Alvear v. 1 World Trade Center L.L.C.
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-02220
District Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 21, 2020 at 1:07 PM DT (11.1 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Santiago Alvear, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Worby Groner Edelman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher R. LoPalo +1 212 267 3700 +1 212 587 0031 clopalo@nkblaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Denise Ava Rubin
v.
No Logo 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo 1 WTC Holdings L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo 2 World Trade Center, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo 2 WTC Holdings L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo 4 World Trade Center, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo 4 WTC Holding L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo 5 World Trade Center, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo 5 WTC Holding L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo A Russo Wrecking, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Abatement Professionals (contractor), Defendant
No Logo ABM, Defendant
ABM Industries, Inc. ABM Industries, Inc., Defendant
No Logo ABM Janitorial Northeast, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Abscope Environmental, Inc., Defendant
No Logo AMEC Construction Management, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Amec Earth & Environmental, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Anthony Cortese Specialized Hauling L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Applied Environmental Inc. (Contractor), Defendant
No Logo Atlantic Heydt Corp., Defendant
No Logo Battery Park City Authority, Defendant
No Logo Bechtel Construction, Inc., Defendant
Bechtel Corporation Bechtel Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Bechtel Environmental, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Berkel & Company Contractors, Inc., Defendant
No Logo BFP Tower C Co., L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Big Apple Wrecking & Construction Corp., Defendant
No Logo Board of Education of The City of New York (Owner), Defendant
No Logo Boston Properties, Defendant
No Logo Bovis Lend Lease LMB, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Worby Groner Edelman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher R. LoPalo +1 212 267 3700 +1 212 587 0031 clopalo@nkblaw.com
No Logo Bovis Lend Lease, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Breeze Carting Corp., Defendant
No Logo Breeze National Inc., Defendant
No Logo Brer-Four Transportation Corp., Defendant
No Logo Bristol Environmental Inc. (Contractor), Defendant
No Logo Brown Brothers Harriman & Co, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Brown Brothers Harriman & Co, Defendant
No Logo Buro Happold Consulting Engineers, P.c., Defendant
No Logo C& D FireProofing & Plastering Corp., Defendant
No Logo C.B. Contracting Corp., Defendant
No Logo Canron Construction Corp., Defendant
No Logo Cantor Seinuk Group, PC, Defendant
Officially listed as "Cantor Seinuk Group"
No Logo Catamount Environmental Inc. (Contractor), Defendant
No Logo Certified Fence Corp., Defendant
No Logo Civetta-Cousins JV, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Clarcor Air Filtration Products, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Clayton Environmental Consultants, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by 100 Wall Street

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Abbie Lynn Eliasberg Fuchs +1 212 687 0100 +1 212 687 0659 cclark@harrisbeach.com
No Logo Component Assembly Systems, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Comprehensive Environmental Service Co. (contractor), Defendant
No Logo Consolidated Edison Communications Holding Company, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Consolidated Edison Development, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Consolidated Edison Energy, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Consolidated Edison Solutions, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Consolidated Edison, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Contaminant Control Inc. (Contractor) , Defendant
No Logo Coordinated Metals, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Cord Contracting Co., Inc., Defendant
No Logo Covino Environmental Associates Inc. (Contractor), Defendant
No Logo Craig Test Boring Company Inc., Defendant
No Logo Criterion Laboratories Inc. (Contractor), Defendant
No Logo Criticom International Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Cushman & Wakefield, Inc., Defendant
No Logo D'Onofrio General Contractors Corp., Defendant
No Logo Dakota Demo-Tech, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Darling Asbestos Disposal Company Inc. (contractor), Defendant
No Logo DCM Erectors, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Department of Business Services, Defendant
No Logo Diamond Point Excavating Corp., Defendant
No Logo Diego Construction, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Diversified Carting, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Diversified Environmental Corporation (contractor), Defendant
No Logo DMT Enterprise, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Dynaserv Industries, Inc. (Contractor), Defendant
No Logo Eagle Leasing & Industrial Supply, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Eagle One Roofing Contractors Inc., Defendant
No Logo Eagle Scaffolding Co., Inc., Defendant
No Logo EJ Davies, Inc., Defendant
No Logo En-Tech Corp., Defendant
No Logo Environmental Products and Services Inc. (Contractor), Defendant
No Logo Environmental Services and Technologies, Inc (Contractor), Defendant
No Logo Environmental Testing Inc. (Contractor), Defendant
No Logo ET Environmental, Defendant
No Logo Evergreen Recycling of Corona (EROC), Defendant
No Logo Ewell W. Finley, P.C., Defendant
No Logo Executive Medical Services, P.C., Defendant
No Logo F&G Mechanical, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Felix Equities, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Fleet Trucking, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Francis A. Lee Exterior Restoration, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Frank Micelli, Jr. Contracting, Inc., Defendant
No Logo FTI Trucking, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Gilsanz, Murray & Steficek, L.L.P., Defendant
No Logo Goldstein Associates Consulting Engineers, P.L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Grace Industries, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Hallen Welding Service, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Helmsman Management Services, Inc., Defendant
No Logo HGC Contracting Corp., Defendant
No Logo High Rise-Hoisting and Scaffolding, Inc., Defendant
No Logo High-Rise Electric, Inc., Defendant
No Logo JP Equipment Rental Materials, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Laquila Construction Inc., Defendant
No Logo LaStrada General Contracting Corp., Defendant
No Logo Leslie E. Robertson Associates Consulting Engineers, P.C., Defendant
Liberty Mutual Insurance Group, Inc. Liberty Mutual Insurance Group, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Liberty Mutual Insurance Company"
No Logo Liberty Mutual Managed Care Inc., Defendant
No Logo Lockwood Kessler & Bartlett, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Lucius Pitkin, Inc., Defendant
No Logo LVI Environmental Services Inc. (Contractor), Defendant
No Logo LVI Services Inc. (contractor), Defendant
No Logo LZA Tech-Div of Thorton Tomasetti, Defendant
No Logo Manafort Brothers, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Manafort Brothers Incorporated"
No Logo Marcor Remediation Inc. (Contractor), Defendant
No Logo Mazzocchi Wrecking, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Ment Bros. Iron Works Co., Inc., Defendant
No Logo Meridian Construction Group, Defendant
No Logo Milro Associates Inc. (Contractor), Defendant
No Logo Moody's Investors Service, Defendant
No Logo MRA Engineering, P.C., Defendant
No Logo Mueser Rutledge Consulting Engineers, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Musco Sports Lighting, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Nacirema Industries Incorporated, Defendant
