John Doe, I, et al v. Daniel Cummins, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit, Case No. 16-3334

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 26, 2016 at 2:43 AM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 3448 - Civil Rights
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Oral argument acknowledgment filed by Attorney Mr. Joshua Adam Engel for Appellants John Doe, I and John Doe, II. Certificate of Service: 08/25/2016. (JAE)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Oral argument acknowledgment filed by Attorney Mr. Evan T. Priestle for Appellees UC, Daniel Cummins, Denine Rocco and Debra Merchant. Certificate of Service: 08/25/2016. (ETP)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Oral argument date set for 9:00 a.m. on Thursday, September 29, 2016. Notice of argument sent to counsel on 08/11/2016. (LAG)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        RESPONSE in opposition filed regarding an additional citation, [20]. Response from Attorney Ms. R. Doreen Canton for Appellees UC, Daniel Cummins, Denine Rocco and Debra Merchant. Certificate of Service:08/09/2016. (RDC)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          ADDITIONAL CITATION filed by Mr. Joshua Adam Engel for John Doe, I and John Doe, II. Certificate of Service: 07/29/2016. (JAE)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            REPLY BRIEF filed by Attorney Mr. Joshua Adam Engel for Appellants John Doe, I and John Doe, II. Certificate of Service:07/05/2016. (JAE)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              APPELLEE BRIEF filed by Ms. R. Doreen Canton for UC, Daniel Cummins, Denine Rocco and Debra Merchant. Certificate of Service:06/28/2016. Argument Request: requested. (RDC)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Daniel Cummins, Debra Merchant, Denine Rocco and UC by Evan T. Priestle. Certificate of Service: 06/28/2016. (ETP)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  CORRECTED APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Joshua Adam Engel for John Doe, I and John Doe, II. Certificate of Service:05/25/2016. Argument Request: requested. (JAE)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    BRIEFING LETTER SENT requesting brief corrections from Mr. Joshua Adam Engel for John Doe, I and John Doe, II because 1) designation of relevant district court documents with appropriate references, 2) corrected table of contents including designation. Corrected brief due: 06/08/2016. The appellant's optional reply brief is due 06/27/16. (BLC)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 75 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?