Olender v. USA et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Middle District Court, Case No. 8:05-cv-02019
District Judge James D. Whittemore, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 23, 2017 at 3:03 AM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Valdy Olender, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Valdy Olender

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Valdy Olender +1 941 429 5515
v.
No Logo IRS, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Akerman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian R. Harris +1 813 209 5011 +1 813 218 5454 brian.harris@akerman.com
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Akerman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian R. Harris +1 813 209 5011 +1 813 218 5454 brian.harris@akerman.com
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7426
Nature of Suit 875 - Taxes: Customer Challenge
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/20/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 21 Motion to dismiss . Signed by Judge James D. Whittemore on 4/20/2006. (ejc) (Entered: 04/21/2006)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/14/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    SUPPLEMENT re 22 Response in opposition to motion by Valdy Olender. (ejc) (Entered: 03/16/2006)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/6/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      RESPONSE in opposition re 21 MOTION to dismiss Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction filed by Valdy Olender. (ejc) (Entered: 03/07/2006)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/10/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        MOTION to dismiss Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction by all defendants. (Harris, Brian) (Entered: 02/10/2006)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/30/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          PROOF of service upon Brian R. Harris (Tax Division / Dept. of Justice) by Valdy Olender. (ejc) (Entered: 01/17/2006)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/30/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            PROOF of service upon US Attorney General by Valdy Olender. (ejc) (Entered: 01/17/2006)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/30/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              PROOF of service upon IRS by Valdy Olender (ejc) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/17/2006 (ejc). Modified on 1/17/2006 (ejc). (Entered: 01/03/2006)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/30/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                RETURN of service executed on 12/13/2005 by Valdy Olender as to USA. (ejc) (Entered: 01/03/2006)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/30/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  NOTICE of proof of service of summons by Valdy Olender. (ejc) (Entered: 01/03/2006)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/14/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Summons issued as to USA, IRS, US Attorney General, Brian R. Harris. (ejc) (Entered: 12/14/2005)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/13/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      PROOF of service as to IRS/SB/SE by Valdy Olender. NOTE: Summons not issued by Clerk. (ejc) (Entered: 12/13/2005)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/13/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        PROOF of service as to US Attorney General by Valdy Olender. NOTE: Summons not issued by Clerk. (ejc) (Entered: 12/13/2005)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/13/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          PROOF of service as to Brian R. Harris by Valdy Olender. NOTE: Summons not issued by Clerk. (ejc) (Entered: 12/13/2005)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/13/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            PROOF of service as to US Attorney by Valdy Olender. NOTE: Summons not issued by Clerk. (ejc) (Entered: 12/13/2005)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/13/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              (Motion) PROOF of service all parties have been served summons by Valdy Olender (ejc) (Entered: 12/13/2005)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/21/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                RESPONSE re 4 Response to request for preliminary injunction filed by Valdy Olender. (ejc) (Entered: 11/22/2005)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/21/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  PROOF of service by Valdy Olender as to IRS, USA, and US Attorney General (ejc) (Entered: 11/22/2005)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/21/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    ORDER staying collection activity on the IRS lien(s) and levy. Signed by Judge James D. Whittemore on 11/21/2005. (kle) (Entered: 11/21/2005)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/21/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge James D. Whittemore : PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING held on 11/21/2005. Court Reporter: Linda Starr (ao) (Entered: 11/21/2005)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/18/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Brian R. Harris on behalf of USA, IRS (Harris, Brian) (Entered: 11/18/2005)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/17/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          RESPONSE re 1 Complaint Request for Preliminary Injunction by USA, IRS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Harris, Brian) (Entered: 11/17/2005)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/3/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 11/3/2005. (maa) (Entered: 11/04/2005)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/31/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              ORDER denying Plaintiff's request for 1 ex parte temporary restraining order. Scheduling hearing on Plaintiff's request for preliminary injunction for 11/21/05 at 10:00 A.M. See order for details. Signed by Judge James D. Whittemore on 10/31/2005. (kle) (Entered: 10/31/2005)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/31/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                COMPLAINT for damages for illegal Tax collection and Injunctive relief against USA, IRS ; jury demand (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number T034628), filed by Valdy Olender. (Attachments: # 1)(apv, ) (Entered: 10/31/2005)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 125 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?