No Logo New York City School Construction Authority, Defendant
No Logo New York Crane & Equipment Corp., Defendant
No Logo Nicholson Construction Company, Defendant
No Logo Norwich Laboratories (contractor), Defendant
No Logo NYC Industrial Development Agency, Defendant
No Logo Olympic Plumbing & Heating Corp., Defendant
No Logo Ove Arup & Partners, P.C., Defendant
No Logo PAR Environmental Corporation (Contractor), Defendant
No Logo Parson Group, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Peter Scalamandre & Sons, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Pinnacle, Defendant
No Logo Pinnacle Environment Corp., Defendant
No Logo Pinnacle Environmental Corporation (Contractor), Defendant
No Logo Plaza Construction Corp., Defendant
No Logo Plaza Construction Management Corp., Defendant
No Logo Port Authority of New York and New Jersey, Defendant
No Logo Potomac Abatement Inc. (Contractor), Defendant
No Logo Pro Safety Services, Llc, Defendant
No Logo PT & L Contracting Corp., Defendant
No Logo Regional Scaffolding & Hoisting Co., Inc., Defendant
No Logo Rober Silman Associates, Defendant
No Logo Robert Errat, Defendant
No Logo Robert L. Gerosa, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Royal Environmental Inc. (Contractor), Defendant
No Logo Royal GM, Inc., Defendant
No Logo SAB Trucking Inc., Defendant
No Logo Safeway Environmental Corp., Defendant
No Logo Seasons Industrial Contracting, Defendant
No Logo Sencam, Inc, (Contractor), Defendant
No Logo Sheldrake Organization, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Silverite Contracting Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Silverstein Development Corp., Defendant
No Logo Silverstein Properties, Defendant
No Logo Silverstein Properties, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Silverstein WTC Facility Manager L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Silverstein WTC L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Silverstein WTC Mgmt. Co., L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Silverstein WTC Properties L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Simpson Gumpertz & Heger Inc., Defendant
No Logo Skidmore, Owing & Merrill L.L.P., Defendant
No Logo Specialty Service Contracting Inc. (Contractor), Defendant
No Logo Star Delta Electric, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Stier Anderson, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Survivair, Defendant
No Logo Syska and Hennessey, Defendant
No Logo Tellabs Operations, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Martin Flannery +1 914 323 7000 +1 914 323 7001 john.flannery@wilsonelser.com
City of New York City of New York, Defendant
Officially listed as "The City of New York"
No Logo Tishman Construction Corporation of Manhattan, Defendant
No Logo Tishman Construction Corporation of New York, Defendant
No Logo Tishman Interiors Corporation (contractor), Defendant
Tishman Speyer Properties Tishman Speyer Properties, Defendant
No Logo Tomasetti Group, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Torretta Trucking, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Total Safety Consulting, LLC., Defendant
No Logo Tribeca Landing L.L.C. (Owner), Defendant
No Logo Trio Asbestos Removal, Defendant
No Logo TTI Environmental Services Inc. (contractor), Defendant
No Logo Tucci Equipment Rental Corp., Defendant
No Logo Tully Construction Co Inc, Defendant
No Logo Tully Construction Company, Defendant
No Logo Tully Environmental Inc., Defendant
No Logo Tully Industries, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Turner Construction Co., Defendant
Turner Construction Company Turner Construction Company, Defendant
No Logo Turner Construction International, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Ultimate Demolition/CS Hauling (Joint Venture), Defendant
No Logo United States Rebar, Inc., Defendant
Verizon New York Inc. Verizon New York Inc., Defendant
No Logo Vollmer Associates L.L.P., Defendant
No Logo W HARRIS & SONS INC, Defendant
No Logo Weeks Marine Inc., Defendant
No Logo Weidlinger Associates, Consulting Engineers, P.C., Defendant
No Logo Westfield America, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Westfield WTC Holding, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Westfield WTC, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo WFP Tower D. Co., L.P., Defendant
No Logo Whitney Contracting Inc., Defendant
No Logo William F. Collins Architects, Defendant
No Logo William F. Collins, Architect (contractor), Defendant
No Logo Wolkow-Braker Roofing Corp., Defendant
No Logo World Trade Center Properties LLC, Defendant
No Logo Yannuzzi & Sons, Inc., Defendant
No Logo YONKERS CONTRACTING Company INC., Defendant
No Logo York Hunter Construction, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Ziegenfuss Drilling, Inc., Defendant
No Logo HILLMAN ENVIRONMENTAL GROUP LLC, ADR Provider
No Logo HILLMANN ENVIRONMENTAL GROUP, LLC, ADR Provider

Toggle Switch Represented by Calabrese & Calabrese, Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Salvatore J. Calabrese +1 914 948 5700 +1 914 948 9612 salvatore.calabrese@admlaw.com
No Logo Port Authority of New York and New Jersey, ADR Provider
City of New York City of New York, ADR Provider
Officially listed as "The City of New York"
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 365 - Personal Injury: Product Liability
  Entries (85) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 10/21/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Order of Voluntary Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 9/3/2019, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 3/18/2019, Entered: None Amended Complaint
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Scott Connolly on behalf of Battery Park City Authority. (Connolly, Daniel) (Entered: 07/17/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rachel Bess Goldman on behalf of Battery Park City Authority. (Goldman, Rachel) (Entered: 07/17/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: None USCA Mandate
            MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to (104 in 1:06-cv-01525-AKH, 42 in 1:10-cv-06860-AKH, 120 in 1:06-cv-05344-AKH, 148 in 1:06-cv-05345-AKH, 93 in 1:06-cv-05289-AKH, 110 in 1:07-cv-01478-AKH, 143 in 1:06-cv-05335-AKH, 37 in 1:10-cv-06859-AKH, 64 in 1:08-cv-09069-AKH, 157 in 1:05-cv-03090-AKH, 93 in 1:06-cv-05325-AKH, 5912 in 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 81 in 1:10-cv-06868-AKH, 46 in 1:09-cv-10591-AKH) Notice of Appeal, filed by Office of New York State Attorney General Eric. T. Schneiderman, (72 in 1:06-cv-02220-AKH, 5923 in 1:21-mc-00102-AKH) Notice of Appeal, filed by Worby Groner Edelman & Napoli Bern, LLP, (5935 in 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 77 in 1:06-cv-02220-AKH) Amended Notice of Appeal, filed by Santiago Alvear, (5924 in 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 73 in 1:06-cv-02220-AKH) Notice of Appeal, filed by Office of New York State Attorney General Eric. T. Schneiderman, (76 in 1:06-cv-02220-AKH, 5929 in 1:21-mc-00102-AKH) Amended Notice of Appeal, filed by Office of New York State Attorney General Eric. T. Schneiderman, (48 in 1:10-cv-04226-AKH) Notice of Appeal filed by Henryk Ciborowski, Irena Barbara Ciborowski, (5913 in 1:21-mc-00102-AKH) Corrected Notice of Appeal, filed by Various plaintiffs represented by Cannata/Grochow, (47 in 1:10-cv-04226-AKH) Notice of Appeal filed by Office of New York State Attorney General Eric. T. Schneiderman. USCA Case Number 15-2181 (L), 15-2283 (Con.), 15-2285 (Con.), 15-2847 (Con.), 15-2506 (Con.), 15-2687 (Con.). The appeal in the above captioned case from an order of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York was submitted on the district court's record and the parties' briefs. Upon consideration thereof, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that the judgment of the district court is VACATED and the case is REMANDED for further proceedings consistent with this Court's opinion. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 06/29/2018. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(nd) (Entered: 07/03/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 6/6/2018, Entered: None USCA order
