jmi, ) (Entered: 11/30/2005)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/31/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        ENDORSED LETTER: addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from Lawerence H. Fogelman dated 10/28/05 re: requests an additional three weeks, until 11/18/05, to complete its search and determine if it can identify the two unnamed officers listed in plaintiff's amended complaint. ENDORSEMENT: GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 10/31/05) (js, ) (Entered: 11/01/2005)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/21/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          DECLARATION of Lawrence H. Fogelman in Support re: 41 MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) to Dismiss. Document filed by Immigration and Naturalization Service, C. Parks, Vivian Chang, Hollandsworth, Bayer, Lee, Anderson. (sac, ) (Entered: 10/24/2005)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/21/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            NOTICE TO PRO SE PURSUANT TO LOCAL CIVIL RULE 12.1. Document filed by Immigration and Naturalization Service, C. Parks, Vivian Chang, Hollandsworth, Bayer, Lee, Anderson. (sac, ) (Entered: 10/24/2005)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/21/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 41 MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) to Dismiss. Document filed by Immigration and Naturalization Service, C. Parks, Vivian Chang, Hollandsworth, Bayer, Lee, Anderson. (sac, ) (Entered: 10/24/2005)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/21/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) for an order, granting judgment in favor of the Government Defendants and dismissing the complaint in this action pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure as against the Government Defendants. Document filed by Immigration and Naturalization Service, C. Parks, Hollandsworth, Bayer, Lee, Anderson. (sac, ) (Entered: 10/24/2005)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/17/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 9/15/2005 before Judge Richard M. Berman. (jar, ) (Entered: 10/17/2005)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/19/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    ORDER; Pretrial Conference is set for 10/11/2005 at 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein in Courtroom 219, 40 Centre Street. (Signed by Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 9/16/05) (kco, ) (Entered: 09/20/2005)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/12/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) to Compel. Document filed by Ihovany Jose Fuentes. Return Date set for 9/15/2005 09:00 AM. (pl, ) (Entered: 08/30/2005)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/11/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from Lawrence H. Fogelman dated 7/8/05 re: Counsel writes to response to plaintiff's motion to compel discovery in this action. The Court will stay discovery pending disposition of the proposed motion by Judge Berman. In light of the April 18 decision, there is no basis for seeking discovery against the existing defendants. Plaintiff is free to seek discovery should any defendant remain in this case following Judge Berman's ruling on the defendants' new proposed motion. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 7/8/05) (jco, ) (Entered: 07/12/2005)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/27/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Lawrence H. Fogelman dated 6/24/05 re: requesting a one-week adjournment of the pre-motion conference. Work it out with your adversary and the Court Deputy and see if 7/25/05 at 10:00 works. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 6/26/05) (sac, ) (Entered: 06/29/2005)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Lawrence H. Fogelman dated 6/21/05 re: We'll have a pre-motion conference on 7/15/05 at 10:00 a.m. and Mr. Fuentes will have the opportunity to be heard then. Courtroom 704 at 40 Centre Street. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 6/23/05) (sac, ) (Entered: 06/27/2005)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/20/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) for an Order to Compel Discovery. Document filed by Ihovany Jose Fuentes. (mde, ) (Entered: 06/24/2005)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/27/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                MEMO ENDORSEMENT ON MOTION; Plaintiff request an extension of time of 45 days. Extension granted, 45 days (Final). (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 5/27/05) (sac, ) (Entered: 05/31/2005)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/4/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint, served. Immigration and Naturalization Service served on 4/29/2005, answer due 5/19/2005. Service was made by certified mail; U. S. Attorney: #70001670000903429402; INS by certified mail, # #70001670000903429341. Document filed by Ihovany Jose Fuentes. (pl, ) (Entered: 05/25/2005)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/16/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Vivian Chang served on 5/5/2005, answer due 5/25/2005. Service was accepted by C. Bailey, Clerk. Document filed by Ihovany Jose Fuentes. (dle, ) (Entered: 05/18/2005)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/22/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 2 Complaint against Jane Doe, Immigration and Naturalization Service, C. Parks, Vivian Chang, Hollandsworth, Bayer, Lee, Anderson, John Doe, John Doe.Document filed by Ihovany Jose Fuentes. Related document: 2 Complaint.(pl, ) (Entered: 05/03/2005)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/18/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        DECISION AND ORDER: for reasons further set forth in said Order, defendants 20 motion for judgment on the pleadings is GRANTED and plaintiffs 23 motion to file an amended complaint is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 4/18/05) (db, ) (Entered: 04/21/2005)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/18/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                          DECISION AND ORDER granting 20 Motion for Judgment, granting in part and denying in part 23 Motion to Amend/Correct 2 Complaint . (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 4/18/05) (cd, ) (Entered: 04/20/2005)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/29/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 20 MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) for Judgment. Document filed by Anderson, Bayer, Vivian Chang, Hollandsworth, Immigration and Naturalization Service, Lee, C. Parks. (jco, ) (Entered: 12/01/2004)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/29/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Berman from Lawrence H. Fogelman dated 11/15/2004 re: Government's time to file a response to planitiff's opposition to the Government's motion for judgment on the pleadings is extended to 11/29/2004 (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 11/17/2004) (jsa, ) (Entered: 11/30/2004)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/18/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Ihovany Jose Fuentes in Opposition. Document filed by Ihovany Jose Fuentes. (db, ) (Entered: 10/21/2004)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/18/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 9/9/2004 before Judge Richard M. Berman.