ELIZABETH ANNE HAWKENSON
Bankruptcy Case Arizona Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 2:16-bk-02468
District Judge Scott H. Gan, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2017 at 7:53 AM ST (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ELIZABETH ANNE HAWKENSON, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by ELIZABETH ANNE HAWKENSON

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ELIZABETH ANNE HAWKENSON
No Logo Russell Brown, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Chapter 13 Trustee

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space RUSSELL BROWN +1 602 277 8996 +1 602 253 8346
Office of the United States Trustee Office of the United States Trustee, U.S. Trustee
Officially listed as "U.S. TRUSTEE"
  Entries (54) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document (related document(s)53 Order Dismissing Case) (Admin.) (Entered: 09/01/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    ORDER Dismissing Case Debtor signed on 8/29/2016 . (Vargas, Rosario) (Entered: 08/30/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Chapter 13 Trustee Notice of Submitting Proposed Dismissal Order filed by RUSSELL BROWN of CHAPTER 13 TRUSTEE on behalf of RUSSELL BROWN (related document(s)38 Trustee Plan Recommendation (batch)).(BROWN, RUSSELL) (Entered: 08/24/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document (related document(s)49 Order on Motion for Relief from Stay) (Admin.) (Entered: 07/13/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s)49 Order on Motion for Relief from Stay) (Admin.) (Entered: 07/13/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            ORDER Granting Motion for Relief from Stay (Related Doc # 44) signed on 7/8/2016 . (Dominguez, Rhianna) (Entered: 07/08/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Notice of Lodging Proposed Order filed by NATHAN FREDERICK JONES SMITH of MALCOLM & CISNEROS, A LAW CORPORATION on behalf of RoundPoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order).(SMITH, NATHAN) (Entered: 07/07/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Certificate of Service and No Objections filed by NATHAN FREDERICK JONES SMITH of MALCOLM & CISNEROS, A LAW CORPORATION on behalf of RoundPoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation. (related document(s)42 Notice of Appearance, 43 Certification, 44 Motion for Relief from Stay (176.00 fee), 45 Notice of Motion for Relief from Stay, 46 Certificate of Mailing) (SMITH, NATHAN) (Entered: 07/07/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Certificate of Mailing filed by NATHAN FREDERICK JONES SMITH of MALCOLM & CISNEROS, A LAW CORPORATION on behalf of RoundPoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation. (related document(s)42 Notice of Appearance, 43 Certification, 44 Motion for Relief from Stay (176.00 fee), 45 Notice of Motion for Relief from Stay) (SMITH, NATHAN) (Entered: 06/20/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Notice of Motion for Relief from Stay filed by NATHAN FREDERICK JONES SMITH of MALCOLM & CISNEROS, A LAW CORPORATION on behalf of RoundPoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation (related document(s)42 Notice of Appearance, 43 Certification, 44 Motion for Relief from Stay (176.00 fee)) Objections/Responses due by 7/7/2016, (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order).(SMITH, NATHAN) (Entered: 06/20/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Motion for Relief from Stay (176.00 fee) filed by NATHAN FREDERICK JONES SMITH of MALCOLM & CISNEROS, A LAW CORPORATION on behalf of RoundPoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation (related document(s)42 Notice of Appearance, 43 Certification) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits). (SMITH, NATHAN) (Entered: 06/20/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Certification of Compliance With Local Rule 4001-1(b) filed by NATHAN FREDERICK JONES SMITH of MALCOLM & CISNEROS, A LAW CORPORATION on behalf of RoundPoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation. (related document(s)42 Notice of Appearance) (SMITH, NATHAN) (Entered: 06/20/2016)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Notice of Appearance filed by NATHAN FREDERICK JONES SMITH of MALCOLM & CISNEROS, A LAW CORPORATION on behalf of RoundPoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation.(SMITH, NATHAN) (Entered: 06/20/2016)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document (related document(s)39 Order on Motion for Relief from Stay) (Admin.) (Entered: 06/12/2016)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s)39 Order on Motion for Relief from Stay) (Admin.) (Entered: 06/12/2016)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                ORDER Granting Motion for Relief from Stay (Related Doc # 27) signed on 6/10/2016 . (Dominguez, Rhianna) (Entered: 06/10/2016)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Trustee Plan Recommendation. (BROWN, RUSSELL) (Entered: 06/10/2016)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Certificate of Service filed by KRISTIN E MCDONALD of McCarthy & Holthus, LLP on behalf of Western American Loan. (related document(s)35 Certificate of Service and No Objections, 36 Notice of Lodging Proposed Order) (MCDONALD, KRISTIN) (Entered: 06/09/2016)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Amended Notice of Lodging Proposed Order filed by KRISTIN E MCDONALD of McCarthy & Holthus, LLP on behalf of Western American Loan (related document(s)27 Motion for Relief from Stay (176.00 fee)) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit).(MCDONALD, KRISTIN) (Entered: 06/09/2016)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Certificate of Service and No Objections filed by KRISTIN E MCDONALD of McCarthy & Holthus, LLP on behalf of Western American Loan. (related document(s)27 Motion for Relief from Stay (176.00 fee)) (MCDONALD, KRISTIN) (Entered: 06/09/2016)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Deficiency Memo (related document(s)32 Notice of Lodging Proposed Order) (Martinez, Lupe) (Entered: 06/08/2016)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Certificate of Service filed by KRISTIN E MCDONALD of McCarthy & Holthus, LLP on behalf of Western American Loan (related document(s)31 Certificate of Service and No Objections, 32 Notice of Lodging Proposed Order).(MCDONALD, KRISTIN) (Entered: 06/08/2016)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Granting Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay filed by KRISTIN E MCDONALD of McCarthy & Holthus, LLP on behalf of Western American Loan (related document(s)27 Motion for Relief from Stay (176.00 fee)) (Attachments: # 1 Order).(MCDONALD, KRISTIN) (Entered: 06/08/2016)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Certificate of Service and No Objections filed by KRISTIN E MCDONALD of McCarthy & Holthus, LLP on behalf of Western American Loan. (related document(s)27 Motion for Relief from Stay (176.00 fee)) (MCDONALD, KRISTIN) (Entered: 06/08/2016)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Request for Notice filed by AVI SCHILD of ATLAS ACQUISITIONS LLC on behalf of Atlas Acquisitions LLC. (SCHILD, AVI) (Entered: 05/10/2016)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Notice of Appearance and Request for Special Notice filed by KRISTIN E MCDONALD of McCarthy & Holthus, LLP on behalf of Western American Loan.(MCDONALD, KRISTIN) (Entered: 05/04/2016)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Notice of Filing Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay Pursuant to 11 United States Code § 362 filed by KRISTIN E MCDONALD of McCarthy & Holthus, LLP on behalf of Western American Loan (related document(s)27 Motion for Relief from Stay (176.00 fee)).(MCDONALD, KRISTIN) (Entered: 05/04/2016)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Blank 27 Filed: 5/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Motion for Relief from Stay (176.00 fee) 2015 CHRYSLER 200, VIN: 1C3CCCAB6FN635326, Goodyear, AZ 85338 (AZ-16-124229) filed by KRISTIN E MCDONALD of McCarthy & Holthus, LLP on behalf of Western American Loan (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits # 2 Proof of Service). (MCDONALD, KRISTIN) (Entered: 05/04/2016)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Meeting of Creditors was held on date as scheduled filed by RUSSELL BROWN of CHAPTER 13 TRUSTEE on behalf of RUSSELL BROWN (related document(s) 2 Meeting of Creditors 13).(BROWN, RUSSELL) (Entered: 04/29/2016)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document (related document(s)23 Chapter 13 Plan and Application for Payment of Administrative Expense and Notice of Date to File Objection) (Admin.) (Entered: 03/31/2016)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s)23 Chapter 13 Plan and Application for Payment of Administrative Expense and Notice of Date to File Objection) (Admin.) (Entered: 03/31/2016)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                Chapter 13 Plan and Application for Payment of Administrative Expense and Notice of Date to File Objection filed by ELIZABETH ANNE HAWKENSON.