              OPINION of USCA (Certified) as to (104 in 1:06-cv-01525-AKH, 42 in 1:10-cv-06860-AKH, 120 in 1:06-cv-05344-AKH, 148 in 1:06-cv-05345-AKH, 93 in 1:06-cv-05289-AKH, 110 in 1:07-cv-01478-AKH, 143 in 1:06-cv-05335-AKH, 37 in 1:10-cv-06859-AKH, 64 in 1:08-cv-09069-AKH, 157 in 1:05-cv-03090-AKH, 93 in 1:06-cv-05325-AKH, 5912 in 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 81 in 1:10-cv-06868-AKH, 46 in 1:09-cv-10591-AKH) Notice of Appeal, filed by Office of New York State Attorney General Eric. T. Schneiderman, (72 in 1:06-cv-02220-AKH, 5923 in 1:21-mc-00102-AKH) Notice of Appeal, filed by Worby Groner Edelman & Napoli Bern, LLP, (5935 in 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 77 in 1:06-cv-02220-AKH) Amended Notice of Appeal, filed by Santiago Alvear, (5924 in 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 73 in 1:06-cv-02220-AKH) Notice of Appeal, filed by Office of New York State Attorney General Eric. T. Schneiderman, (6173 in 1:21-mc-00102-AKH) Notice of Appeal filed by Office of New York State Attorney General Eric. T. Schneiderman, (76 in 1:06-cv-02220-AKH, 5929 in 1:21-mc-00102-AKH) Amended Notice of Appeal, filed by Office of New York State Attorney General Eric. T. Schneiderman, (48 in 1:10-cv-04226-AKH) Notice of Appeal filed by Henryk Ciborowski, Irena Barbara Ciborowski, (47 in 1:10-cv-04226-AKH) Notice of Appeal filed by Office of New York State Attorney General Eric. T. Schneiderman. USCA Case Number 15-2181-cv(L), 15-2283-cv(Con), 15-2285-cv(Con), 15-2487-cv(Con), 15-2506-cv(Con), 15-2687-cv(Con). Plaintiffs brought tort and labor law claims against defendant-appellee Battery Park City Authority after their participation in post-9/11 cleanup efforts at sites defendant owns allegedly caused them to develop respiratory illnesses. The United States District Court for the Southern District of New York (Alvin K. Hellerstein, J.) granted summary judgment against plaintiffs on the ground that the New York law that had revived their otherwise time-barred claims was unconstitutional. Plaintiffs argue that New York's capacity-to-sue rule bars a public corporation like defendant from raising a constitutional challenge to state legislation, and that defendant's challenge fails on the merits. After certifying two questions to the New York Court of Appeals and receiving answers to those questions, we VACATE the judgment of the district court and REMAND the case for further proceedings.. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Certified: 06/06/2018. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(nd) (Entered: 06/06/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Andrew William Amend on behalf of Office of New York State Attorney General Eric. T. Schneiderman. New Address: New York State Office of the Attorney General, 28 Liberty Street, New York, NY, 10005, 212-416-8022. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(Amend, Andrew) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL re: (72 in 1:06-cv-02220-AKH, 5923 in 1:21-mc-00102-AKH) Notice of Appeal, (74 in 1:06-cv-02220-AKH, 74 in 1:06-cv-02220-AKH, 5925 in 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 5925 in 1:21-mc-00102-AKH) Order of Dismissal, Add and Terminate Parties,,,,. Document filed by Santiago Alvear. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:06-cv-02220-AKH(LoPalo, Christopher) (Entered: 07/30/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL re: (5924 in 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 73 in 1:06-cv-02220-AKH) Notice of Appeal, (5925 in 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 5925 in 1:21-mc-00102-AKH) Order of Dismissal, Add and Terminate Parties,,,, (5890 in 1:21-mc-00102-AKH) Order on Motion to Approve,,,,,. Document filed by Office of New York State Attorney General Eric. T. Schneiderman. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:06-cv-02220-AKH(Amend, Andrew) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      FILING ERROR - NO ORDER SELECTED FOR APPEAL - AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL re: (5924 in 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 73 in 1:06-cv-02220-AKH) Notice of Appeal,. Document filed by Office of New York State Attorney General Eric. T. Schneiderman. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:06-cv-02220-AKH(Amend, Andrew) Modified on 7/22/2015 (nd). (Entered: 07/21/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        ORDER: By Order dated June 16, 2015, I approved settlements on behalf of plaintiffs in 75 cases. See Order Approving Settlements in 75 Cases, No. 21MC102, ECF No. 5890 (S.D.N.Y. June 16, 2015). Exhibit B of that Order listed several cases against Battery Park City Authority as still open. That was in error. All cases against Battery Park City Authority by plaintiffs listed in the June 16, 2015 Order have been terminated. Battery Park City Authority terminated. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/16/2015) ***As per chambers, filed in 21mc102, and all cases listed in Exhibit B. (tn) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          NOTICE OF APPEAL from (5890 in 1:21-mc-00102-AKH) Order on Motion to Approve,,,,,. Document filed by Office of New York State Attorney General Eric. T. Schneiderman. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:06-cv-02220-AKH(Amend, Andrew) (Entered: 07/16/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            NOTICE OF APPEAL from (5890 in 1:21-mc-00102-AKH) Order on Motion to Approve,,,,,. Document filed by Worby Groner Edelman & Napoli Bern, LLP. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number 0208-11160835. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:06-cv-02220-AKH(LoPalo, Christopher) (Entered: 07/16/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENTS IN 75 CASES granting (5853 in 21mc102) Motion to Approve: that WGENB's motion to approve the settlements is GRANTED. The Clerk shall mark the motion (Doc. No. 5853) terminated. This second tranche of approved settlements results in the resolution of all claims of 31 of the 75 settling plaintiffs. Accordingly, the Clerk shall dismiss with prejudice the Complaints of the 31 plaintiffs listed in Exhibit A, attached hereto, and close their cases, subject to restoration by any party if settlements are not finalized. Exhibit B, attached hereto, shows the defendants who have settled and those who remain in these 44 cases. The Clerk shall dismiss with prejudice the Complaints of the plaintiffs against the settling defendants identified in Exhibit B, subject to restoration by any party if settlements are not finalized. As to the previously approved settlements, fully resolving 26 cases and partially resolving 52 cases, see In re World Trade Ctr. Lower Manhattan Disaster Site Litig., 2015 WL 1262283, Exhibit C, attached hereto, shows the defendants who since have settled and those who remain in those 52 cases. The Clerk shall dismiss with prejudice the Complaints of the plaintiffs against the settling defendants identified in Exhibit C, subject to restoration by any party if settlements are not finalized, and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/16/2015) ***As per chambers, filed in 21mc102 and all cases listed in Exhibits A, B and C. (tn) (Entered: 06/18/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                ORDER GRANTING BATTERY PARK CITY AUTHORITY'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Dkt. No. 5751 in 21mc102): that BPCA's motion is GRANTED and the claims against BPCA brought by the 171 plaintiffs listed in the attached schedule are dismissed. The Plaintiffs shall amend their Complaints by May 11, 2015. BPCA need not amend its Answer. The Clerk shall mark the motion (Doc. No. 5751) terminated. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 4/13/2015) ***As per chambers, filed in 21mc102, and all cases listed on Schedule A. (tn) (Entered: 04/16/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew William Amend on behalf of Office of New York State Attorney General Eric. T. Schneiderman. