Jacob Danley, et al v. Encore Capital Group, Inc., et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit, Case No. 16-1670

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 21, 2017 at 2:37 PM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RULING LETTER SENT granting motion to extend time by twenty-eight (28) days to file brief [17] filed by Mr. Aaron L. Vorce, resetting briefing schedule: appellee brief now due 10/17/2016. (LMN)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    MOTION filed by Mr. Aaron L. Vorce for Midland Credit Management, Inc., Encore Capital Group, Inc. and Midland Funding, LLC to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 09/07/2016. (ALV)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 16 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Ms. Michelle Elise Vocht for Jacob N. Danley and Jeffrey J. McIntyre. Certificate of Service:08/17/2016. Argument Request: requested. (MEV)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 08/17/2016; appellee brief due 09/19/2016. (LMN)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          The Telephone Mediation conference has been rescheduled for 06/30/2016 at 2:00 PM (ET) with Paul Calico. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Encore Capital Group, Inc., Midland Credit Management, Inc. and Midland Funding, LLC by Aaron L. Vorce. Certificate of Service: 05/27/2016. (ALV)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Ms. Michelle Elise Vocht for Appellants Jacob N. Danley and Jeffrey J. McIntyre. Certificate of Service:05/27/2016. (MEV)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Theodore W. Seitz for Appellees Midland Credit Management, Inc., Encore Capital Group, Inc. and Midland Funding, LLC Certificate of Service: 05/27/2016. (TWS)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Encore Capital Group, Inc., Midland Credit Management, Inc. and Midland Funding, LLC by Theodore W. Seitz. Certificate of Service: 05/26/2016. (TWS)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM filed by Ms. Michelle Elise Vocht for Jacob N. Danley and Jeffrey J. McIntyre; transcript ordered on 05/25/2016 from Court Reporter Mr. Ronald DiBartolomeo. [6] Certificate of Service: 05/25/2016. (MEV)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 06/30/2016 at 9:30 AM (ET) with Paul Calico. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Jacob N. Danley and Jeffrey J. McIntyre by Michelle E. Vocht. Certificate of Service: 05/25/2016. (MEV)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellants Jacob N. Danley and Jeffrey J. McIntyre. Transcript needed: y. (LMN)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 55 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?