Paulsen v. Primeflight Aviation Services, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-05338
District Judge Brian M. Cogan, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 1, 2017 at 10:59 PM DT (3.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo James G. Paulsen, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by National Labor Relations Board

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brady Francisco-FitzMaurice +1 718 330 2819 +1 718 330 7579 brady.francisco-fitzmaurice@nlrb.gov
v.
No Logo Primeflight Aviation Services, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Franklin Birchfield +1 212 492 2518 +1 212 492 2501 frank.birchfield@ogletreedeakins.com
No Logo SEIU Local 32BJ, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by SEIU Local 32BJ

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brent Leland Garren +1 212 388 3943 +1 212 388 2062 bgarren@seiu32bj.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jessica Drangel Ochs +1 212 239 4999 +1 212 239 1311 jochs@seiu32bj.org
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 160(1)
Nature of Suit 720 - Labor: Labor/Management Relations
  Entries (37) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: None Notice of Cross Appeal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/29/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      RESPONSE in Opposition re 31 MOTION to Stay re 7 Order to Show Cause, and/or Suspend Injunction Pending Appeal filed by James G. Paulsen. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Francisco-FitzMaurice, Brady) (Entered: 12/14/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Alter Judgment
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          REPLY to Response to Motion re 29 Emergency MOTION to Alter Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59(e) filed by James G. Paulsen. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Francisco-FitzMaurice, Brady) (Entered: 12/08/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: None Memorandum in Support
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: None Stay
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                RESPONSE in Opposition re 29 Emergency MOTION to Alter Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59(e) filed by Primeflight Aviation Services, Inc.. (Birchfield, William) (Entered: 12/01/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Alter Judgment
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: None Affidavit/Affirmation
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/27/2016, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION.( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 10/24/2016 ) (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 10/24/2016)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank 24 Filed: 10/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER dated 10/24/16 that the 5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is granted in part. The terms of the preliminary injunction as set forth above will be issued separately. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 10/24/2016 ) (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 10/24/2016)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Exhibits to be filed) filed by Primeflight Aviation Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2) (Birchfield, William) (Entered: 10/07/2016)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Exhibits to be filed) filed by Primeflight Aviation Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3) (Birchfield, William) (Entered: 10/07/2016)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Exhibits to be filed) filed by Primeflight Aviation Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1) (Birchfield, William) (Entered: 10/07/2016)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: None Answer
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: None Memorandum in Support
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Brent Garren on behalf of SEIU Local 32BJ (aty to be noticed) (Garren, Brent) (Entered: 09/30/2016)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Letter regarding Respondent's request for an extension of time by James G. Paulsen (Francisco-FitzMaurice, Brady) (Entered: 09/30/2016)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 7 Order to Show Cause, by Primeflight Aviation Services, Inc.. (Birchfield, William) (Entered: 09/29/2016)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by William Franklin Birchfield on behalf of Primeflight Aviation Services, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Birchfield, William) (Entered: 09/29/2016)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Notice of MOTION for More Definite Statement Notice of Motion For Leave To Participate As Amicus Curiae by SEIU Local 32BJ. (Ochs, Jessica) (Entered: 09/29/2016)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support Memorandum of Law In Support of Motoin For Leave to Appear as Amicus Curiae filed by SEIU Local 32BJ. (Ochs, Jessica) (Entered: 09/29/2016)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Jessica Drangel Ochs on behalf of SEIU Local 32BJ (Ochs, Jessica) (Entered: 09/29/2016)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                          Letter seeking clarification of Judge Cogan's September 26, 2016 Order to Show Cause by Primeflight Aviation Services, Inc. (Birchfield, William) (Entered: 09/28/2016)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by James G. Paulsen (Francisco-FitzMaurice, Brady) (Entered: 09/28/2016)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE dated 9/26/16 that respondent show cause why a temporary injunction should not issue. Show Cause Hearing set for 10/6/2016 at 02:15 PM in Courtroom 8D South before Judge Brian M. Cogan. See Order for further complete details.( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/26/2016 ) (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 09/27/2016)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 09/26/2016)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Exhibits to be filed) by James G. Paulsen. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit) (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 09/26/2016)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Brady Francisco-FitzMaurice) by James G. Paulsen. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 09/26/2016)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re 1 Complaint ( Petition for Injunction) filed by James G. Paulsen. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 09/26/2016)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        Unsigned Order to Show Cause by James G. Paulsen (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 09/26/2016)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          COMPLAINT (Petition for Temporary Injunction) against Primeflight Aviation Services, Inc., filed by James G. Paulsen. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 09/26/2016)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                            Statistics

                                                                            This case has been viewed 197 times.

                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                            Space
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                             
                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                            Need Password Help?