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(Amend, Andrew) (Entered: 04/02/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 2/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    ORDER COMPELLING SETTLEMENT MEDIATION CONFERENCES: that a settlement process is established for the remaining non-settled defendants, as identified on Exhibit A, in the 21-mc-102 docket. Counsel for plaintiffs and counsel for the non-settled defendants, along with representatives of their respective insurance carriers, who have the authority (but not the obligation) to settle as at the last made demand and/or offer, shall meet for settlement mediation conferences with the Special Masters. These mediation conferences will be held on February 25, 26, and 27, 2015; March 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, 2015; and March 9, 10, 11, 12 and 13, 2015. The in-person settlement mediation conferences shall be held at the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, located at 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 in Courtroom 14D or such other rooms as shall be designated by the Court. The conference schedule is annexed hereto as Exhibit A; and as further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/23/2015) As per chambers, Filed In Member Cases only: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(tn) (Entered: 02/23/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      MEMO ENDORSEMENT on (5014 AFFIRMATION of Daniel S. Corde in Opposition in case 1:21-mc-00102-AKH). ENDORSEMENT: Mr. Corde's responses are accepted, and the Court's Order to show cause (doc. no. 5006) is terminated as to the Jones Hirsch law firm. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/24/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(ft) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, the parties' counsel, that the plaintiffs' time to respond to the Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' claims for failure to prosecute, filed and served on May 24, 2013, originally set for June 7, 2013, shall be and hereby extended for 7 days, and thus shall be filed and served on or before Friday, June 14, 2013. The Defendants Reply papers shall be filed and served on or before Friday June 21, 2013., ( Responses due by 6/14/2013., Replies due by 6/21/2013.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/31/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(lmb) (Entered: 05/31/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/21/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          STIPULATION. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, the parties' counsel, that the Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendant NYSE Euronext to appear for depositions, that was filed and served on May 14, 2013 is resolved as follows: Defendant NYSE Euronext will produce Antoine P. Sultana, Managing Director, Global Real Estate and Corporate Services, for a deposition pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on June 3, 2013 at 10:00 AM at a location to be agreed upon by the parties. This deposition will continue day to day until completed. Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendant NYSE Euronext to appear for depositions, that was filed and served on May 14, 2013 is withdrawn without prejudice. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/20/2013). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al. (rjm) (Entered: 05/22/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 4/18/2013 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Ann Hairston, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/31/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/10/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/8/2013.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 05/06/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 2/22/2013 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Ann Hairston, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/6/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/16/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/15/2013.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 04/12/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/8/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION: Please take notice, that McGivney & Kluger, P.C. 80 Broad Street, 23rd Floor, New York, New York 10004, has been substituted as counsel in place and stead of Callan, Koster, Brady & Brennan, LLP. as attorneys for defendants Hudson View East Condominium and Board of Managers of the Hudson View East Condominium in the 21 MC 102 Docket for the Civil Action Numbers listed in Exhibit "A" attached hereto. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/7/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(js) (Entered: 03/08/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 1/16/2013 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Martha Drevis, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/22/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/4/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/2/2013.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 01/28/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 1/16/2013 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Martha Drevis, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/19/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/28/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/26/2013.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 01/23/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      PROTECTIVE ORDER NO. 1 GOVERNING THE DISCLOSURE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION AND CONFIDENTIAL INSURANCE INFORMATION...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material...(Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/2/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(djc) (Entered: 01/03/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/13/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 10/11/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 12/13/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/13/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 10/11/2012 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Karen Gorlaski, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/7/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/17/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/18/2013.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 12/13/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 8/2/2011 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Richards, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/10/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/20/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/19/2011.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 09/15/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              MEMO-ENDORSEMENT: re: in case 1:04-cv-05338-AKH; denying (4073) Motion for Reconsideration in case 1:21-mc-00102-AKH. ENDORSEMENT: The motion is denied. These law suits, approximately 2,000 in number, cannot be prosecuted effectively unless liaison counsels direct costs are equitably shared on a current basis. My order of August 19, 2011 so provides. Movants argument based on consensus and inequitable and partial sharing is rejected. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/29/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(pl) (Entered: 08/30/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 8/2/2011 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Richards, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/19/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/29/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/28/2011.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 08/26/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/25/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 8/2/2011 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Richards, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/19/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/29/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/28/2011.