Rocco Genova, Jr. v. Total Card, Inc.
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit, Case No. 16-2935

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 28, 2016 at 4:46 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012370640 Filed: 8/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellant Rocco Genova Jr. due on or before 09/12/2016. Appendix due on or before 09/12/2016. (TMM)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012361309 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Yitzchak Zelman, Esq. on behalf of Appellant(s) Rocco Genova, Jr.. (YZ)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012361312 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Ari H. Marcus, Esq. on behalf of Appellant(s) Rocco Genova, Jr.. (YZ)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012361324 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Rocco Genova, Jr., filed. (YZ)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012361361 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Rocco Genova, Jr., received. (YZ)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012361366 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Rocco Genova, Jr. advising this court that no transcripts are available. (YZ)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012358974 Filed: 7/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              ORDER (Clerk) After consideration of the response filed by the appellant, this appeal will not be submitted to a motions panel for possible dismissal due to jurisdictional defect at this time. The issue of jurisdiction is referred to the merits panel. The parties are advised that this Order does not represent a finding of appellate jurisdiction in this matter. As in all cases, the panel of this Court that reviews the appeal on its merits will make a final determination of appellate jurisdiction. A briefing schedule will be issued at the appropriate time. The parties should address jurisdiction in their briefs, filed. (TMM)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012355523 Filed: 7/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                FOLLOW UP LETTER to Ari H. Marcus, Esq. for Rocco Genova, Jr. and Yitzchak Zelman, Esq. for Rocco Genova, Jr. requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form within 14 days. Information Statement on or before 07/29/2016. Concise Summary on or before 07/29/2016. Transcript Purchase Order on or before 07/29/2016. (TMM)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012355529 Filed: 7/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  FOLLOW UP LETTER to Concepcion A. Montoya, Esq. for Total Card Inc requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form within 14 days. Disclosure Statement on or before 07/29/2016. (TMM)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 118 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?