ADAMS v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-01041

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 1, 2017 at 7:40 PM DT (3.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo DALE BRENT ADAMS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by DALE BRENT ADAMS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DALE BRENT ADAMS +1 870 365 0827
v.
No Logo BRUCE MACDONALD, Defendant
No Logo CHARLES T. HAGEL, Defendant
Rice, Condoleezza Rice, Condoleezza, Defendant
Officially listed as "CONDOLEEZZA RICE"
Unknown Role, Kior, Inc.
Unknown Role, Evenflow, Inc.
Unknown Role, C3, Inc.
No Logo DONALD RUMSFELD, Defendant
No Logo HILLARY RODHAM CLINTON, Defendant
No Logo JANET NAPOLITANO, Defendant
No Logo John F. Kerry, Defendant
No Logo LEON PANETTA, Defendant
No Logo Michael Chertoff, Defendant
Gates, Robert M. Gates, Robert M., Defendant
Officially listed as "ROBERT M. GATES"
Nacco Industries, Inc. Unknown Role, Nacco Industries, Inc.
Starbucks Corporation Unknown Role, Starbucks Corporation
No Logo TIM L. WATKINS, Defendant
United States Department of Defense United States Department of Defense, Defendant
United States Department of Homeland Security United States Department of Homeland Security, Defendant
United States Department of State United States Department of State, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER of USCA (certified copy) as to 7 Notice of Appeal filed by DALE B. ADAMS ; ORDERED that the motion be granted, and this case is hereby dismissed. USCA Case Number 13-5244. (md, ) (Entered: 09/07/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re 7 Notice of Appeal, 8 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA. (md, ) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Fee was not paid because it was filed In Forma Pauperis re 7 Notice of Appeal. (md, ) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 5 Memorandum & Opinion, 6 Order Dismissing Pro Se Case, by DALE B. ADAMS. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (md, ) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER DISMISSING PRO SE CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Ordered that the application of the plaintiff to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. Further ordered that the motion to appoint legal counsel is denied. This is a final appealable Order. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 7/2/13. (zmr) (Entered: 07/11/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 7/2/13. (zmr) (Entered: 07/11/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              AMENDED COMPLAINT against HILLARY R. CLINTON, JOHN KERRY, CONDOLEEZZA RICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, MICHAEL CHERTOFF, JANET NAPOLITANO, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, TIM L. WATKINS, BRUCE MACDONALD, DONALD RUMSFELD, ROBERT M. GATES, LEON PANETTA, CHUCK HAGEL with Jury Demand filed by DALE B. ADAMS.(zmr, ) (Entered: 07/11/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                MOTION to Appoint Counsel by DALE B. ADAMS. (zmr) (Entered: 07/11/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by DALE B. ADAMS. (zmr) (Entered: 07/11/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    COMPLAINT against HILLARY R. CLINTON, JOHN KERRY, CONDOLEEZZA RICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Filing fee $ 0.00) with Jury Demand filed by DALE B. ADAMS. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(zmr) (Entered: 07/11/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 109 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?