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 08/25/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/22/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT WITH TAYLOR RECYCLING AND DISMISSING CERTAIN PLAINTIFFS FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE: The Court has been advised that Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel, Worby Groner Edelman & Napoli Bern, LLP, and counsel for Taylor Recycling, LLP, have reached a settlement of all claims against Taylor Recycling in the above-captioned cases. The Court has received a pair of stipulations to dismiss settled cases. I rule as follows. The Settlement with Taylor Recycling is Fair and Reasonable, and the Claims of the 1,802 Plaintiffs who Filed Proper Settlement Paperwork is Endorsed. The Complaints of 26 Derivative Plaintiffs who Alleged Claims Against Taylor Recycling, but who did not File Proper Settlement Paperwork, Are Dismissed Involuntarily for Failure to Prosecute. A group of Plaintiffs who had to cure their paperwork held claims against Taylor Recycling. I have been informed that 26 of these Plaintiffs have not cured the defects in their paperwork. Accordingly, I dismiss the complaints of these 26 Plaintiffs for failure to prosecute under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). The dismissals are with prejudice. The list of 26 Plaintiffs is attached to this Order. One final point deserves notice. Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel submitted a proposed stipulation dismissing these 26 Plaintiffs, which suggests the dismissals are voluntary, that is, specifically requested by each such Plaintiff. It seems that this is not the case. Liaison Counsel's stipulation and proposed order of dismissal is rejected, and is being returned. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/21/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(jpo) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from James E. Tyrrell, Jr. dated 1/19/2011 re: Requesting an extension of time to object to the terms contained in the Order Accepting Report of Special Counsel and Providing for Effectiveness of Settlement. ENDORSEMENT: The request is granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/20/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(jpo) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/29/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER: On June 23, 2010, I entered Case Management Order Nos. 10, 7, and 2 in the 21 MC 100, 21 MC 102, and 21 MC 103 Consolidated Master Dockets, respectively. On October 27, 2010, I extended the potential expiration date of all three Case Management Orders to December 21, 2010. For the reasons stated on the record at the conference held on December 22, 2010, I hereby extend the December 21, 2010 deadline to February 2, 2011. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/28/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(db) (Entered: 12/29/2010)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          COMPLAINT BY ADOPTION/CHECK-OFF COMPLAINT Related to the Master Complaint 44 Complaint By Adoption/Check-Off Complaint, against ABM Industries, Inc., ABM Janitorial Northeast, Inc., AMEC Construction Management, Inc., Abscope Environmental, Inc., Amec Earth & Environmental, Inc., Anthony Cortese Specialized Hauling L.L.C., Atlantic Heydt Corp., BFP Tower C Co., L.L.C., Battery Park City Authority, Bechtel Construction, Inc., Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Environmental, Inc., Berkel & Company Contractors, Inc., Big Apple Wrecking & Construction Corp., Boston Properties, Bovis Lend Lease LMB, Inc., Bovis Lend Lease, Inc., Breeze Carting Corp., Breeze National Inc., Brer-Four Transportation Corp., Brown Brothers Harriman & CO., Buro Happold Consulting Engineers, P.C., C& D FireProofing & Plastering Corp., C.B. Contracting Corp., Canron Construction Corp., Cantor Seinuk Group, Certified Fence Corp., Civetta-Cousins JV, L.L.C., Clarcor Air Filtration Products, Inc., Clayton Environmental Consultants, Component Assembly Systems, Inc., Consolidated Edison Communications Holding Company, Inc., Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc., Consolidated Edison Development, Inc., Consolidated Edison Energy, Inc., Consolidated Edison Solutions, Inc., Consolidated Edison, Inc., Coordinated Metals, Inc., Cord Contracting Co., Inc., Craig Test Boring Company Inc., Criticom International Corporation, Cushman & Wakefield, Inc., D'Onofrio General Contractors Corp., DCM Erectors, Inc., DMT Enterprise, Inc., Dakota Demo-Tech, Inc., Department of Business Services, Diamond Point Excavating Corp., Diego Construction, Inc., Diversified Carting, Inc., EJ Davies, Inc., ET Environmental, Eagle Leasing & Industrial Supply, Inc., Eagle One Roofing Contractors Inc., Eagle Scaffolding Co., Inc., En-Tech Corp., Evergreen Recycling of Corona (EROC), Ewell W. Finley, P.C., Executive Medical Services, P.C., F&G Mechanical, Inc., FTI Trucking, Inc., Felix Equities, Inc., Fleet Trucking, Inc., Francis A. Lee Exterior Restoration, Inc., Frank Micelli, Jr. Contracting, Inc., Gilsanz, Murray & Steficek, L.L.P., Goldstein Associates Consulting Engineers, P.L.L.C., Grace Industries, Inc., HGC Contracting Corp., Hallen Welding Service, Inc., Helmsman Management Services, Inc., High Rise-Hoisting and Scaffolding, Inc., High-Rise Electric, Inc., JP Equipment Rental Materials, Inc., LZA Tech-Div of Thorton Tomasetti, LaStrada General Contracting Corp., Laquila Construction Inc., Leslie E. Robertson Associates Consulting Engineers, P.C., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Managed Care Inc., Lockwood, Kessler & Bartlett, Inc., Lucius Pitkin, Inc., MRA Engineering, P.C., Manafort Brothers Incorporated, Mazzocchi Wrecking, Inc., Ment Bros. Iron Works Co., Inc., Meridian Construction Group, Moody's Investors Service, Mueser Rutledge Consulting Engineers, Inc., Musco Sports Lighting, L.L.C., NYC Industrial Development Agency, Nacirema Industries Incorporated, New York Crane & Equipment Corp., Nicholson Construction Company, Olympic Plumbing & Heating Corp., Ove Arup & Partners, P.C., PT & L Contracting Corp., Parson Group, Inc., Peter Scalamandre & Sons, Inc., Pinnacle, Pinnacle Environment Corp., Plaza Construction Corp., Plaza Construction Management Corp., Port Authority of New York and New Jersey, Pro Safety Services L.L.C., Regional Scaffolding & Hoisting Co., Inc., Rober Silman Associates, Robert Errat, Robert L. Gerosa, Inc., Royal GM, Inc., SAB Trucking Inc., Safeway Environmental Corp., Seasons Industrial Contracting, Sheldrake Organization, Inc., Silverite Contracting Corporation, Silverstein Development Corp., Silverstein Properties, Silverstein Properties Inc., Silverstein WTC Facility Manager L.L.C., Silverstein WTC L.L.C., Silverstein WTC Mgmt. Co., L.L.C., Silverstein WTC Properties L.L.C., Simpson Gumpertz & Heger Inc., Skidmore, Owing & Merrill L.L.P., Star Delta Electric, Inc., Stier Anderson, L.L.C., Survivair, Syska and Hennessey, Tellabs Operations Inc., The City of New York, Tishman Construction Corporation of Manhattan, Tishman Construction Corporation of New York, Tishman Speyer Properties, Tomasetti Group, Inc., Torretta Trucking, Inc., Total Safety Consulting, L.L.C., Trio Asbestos Removal, Tucci Equipment Rental Corp., Tully Construction Co., Inc., Tully Construction Company, Tully Environmental Inc., Tully Industries, Inc., Turner Construction Co., Turner Construction Company, Turner Construction International, L.L.C., Ultimate Demolition/CS Hauling (Joint Venture), United States Rebar, Inc., Verizon New York Inc., Vollmer Associates L.L.P., W Harris & Sons Inc., WFP Tower D. Co., L.P., Weeks Marine, Inc., Weidlinger Associates, Consulting Engineers, P.C., Westfield America, Inc., Westfield WTC Holding, L.L.C., 1 WTC Holdings L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., 2 WTC Holdings L.L.C., 2 World Trade Center, L.L.C., 4 WTC Holding L.L.C., 4 World Trade Center, L.L.C., 5 WTC Holding L.L.C., 5 World Trade Center, L.L.C., A Russo Wrecking, Inc., ABM, Westfield WTC, L.L.C., Whitney Contracting Inc., William F. Collins Architects, Wolkow-Braker Roofing Corp., World Trade Center Properties L.L.C., Yannuzzi & Sons, Inc., Yonkers Contracting Company, Inc., York Hunter Construction, L.L.C., Ziegenfuss Drilling, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Santiago Alvear. Related document: 44 Complaint By Adoption/Check-Off Complaint, filed by Bovis Lend Lease LMB, Inc.