USA v. GENTILE
Criminal Case New Jersey District Court, Case No. 2:16-cr-00155

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 31, 2017 at 1:13 AM DT (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Gentile, Guy, Defendant (1)
Officially listed as "GUY GENTILE"

Toggle Switch Represented by Armstrong, Frank

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Joseph Tacopina +1 212 227 8877 +1 212 619 1028 info@tacopinalaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by FORD O'BRIEN LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained ADAM C. FORD +1 212 858 0040 aford@fordobrien.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Tacopina, Seigel & Turano, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chad Derek Seigel +1 212 227 8877 +1 212 619 1028 cseigel@tacopinalaw.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (32) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 34 Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF APPEAL by USA as to GUY GENTILE re 33 Order on Motion to Dismiss The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (Finance notified) (COYNE, MARK) (Entered: 03/01/2017)
    LREF
    Blank 33 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER granting 14 Motion to Dismiss as to GUY GENTILE (1). Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 1/30/2017. (msd) (Entered: 01/31/2017)
      LREF
      Legal Document 32 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      OPINION as to GUY GENTILE re 14 MOTION to Dismiss Indictment filed by GUY GENTILE. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 1/30/2017. (msd) (Entered: 01/31/2017)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        Transcript of Proceedings of a Motion Hearing as to GUY GENTILE held on 12/21/2016, before Judge Jose L. Linares. Court Reporter/Transcriber Phyllis Lewis (732-735-4522). Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber only. (Miller, S) (Entered: 01/06/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to GUY GENTILE Time excluded from 12/22/2016 until 3/31/2017. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 12/22/2016. (msd) (Entered: 12/22/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jose L. Linares:Motion Hearing as to GUY GENTILE held on 12/21/2016 re 14 MOTION to Dismiss Indictment filed by GUY GENTILE. Court RESERVED decision. (Court Reporter/Recorder PHYLLIS T. LEWIS.) (lr, ) (Entered: 12/21/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Letter from defendant Guy Gentile Responding to Government's 12/15/16 Sur-Reply (SEIGEL, CHAD) (Entered: 12/19/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                Transcript of Proceedings of Status Conference as to GUY GENTILE held on November 14, 2016, before Judge JOSE L. LINARES. Court Reporter/Transcriber Phyllis Lewis (732-735-4522). Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber only. (ek) (Entered: 12/19/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Letter from USA re: Motion to Dismiss (GRIPPO, NICHOLAS) (Main Document 26 replaced on 12/16/2016) (msd). (Entered: 12/15/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    TEXT ORDER as to GUY GENTILE: The Court will hold oral argument with respect to Defendant's Motion 14 to Dismiss the Indictment on December 21, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 5D. The Court will only entertain arguments relating to the statute of limitations and Defendant's Sixth Amendment Right to a Speedy Trial. SO ORDERED by Judge Jose L. Linares on 11/14/2016. (lr, ) (Entered: 11/14/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jose L. Linares:Status Conference as to GUY GENTILE held on 11/14/2016 (Court Reporter/Recorder PHYLLIS T. LEWIS.) (lr, ) (Entered: 11/14/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by GUY GENTILE re 14 MOTION to Dismiss Indictment 16-CR-155 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit In Support of Reply to Government's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Exhibit A)(SEIGEL, CHAD) (Entered: 11/04/2016)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          Letter ORDER [Defendant's Reply Memo due 11/4/16] as to GUY GENTILE. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 10/25/2016. (msd) (Entered: 10/25/2016)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Letter from Adam Ford and Chad Seigel (SEIGEL, CHAD) (Entered: 10/24/2016)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              Transcript of Proceedings of a Status Conference as to GUY GENTILE held on 6/14/2016, before Judge Jose L. Linares. Court Reporter/Transcriber Phyllis Lewis (732-735-4522). Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber only. (Miller, S) (Entered: 09/29/2016)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                BRIEF in Opposition by USA as to GUY GENTILE re 14 MOTION to Dismiss Indictment (GRIPPO, NICHOLAS) (Entered: 09/23/2016)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  ORDER as to GUY GENTILE. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 9/22/2016. (msd) (Entered: 09/23/2016)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    CONSENT SCHEDULING ORDER as to GUY GENTILE ORDERED that: The Government shall file any opposition by 9/23/2016; that Deft. shall file any reply by 10/28/16; and that the parties shall appear for a status conference on 11/14/2016 at 3:00 PM in Newark - Courtroom 5D before Judge Jose L. Linares at which the Court will determine whether oral argument and/or further proceedings are required in connection with the pending 14 motion to dismiss and will set a schedule for such proceedings. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 8/3/16. (dc, ) (Entered: 08/05/2016)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to GUY GENTILE Time excluded from 8/3/16 until 11/30/16. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 8/3/16. (dc, ) (Entered: 08/05/2016)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE PAUL ANDREW MURPHY appearing for USA. (MURPHY, PAUL) (Entered: 07/18/2016)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document 14 Filed: 7/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          MOTION to Dismiss Indictment by GUY GENTILE. (Attachments: # 1 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support Of Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Affidavit Affidavit of Adam Ford, Esq., # 3 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit G, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit H, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit I, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit J, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit K, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit L, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit M, # 17 Exhibit Exhibit N, # 18 Exhibit Exhibit O, # 19 Exhibit Exhibit P, # 20 Exhibit Exhibit Q, # 21 Exhibit Exhibit R, # 22 Exhibit Exhibit S, # 23 Exhibit Exhibit T, # 24 Exhibit Exhibit U, # 25 Affidavit Affidavit of Guy Gentile, # 26 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order)(SEIGEL, CHAD) (Entered: 07/14/2016)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to GUY GENTILE Time excluded from 6/14/2016 until 9/8/2016. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 6/14/2016. (msd) (Entered: 06/15/2016)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              SCHEDULING ORDER as to GUY GENTILE [Status Conference set for 9/8/2016 3:00 PM in Newark - MLK Courtroom 5D before Judge Jose L. Linares] Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 6/14/2016. (msd) (Entered: 06/15/2016)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jose L. Linares:Status Conference as to GUY GENTILE held on 6/14/2016 (Court Reporter/Recorder PHYLLIS T. LEWIS.) (lr, ) (Entered: 06/14/2016)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  AMENDED ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to GUY GENTILE (1) $500,000 secured through property (Finance notified). Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 3/28/16. (nm, ) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to GUY GENTILE Time excluded from 4/4/2016 until 6/14/2016. Parties shall appear for a status conference on 6/14/2016 @ 2:30 pm at which time the Court will set a schedule for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 4/4/2016. (msd) (Entered: 04/07/2016)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: ADAM C. FORD, ESQ. appearing for GUY GENTILE (msd) (Entered: 04/05/2016)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jose L. Linares:Arraignment as to GUY GENTILE (1) Counts 1 & 2 held on 4/4/2016. Plea entered by GUY GENTILE, NOT GUILTY on Counts 1&2. Status Conference set for 6/14/2016 02:30 PM in Newark - Courtroom 5D before Judge Jose L. Linares. (Court Reporter/Recorder PHYLLIS T. LEWIS.) (lr, ) (Entered: 04/05/2016)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to GUY GENTILE (1) $500,000 secured (Finance notified). Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 3/28/16. (nm, ) (Entered: 04/01/2016)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson:Bond Hearing as to GUY GENTILE held on 3/28/2016, Initial Appearance as to GUY GENTILE held on 3/28/2016 (CD #ECR.) (nm, ) (Entered: 04/01/2016)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: CHAD D. SEIGEL appearing for GUY GENTILE (SEIGEL, CHAD) (Entered: 03/29/2016)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                INDICTMENT as to GUY GENTILE (1) count(s) 1, 2. (msd) (Entered: 03/24/2016)
                                                                  LREF

                                                                  Statistics

                                                                  This case has been viewed 39 times.

                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                  Space
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                   
                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                  Need Password Help?