Jeffrey Brill v. TransUnion LLC
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit, Case No. 16-1091

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 9, 2017 at 5:09 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (36) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00702882505 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
FOR COURT USE ONLY: Certified copy of 10/04/2016 Opinion & Judgment, 11/07/2016 Rehearing Denial Order with the court's 11/15/16 Mandate and Bill of Costs sent to the District Court Clerk. [6797639-2] [6797639] [16-1091] (ER)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Mandate issued with bill of costs in the amount of $61.50. No record to be returned. [37] [6797619] [16-1091] (ER)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      ORDER: On 10/18/2016, plaintiff‐appellant filed a petition for rehearing en banc. All the judges on the original panel have voted to deny the petition and none of the judges in regular active service have requested a vote on the petition for rehearing en banc. The petition is therefore DENIED.[36] [6795994] [16-1091] (MM)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Filed Petition for Rehearing and Petition for Rehearing Enbanc by Appellant Jeffrey Brill. Paper copies due on 10/21/2016 [35] [6791444] [16-1091] (MT)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Submitted petition for rehearing enbanc by Julie A. Murray for Appellant Jeffrey Brill. [34] [6791364] [16-1091] (Murray, Julie)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Brief deficiency letter sent to Appellant Jeffrey Brill. [33] [6791333] [16-1091] (MT)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Submitted petition for rehearing enbanc by Julie A. Murray for Appellant Jeffrey Brill. [32] [6791115] [16-1091] (Murray, Julie)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Filed Bill of Costs by Appellee TransUnion LLC in the amount of $61.50. [31] [6788997] [16-1091] (Brown, William)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with internet citation. ATTACHED. [30] [16-1091] (BF)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    ORDER: Final judgment filed per opinion. With costs: yes. [29] [6787908] [16-1091] (CD)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      Filed opinion of the court by Judge Posner. AFFIRMED. Richard A. Posner, Circuit Judge; Daniel A. Manion, Circuit Judge and Ann Claire Williams, Circuit Judge. [28] [6787905] [16-1091] (CD)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Received argument confirmation from Julie Murray for Appellant Jeffrey Brill. [25] [6777153] [16-1091] (Murray, Julie)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Received argument confirmation from William R. Brown for Appellee TransUnion LLC. [24] [6770068] [16-1091] (Brown, William)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Original record on appeal filed electronically. Contents of record : 1 vol. of pleadings. [23] [6769346] [16-1091] (SK)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Argument set for Friday, September 9, 2016, at 9:30 a.m. in the Main Courtroom, Room 2721. Each side limited to 10 minutes. [22] [6769007] [16-1091] (SK)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Notice to the District Court to transmit the record on appeal. [21] [6769002] [16-1091] (SK)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank 20 Filed: 6/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Appellant's reply brief filed by Appellant Jeffrey Brill. Paper copies due on 06/09/2016 Electronically Transmitted. [20] [6755197] [16-1091] (CO)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Submitted appellant reply brief by Julie A. Murray for Appellant Jeffrey Brill. [19] [6754805] [16-1091] (Murray, Julie)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Appellee's brief filed by Appellee TransUnion LLC. Paper copies due on 05/25/2016 Electronically Transmitted. [18] [6751450] [16-1091] (NR)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        NOTICE: Attorney Ms. Julie A. Murray for Appellant Jeffrey Brill will not be available for oral argument August 8-12, 2016. [17] [6751391] [16-1091] (Murray, Julie)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Submitted appellee brief by William R. Brown for Appellee TransUnion LLC. [16] [6751357] [16-1091] (Brown, William)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Julie A. Murray for Appellant Jeffrey Brill. [15] [6749449] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-Yes) [16-1091]--[Edited 05/10/2016 by MM to reflect termination and addition of counsel.] (Murray, Julie)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Appellant's brief filed by Appellant Jeffrey Brill. Paper copies due on 04/25/2016 Electronically Transmitted. [14] [6743724] [16-1091] (GW)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Blank 13 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Submitted appellant brief by Scott Michelman for Appellant Jeffrey Brill. [13] [6743630] [16-1091] (Michelman, Scott)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 04/18/2016 for Jeffrey Brill. Appellee's brief due on or before 05/18/2016 for TransUnion LLC. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 06/01/2016 for Appellant Jeffrey Brill. JNS [6732629] [16-1091] (CAG)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Notice of Circuit Rule 33 settlement conference issued. The conference will be conducted by phone, Wednesday, March 16, 2016 at 9:30 a.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JNS. [11] [6732625] [16-1091] (CAG)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      ORDER: This appeal shall proceed to briefing. The briefing schedule is as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 03/21/2016 for Jeffrey Brill. Appellee's brief due on or before 04/20/2016 for Trans Union LLC. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 05/04/2016 for Appellant Jeffrey Brill. DW [6727431] [16-1091] (FP)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Filed Response by Appellee Trans Union LLC to Jurisdictional Memorandum Of Appellant Jeffrey Brill [Doc. No. 6-1]. [9][6726926] [16-1091] (Brown, William)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney William R. Brown, Esq. for Appellee Trans Union LLC. [8] [6726923] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [16-1091] (Brown, William)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            ORDER re: JURISDICTIONAL MEMORANDUM OF APPELLANT JEFFREY BRILL” filed on January 29. 2016. The defendant-appellee shall file, on or before February 8, 2016, a response to appellant’s memorandum, addressing the jurisdictional issue raised in the court's order of January 15, 2016. [7] [6725226] [16-1091] (FP)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              Jurisdictional memorandum filed by Appellant Jeffrey Brill. [6] [6724604] [16-1091] (Michelman, Scott)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Jeffrey Brill. [5] [6723518] [16-1091] (CD)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Jeffrey Brill. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [4] [6722754] [16-1091] (Michelman, Scott)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Scott Michelman for Appellant Jeffrey Brill. [3] [6722704] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-Yes) [16-1091] ]--[Edited 01/21/2016 by MM to reflect addition of counsel.] (Michelman, Scott)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      ORDER: Appellant Jeffrey Brill shall file a brief memorandum stating why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. A motion for voluntary dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b) will satisfy this requirement. Briefing shall be SUSPENDED pending further court order. [6721778] Jurisdictional memorandum due for Appellant Jeffrey Brill by 01/29/2016. (See order for further details) DW [2] [6721778] [16-1091] (VG)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Jeffrey Brill by 01/21/2016. Transcript information sheet due by 01/29/2016. Appellant's brief due on or before 02/24/2016 for Jeffrey Brill. [1] [6721653] [16-1091] (CD)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                          Statistics

                                                                          This case has been viewed 116 times.

                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                          Space
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                           
                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                          Need Password Help?