(Docket Services Intern 6) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER ADJOURNING STATUS CONFERENCE 11/18/10 Status Conference reset for 12/3/2010 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 14D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/3/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(cd) (Entered: 11/03/2010)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/30/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                              STIPULATION: It is hereby sitpulated and agreed by and between the parties, that with respect to the actions listed "Schedule A" attached hereto, that each claim, cross-claim and counter-claim asserted by and against Defendant Pinnacle Environmental Corp., only as to the claims being made as to the premises identified in the First Amended Master Complaint and individual; Check-off Complaint as 140 West Street, New York, NY 1007, shall be and are hereby discontinued without prejudice and without costs as to any party against the other. It is further stipulated and agreed that upon Amended Master Complaint and Amended Form Check-Off Complaint, Plaintiffs will remove all references to Defendant Pinnacle Environmental Corp. with regard to 140 West Street, New York, NY 10007. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/30/2010) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(jpo) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/12/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE: Status Conference set for 8/19/2010 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 14D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/9/2010) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(jpo) (Entered: 08/12/2010)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, the attorneys of record for the Plaintiffs listed on the attached Schedule A, and the attorneys for defendants BFP One Liberty Plaza Co. LP, BFP One Liberty Plaza Co., LLC, BFP Tower C Co. LLC, Brookfield Financial Properties, Inc., WFP Tower A Co., LP, WFP Tower B Co., LP and WFP Tower D Co., LP (collectively the "Brookfield Parties") in these actions, that whereas no party hereto is an infant or incompetent person for whom a committee has been appointed, and no person not a party has an interest in the subject matter of this action, the matters listed on the attached Schedule A are hereby discontinued without prejudice as against the above-named Brookfield Parties only, and without costs to any party... and as further set forth. Relates to All cases listed in Schedule A. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 4/27/10) (rjm) (Entered: 04/29/2010)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/28/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT BY ADOPTION/CHECK-OFF COMPLAINT Related to the Master Complaint 43 Complaint By Adoption/Check-Off Complaint, against Bovis Lend Lease LMB, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Bovis Lend Lease LMB, Inc. Related document: 43 Complaint By Adoption/Check-Off Complaint, filed by Santiago Alvear.(jmi) (Entered: 03/01/2010)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT BY ADOPTION/CHECK-OFF COMPLAINT Related to the Master Complaint 1 Complaint, against Liberty Mutual Insurance Company with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Santiago Alvear. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by Santiago Alvear.(jmi) (Entered: 03/01/2010)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                        STIPULATION OF DISCONTINUANCE AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO ABSCOPE ENVIRONMENTAL INC. This order relates to: Cases listed in Exhibit A. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED, CONSENTED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, the attorneys of record for the parties to the above-titled action, that whereas no party hereto is an infant, incompetent person for whom a committee has been appointed or conservatee and no person not a party has an interest in the subject matter of the action, the above entitled action be, and the same hereby is discontinued without prejudice as against defendant ABSCOPE ENVIRONMENTAL INC. only, without costs to either party as against the other... and as further set forth. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/27/10) (rjm) (Entered: 02/04/2010)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER ANSWER. Document filed by Syska and Hennessey. (Pollack, David) (Entered: 08/10/2009)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/30/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER ANSWER. Document filed by William F. Collins Architects. (Pollack, David) (Entered: 07/30/2009)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/24/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                              MEMO ENDORSEMENT ON NOTICE OF MOTION for Sanctions against the Worby Groner Edelman & Napoli Bern, LLP Firm in case 1:04-cv-05338-AKH; denying (3450) Motion for Sanctions in case 1:21-mc-00102-AKH. ENDORSEMENT: Motion for sanctions is denied. There has been no showing that a ruling in 21 MC 100 is applicable to litigation in 21 MC 102 or 21 MC 103. Defendants may consider filing a motion for injunction against plaintiff's splitting essentially the same courses of action: suing some defendants in federal court, and other defendants in state court. An Order to Show Course may be presented immediately following the oral arguments scheduled to be heard 7/28/09. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/24/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(rjm) (Entered: 07/27/2009)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/8/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, the parties' counsel, that the Defendant, Battery Park City Authority's time to submit a Reply to its Motion to Dismiss Complaint which was filed and served on May 14, 2009, shall be and hereby is extended until July 24, 2009. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/7/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(rjm) (Entered: 07/09/2009)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/15/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  FIRST NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER ANSWER. Document filed by HILLMANN ENVIRONMENTAL GROUP, LLC. (Calabrese, Salvatore) (Entered: 06/15/2009)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/28/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER, by and between the undersigned, the parties' counsel, that the plaintiffs' time to respond to the Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaints on behalf of the Battery Park City Authority, filed and served on May 14, 2009, originally set for May 28, 2009, shall be and hereby is extended for 21 days, and thus shall be filed and served on or before Friday, June 19, 2009. SO ORDERED ( Responses due by 6/19/2009) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/28/2009) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(jmi) (Entered: 05/29/2009)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER. That the Defendant's motion to have Thomas R. Harrington, Esquire admitted to practice law in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York pro hac vice in connection with the above-captioned case is GRANTED. Counsel is directed to immediately apply for an ECF password at www.nysd.uscourts.gov and shall forward the pro hac vice fee to the Clerk of the Court. THIS DOCUMENT APPLIES TO ALL CASES IN THE WORLD TRADE CENTER LOWER MANHATTAN DISASTER SITE LITIGATION IN WHICH AIG REALTY, INC., AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP, INC. AND AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL REALTY CORP. IS A DEFENDANT. Relates to 21mc102, 21mc103. granting (3250 in Case No. 21mc102) Motion for Thomas R. Harrington to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:21-mc-00102-AKH. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/19/09). