Hearts on Fire Company, LLC v. Circa, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:14-cv-11044
Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 17, 2017 at 6:03 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Hearts on Fire Company, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew J. Iverson +1 617 406 6038 +1 617 406 6138 matthew.iverson@dlapiper.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Miles David Norton +1 212 335 4622 +1 917 778 8122 miles.norton@dlapiper.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leah S.P. Rabin +1 617 406 6049 leah.rabin@dlapiper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert P. Sherman +1 617 406 6035 +1 617 406 6135 Jennifer.Sullivan@dlapiper.com
No Logo Circa, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/23/2015, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony Scott Barkow +1 212 891 1662 +1 212 909 0860 abarkow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 03/23/2015, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marisa K. Perry +1 212 891 1623 +1 212 909 0823 mperry@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LibbyHoopes, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas S. Brooks +1 617 338 9300 +1 617 338 9911 dbrooks@lhblaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Moskowitz & Brooks, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Todd Parker +1 212 221 7999 +1 212 398 8835 mparker@mb-llp.com
v.
No Logo Circa, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/23/2015, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony Scott Barkow +1 212 891 1662 +1 212 909 0860 abarkow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 03/23/2015, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marisa K. Perry +1 212 891 1623 +1 212 909 0823 mperry@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LibbyHoopes, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas S. Brooks +1 617 338 9300 +1 617 338 9911 dbrooks@lhblaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Moskowitz & Brooks, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Todd Parker +1 212 221 7999 +1 212 398 8835 mparker@mb-llp.com
No Logo Hearts on Fire Company, LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew J. Iverson +1 617 406 6038 +1 617 406 6138 matthew.iverson@dlapiper.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Miles David Norton +1 212 335 4622 +1 917 778 8122 miles.norton@dlapiper.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leah S.P. Rabin +1 617 406 6049 leah.rabin@dlapiper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert P. Sherman +1 617 406 6035 +1 617 406 6135 Jennifer.Sullivan@dlapiper.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
  Entries (34) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Status Conference set for 10/11/2016 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 23 before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 09/20/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    NOTICE of Appearance by Leah S.P. Rabin on behalf of Hearts on Fire Company, LLC (Rabin, Leah) (Entered: 06/16/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 31 Assented to Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. New deadlines set as noted in the motion. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 06/16/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Circa, Inc..(Brooks, Douglas) (Entered: 06/15/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 29 Assented to Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Fact Discovery to be completed by 6/17/2016. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 03/18/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to June 17, 2016 to Complete Discovery (Fact Discovery) by Circa, Inc..(Brooks, Douglas) (Entered: 03/17/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/18/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ORDER entered. STIPULATION AND ORDER GOVERNING THE TREATMENT OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION(Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 12/28/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/18/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ENDORSED ORDER entered granting 26 Joint Motion for Protective Order (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 12/28/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/18/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Hearts on Fire Company, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Stipulated Protective Order)(Norton, Miles) (Entered: 12/18/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ORDER entered. SCHEDULING AND INSTRUCTION ORDER (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 11/06/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell added. Judge Mark L. Wolf no longer assigned to case. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/20/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/20/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          CONSENT by all parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. IT IS ORDERED. (Bartlett, Timothy) (Entered: 10/20/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: Scheduling Conference held on 10/15/2015. The court will adopt the deadlines in the joint report but changes the date for amendments of pleadings to 4/15/16. The court indicates that the deadlines are firm unless for good cause. The parties indicate ADR may be premature. The Court asks them to contact the clerk if they would like to send the case to ADR. Scheduling order to issue. (Court Reporter: No Court Reporter Used.)(Attorneys present: Sherman, Norton, Parker and Brooks) (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 10/15/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              JOINT SUBMISSION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 Parties' Discovery Plan and Joint Statement by Hearts on Fire Company, LLC.(Norton, Miles) (Entered: 10/08/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                NOTICE of Appearance by Miles D. Norton on behalf of Hearts on Fire Company, LLC (Norton, Miles) (Entered: 10/08/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 17 Motion to Continue. Scheduling Conference re-set for 10/15/2015 @ 11:00 AM in Courtroom 23 before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 09/09/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference to October 15, 2015 (Unopposed) by Circa, Inc..(Brooks, Douglas) (Entered: 09/08/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 10/7/2015 @ 10:15 AM in Courtroom 23 before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. Please see attached notice for full details and requirements. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 09/08/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        Judge Mark L. Wolf: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. Referred for: Full Pretrial, Dispositive Motions (ptd). (Bartlett, Timothy) (Entered: 09/08/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 09/08/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Anthony S. Barkow and Marissa K. Perry (Barkow, Anthony) (Entered: 03/23/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              NOTICE of Appearance by M. Todd Parker on behalf of Circa, Inc. (Parker, M.) (Entered: 03/23/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/18/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                Judge Mark L. Wolf: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added M. Todd Parker. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Franklin, Yvonne) (Entered: 03/18/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of M. Todd Parker Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-5460170 by Circa, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Brooks, Douglas) (Entered: 03/17/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    ANSWER to Counterclaim by Hearts on Fire Company, LLC.(Iverson, Matthew) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      Judge Mark L. Wolf: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Anthony S. Barkow and Marisa K. Perry. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (MacDonald, Gail) (Entered: 04/10/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        STATE COURT Record Circa, Inc. summons served on 2/28/2014, answer due 3/21/2014.. (Brooks, Douglas) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Hearts on Fire Company, LLC by Circa, Inc..(Brooks, Douglas) (Entered: 03/27/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Anthony S. Barkow, Marisa K. Perry Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number 0101-4934555 by Circa, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Brooks, Douglas) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas S. Brooks on behalf of Circa, Inc. (Brooks, Douglas) (Entered: 03/20/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 03/20/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                  ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark L. Wolf assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 03/20/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Circa, Inc. ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-4921056 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Category Form)(Brooks, Douglas) (Attachment 4 replaced on 3/25/2014 for correct PDF format ) (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde). (Entered: 03/20/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                      Statistics

                                                                      This case has been viewed 137 times.

                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                      Space
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                       
                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                      Need Password Help?