(Gonzalez, Jose) (Entered: 10/18/2004)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/4/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) to Amend 2 Complaint. Document filed by Ihovany Jose Fuentes. (db, ) (Entered: 10/06/2004)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/1/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      DECLARATION of Lawrence H. Fogelman in Support re: 20 MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) for Judgment.. Document filed by Anderson, Bayer, Vivian Chang, Hollandsworth, Immigration and Naturalization Service, Lee, C. Parks. (pa, ) (Entered: 10/04/2004)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/1/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 20 MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) for Judgment.. Document filed by Anderson, Bayer, Vivian Chang, Hollandsworth, Immigration and Naturalization Service, Lee, C. Parks. (pa, ) (Entered: 10/04/2004)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/1/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          NOTICE OF MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) for Judgment on the pleadings in favor of defts and dismiss the complt.pltffs opposition papers due 11/5/04..govt's reply 11/15/04.. Document filed by Anderson, Bayer, Vivian Chang, Hollandsworth, Immigration and Naturalization Service, Lee, C. Parks. (pa, ) (Entered: 10/04/2004)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/11/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Berman from Lawrence H. Fogelman dated 08/09/04 re: Conference on 09/09/04 at 1:00 p.m. in Room 706, 40 Centre Street; (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 8/11/04) (djc, ) (Entered: 08/16/2004)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/2/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 2/27/04 before Judge Richard M. Berman.(ja, ) (Entered: 04/05/2004)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/26/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Berman from Lawrence H. Fogelman dated 3/24/04 : dft's writes to inform the Court that Ms. Change has not been personally served; let's deter briefing until all parties are served or dropped from suit. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 3/25/04) (pl, ) (Entered: 03/30/2004)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/27/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  MEMORANDUM TO THE DOCKET CLERK: that a status conference was held 2/27/04. Set motion to be filed by 3/26/04, response by 4/30/04; reply by 5/14/04. (pl, ) (Entered: 03/09/2004)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/20/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Berman from Lawrence H. Fogelman dated 2/18/2004 re:premotion conference to be held on 2/27/2004 at 12:00pm.. Application granted. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 2/20/2004) (jsa, ) (Entered: 02/23/2004)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/29/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Lawrence H. Fogelman dated 1/23/04 re: Government requests permission to file its motion by 2/20/04. Granted. Please call the Court Deputy after conference with all counsel to set a conference before motion practice. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 1/26/04) (dfe, ) (Entered: 02/04/2004)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/16/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from Lawrence H. Fogelman dated 12/12/2003 re: Pre-trial Conference issues. The Govt can raise the matters addressed in this letter and the issues of the December 5, 2003 order at the next pre-trial conference. (Signed by Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 12/16/2003) (Sacco, John) (Entered: 01/07/2004)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER, Case Management Conference set for 1/21/2004 at 10:45 AM, in Courtroom 228, U.S. Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 12/5/03) Copies Mailed By Chambers.(tp, ) (Entered: 12/23/2003)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Gorenstein from Lawrence H. Fogelman dated 12/4/03 re: the Government requests an extension until 2/2/04 for this Office to complete this investigation of the identities of John Doe I, John Doe II and Jane Doe I and for a determination to be reached concerning whether this Office is authorized to represent the John and Jane Does, and also Vebian Chang in this action. Application granted. (Signed by Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 12/8/03) (yv, ) (Entered: 12/22/2003)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/4/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Anderson, Bayer, Hollandsworth, Immigration and Naturalization Service, C. Parks.(moc, ) (Entered: 12/10/2003)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/16/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Magistrate Judge Gorenstein from Lawrence H. Fogelman, dated 10/15/03: Granting the Dept. of Homeland Securities request for a 45 day extension of time until 12/4/03 to file an answer or motion in response to the complaint. No further extensions. If authorizations are not received for ALL defendants by such date, the Government shall answer or move with respect to any defendant it represents . ( signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein ). (tp) (Entered: 10/20/2003)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/16/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                  Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Mag. Judge Gorenstein from Lawrence H. Fogelman, dated 9/12/03. Counsel for Dep't of Homeland Security requests a one-month extension, until 10/20/03, of the time to file an answer or motion in response to the complaint. Application granted. ( signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein ) (sb) (Entered: 09/19/2003)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/12/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                    Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Judge Berman from Lawrence H. Fogelman, dated 9/11/03. Re: Dept. of homeland Security requests extension of time until 10/20/03 to file answer or motion in response to the complaint. Please take up with Magistrate Judge Gorenstein to whom the matter has been referred . ( signed by Judge Richard M. Berman ). (tp) (Entered: 09/16/2003)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/9/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                      Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Judge Berman from Lawrence H. Fogelman, dated 7/7/03, reset answer to complaint due for 9/19/03 for I.N.S./Department of Homeland Security. See Court's rules re: any proposed motion(s) ( signed by Judge Richard M. Berman ); (cd) (Entered: 07/09/2003)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/19/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        U.S. MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE of summons and compliant executed as to I.N.S. by Ralph Latcha on 6/16/03 . Government Answer due on 8/15/03 for I.N.S. . (dle) (Entered: 06/23/2003)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/19/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE of S/C executed as to Lee by Ralph Latcha/certified mail on 5/14/03 . Government Answer due on 7/14/03 for Lee . (cd) (Entered: 05/22/2003)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/30/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                            Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for general pretrial/including initial case management conference. Referred to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein. ( signed by Judge Richard M. Berman ) (kw) (Entered: 05/01/2003)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/16/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              COMPLAINT filed. Summons issued and Notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). . (dle) (Entered: 04/21/2003)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/16/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                Order endorsed on declaration in support of request to proceed in forma pauperis; I.F.P. request is granted. ( signed by Chief Judge Michael B. Mukasey ) (dle) (Entered: 04/21/2003)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 110 times.

                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?