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(rjm) (Entered: 05/21/2009)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (60 in 1:06-cv-01786-AKH, 44 in 1:06-cv-10237-AKH, 34 in 1:06-cv-15084-AKH, 3257 in 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 83 in 1:06-cv-04171-AKH, 53 in 1:05-cv-01104-AKH, 58 in 1:06-cv-01340-AKH, 45 in 1:06-cv-15116-AKH, 157 in 1:05-cv-01093-AKH, 31 in 1:06-cv-09674-AKH, 31 in 1:06-cv-03846-AKH, 49 in 1:06-cv-01032-AKH, 15 in 1:06-cv-14047-AKH, 31 in 1:05-cv-10741-AKH, 79 in 1:06-cv-02527-AKH, 26 in 1:06-cv-14496-AKH, 38 in 1:06-cv-11892-AKH, 28 in 1:06-cv-04376-AKH, 29 in 1:06-cv-06233-AKH, 38 in 1:06-cv-12772-AKH, 87 in 1:06-cv-01521-AKH, 44 in 1:05-cv-01636-AKH, 62 in 1:06-cv-08278-AKH, 66 in 1:06-cv-13166-AKH, 33 in 1:06-cv-02220-AKH, 20 in 1:06-cv-12120-AKH, 78 in 1:05-cv-06269-AKH, 45 in 1:06-cv-14623-AKH, 76 in 1:06-cv-06814-AKH, 56 in 1:06-cv-13787-AKH, 50 in 1:06-cv-03422-AKH, 16 in 1:06-cv-08853-AKH, 40 in 1:07-cv-00061-AKH, 64 in 1:06-cv-01513-AKH, 38 in 1:06-cv-07913-AKH, 89 in 1:06-cv-02748-AKH, 40 in 1:05-cv-01272-AKH, 44 in 1:06-cv-13211-AKH, 52 in 1:05-cv-01260-AKH, 10 in 1:06-cv-14139-AKH, 57 in 1:06-cv-12826-AKH, 31 in 1:06-cv-07912-AKH, 59 in 1:06-cv-13703-AKH, 53 in 1:06-cv-14741-AKH, 45 in 1:06-cv-11532-AKH, 58 in 1:07-cv-00060-AKH, 64 in 1:05-cv-05666-AKH, 30 in 1:06-cv-07911-AKH, 100 in 1:05-cv-01691-AKH, 24 in 1:06-cv-11647-AKH, 53 in 1:06-cv-06521-AKH, 18 in 1:05-cv-01379-AKH, 78 in 1:06-cv-01649-AKH, 46 in 1:05-cv-01198-AKH, 40 in 1:06-cv-02813-AKH, 42 in 1:06-cv-06234-AKH, 29 in 1:06-cv-13784-AKH, 46 in 1:06-cv-01341-AKH, 41 in 1:05-cv-02501-AKH, 72 in 1:06-cv-14554-AKH, 25 in 1:06-cv-03932-AKH, 61 in 1:06-cv-02884-AKH, 13 in 1:06-cv-12425-AKH, 68 in 1:06-cv-13168-AKH, 35 in 1:06-cv-14619-AKH, 27 in 1:06-cv-02814-AKH, 52 in 1:07-cv-00057-AKH, 32 in 1:06-cv-15118-AKH, 35 in 1:06-cv-14824-AKH, 162 in 1:05-cv-01091-AKH, 46 in 1:05-cv-01675-AKH, 46 in 1:06-cv-13702-AKH, 71 in 1:06-cv-11534-AKH, 60 in 1:06-cv-12341-AKH, 27 in 1:06-cv-10823-AKH) MOTION to Dismiss. against Battery Park City Authority. Document filed by Battery Park City Authority. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(Avila, Allyson) (Entered: 05/20/2009)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaints (Part 1 of 4). Document filed by Battery Park City Authority.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(Avila, Allyson) (Entered: 05/20/2009)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/14/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (32 in 1:06-cv-15084-AKH, 56 in 1:07-cv-00060-AKH, 50 in 1:07-cv-00057-AKH, 43 in 1:06-cv-15116-AKH, 33 in 1:06-cv-14824-AKH, 38 in 1:07-cv-00061-AKH, 3242 in 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 30 in 1:06-cv-15118-AKH) MOTION to Dismiss. The Plaintiff's Complaints Against Battery Park City Authority (Part 1 of 4). Document filed by Battery Park City Authority. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(Avila, Allyson) (Entered: 05/14/2009)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/6/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER ANSWER. Document filed by Abscope Environmental, Inc.. (Gallagher, Timothy) (Entered: 04/06/2009)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER ANSWER. Document filed by Tellabs Operations Inc.. (Flannery, John) (Entered: 04/03/2009)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/20/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Salvatore J. Calabrese on behalf of HILLMANN ENVIRONMENTAL GROUP, LLC (Calabrese, Salvatore) (Entered: 03/20/2009)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/18/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER by and between the undersigned, the attorneys of record for the parties to the actions listed in "Schedule A" and "Schedule B" attached hereto, that whereas no part herein is an infant, incompetent person for whom a committee has been appointed or conservatee and no person not a party has an interest in the subject matter of this action, and based on the representation of the within Defendant, and to the extent Plaintiff(s) can so stipulate, that each claim, cross-claim and counter-claim asserted by and against Defendant NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF SMALL BUSINESS SERVICES ("DSBS'), only as to the claims being made as to the premises located at 345 Chambers St. (Stuyvesant High School), New York, New York, shall be and are hereby discontinued without prejudice and without costs to any party as against the other. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED that should evidence be discovered throughout this litigation which determines that the NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF SMALL BUSINESS SERVICES is a proper entity to this suit, that Plaintiff(s) may reinstitute the actions listed herein without regard to the applicable Statute of Limitations, assuming said original action was timely commenced, and in such instance Defendant shall not assert Statute of Limitation as a defense. This Stipulation maybe filed without notice with the Clerk of the Court. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/17/2009) (jmi) (Entered: 02/20/2009)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/12/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Breeze Carting Corp. served on 5/30/2006, answer due 6/19/2006. Document filed by Santiago Alvear. (Rubin, Denise) (Entered: 11/12/2008)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/2/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Bovis Lend Lease LMB, Inc. served on 6/16/2006, answer due 7/6/2006. Service was accepted by Kristen M Hackford. Document filed by Santiago Alvear. (LoPalo, Christopher) (Entered: 11/02/2008)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER ANSWER. Document filed by Battery Park City Authority. (Flannery, John) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/25/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER ANSWER. Document filed by Clayton Environmental Consultants. (Eliasberg Fuchs, Abbie) (Entered: 09/25/2008)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/25/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Abbie Lynn Eliasberg Fuchs on behalf of Clayton Environmental Consultants (Eliasberg Fuchs, Abbie) (Entered: 09/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER ANSWER. Document filed by Brown Brothers Harriman & CO.. (Leff, Richard) (Entered: 06/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL... that whereas no party hereto is an infant or incompetent person for whom a committee has been appointed and no person not a party has an interest in the subject matter of the actions, the above actions listed are discontinued without prejudice against -Cushman and Wakefield, Inc.- only, without costs to either party as against the other... and as further set forth in said stipulation and order. This Document relates to All Cases listed in this document. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 4/4/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00100-AKH et al.(rjm) (Entered: 04/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/5/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Adoption of Answer to Master Complaint. Document filed by Verizon New York Inc.. (Reisman, Michael) (Entered: 12/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of ADOPTION (ANSWER TO MASTER COMPLAINT). Document filed by HILLMAN ENVIRONMENTAL GROUP LLC. (Rosmarin, Sam) (Entered: 09/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Turner Construction Co. served on 6/16/2006, answer due 7/6/2006; Turner Construction Company served on 6/16/2006, answer due 7/6/2006; Turner Construction International, L.L.C. served on 6/16/2006, answer due 7/6/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Santiago Alvear. (Napoli, Paul) (Entered: 07/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Whitney Contracting Inc. served on 6/29/2006, answer due 7/19/2006. Service was accepted by Linda Cerreta. Document filed by Santiago Alvear. (Napoli, Paul) (Entered: 07/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Tucci Equipment Rental Corp. served on 5/30/2006, answer due 6/19/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Santiago Alvear. (Napoli, Paul) (Entered: 07/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Total Safety Consulting, L.L.C. served on 5/24/2006, answer due 6/13/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Santiago Alvear. (Napoli, Paul) (Entered: 07/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Tishman Speyer Properties served on 5/26/2006, answer due 6/15/2006. Service was accepted by Shari Harrison. Document filed by