Samms v. Abrams, Fensterman, Fensterman
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Case No. 16-2987

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 10, 2017 at 9:43 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Abrams, Fensterman, Fensterman, Eisman, Formato, Ferrara & Wolf, LLP Brief due date as 12/28/2016. Joint Appendix due date as 12/28/2016, FILED.[1883074] [16-2987] [Entered: 10/13/2016 11:09 AM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Abrams, Fensterman, Fensterman, Eisman, Formato, Ferrara & Wolf, LLP, informing Court of proposed due date 12/28/2016, RECEIVED. Service date 10/13/2016 by CM/ECF.[1882937] [16-2987] [Entered: 10/13/2016 10:07 AM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      CAMP CONFERENCE ORDER: Type of Conference: In-Person, Scheduled Date of Conference: 11/18/2016, Start Time: 10:30 AM, endorsed by Kathleen M. Scanlon, FILED.[1882267] [16-2987] [Entered: 10/12/2016 02:05 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, LR 31.2 Scheduling Notification, [20], on behalf of Appellant Abrams, Fensterman, Fensterman, Eisman, Formato, Ferrara & Wolf, LLP, FILED.[1880389] [16-2987] [Entered: 10/11/2016 08:30 AM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 20 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          TRANSFER STIPULATION, RECEIVED. Service date 10/07/2016 by CM/ECF.[1879979] [16-2987] [Entered: 10/07/2016 02:25 PM]
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            TRANSCRIPT STATUS UPDATE LETTER, dated 09/29/2016, on behalf of Appellant Abrams, Fensterman, Fensterman, Eisman, Formato, Ferrara & Wolf, LLP , informing court of transcript delays, RECEIVED. Service date 09/29/2016 by CM/ECF.[1873562] [16-2987] [Entered: 09/29/2016 01:49 AM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              NEW CASE MANAGER, Dana Ellwood, ASSIGNED.[1862055] [16-2987] [Entered: 09/13/2016 03:10 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Abrams, Fensterman, Fensterman, Eisman, Formato, Ferrara & Wolf, LLP, FILED. Service date 09/08/2016 by US mail.[1858874] [16-2987] [Entered: 09/08/2016 02:42 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Larry Samms, FILED. Service date 09/02/2016 by CM/ECF.[1856170] [16-2987] [Entered: 09/02/2016 04:53 PM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Abrams, Fensterman, Fensterman, Eisman, Formato, Ferrara & Wolf, LLP, district court receipt # 0208-12700018, FILED.[1852630] [16-2987] [Entered: 08/30/2016 02:11 PM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      ADDENDUM, on behalf of Appellant Abrams, Fensterman, Fensterman, Eisman, Formato, Ferrara & Wolf, LLP, FILED. Service date 08/29/2016 by email, CM/ECF.[1851982] [16-2987] [Entered: 08/29/2016 06:25 PM]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Abrams, Fensterman, Fensterman, Eisman, Formato, Ferrara & Wolf, LLP, FILED. Service date 08/29/2016 by email, CM/ECF.[1851981] [16-2987] [Entered: 08/29/2016 06:24 PM]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Abrams, Fensterman, Fensterman, Eisman, Formato, Ferrara & Wolf, LLP, FILED. Service date 08/29/2016 by CM/ECF.[1851678] [16-2987] [Entered: 08/29/2016 02:58 PM]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1851448] [16-2987] [Entered: 08/29/2016 12:11 PM]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT, dated 07/28/2016, RECEIVED.[1851433] [16-2987] [Entered: 08/29/2016 12:06 PM]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Abrams, Fensterman, Fensterman, Eisman, Formato, Ferrara & Wolf, LLP, FILED. [1851423] [16-2987] [Entered: 08/29/2016 12:03 PM]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 119 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?