Dyson, Inc. et al v. Sharkninja Operating LLC et al
Federal Court Proceeding Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:16-mc-00280
District Judge Michael P. Shea, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 3, 2017 at 11:17 PM DT (4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Dyson Technology Ltd., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Dyson Technology Limited"

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dennis John Abdelnour +1 312 862 3102 +1 202 879 5200 dabdelnour@kirkland.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan Scott Hales +1 312 862 2000 +1 312 862 2200 bhales@kirkland.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robinson & Cole, LLP-HTFD

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen Elizabeth Dion +1 860 275 8231 kdion@rc.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nuala E Droney +1 860 275 8346 +1 860 275 8299 ndroney@rc.com
No Logo Dyson, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dennis John Abdelnour +1 312 862 3102 +1 202 879 5200 dabdelnour@kirkland.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan Scott Hales +1 312 862 2000 +1 312 862 2200 bhales@kirkland.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robinson & Cole, LLP-HTFD

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen Elizabeth Dion +1 860 275 8231 kdion@rc.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nuala E Droney +1 860 275 8346 +1 860 275 8299 ndroney@rc.com
v.
No Logo Sharkninja Operating LLC, Defendant
No Logo SharkNinja Sales Co., Defendant
No Logo Great Blue Research Inc., Witness
Citation Motion to Compel
Nature of Suit 990 - Other
  Entries (40) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The parties have filed a 39 notice indicating that no outstanding issues remain to be resolved and requesting termination of the case. Accordingly, the Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 11/21/2016. (Howard, H.) (Entered: 11/21/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Notice of Compliance with Pretrial Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Sealed Document
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Seal
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael P. Shea: Telephonic Status Conference held on 11/4/2016. 35 minutes(Court Reporter Marshall.) (Johnson, D.) (Entered: 11/04/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ORDER. As discussed on the telephonic status conference call held today, Great Blue Research Inc. ("Great Blue") shall file an affidavit by a person with technical competence within 7 days of this order that sets forth (i) whether responsive emails of former Great Blue employee, Dan Quatrocelli (the "Quatrocelli Emails"), are accessible or can be made accessible by any technical means either through "un-archiving" or otherwise, or whether such emails have been deleted entirely and are no longer capable of being restored by any technical means, and (ii) if the Quatrocelli emails are or can be made accessible, the process for making such emails readily available, for searching them to locate any that are responsive to the subpoena, and for producing them to Dyson, (iii) the time, costs, and burden associated with restoring or otherwise making the emails readily available, searching them, and producing them, including whether or not Great Blue would need to retain outside personnel for this purpose, how many Great Blue and/or outside personnel would be needed for the project, the total costs of the project, and the estimated time needed to complete the project. The affidavit shall also include a specific statement by the affiant of the time and costs associated with preparing the affidavit, a statement that must be verifiable through time records or other documents kept in the ordinary course of business and used for timekeeping or billing purposes. At the same time Great Blue files the affidavit discussed above, Great Blue shall also file an affidavit of its counsel setting forth the costs, fees, and time that its counsel incurred with the preparation and filing of the affidavit described in the preceding sentences of this order; counsel's affidavit must attach contemporaneous supporting time records, the narrative portions of which may be redacted and filed under seal (and without providing a copy of the narrative portions to other parties or counsel). See N.Y. State Ass'n for Retarded Children, Inc. v. Carey, 711 F.2d 1136, 1148 (2d Cir. 1983)(requiring documentation of requests for attorneys' fees with records that "specify, for each attorney, the date, the hours expended, and the nature of the work done."). Within 7 days of Great Blue's filing of the affidavits described above, (1) Dyson shall file a statement confirming that it has paid the costs and fees identified in the two Great Blue Affidavits or that it has paid that portion of such costs and fees that it considers reasonable and that it contests the remainder (in which case it shall set forth a specific basis for such contest), and (2) the parties shall meet, confer, and file a joint statement setting forth (i) whether plaintiff continues to seek production of the Quatrocelli emails in light of the information provided in Great Blue's affidavit, (ii) whether the scope of Dyson's requests can be narrowed to decrease any costs associated with the restoration, collection, and production of the Quatrocelli emails, and (iii) how each side proposes that the Court proceed to resolve any matters remaining in dispute, which matters shall be specifically identified. To the extent the parties cannot agree, the joint statement may set forth the separate positions of each, but the joint statement as a whole shall not exceed 5 pages. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 11/4/2016. (Howard, H.) (Entered: 11/04/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: None Certificate of Good Standing
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    ORDER. The Court has reviewed the parties' submissions in response to the Court's 19 order regarding whether there remain any issues to resolve. In light of those filings, the Court will host a telephonic status conference on November 4, 2016 at 11:30 a.m. to discuss this matter. The Court will provide counsel dial-in information for the conference call via email. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 11/01/2016. (Howard, H.) (Entered: 11/01/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: None Sealed Document
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: None Seal
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: None Response
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            ORDER. The Third Party's 23 Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED. The Third Party shall have until 5:00 p.m. on October 31, 2016 to submit a response to plaintiff's 24 list of remaining issues for the Court to resolve. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 10/31/2016. (Howard, H.) (Entered: 10/31/2016)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/28/2016, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/28/2016, Entered: None Seal
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/28/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/28/2016, Entered: None extension of time
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/28/2016, Entered: None Certificate of Good Standing
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/28/2016, Entered: None Certificate of Good Standing
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/28/2016, Entered: None Certificate of Good Standing
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            ORDER: The Court has reviewed the parties' submissions and is uncertain whether there remain any issues to resolve. Accordingly, the Court orders as follows: If Dyson's position is that all issues raised by its motion to compel (ECF No. 1) have been resolved, it shall file a one-page statement on the docket so indicating by 5pm on October 26, 2016. If not, counsel for Dyson shall confer -- by telephone or in person -- with counsel for Great Blue to identify the remaining issues to be resolved by the Court, after which the parties shall jointly file a list of such issues exceeding no more than two pages and annotated with page numbers referring to the portions of their briefs at which each such issue is addressed. If the parties cannot agree on the contents of such a list, each shall file its own such list, neither of which shall exceed two pages. All such filings -- whether a joint list or individual lists -- shall be made by 5pm on October 28, 2016. If Dyson files a statement indicating there are no remaining issues for the Court to resolve or if there is no response to this order, the Court will deny the motion to compel as moot and close this case. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 10/25/2016. (Howard, H.) (Entered: 10/25/2016)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Sealed Legal Document 18 Filed: 10/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Sealed Document: NonParty GreatBlue's Opposition to Dyson's Motion to Compel and Exhibits by Great Blue Research Inc. re 16 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,,,, 17 MOTION to Seal NonParty GreatBlue Research Inc's Opposition to Dyson's Motion to Compel and Exhibits 1-13, 15-17 and 19-21 . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 15, # 15 Exhibit 16, # 16 Exhibit 17, # 17 Exhibit 19, # 18 Exhibit 20, # 19 Exhibit 21)(Rechen, Thomas) (Entered: 10/21/2016)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                MOTION to Seal NonParty GreatBlue Research Inc's Opposition to Dyson's Motion to Compel and Exhibits 1-13, 15-17 and 19-21 by Great Blue Research Inc.. (Rechen, Thomas) (Entered: 10/21/2016)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Memorandum in Opposition re 1 MOTION to Compel Subpoena Compliance Emergency (paid $46 fee; receipt number 0205-4154417) filed by Great Blue Research Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Filed Under Seal), # 2 Exhibit 2 (Filed Under Seal), # 3 Exhibit 3 (Filed Under Seal), # 4 Exhibit 4 (Filed Under Seal), # 5 