Santiago Alvear. (Napoli, Paul) (Entered: 07/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Tishman Construction Corporation of Manhattan served on 6/16/2006, answer due 7/6/2006; Tishman Construction Corporation of New York served on 6/16/2006, answer due 7/6/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Santiago Alvear. (Napoli, Paul) (Entered: 07/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. The City of New York served on 5/23/2006, answer due 6/12/2006. Service was accepted by Madelyn Santana. Document filed by Santiago Alvear. (Napoli, Paul) (Entered: 07/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Hallen Welding Service, Inc. served on 6/20/2006, answer due 7/10/2006. Service was accepted by Laura Distasi. Document filed by Santiago Alvear. (Napoli, Paul) (Entered: 07/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Safeway Environmental Corp. served on 5/30/2006, answer due 6/19/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Santiago Alvear. (Napoli, Paul) (Entered: 07/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Port Authority of New York and New Jersey served on 5/26/2006, answer due 6/15/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Santiago Alvear. (Napoli, Paul) (Entered: 06/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Moody's Investors Service served on 5/26/2006, answer due 6/15/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Santiago Alvear. (Napoli, Paul) (Entered: 06/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. LaStrada General Contracting Corp. served on 5/24/2006, answer due 6/13/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Santiago Alvear. (Napoli, Paul) (Entered: 06/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. High Rise-Hoisting and Scaffolding, Inc. served on 5/24/2006, answer due 6/13/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Santiago Alvear. (Napoli, Paul) (Entered: 06/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Fleet Trucking, Inc. served on 5/24/2006, answer due 6/13/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Santiago Alvear. (Napoli, Paul) (Entered: 06/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/27/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. ET Environmental served on 5/26/2006, answer due 6/15/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Santiago Alvear. (Napoli, Paul) (Entered: 06/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/27/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. D'Onofrio General Contractors Corp. served on 6/16/2006, answer due 7/6/2006; Diego Construction, Inc. served on 6/16/2006, answer due 7/6/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Santiago Alvear. (Napoli, Paul) (Entered: 06/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/27/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Cushman & Wakefield, Inc. served on 5/26/2006, answer due 6/15/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Santiago Alvear. (Napoli, Paul) (Entered: 06/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/20/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT against Laquila Construction Inc., LaStrada General Contracting Corp., Leslie E. Robertson Associates Consulting Engineers, P.C., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Managed Care Inc., Lockwood, Kessler & Bartlett, Inc., Lucius Pitkin, Inc., LZA Tech-Div of Thorton Tomasetti, Manafort Brothers Incorporated, Mazzocchi Wrecking, Inc., Ment Bros. Iron Works Co., Inc., Meridian Construction Group, Moody's Investors Service, MRA Engineering, P.C., Mueser Rutledge Consulting Engineers, Inc., Musco Sports Lighting, L.L.C., Nacirema Industries Incorporated, New York Crane & Equipment Corp., NYC Industrial Development Agency, Nicholson Construction Company, Olympic Plumbing & Heating Corp., Ove Arup & Partners, P.C., Parson Group, Inc., Peter Scalamandre & Sons, Inc., Pinnacle, Pinnacle Environment Corp., Plaza Construction Corp., Plaza Construction Management Corp., Pro Safety Services L.L.C., PT & L Contracting Corp., Regional Scaffolding & Hoisting Co., Inc., Rober Silman Associates, Robert Errat, Robert L. Gerosa, Inc., Royal GM, Inc., SAB Trucking Inc., Safeway Environmental Corp., Seasons Industrial Contracting, Sheldrake Organization, Inc., Silverite Contracting Corporation, Silverstein Development Corp., Silverstein Properties Inc., Silverstein Properties, Silverstein WTC Facility Manager L.L.C., Silverstein WTC L.L.C., Silverstein WTC Mgmt. Co., L.L.C., Silverstein WTC Properties L.L.C., Simpson Gumpertz & Heger Inc., Skidmore, Owing & Merrill L.L.P., Star Delta Electric, Inc., Stier Anderson, L.L.C., Survivair, Tishman Construction Corporation of Manhattan, Tishman Construction Corporation of New York, Tishman Speyer Properties, Tomasetti Group, Inc., Torretta Trucking, Inc., Total Safety Consulting, L.L.C., Trio Asbestos Removal, Tucci Equipment Rental Corp., Tully Construction Co., Inc., Tully Construction Company, Tully Environmental Inc., Tully Industries, Inc., Turner Construction Co., Turner Construction Company, Turner Construction International, L.L.C., Ultimate Demolition/CS Hauling (Joint Venture), United States Rebar, Inc., Vollmer Associates L.L.P., W Harris & Sons Inc., Weeks Marine, Inc., Weidlinger Associates, Consulting Engineers, P.C., Westfield America, Inc., Westfield WTC Holding, L.L.C., Westfield WTC, L.L.C., WFP Tower D. Co., L.P., Whitney Contracting Inc., Wolkow-Braker Roofing Corp., World Trade Center Properties L.L.C., Yannuzzi & Sons, Inc., Yonkers Contracting Company, Inc., York Hunter Construction, L.L.C., Ziegenfuss Drilling, Inc., Department of Business Services, Verizon New York Inc., 2 World Trade Center, L.L.C., 2 WTC Holdings L.L.C., 4 World Trade Center, L.L.C., 4 WTC Holding L.L.C., 5 World Trade Center, L.L.C., 5 WTC Holding L.L.C., A Russo Wrecking, Inc., ABM, ABM Industries, Inc., ABM Janitorial Northeast, Inc., AMEC Construction Management, Inc., Amec Earth & Environmental, Inc., Anthony Cortese Specialized Hauling L.L.C., Atlantic Heydt Corp., Bechtel Construction, Inc., Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Environmental, Inc., Berkel & Company Contractors, Inc., BFP Tower C Co., L.L.C., Big Apple Wrecking & Construction Corp., Boston Properties, Bovis Lend Lease LMB, Inc., Bovis Lend Lease, Inc., Breeze Carting Corp., Breeze National Inc., Brer-Four Transportation Corp., Buro Happold Consulting Engineers, P.C., C& D FireProofing & Plastering Corp., C.B. Contracting Corp., Canron Construction Corp., Cantor Seinuk Group, 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., Certified Fence Corp., Civetta-Cousins JV, L.L.C., Clarcor Air Filtration Products, Inc., Component Assembly Systems, Inc., Consolidated Edison Communications Holding Company, Inc., Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc., Consolidated Edison Development, Inc., Consolidated Edison Energy, Inc., Consolidated Edison Solutions, Inc., Consolidated Edison, Inc., 1 WTC Holdings L.L.C., Coordinated Metals, Inc., Cord Contracting Co., Inc., Craig Test Boring Company Inc., Criticom International Corporation, Cushman & Wakefield, Inc., D'Onofrio General Contractors Corp., Dakota Demo-Tech, Inc., DCM Erectors, Inc., Diamond Point Excavating Corp., Diego Construction, Inc., Diversified Carting, Inc., DMT Enterprise, Inc., Eagle Leasing & Industrial Supply, Inc., Eagle One Roofing Contractors Inc., Eagle Scaffolding Co., Inc., EJ Davies, Inc., En-Tech Corp., ET Environmental, Evergreen Recycling of Corona (EROC), Ewell W. Finley, P.C., Executive Medical Services, P.C., F&G Mechanical, Inc., Felix Equities, Inc., Fleet Trucking, Inc., Francis A. Lee Exterior Restoration, Inc., Frank Micelli, Jr. Contracting, Inc., FTI Trucking, Inc., Gilsanz, Murray & Steficek, L.L.P., Goldstein Associates Consulting Engineers, P.L.L.C., Grace Industries, Inc., Hallen Welding Service, Inc., Helmsman Management Services, Inc., HGC Contracting Corp., High-Rise Electric, Inc., High Rise-Hoisting and Scaffolding, Inc., JP Equipment Rental Materials, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 250.00, Receipt Number 573550)Document filed by Santiago Alvear.(laq, ) (Entered: 03/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 132 times.

                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?