FLORES v. GUADAMUD et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-00688

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 23, 2017 at 10:49 AM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo XAVIER FLORES, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo ANDREW CUOMO, Defendant
Obama, Barack Hussein Obama, Barack Hussein, Defendant
Officially listed as "BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II"
United States of America President, United States of America, January 20, 2009 - January 20, 2017
No Logo CHARLES BOIDEN, Defendant
No Logo DAVID PETRAEUS, Defendant
No Logo DENIS MCDONOUGH, Defendant
No Logo GEORGE HERBERT WALKER BUSH, Defendant
No Logo HILLARY RODHAM CLINTON, Defendant
No Logo JANET A. NAPOLITANO, Defendant
No Logo KEITH B. ALEXANDER, Defendant
No Logo MARIANA GUADAMUD, Defendant
No Logo MARK J. SULLIVAN, Defendant
No Logo MICHAEL GALLO, Defendant
No Logo Michael Huerta, Defendant
No Logo MICHELE LEONHART, Defendant
Bloomberg, Michael Rubens Bloomberg, Michael Rubens, Defendant
Officially listed as "MIKE BLOOMBERG"
No Logo RICHARD TRUMKA, Defendant
No Logo ROBERT GATES, Defendant
No Logo ROBERT POPP, Defendant
No Logo SUSAN N. HERMAN, Defendant
No Logo TIMOTHY F. GEITHNER, Defendant
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER DISMISSING PRO SE CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Ordered that the application of the plaintiff to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. This is a final appealable Order. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/3/2013. (zam, ) (Entered: 05/15/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 3 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/3/2013. (zam, ) (Entered: 05/15/2013)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by XAVIER FLORES. (zam, ) (Entered: 05/15/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 0.00) filed by XAVIER FLORES. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(zam, ) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/24/2013) (kb). (Entered: 05/15/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 84 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?