(Dominguez, Rhianna) (Entered: 03/29/2016)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments filed by ELIZABETH ANNE HAWKENSON. (Dominguez, Rhianna) (Entered: 03/29/2016)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Meeting of Creditors (related document(s)20 BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 13) (Admin.) (Entered: 03/27/2016)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      Notice of Meeting of Creditors and Notice of Chapter 13 Procedures. Government Proof of Claims due by 9/12/2016, (Dominguez, Rhianna) (Entered: 03/25/2016)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        Notice of Appearance and Request for Special Notice, (AZ-16-124229) filed by KRISTIN E MCDONALD of McCarthy & Holthus, LLP on behalf of Western American Loan.(MCDONALD, KRISTIN) (Entered: 03/18/2016)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s)13 Notice of Financial Management Course Due) (Admin.) (Entered: 03/17/2016)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Meeting of Creditors (related document(s)12 BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint) (Admin.) (Entered: 03/17/2016)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s)5 Order to Pay Filing Fee in One Installment) (Admin.) (Entered: 03/16/2016)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s)3 Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)) (Admin.) (Entered: 03/16/2016)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s)4 Notice to Debtor Not Represented by an Attorney) (Admin.) (Entered: 03/16/2016)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    Notice of Financial Management Course Due (Dominguez, Rhianna) (Entered: 03/15/2016)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      ENTERED IN ERROR Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint--Notice of Meeting of Creditors (related document(s)1 Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition) (Dominguez, Rhianna) Modified on 3/25/2016 (Dominguez, Rhianna). (Entered: 03/15/2016)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments filed by ELIZABETH ANNE HAWKENSON. (Dominguez, Rhianna) (Entered: 03/15/2016)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period for 3 Years Form 122C-1. Disposable Income Is Not Determined filed by ELIZABETH ANNE HAWKENSON. (Dominguez, Rhianna) (Entered: 03/15/2016)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            Schedules and Statements for Individuals filed by ELIZABETH ANNE HAWKENSON. (Dominguez, Rhianna) (Entered: 03/14/2016)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              Master Mailing List filed by ELIZABETH ANNE HAWKENSON. (Dominguez, Rhianna) (Entered: 03/14/2016)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                Credit Counseling Certificate filed by ELIZABETH ANNE HAWKENSON. (Dominguez, Rhianna) (Entered: 03/14/2016)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  Statement of Social Security Number Submitted (related document(s)1 Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition) (Dominguez, Rhianna) (Entered: 03/14/2016)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    ORDER to Pay Filing Fee in One Installment Final Filing Fee Installment due by 3/28/2016, . (Bryant, Renee) (Entered: 03/14/2016)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      Notice to Debtor Not Represented by an Attorney (Bryant, Renee) (Entered: 03/14/2016)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        Deficiency Notice to Debtor and Attorney for Debtor That All Required Documents Were Not Filed. (Bryant, Renee) (Entered: 03/14/2016)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          Meeting of Creditors scheduled for 04/27/2016 at 09:00 AM at US Trustee Meeting Room, 230 N. First Avenue, Suite 102, Phoenix, AZ (341-PHX). Complaints objecting to discharge due by 06/27/2016. Proof of Claims due by 07/26/2016 (Bryant, Renee) (Entered: 03/14/2016)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition for Individuals Payment Advices Declaration Required by 11 USC Section 521(a)(1)(B)(iv) due by 3/28/2016, Chapter 13 Plan due 3/28/2016, filed by ELIZABETH ANNE HAWKENSON (Bryant, Renee) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/14/2016 (Dominguez, Rhianna). (Entered: 03/14/2016)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 3,382 times.

                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                               
                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                              Need Password Help?