DJABATEY v. HANA INDUSTRIES, INC. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-01952

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 3, 2017 at 6:23 PM ST (4.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ARCHIBALD S DJABATEY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Karr & Allison PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Theodore S. Allison +1 202 331 7600 +1 202 293 3999 tsallison@karrallison.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Theodore S. Allison +1 202 331 7600 +1 202 293 3999 tsallison@karrallison.com
v.
No Logo HANA INDUSTRIES, INC., Defendant
No Logo UNITED SECURITY AND POLICE OFFICERS OF AMERICA, Defendant
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 160(1)
Nature of Suit 790 - Labor: Other
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: None Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/26/2017, Entered: None Waiver of Service
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/26/2017, Entered: None Summons Returned as to private individual or business
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: None Standing Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/28/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: None Electronic Summons Reissued
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/15/2016, Entered: None Request for Summons to Issue
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/15/2016, Entered: None Summons Returned Unexecuted
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 1 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4693894) filed by Archibald S Djabatey. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Hana Industries, # 3 Summons United Security and Police Ofcrs)(Allison, Theodore) (Entered: 09/30/2016)
                        LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 134 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?