Exhibit 5 (Filed Under Seal), # 6 Exhibit 6 (Filed Under Seal), # 7 Exhibit 7 (Filed Under Seal), # 8 Exhibit 8 (Filed Under Seal), # 9 Exhibit 9 (Portions Filed Under Seal), # 10 Exhibit 10 (Filed Under Seal), # 11 Exhibit 11 (Filed Under Seal), # 12 Exhibit 12 (Filed Under Seal), # 13 Exhibit 13 (Filed Under Seal), # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15 (Portions Filed Under Seal), # 16 Exhibit 16 (Portions Filed Under Seal), # 17 Exhibit 17 (Portions Filed Under Seal), # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19 (Portions Filed Under Seal), # 20 Exhibit 20 (Filed Under Seal), # 21 Exhibit 21 (Filed Under Seal), # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23)(Rechen, Thomas) (Entered: 10/21/2016)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    ORDER granting 12 Motion for Attorney David L. Witcoff to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 14 Motion for Attorney John C. Evans to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 12/12/2016. Signed by Clerk on 10/13/2016. (Shafer, J.) (Entered: 10/13/2016)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/12/2016, Entered: None Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/12/2016, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/12/2016, Entered: None Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              Order. Great Blue Research Inc. (Great Blue) shall file a response to plaintiff's 1 Emergency Motion to Compel within 14 days of this order and such response shall not exceed 20 pages. Defendants in the underlying case, Dyson, Inc. v. SharkNinja Operating LLC; Docket No. 1:14-cv-00779 (N.D. Ill.), may also file a response, if they wish, to plaintiff's 1 Emergency Motion to Compel, but if both Great Blue and defendants file a response to plaintiff's 1 Emergency Motion to Compel, each response shall be no more than 10 pages. Plaintiff in the underlying case shall file proof of service of this order on Great Blue and defendants in the underlying action on or before close of business on Wednesday, October 12, 2016 at 5:00 p.m. Also, by the close of business on Wednesday, October 12, 2016 at 5:00 p.m., plaintiff in the underlying case shall also file adequate proof of service of the subpoena dated September 1, 2016; its existing proof of service does not indicate whether plaintiff tendered witness fees as required under Rule 45(b)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 10/07/2016. (Howard, H.) (Entered: 10/07/2016)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  ORDER granting 4 Motion for Attorney Bryan S. Hales to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice; granting 5 Motion for Attorney Dennis J. Abdelnour to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 12/3/2016. Signed by Clerk on 10/04/2016. (Shafer, J.) (Entered: 10/04/2016)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                    ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 10/03/2016. (Shafer, J.) (Entered: 10/04/2016)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Elizabeth Dion on behalf of Dyson Technology Limited, Dyson, Inc. (Dion, Kathleen) (Entered: 10/03/2016)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        MOTION for Attorney(s) Dennis J. Abdelnour to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4154440) by Dyson Technology Limited, Dyson, Inc.. (Droney, Nuala) (Entered: 10/03/2016)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          MOTION for Attorney(s) Bryan S. Hales to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4154439) by Dyson Technology Limited, Dyson, Inc.. (Droney, Nuala) (Entered: 10/03/2016)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            MOTION to Seal Unredacted Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Compel and Exhibits by Dyson Technology Limited, Dyson, Inc.. (Droney, Nuala) (Entered: 10/03/2016)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 2 Filed: 10/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              Sealed Document: Unredacted Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Compel and Exhibits by Dyson Technology Limited, Dyson, Inc. re 1 MOTION to Compel Subpoena Compliance Emergency (paid $46 fee; receipt number 0205-4154417) . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2, # 2 Exhibit 3, # 3 Exhibit 4, # 4 Exhibit 5, # 5 Exhibit 11)(Droney, Nuala) (Entered: 10/03/2016)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                MOTION to Compel Subpoena Compliance Emergency (paid $46 fee; receipt number 0205-4154417), filed by Dyson, Inc., Dyson Technology Limited.Responses due by 10/24/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13)(Droney, Nuala) (Entered: 10/03/2016)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                  This case has been viewed 140 times.

                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                  Space
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                   
                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                  Need Password Help?